Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 114 Today
» 1094 Yesterday
» 5845 Week
» 17138 Month
» 281771 Year
» 1503336 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GNR/LNER Ivatt "N1" Class 0-6-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
02/1947 Condemned 9438       COND  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9430     COP Copley Hill (Leeds)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9431     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9432     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9433     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9434     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9435     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9436     COP Copley Hill (Leeds)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9437     BFD Bradford Hammerton Street  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9439     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9440     COP Copley Hill (Leeds)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9441     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9442     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9443     BFD Bradford Hammerton Street  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9444     COP Copley Hill (Leeds)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9445     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9446     COP Copley Hill (Leeds)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9447     BFD Bradford Hammerton Street  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9448     BFD Bradford Hammerton Street  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9449     BFD Bradford Hammerton Street  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9450     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9451     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9452     ARD Ardsley  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9453     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9454     BFD Bradford Hammerton Street  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9455     HAT Hatfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9456     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9457     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9458     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9459     BFD Bradford Hammerton Street  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9460     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9461     ARD Ardsley  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9462     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9463     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9464     BFD Bradford Hammerton Street  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9465     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9466     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9467     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9468     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9469     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9470     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9471     COP Copley Hill (Leeds)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9472     COP Copley Hill (Leeds)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9473     ARD Ardsley  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9474     BFD Bradford Hammerton Street  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9475     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9476     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9477     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9478     BFD Bradford Hammerton Street  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9479     BFD Bradford Hammerton Street  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9480     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9481     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9482     BFD Bradford Hammerton Street  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9483     BFD Bradford Hammerton Street  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9484     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9485     BFD Bradford Hammerton Street  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 69472 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 37A Ardsley  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 69483 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)  
06/1951 Condemned 69480 KX Kings Cross   COND  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 69432 HSY Hornsey 37C Bradford Hammerton Street  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 69434 KX Kings Cross 37C Bradford Hammerton Street  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 69439 HSY Hornsey 37C Bradford Hammerton Street  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 69450 HSY Hornsey 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 69463 HSY Hornsey 37A Ardsley  
20/10/1951 Reallocation 69484 KX Kings Cross 37A Ardsley  
01/09/1952 Condemned 69473 ARD Ardsley   COND  
20/09/1952 Reallocation 69477 HSY Hornsey 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)  
27/10/1952 Condemned 69479 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street   COND  
13/12/1952 Reallocation 69442 HSY Hornsey 37C Bradford Hammerton Street  
12/01/1953 Condemned 69448 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street   COND  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 69433 HSY Hornsey 37C Bradford Hammerton Street  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 69475 HSY Hornsey 37C Bradford Hammerton Street  
18/04/1953 Reallocation 69431 HSY Hornsey 37A Ardsley  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 69456 HSY Hornsey 37A Ardsley  
15/06/1953 Condemned 69446 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)   COND  
20/06/1953 Reallocation 69451 HSY Hornsey 34A Kings Cross  
20/06/1953 Reallocation 69468 KX Kings Cross 34A Kings Cross  
20/06/1953 Reallocation 69470 HSY Hornsey 34A Kings Cross  
25/07/1953 Reallocation 69451 34A Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
25/07/1953 Reallocation 69462 KX Kings Cross 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)  
25/07/1953 Reallocation 69468 34A Kings Cross 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)  
25/07/1953 Reallocation 69470 34A Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
06/09/1953 Condemned 69442 37C Bradford Hammerton Street   COND  
23/01/1954 Reallocation 69451 34B Hornsey 38A Colwick  
23/01/1954 Reallocation 69481 KX Kings Cross 38A Colwick  
20/02/1954 Reallocation 69457 HSY Hornsey 38A Colwick  
20/02/1954 Reallocation 69469 KX Kings Cross 38A Colwick  
08/03/1954 Condemned 69468 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)   COND  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 69441 HSY Hornsey 38A Colwick  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 69453 HSY Hornsey 38A Colwick  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 69467 KX Kings Cross 38A Colwick  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 69469 38A Colwick 38D Staveley (G.C.)  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 69476 KX Kings Cross 38A Colwick  
07/06/1954 Condemned 69461 ARD Ardsley   COND  
19/07/1954 Condemned 69437 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street   COND  
21/08/1954 Reallocation 69436 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 37C Bradford Hammerton Street  
21/08/1954 Reallocation 69462 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 34C Hatfield  
21/08/1954 Reallocation 69471 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 37C Bradford Hammerton Street  
21/08/1954 Reallocation 69475 37C Bradford Hammerton Street 34C Hatfield  
21/08/1954 Reallocation 69477 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 34C Hatfield  
30/08/1954 Condemned 69482 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street   COND  
01/11/1954 Condemned 69485 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street   COND  
08/11/1954 Condemned 69432 37C Bradford Hammerton Street   COND  
13/11/1954 Reallocation 69469 38D Staveley (G.C.) 38A Colwick  
15/11/1954 Condemned 69456 37A Ardsley   COND  
25/12/1954 Reallocation 69440 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 37A Ardsley  
27/12/1954 Condemned 69433 37C Bradford Hammerton Street   COND  
17/01/1955 Condemned 69445 HSY Hornsey   COND  
07/02/1955 Condemned 69454 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street   COND  
19/02/1955 Reallocation 69477 34C Hatfield 34B Hornsey  
07/03/1955 Condemned 69431 37A Ardsley   COND  
07/03/1955 Condemned 69483 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)   COND  
14/03/1955 Condemned 69476 38A Colwick   COND  
19/03/1955 Reallocation 69455 HAT Hatfield 37C Bradford Hammerton Street  
19/03/1955 Reallocation 69475 34C Hatfield 37C Bradford Hammerton Street  
21/03/1955 Condemned 69435 HSY Hornsey   COND  
28/03/1955 Condemned 69459 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street   COND  
11/04/1955 Condemned 69475 37C Bradford Hammerton Street   COND  
19/04/1955 Condemned 69449 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street   COND  
23/04/1955 Reallocation 69441 38A Colwick 37C Bradford Hammerton Street  
23/04/1955 Reallocation 69451 38A Colwick 37C Bradford Hammerton Street  
23/04/1955 Reallocation 69453 38A Colwick 37A Ardsley  
23/04/1955 Reallocation 69467 38A Colwick 37C Bradford Hammerton Street  
16/05/1955 Condemned 69455 37C Bradford Hammerton Street   COND  
30/05/1955 Condemned 69441 37C Bradford Hammerton Street   COND  
18/06/1955 Reallocation 69462 34C Hatfield 34B Hornsey  
04/07/1955 Condemned 69466 KX Kings Cross   COND  
11/07/1955 Condemned 69436 37C Bradford Hammerton Street   COND  
08/08/1955 Condemned 69464 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street   COND  
22/08/1955 Condemned 69460 HSY Hornsey   COND  
12/10/1955 Condemned 69451 37C Bradford Hammerton Street   COND  
28/10/1955 Condemned 69463 37A Ardsley   COND  
04/11/1955 Condemned 69458 HSY Hornsey   COND  
11/11/1955 Condemned 69439 37C Bradford Hammerton Street   COND  
12/11/1955 Reallocation 69457 38A Colwick 37A Ardsley  
12/11/1955 Reallocation 69469 38A Colwick 37A Ardsley  
12/11/1955 Reallocation 69481 38A Colwick 37A Ardsley  
10/12/1955 Condemned 69465 HSY Hornsey   COND  
16/01/1956 Condemned 69471 37C Bradford Hammerton Street   COND  
21/04/1956 Reallocation 69457 37A Ardsley 37C Bradford Hammerton Street  
28/05/1956 Condemned 69481 37A Ardsley   COND  
02/07/1956 Condemned 69467 37C Bradford Hammerton Street   COND  
06/08/1956 Condemned 69470 34B Hornsey   COND  
22/10/1956 Condemned 69444 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)   COND  
26/10/1956 Condemned 69447 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street   COND  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 69469 37A Ardsley 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)  
10/12/1956 Condemned 69430 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)   COND  
12/12/1956 Condemned 69478 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street   COND  
16/02/1957 Reallocation 69434 37C Bradford Hammerton Street 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)  
16/03/1957 Reallocation 69457 37C Bradford Hammerton Street 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)  
18/03/1957 Condemned 69440 37A Ardsley   COND  
15/04/1957 Condemned 69469 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)   COND  
23/04/1957 Condemned 69457 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)   COND  
18/05/1957 Reallocation 69462 34B Hornsey 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)  
15/06/1957 Reallocation 69477 34B Hornsey 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)  
30/09/1957 Condemned 69484 37A Ardsley   COND  
19/10/1957 Reallocation 69474 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 56B Ardsley  
14/12/1957 Reallocation 69443 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 56B Ardsley  
29/04/1958 Condemned 69453 37A Ardsley   COND  
21/08/1958 Condemned 69472 37A Ardsley   COND  
10/03/1959 Condemned 69434 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)   COND  
10/03/1959 Condemned 69450 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)   COND  
11/03/1959 Condemned 69443 56B Ardsley   COND  
13/03/1959 Condemned 69452 ARD Ardsley   COND  
13/03/1959 Condemned 69474 56B Ardsley   COND  
02/04/1959 Condemned 69477 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)   COND  
03/04/1959 Condemned 69462 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)   COND