Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 430 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 3018 Week
» 32516 Month
» 369362 Year
» 1590927 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Gresley "K4" Class 2-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1993     EFD Eastfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1994     EFD Eastfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1995     FW Fort William  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1996     FW Fort William  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1998     EFD Eastfield  
12/06/1954 Reallocation 61995 FW Fort William 65A Eastfield  
12/06/1954 Reallocation 61996 FW Fort William 65A Eastfield  
09/05/1959 Reallocation 61993 EFD Eastfield 62A Thornton Junction  
09/05/1959 Reallocation 61996 65A Eastfield 62A Thornton Junction  
19/12/1959 Reallocation 61994 EFD Eastfield 62C Dunfermline Upper  
19/12/1959 Reallocation 61995 65A Eastfield 62C Dunfermline Upper  
19/12/1959 Reallocation 61998 EFD Eastfield 62C Dunfermline Upper  
02/10/1961 Condemned 61993 62A Thornton Junction   COND  
02/10/1961 Condemned 61995 62C Dunfermline Upper   COND  
02/10/1961 Condemned 61996 62A Thornton Junction   COND  
02/10/1961 Condemned 61998 62C Dunfermline Upper   COND  
18/12/1961 Condemned 61994 62C Dunfermline Upper   COND