GNR/LNER Ivatt "N1" Class 0-6-2T
Class | GNR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
N1 | 190 | 3190 | 9430 | 69430 | 04/1907 | COP W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/12/1956 |
10/12/1956 |
N1 | 1551 | 4551 | 9431 | 69431 | 12/1907 | HSY 37A W |
Hornsey Ardsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/04/1953 07/03/1955 |
07/03/1955 |
N1 | 1552 | 4552 | 9432 | 69432 | 12/1907 | HSY 37C 37C W |
Hornsey Bradford Hammerton Street Bradford Hammerton Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/06/1951 21/07/1951 08/11/1954 |
08/11/1954 |
N1 | 1553 | 4553 | 9433 | 69433 | 12/1907 | HSY 37C W |
Hornsey Bradford Hammerton Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/03/1953 27/12/1954 |
27/12/1954 |
N1 | 1554 | 4554 | 9434 | 69434 | 12/1907 | KX HSY 37C 37C 56C W |
Kings Cross Hornsey Bradford Hammerton Street Bradford Hammerton Street Copley Hill (Leeds) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/12/1948 30/06/1951 21/07/1951 16/02/1957 10/03/1959 |
10/03/1959 |
N1 | 1555 | 4555 | 9435 | 69435 | 12/1907 | HSY W |
Hornsey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/03/1955 |
21/03/1955 |
N1 | 1556 | 4556 | 9436 | 69436 | 12/1907 | COP 37C W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Bradford Hammerton Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1954 11/07/1955 |
11/07/1955 |
N1 | 1557 | 4557 | 9437 | 69437 | 12/1907 | BFD ARD COP W |
Bradford Hammerton Street Ardsley Copley Hill (Leeds) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1948 11/12/1948 19/07/1954 |
19/07/1954 |
N1 | 1558 | 4558 | 9438 | 12/1907 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1947 | 02/1947 | |
N1 | 1559 | 4559 | 9439 | 69439 | 12/1907 | HSY 37C 37C W |
Hornsey Bradford Hammerton Street Bradford Hammerton Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/06/1951 21/07/1951 11/11/1955 |
11/11/1955 |
N1 | 1560 | 4560 | 9440 | 69440 | 02/1908 | COP 37A W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/12/1954 18/03/1957 |
18/03/1957 |
N1 | 1561 | 4561 | 9441 | 69441 | 03/1910 | HSY 38A 37C W |
Hornsey Colwick Bradford Hammerton Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1954 23/04/1955 30/05/1955 |
30/05/1955 |
N1 | 1562 | 4562 | 9442 | 69442 | 03/1910 | HSY 37C 37C W |
Hornsey Bradford Hammerton Street Bradford Hammerton Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/12/1952 27/12/1952 06/09/1953 |
06/09/1953 |
N1 | 1563 | 4563 | 9443 | 69443 | 03/1910 | BFD 56B W |
Bradford Hammerton Street Ardsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/12/1957 11/03/1959 |
11/03/1959 |
N1 | 1564 | 4564 | 9444 | 69444 | 03/1910 | COP W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/10/1956 |
22/10/1956 |
N1 | 1565 | 4565 | 9445 | 69445 | 04/1910 | HSY W |
Hornsey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1955 |
17/01/1955 |
N1 | 1566 | 4566 | 9446 | 69446 | 04/1910 | COP W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/06/1953 |
15/06/1953 |
N1 | 1567 | 4567 | 9447 | 69447 | 04/1910 | BFD W |
Bradford Hammerton Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/10/1956 |
26/10/1956 |
N1 | 1568 | 4568 | 9448 | 69448 | 05/1910 | BFD W |
Bradford Hammerton Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/01/1953 |
12/01/1953 |
N1 | 1569 | 4569 | 9449 | 69449 | 05/1910 | BFD W |
Bradford Hammerton Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/04/1955 |
19/04/1955 |
N1 | 1570 | 4570 | 9450 | 69450 | 05/1910 | HSY 37B 37B W |
Hornsey Copley Hill (Leeds) Copley Hill (Leeds) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/06/1951 21/07/1951 10/03/1959 |
10/03/1959 |
N1 | 1571 | 4571 | 9451 | 69451 | 12/1910 | HSY 34A 34B 38A 37C W |
Hornsey Kings Cross Hornsey Colwick Bradford Hammerton Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/06/1953 25/07/1953 23/01/1954 23/04/1955 12/10/1955 |
12/10/1955 |
N1 | 1572 | 4572 | 9452 | 69452 | 12/1910 | ARD W |
Ardsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/03/1959 |
13/03/1959 |
N1 | 1573 | 4573 | 9453 | 69453 | 12/1910 | HSY 38A 37A W |
Hornsey Colwick Ardsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1954 23/04/1955 29/04/1958 |
29/04/1958 |
N1 | 1574 | 4574 | 9454 | 69454 | 12/1910 | BFD W |
Bradford Hammerton Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1955 |
07/02/1955 |
N1 | 1575 | 4575 | 9455 | 69455 | 12/1910 | HAT HSY 37C W |
Hatfield Hornsey Bradford Hammerton Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/12/1949 19/03/1955 16/05/1955 |
16/05/1955 |
N1 | 1576 | 4576 | 9456 | 69456 | 12/1910 | HSY 37A W |
Hornsey Ardsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/05/1953 15/11/1954 |
15/11/1954 |
N1 | 1577 | 4577 | 9457 | 69457 | 01/1911 | HSY 38A 37A 37C 56C W |
Hornsey Colwick Ardsley Bradford Hammerton Street Copley Hill (Leeds) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/02/1954 12/11/1955 21/04/1956 16/03/1957 23/04/1957 |
23/04/1957 |
N1 | 1578 | 4578 | 9458 | 69458 | 02/1911 | HSY W |
Hornsey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/11/1955 |
04/11/1955 |
N1 | 1579 | 4579 | 9459 | 69459 | 02/1911 | HAT BFD W |
Hatfield Bradford Hammerton Street Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 28/03/1955 |
28/03/1955 |
N1 | 1580 | 4580 | 9460 | 69460 | 03/1911 | HSY W |
Hornsey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/08/1955 |
22/08/1955 |
N1 | 1581 | 4581 | 9461 | 69461 | 12/1911 | ARD W |
Ardsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/06/1954 |
07/06/1954 |
N1 | 1582 | 4582 | 9462 | 69462 | 12/1911 | KX 37B 34C 34B 56C W |
Kings Cross Copley Hill (Leeds) Hatfield Hornsey Copley Hill (Leeds) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/07/1953 21/08/1954 18/06/1955 18/05/1957 03/04/1959 |
03/04/1959 |
N1 | 1583 | 4583 | 9463 | 69463 | 12/1911 | HSY 37A 37A W |
Hornsey Ardsley Ardsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/06/1951 21/07/1951 28/10/1955 |
28/10/1955 |
N1 | 1584 | 4584 | 9464 | 69464 | 02/1912 | BFD W |
Bradford Hammerton Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/08/1955 |
08/08/1955 |
N1 | 1585 | 4585 | 9465 | 69465 | 02/1912 | HSY W |
Hornsey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/12/1955 |
10/12/1955 |
N1 | 1586 | 4586 | 9466 | 69466 | 02/1912 | KX HSY W |
Kings Cross Hornsey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/12/1948 04/07/1955 |
04/07/1955 |
N1 | 1587 | 4587 | 9467 | 69467 | 03/1912 | KX 38A 37C W |
Kings Cross Colwick Bradford Hammerton Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1954 23/04/1955 02/07/1956 |
02/07/1956 |
N1 | 1588 | 4588 | 9468 | 69468 | 03/1912 | KX HSY 34A 37B W |
Kings Cross Hornsey Kings Cross Copley Hill (Leeds) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/12/1949 20/06/1953 25/07/1953 08/03/1954 |
08/03/1954 |
N1 | 1589 | 4589 | 9469 | 69469 | 03/1912 | KX HSY 38A 38D 38A 37A 56C W |
Kings Cross Hornsey Colwick Staveley (G.C.) Colwick Ardsley Copley Hill (Leeds) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/12/1948 20/02/1954 24/04/1954 13/11/1954 12/11/1955 17/11/1956 15/04/1957 |
15/04/1957 |
N1 | 1590 | 4590 | 9470 | 69470 | 04/1912 | HSY 34A 34B W |
Hornsey Kings Cross Hornsey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/06/1953 25/07/1953 06/08/1956 |
06/08/1956 |
N1 | 1591 | 4591 | 9471 | 69471 | 04/1912 | COP 37C W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Bradford Hammerton Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1954 16/01/1956 |
16/01/1956 |
N1 | 1593 | 4592 | 9472 | 69472 | 04/1912 | COP 37A 37A W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Ardsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 21/08/1958 |
21/08/1958 |
N1 | 1592 | 4593 | 9473 | 69473 | 04/1912 | ARD COP W |
Ardsley Copley Hill (Leeds) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 01/09/1952 |
01/09/1952 |
N1 | 1594 | 4594 | 9474 | 69474 | 04/1912 | BFD 56B W |
Bradford Hammerton Street Ardsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/10/1957 13/03/1959 |
13/03/1959 |
N1 | 1595 | 4595 | 9475 | 69475 | 05/1912 | HSY 37C 34C 37C W |
Hornsey Bradford Hammerton Street Hatfield Bradford Hammerton Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/03/1953 21/08/1954 19/03/1955 11/04/1955 |
11/04/1955 |
N1 | 1596 | 4596 | 9476 | 69476 | 05/1912 | KX HSY 38A W |
Kings Cross Hornsey Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/01/1950 24/04/1954 14/03/1955 |
14/03/1955 |
N1 | 1597 | 4597 | 9477 | 69477 | 06/1912 | HSY 37B 37B 34C 34B 56C W |
Hornsey Copley Hill (Leeds) Copley Hill (Leeds) Hatfield Hornsey Copley Hill (Leeds) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/09/1952 04/10/1952 21/08/1954 19/02/1955 15/06/1957 02/04/1959 |
02/04/1959 |
N1 | 1598 | 4598 | 9478 | 69478 | 06/1912 | BFD W |
Bradford Hammerton Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/12/1956 |
12/12/1956 |
N1 | 1599 | 4599 | 9479 | 69479 | 06/1912 | BFD W |
Bradford Hammerton Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/10/1952 |
27/10/1952 |
N1 | 1600 | 4600 | 9480 | 69480 | 06/1912 | KX HSY W |
Kings Cross Hornsey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/01/1950 06/1951 |
06/1951 |
N1 | 1601 | 4601 | 9481 | 69481 | 06/1912 | KX HSY 38A 37A W |
Kings Cross Hornsey Colwick Ardsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/01/1950 23/01/1954 12/11/1955 28/05/1956 |
28/05/1956 |
N1 | 1602 | 4602 | 9482 | 69482 | 06/1912 | BFD W |
Bradford Hammerton Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/08/1954 |
30/08/1954 |
N1 | 1603 | 4603 | 9483 | 69483 | 06/1912 | BFD 37B 37B W |
Bradford Hammerton Street Copley Hill (Leeds) Copley Hill (Leeds) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/02/1951 24/03/1951 07/03/1955 |
07/03/1955 |
N1 | 1604 | 4604 | 9484 | 69484 | 06/1912 | KX HAT 37A 37A W |
Kings Cross Hatfield Ardsley Ardsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/06/1948 29/09/1951 20/10/1951 30/09/1957 |
30/09/1957 |
N1 | 1605 | 4605 | 9485 | 69485 | 06/1912 | BFD W |
Bradford Hammerton Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/11/1954 |
01/11/1954 |