MSLR/LNER Parker "N4" Class 0-6-2T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/1932 | Condemned | 5626 | COND | ||||
01/1932 | Condemned | 5638 | COND | ||||
04/1932 | Condemned | 5627 | COND | ||||
05/1932 | Condemned | 5722 | COND | ||||
06/1932 | Condemned | 5631 | COND | ||||
03/1933 | Condemned | 5630 | COND | ||||
04/1933 | Condemned | 5613 | COND | ||||
04/1933 | Condemned | 5616 | COND | ||||
07/1933 | Condemned | 5714 | COND | ||||
08/1933 | Condemned | 5612 | COND | ||||
08/1933 | Condemned | 5603 | COND | ||||
10/1933 | Condemned | 5619 | COND | ||||
10/1933 | Condemned | 5601 | COND | ||||
10/1933 | Condemned | 5712 | COND | ||||
02/1934 | Condemned | 5717 | COND | ||||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 5614 | LIN | Lincoln | |||
08/1936 | Condemned | 5617 | COND | ||||
09/1936 | Condemned | 5609 | COND | ||||
09/1936 | Condemned | 5719 | COND | ||||
04/1937 | Condemned | 5607 | COND | ||||
04/1937 | Condemned | 5608 | COND | ||||
05/1937 | Condemned | 5715 | COND | ||||
09/1937 | Condemned | 5618 | COND | ||||
10/1937 | Condemned | 5621 | COND | ||||
12/1937 | Condemned | 5615 | COND | ||||
01/1938 | Condemned | 5512 | COND | ||||
07/1938 | Condemned | 5624 | COND | ||||
11/1938 | Condemned | 5610 | COND | ||||
08/1939 | Condemned | 5604 | COND | ||||
08/1939 | Condemned | 5602 | COND | ||||
08/1939 | Condemned | 5723 | COND | ||||
03/1940 | Condemned | 5634 | COND | ||||
02/1946 | Condemned | 9248 | COND | ||||
07/1947 | Condemned | 9238 | COND | ||||
10/01/1948 | Reallocation | 5619 | 98W | YK | York (North) | ||
10/01/1948 | Reallocation | 5621 | 98W | YK | York (North) | ||
10/01/1948 | Reallocation | 5631 | 98W | YK | York (North) | ||
22/05/1948 | Reallocation | 5603 | 98W | STM | St Margarets | ||
23/10/1948 | Reallocation | 5604 | 98W | NBH | Blyth (North) | ||
20/11/1948 | Reallocation | 5604 | NBH | Blyth (North) | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | |
29/01/1949 | Reallocation | 5631 | YK | York (North) | MAL | Malton | |
30/07/1949 | Reallocation | 5624 | 98W | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
06/08/1949 | Reallocation | 5621 | YK | York (North) | WBY | Whitby | |
09/1949 | Condemned | 69241 | COND | ||||
10/1949 | Condemned | 69226 | COND | ||||
10/1949 | Condemned | 69243 | COND | ||||
03/12/1949 | Reallocation | 5624 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | WBY | Whitby | |
03/12/1949 | Reallocation | 5627 | 98W | WBY | Whitby | ||
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 69225 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |||
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 9231 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |||
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 69239 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |||
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 69246 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |||
05/1950 | Condemned | 69247 | COND | ||||
03/07/1950 | Condemned | 69237 | COND | ||||
01/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5631 | MAL | Malton | 50G | Whitby | |
30/10/1950 | Condemned | 69245 | COND | ||||
14/01/1952 | Condemned | 69242 | COND | ||||
25/02/1952 | Condemned | 69244 | COND | ||||
28/04/1952 | Condemned | 69246 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
23/06/1952 | Condemned | 69229 | COND | ||||
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 69225 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
10/11/1952 | Condemned | 69240 | COND | ||||
12/01/1953 | Condemned | 69234 | COND | ||||
09/11/1953 | Condemned | 69227 | COND | ||||
24/03/1954 | Condemned | 69239 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
08/1954 | Condemned | 69235 | COND | ||||
01/10/1954 | Condemned | 69231 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
08/11/1954 | Condemned | 69236 | COND | ||||
03/12/1954 | Condemned | 69233 | COND | ||||
31/12/1954 | Condemned | 69225 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
31/12/1954 | Condemned | 69228 | COND | ||||
31/12/1954 | Condemned | 69230 | LIN | Lincoln | COND | ||
31/12/1954 | Condemned | 69232 | COND |