Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 212 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 212 Week
» 11505 Month
» 276138 Year
» 1497703 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GNR/LNER Gresley "N2" Class 0-6-2T


GNR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
2662 9568 69568 10/1928 16/09/1962 33.92
2663 9569 69569 10/1928 23/03/1959 30.42
2664 9570 69570 10/1928 15/12/1959 31.17
2665 9571 69571 11/1928 01/06/1961 32.58
2666 9572 69572 11/1928 11/03/1961 32.33
2667 9573 69573 11/1928 24/11/1958 30
2668 9574 69574 11/1928 14/02/1961 32.25
2669 9575 69575 11/1928 16/09/1962 33.83
2670 9576 69576 12/1928 22/07/1959 30.58
2671 9577 69577 12/1928 05/05/1959 30.42
2672 9578 69578 01/1929 25/11/1959 30.83
2673 9579 69579 02/1929 16/09/1962 33.58
2674 9580 69580 03/1929 11/09/1961 32.5
2675 9581 69581 03/1929 01/12/1960 31.75
2676 9582 69582 03/1929 26/09/1960 31.5
2677 9583 69583 03/1929 16/09/1962 33.5
2678 9584 69584 03/1929 10/07/1959 30.33
2679 9585 69585 04/1929 23/09/1961 32.42
2680 9586 69586 05/1929 03/03/1961 31.83
2681 9587 69587 05/1929 11/07/1960 31.17
2682 9588 69588 09/1928 29/02/1960 31.42
2683 9589 69589 10/1928 07/03/1960 31.42
2684 9590 69590 11/1928 03/06/1957 28.58