GNR/LNER Gresley "N2" Class 0-6-2T
GNR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2583 | 9550 | 69550 | 05/1925 | 02/09/1958 | 33.33 | |||||||
2584 | 9551 | 69551 | 02/1925 | 03/12/1958 | 33.83 | |||||||
2585 | 9552 | 69552 | 03/1925 | 09/05/1960 | 35.17 | |||||||
2586 | 9553 | 69553 | 03/1925 | 03/12/1959 | 34.75 | |||||||
2587 | 9554 | 69554 | 03/1925 | 10/06/1958 | 33.25 | |||||||
2588 | 9555 | 69555 | 03/1925 | 06/04/1959 | 34.08 | |||||||
2589 | 9556 | 69556 | 03/1925 | 18/12/1959 | 34.75 | |||||||
2590 | 9557 | 69557 | 04/1925 | 17/06/1957 | 32.17 | |||||||
2591 | 9558 | 69558 | 03/1925 | 03/06/1957 | 32.25 | |||||||
2592 | 9559 | 69559 | 03/1925 | 18/07/1957 | 32.33 | |||||||
2593 | 9560 | 69560 | 04/1925 | 18/10/1960 | 35.5 | |||||||
2594 | 9561 | 69561 | 04/1925 | 25/05/1961 | 36.08 |