Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1251 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 8992 Week
» 29434 Month
» 366280 Year
» 1587845 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Gresley "K4" Class 2-6-0


Class LNER LNER (1946) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
K4 3441 1993 61993 01/1937 EFD
62A
W
Eastfield
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/05/1959
02/10/1961
02/10/1961
K4 3442 1994 61994 07/1938 EFD
62C
W
Eastfield
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/12/1959
18/12/1961
18/12/1961
K4 3443 1995 61995 12/1938 FW
65A
62C
W
Fort William
Eastfield
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/06/1954
19/12/1959
02/10/1961
02/10/1961
K4 3444 1996 61996 12/1938 FW
65A
62A
W
Fort William
Eastfield
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/06/1954
09/05/1959
02/10/1961
02/10/1961
K4 3445 1997 61997 01/1939 NWE
BLA
STM
THJ
EFD
THJ
STM
NOR
NWE
EFD
63D
W
New England
Blaydon
St Margarets
Thornton Junction
Eastfield
Thornton Junction
St Margarets
Norwich Thorpe
New England
Eastfield
Fort William
Withdrawn
02/12/1945
16/05/1946
05/07/1946
06/07/1946
24/08/1946
01/09/1946
30/09/1946
29/10/1946
15/10/1947
13/11/1949
24/05/1954
12/06/1961
12/06/1961
K4 3446 1998 61998 01/1939 EFD
62C
W
Eastfield
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/12/1959
02/10/1961
02/10/1961