GNR/LNER Gresley "K3" Class 2-6-0
Class | GNR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
K3 | 1000 | 4000 | 1800 | 61800 | 03/1920 | IMM 36A W |
Immingham Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1959 13/07/1962 |
13/07/1962 |
K3 | 1001 | 4001 | 1801 | 61801 | 06/1920 | CLK MAR STR 40A 30A 31B 31A 31B W |
Colwick March Stratford Lincoln Stratford March Cambridge March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/06/1949 01/10/1949 24/07/1954 23/10/1954 16/02/1957 12/12/1959 02/12/1961 17/04/1962 |
17/04/1962 |
K3 | 1002 | 4002 | 1802 | 61802 | 09/1920 | CLK IMM 40A 31B 32C 40A W |
Colwick Immingham Lincoln March Lowestoft Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 16/06/1956 27/06/1959 04/07/1959 01/08/1959 07/03/1960 |
07/03/1960 |
K3 | 1003 | 4003 | 1803 | 61803 | 10/1920 | IMM 36A W |
Immingham Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1959 13/07/1961 |
13/07/1961 |
K3 | 1004 | 4004 | 1804 | 61804 | 12/1920 | NWE 31B 31B 31B 40A 38A 38E W |
New England March March March Lincoln Colwick Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/05/1950 30/06/1950 24/10/1953 21/07/1956 16/03/1957 20/07/1957 31/03/1962 |
31/03/1962 |
K3 | 1005 | 4005 | 1805 | 61805 | 12/1920 | MAR STR 35A W |
March Stratford New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/10/1949 16/03/1957 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 |
K3 | 1006 | 4006 | 1806 | 61806 | 04/1921 | IMM 40A W |
Immingham Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/11/1958 07/03/1960 |
07/03/1960 |
K3 | 1007 | 4007 | 1807 | 61807 | 05/1921 | LIN 40B 40A 40A 40B W |
Lincoln Immingham Lincoln Lincoln Immingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1951 16/02/1952 23/02/1952 20/01/1962 04/11/1962 |
04/11/1962 |
K3 | 1008 | 4008 | 1808 | 61808 | 07/1921 | CLK 39A 39A 38A 31B 40E W |
Colwick Gorton Gorton Colwick March Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/05/1950 31/05/1950 14/12/1957 27/06/1959 01/08/1959 25/09/1961 |
25/09/1961 |
K3 | 1009 | 4009 | 1809 | 61809 | 08/1921 | NWE MAR YAR GOR 38A 38E W |
New England March Yarmouth South Town Gorton Colwick Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/06/1949 05/11/1949 07/01/1950 19/06/1954 08/01/1958 03/03/1962 |
03/03/1962 |
K3 | 17 | 1810 | 61810 | 08/1924 | NWE 37B 30A 31B 40A 40E 34E W |
New England Copley Hill (Leeds) Stratford March Lincoln Colwick New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/03/1950 09/04/1950 20/12/1958 10/12/1960 17/12/1960 23/09/1961 15/08/1962 |
15/08/1962 | |
K3 | 28 | 1811 | 61811 | 08/1924 | NWE 31B 41H 41J 40E 40A W |
New England March Staveley (G.C.) Langwith Junction Colwick Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1953 16/04/1960 24/06/1961 09/06/1962 23/06/1962 04/11/1962 |
04/11/1962 | |
K3 | 32 | 1812 | 61812 | 08/1924 | MAR NOR CLK 39A 39A 40A 32A 36A W |
March Norwich Thorpe Colwick Gorton Gorton Lincoln Norwich Thorpe Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/10/1948 07/01/1950 16/02/1952 23/02/1952 19/06/1954 16/06/1956 16/02/1957 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 33 | 1813 | 61813 | 09/1924 | HLD W |
Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/04/1962 |
09/04/1962 | |
K3 | 36 | 1814 | 61814 | 09/1924 | HLD W |
Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/12/1961 |
27/12/1961 | |
K3 | 38 | 1815 | 61815 | 10/1924 | MAR STR 40A 30A 30F 30A W |
March Stratford Lincoln Stratford Parkeston Quay Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1949 24/07/1954 23/10/1954 08/03/1958 14/11/1959 11/07/1960 |
11/07/1960 | |
K3 | 39 | 1816 | 61816 | 10/1924 | CLK 31B 31B 38A 31B 41A W |
Colwick March March Colwick March Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/05/1950 30/06/1950 20/08/1950 24/10/1953 21/03/1959 31/05/1962 |
31/05/1962 | |
K3 | 46 | 1817 | 61817 | 10/1924 | MAR STR 31A 31B W |
March Stratford Cambridge March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1949 20/12/1958 02/12/1961 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 52 | 1818 | 61818 | 10/1924 | HTN 52H 51L 50B W |
Heaton Tyne Dock Thornaby Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/12/1960 24/12/1960 17/06/1961 05/03/1962 |
05/03/1962 | |
K3 | 53 | 1819 | 61819 | 10/1924 | HLD W |
Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/12/1962 |
17/12/1962 | |
K3 | 58 | 1820 | 61820 | 10/1924 | MAR STR 30F 30A 41H 41F 41C 41D 40E 40A W |
March Stratford Parkeston Quay Stratford Staveley (G.C.) Mexborough Sheffield Millhouses Canklow Colwick Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/10/1949 12/04/1958 14/11/1959 09/04/1960 18/06/1960 15/07/1961 06/01/1962 09/06/1962 23/06/1962 04/11/1962 |
04/11/1962 | |
K3 | 69 | 1821 | 61821 | 10/1924 | CLK W |
Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 73 | 1822 | 61822 | 10/1924 | LIN 38A 38A 31B 41H 41F 41C 41D 40E 40A W |
Lincoln Colwick Colwick March Staveley (G.C.) Mexborough Sheffield Millhouses Canklow Colwick Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/10/1950 21/10/1950 24/10/1953 30/04/1960 18/06/1960 15/07/1961 06/01/1962 09/06/1962 23/06/1962 04/11/1962 |
04/11/1962 | |
K3 | 75 | 1823 | 61823 | 11/1924 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1959 |
29/12/1959 | |
K3 | 80 | 1824 | 61824 | 11/1924 | CLK 31B 38A 38E W |
Colwick March Colwick Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1953 23/01/1954 08/01/1958 05/07/1961 |
05/07/1961 | |
K3 | 91 | 1825 | 61825 | 11/1924 | NWE IMM 41A 34E W |
New England Immingham Sheffield Darnall New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/05/1949 14/12/1957 04/11/1961 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 92 | 1826 | 61826 | 11/1924 | CLK 31B 32A 41H 40E W |
Colwick March Norwich Thorpe Staveley (G.C.) Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1953 14/06/1958 06/02/1960 09/06/1962 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 109 | 1827 | 61827 | 11/1924 | NWE IMM 31B 40A 40E W |
New England Immingham March Lincoln Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/05/1949 24/10/1953 10/12/1960 17/12/1960 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 111 | 1828 | 61828 | 11/1924 | NWE GOR 40A W |
New England Gorton Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/01/1949 19/06/1954 20/03/1961 |
20/03/1961 | |
K3 | 112 | 1829 | 61829 | 12/1924 | WFD GOR 39B 40A 32A 36A W |
Woodford Halse Gorton Sheffield Darnall Lincoln Norwich Thorpe Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1949 19/06/1954 23/10/1954 16/06/1956 16/02/1957 28/02/1962 |
28/02/1962 | |
K3 | 113 | 1830 | 61830 | 12/1924 | MAR STR 35A 36A W |
March Stratford New England Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/02/1949 16/03/1957 22/09/1962 04/11/1962 |
04/11/1962 | |
K3 | 114 | 1831 | 61831 | 12/1924 | MAR STR 31B 40A 40E W |
March Stratford March Lincoln Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/02/1949 16/03/1957 10/12/1960 17/12/1960 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 116 | 1832 | 61832 | 12/1924 | NWE GOR 2F W |
New England Gorton Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/01/1949 18/07/1959 03/11/1962 |
03/11/1962 | |
K3 | 118 | 1833 | 61833 | 12/1924 | NWE MAR CLK 31B 31B 38A 38A W |
New England March Colwick March March Colwick Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/06/1949 07/01/1950 31/05/1950 30/06/1950 27/08/1950 23/09/1950 20/09/1961 |
20/09/1961 | |
K3 | 120 | 1834 | 61834 | 12/1924 | NWE MAR STR 30F 31A 31B W |
New England March Stratford Parkeston Quay Cambridge March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/06/1949 22/10/1949 08/03/1958 16/08/1958 14/10/1961 15/05/1962 |
15/05/1962 | |
K3 | 121 | 1835 | 61835 | 01/1925 | MAR NOR MAR STR 31B 40A 40E 34E 34E W |
March Norwich Thorpe March Stratford March Lincoln Colwick New England New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/10/1948 25/12/1948 22/10/1949 24/10/1953 10/12/1960 17/12/1960 23/09/1961 21/04/1962 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 125 | 1836 | 61836 | 01/1925 | IMM 41F 36A W |
Immingham Mexborough Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1959 20/06/1959 08/02/1960 |
08/02/1960 | |
K3 | 126 | 1837 | 61837 | 01/1925 | IMM 38A W |
Immingham Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/01/1958 27/04/1962 |
27/04/1962 | |
K3 | 127 | 1838 | 61838 | 01/1925 | IMM 38A 38E W |
Immingham Colwick Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/03/1957 20/07/1957 21/03/1960 |
21/03/1960 | |
K3 | 134 | 1839 | 61839 | 01/1925 | WFD GOR GOR 40B 40B 41F 36A W |
Woodford Halse Gorton Gorton Immingham Immingham Mexborough Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/06/1949 07/1949 02/06/1951 23/06/1951 07/02/1959 20/06/1959 09/01/1962 |
09/01/1962 | |
K3 | 135 | 1840 | 61840 | 02/1925 | NWE 30A 30F 31B W |
New England Stratford Parkeston Quay March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/04/1950 20/12/1958 14/02/1959 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 140 | 1841 | 61841 | 02/1925 | NWE 31B 38E W |
New England March Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1953 22/09/1956 31/03/1962 |
31/03/1962 | |
K3 | 141 | 1842 | 61842 | 02/1925 | IMM 31B 38E W |
Immingham March Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1953 22/09/1956 21/08/1961 |
21/08/1961 | |
K3 | 143 | 1843 | 61843 | 02/1925 | NWE 31B 38E W |
New England March Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1953 22/09/1956 03/11/1962 |
03/11/1962 | |
K3 | 146 | 1844 | 61844 | 02/1925 | NWE NWE 31B 31B 32C 32C 31B 31B 53A 53A 52B 52D 52B 51L W |
New England New England March March Lowestoft Lowestoft March March Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Heaton Tweedmouth Heaton Thornaby Withdrawn |
11/1935 01/01/1948 31/05/1950 30/06/1950 08/10/1950 21/10/1950 23/12/1950 31/12/1950 02/09/1951 22/09/1951 20/10/1956 17/09/1960 10/12/1960 24/12/1960 05/06/1961 |
05/06/1961 | |
K3 | 153 | 1845 | 61845 | 02/1925 | IMM 40A 31B 32A 31B 40E 40A W |
Immingham Lincoln March Norwich Thorpe March Colwick Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/04/1953 24/10/1953 04/07/1959 01/08/1959 24/12/1960 01/04/1961 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 156 | 1846 | 61846 | 02/1925 | MAR MAR 53A 53A W |
March March Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/12/1948 02/09/1951 22/09/1951 17/12/1962 |
17/12/1962 | |
K3 | 158 | 1847 | 61847 | 02/1925 | MAR NOR 53A 53A W |
March Norwich Thorpe Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/10/1948 02/09/1951 22/09/1951 10/12/1962 |
10/12/1962 | |
K3 | 159 | 1848 | 61848 | 03/1925 | NWE GOR 39B 40A W |
New England Gorton Sheffield Darnall Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/01/1949 19/06/1954 23/10/1954 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 163 | 1849 | 61849 | 03/1925 | MAR STR 30F 31A W |
March Stratford Parkeston Quay Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/02/1949 20/12/1958 07/03/1959 17/04/1961 |
17/04/1961 | |
K3 | 167 | 1850 | 61850 | 03/1925 | NWE 31B 36B 36A W |
New England March Mexborough Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1953 22/09/1956 20/06/1959 30/06/1961 |
30/06/1961 | |
K3 | 170 | 1851 | 61851 | 03/1925 | DON CAR 31B 12C 2F W |
Doncaster Carlisle Canal March Carlisle Canal Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
11/1935 01/01/1948 04/07/1959 20/02/1960 18/06/1960 25/11/1961 |
25/11/1961 | |
K3 | 178 | 1852 | 61852 | 03/1925 | LIN 39A 39A 40A 40B 38A W |
Lincoln Gorton Gorton Lincoln Immingham Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/05/1950 31/05/1950 19/06/1954 14/05/1955 08/01/1958 18/07/1961 |
18/07/1961 | |
K3 | 180 | 1853 | 61853 | 03/1925 | NWE 31B 38E 56B 56F 56B W |
New England March Woodford Halse Ardsley Low Moor Ardsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1953 22/09/1956 16/05/1959 17/06/1961 16/09/1961 18/12/1962 |
18/12/1962 | |
K3 | 184 | 1854 | 61854 | 03/1925 | CAR 53A 52D 50B W |
Carlisle Canal Hull Dairycoates Tweedmouth Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/03/1957 14/06/1958 16/09/1961 29/10/1962 |
29/10/1962 | |
K3 | 186 | 1855 | 61855 | 03/1925 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/07/1959 |
06/07/1959 | |
K3 | 188 | 1856 | 61856 | 03/1925 | DON 39A 39A 38A 38B 56B W |
Doncaster Gorton Gorton Colwick Annesley Ardsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/05/1950 31/05/1950 19/06/1954 19/02/1955 16/05/1959 17/12/1962 |
17/12/1962 | |
K3 | 191 | 1857 | 61857 | 04/1925 | STM 53A W |
St Margarets Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/03/1957 03/12/1962 |
03/12/1962 | |
K3 | 195 | 1858 | 61858 | 04/1925 | CAR W |
Carlisle Canal Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/04/1961 |
26/04/1961 | |
K3 | 200 | 1859 | 61859 | 04/1925 | LIN W |
Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/11/1962 |
04/11/1962 | |
K3 | 203 | 1860 | 61860 | 08/1925 | MAR 40E W |
March Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/12/1960 16/11/1961 |
16/11/1961 | |
K3 | 202 | 1861 | 61861 | 08/1925 | DON 31B 40E 34E W |
Doncaster March Colwick New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1953 14/01/1961 23/09/1961 12/01/1962 |
12/01/1962 | |
K3 | 204 | 1862 | 61862 | 08/1925 | NWE 40A 40A 30A 30A 30F 31B W |
New England Lincoln Lincoln Stratford Stratford Parkeston Quay March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/07/1952 19/07/1952 18/10/1952 01/11/1952 20/12/1958 18/06/1960 16/01/1962 |
16/01/1962 | |
K3 | 206 | 1863 | 61863 | 09/1925 | GOR NEA DON COP DON NWE DON NWE HLD STM NWE MAR STR MAR NWE 30A 30A W |
Gorton Neasden Doncaster Copley Hill (Leeds) Doncaster New England Doncaster New England Hull Dairycoates St Margarets New England March Stratford March New England Stratford Stratford Withdrawn |
09/1925 02/02/1926 31/05/1927 18/07/1930 20/07/1930 12/06/1931 25/06/1945 13/09/1945 27/10/1946 15/01/1947 28/02/1947 18/04/1947 04/05/1947 17/05/1947 23/11/1947 12/10/1952 01/11/1952 06/06/1960 |
06/06/1960 | |
K3 | 207 | 1864 | 61864 | 09/1925 | NWE 31B 32C 32C 38A 38A 31B 35A W |
New England March Lowestoft Lowestoft Colwick Colwick March New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/06/1950 08/10/1950 21/10/1950 23/12/1950 31/12/1950 24/10/1953 17/11/1956 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 208 | 1865 | 61865 | 09/1925 | CLK MAR CLK 39A 39A 2F W |
Colwick March Colwick Gorton Gorton Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/05/1948 06/11/1948 14/05/1950 31/05/1950 09/04/1960 06/1961 |
06/1961 | |
K3 | 227 | 1866 | 61866 | 10/1925 | MAR 38E 40B 40A W |
March Woodford Halse Immingham Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/09/1956 08/01/1958 24/12/1960 19/10/1961 |
19/10/1961 | |
K3 | 228 | 1867 | 61867 | 10/1925 | NWE 31B 36B 36A 31B 36A W |
New England March Mexborough Doncaster March Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1953 22/09/1956 20/06/1959 27/06/1959 01/08/1959 04/11/1962 |
04/11/1962 | |
K3 | 229 | 1868 | 61868 | 10/1925 | NWE 31B 36B 36A W |
New England March Mexborough Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1953 22/09/1956 20/06/1959 10/05/1962 |
10/05/1962 | |
K3 | 231 | 1869 | 61869 | 12/1925 | NWE MAR 53A 53A 52B 50B W |
New England March Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Heaton Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/02/1949 02/09/1951 22/09/1951 20/10/1956 23/01/1960 03/12/1962 |
03/12/1962 | |
K3 | 1300 | 1870 | 61870 | 04/1929 | WFD GOR GOR 38A W |
Woodford Halse Gorton Gorton Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1949 02/07/1949 19/06/1954 12/07/1962 |
12/07/1962 | |
K3 | 1312 | 1871 | 61871 | 05/1929 | HLD W |
Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/12/1962 |
03/12/1962 | |
K3 | 1318 | 1872 | 61872 | 06/1929 | HLD W |
Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/12/1962 |
03/12/1962 | |
K3 | 1331 | 1873 | 61873 | 06/1929 | MAR 38A W |
March Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/09/1956 08/05/1962 |
08/05/1962 | |
K3 | 1345 | 1874 | 61874 | 07/1929 | HLD W |
Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/05/1961 |
22/05/1961 | |
K3 | 1364 | 1875 | 61875 | 07/1929 | GHD MAR HTN 50B W |
Gateshead March Heaton Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 06/11/1948 23/01/1960 10/12/1962 |
10/12/1962 | |
K3 | 1365 | 1876 | 61876 | 07/1929 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/09/1959 |
17/09/1959 | |
K3 | 1367 | 1877 | 61877 | 08/1929 | NWE GOR 32A 32A 31B 32C 32C 32A 32A 31B 41H 40A 40B 40E W |
New England Gorton Norwich Thorpe Norwich Thorpe March Lowestoft Lowestoft Norwich Thorpe Norwich Thorpe March Staveley (G.C.) Lincoln Immingham Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/01/1949 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 19/05/1951 13/10/1951 20/10/1951 29/12/1951 19/01/1952 06/02/1960 13/02/1960 26/03/1960 06/08/1960 04/11/1961 24/07/1962 |
24/07/1962 | |
K3 | 1368 | 1878 | 61878 | 08/1929 | GHD HTN STM W |
Gateshead Heaton St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 19/02/1949 06/08/1959 |
06/08/1959 | |
K3 | 1386 | 1879 | 61879 | 09/1929 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/06/1959 |
16/06/1959 | |
K3 | 1387 | 1880 | 61880 | 10/1929 | NWE 30A 30A 30F 31A 31B W |
New England Stratford Stratford Parkeston Quay Cambridge March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/05/1950 31/05/1950 20/12/1958 14/02/1959 02/12/1961 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 1388 | 1881 | 61881 | 10/1929 | GHD HTN STM W |
Gateshead Heaton St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 19/02/1949 21/04/1960 |
21/04/1960 | |
K3 | 1389 | 1882 | 61882 | 10/1929 | CAR 2F W |
Carlisle Canal Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/04/1959 28/05/1960 |
28/05/1960 | |
K3 | 1391 | 1883 | 61883 | 10/1929 | HLD W |
Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/12/1962 |
03/12/1962 | |
K3 | 1392 | 1884 | 61884 | 11/1929 | HTN MAR HTN 53A 52B 52H 52B 52H 50B W |
Heaton March Heaton Hull Dairycoates Heaton Tyne Dock Heaton Tyne Dock Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 16/10/1948 16/05/1953 11/10/1958 10/12/1960 31/12/1960 21/01/1961 05/08/1961 23/07/1962 |
23/07/1962 | |
K3 | 1394 | 1885 | 61885 | 11/1929 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/11/1959 |
03/11/1959 | |
K3 | 1395 | 1886 | 61886 | 11/1929 | MAR W |
March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 1396 | 1887 | 61887 | 11/1929 | MAR 36A W |
March Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/09/1956 02/03/1962 |
02/03/1962 | |
K3 | 1397 | 1888 | 61888 | 12/1929 | MAR 38A W |
March Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/09/1956 25/09/1961 |
25/09/1961 | |
K3 | 1398 | 1889 | 61889 | 12/1929 | MAR MAR GOR MAR 40A 40E 40B W |
March March Gorton March Lincoln Colwick Immingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/12/1948 14/01/1950 21/01/1950 25/09/1954 22/10/1960 20/01/1962 04/11/1962 |
04/11/1962 | |
K3 | 2761 | 1890 | 61890 | 07/1930 | NWE 31B W |
New England March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1953 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 2762 | 1891 | 61891 | 07/1930 | IMM 40A W |
Immingham Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/07/1961 12/09/1961 |
12/09/1961 | |
K3 | 2763 | 1892 | 61892 | 07/1930 | HLD W |
Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/10/1961 |
30/10/1961 | |
K3 | 2764 | 1893 | 61893 | 07/1930 | MAR 53A 53A W |
March Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/09/1951 22/09/1951 17/12/1962 |
17/12/1962 | |
K3 | 2765 | 1894 | 61894 | 07/1930 | CLK LIN 40E W |
Colwick Lincoln Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 22/10/1960 30/10/1961 |
30/10/1961 | |
K3 | 2766 | 1895 | 61895 | 07/1930 | ANN CLK MAR 36A W |
Annesley Colwick March Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/03/1948 18/06/1949 22/09/1956 18/07/1962 |
18/07/1962 | |
K3 | 2767 | 1896 | 61896 | 08/1930 | NWE MAR GOR 38A W |
New England March Gorton Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/06/1949 07/01/1950 19/06/1954 14/05/1962 |
14/05/1962 | |
K3 | 2768 | 1897 | 61897 | 08/1930 | GHD HTN STM 53A W |
Gateshead Heaton St Margarets Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 19/02/1949 16/03/1957 17/12/1962 |
17/12/1962 | |
K3 | 2769 | 1898 | 61898 | 08/1930 | CAR W |
Carlisle Canal Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1959 |
07/02/1959 | |
K3 | 1100 | 1899 | 61899 | 03/1931 | HLD 52D 52D 53A W |
Hull Dairycoates Tweedmouth Tweedmouth Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/12/1952 27/12/1952 17/09/1955 18/12/1962 |
18/12/1962 | |
K3 | 1101 | 1900 | 61900 | 03/1931 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/03/1960 |
04/03/1960 | |
K3 | 1102 | 1901 | 61901 | 03/1931 | HTN 52D 52D 50B W |
Heaton Tweedmouth Tweedmouth Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/01/1952 26/01/1952 26/11/1960 27/12/1961 |
27/12/1961 | |
K3 | 1106 | 1902 | 61902 | 03/1931 | HLD W |
Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/07/1961 |
03/07/1961 | |
K3 | 1108 | 1903 | 61903 | 04/1931 | HLD W |
Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/11/1961 |
23/11/1961 | |
K3 | 1117 | 1904 | 61904 | 03/1931 | GHD MAR HTN 53A W |
Gateshead March Heaton Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 06/11/1948 22/10/1955 05/06/1961 |
05/06/1961 | |
K3 | 1118 | 1905 | 61905 | 03/1931 | CLK IMM 40E 40A W |
Colwick Immingham Colwick Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 20/01/1962 07/07/1962 04/11/1962 |
04/11/1962 | |
K3 | 1119 | 1906 | 61906 | 04/1931 | HTN 52H 50B W |
Heaton Tyne Dock Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/01/1961 22/07/1961 17/12/1962 |
17/12/1962 | |
K3 | 1121 | 1907 | 61907 | 04/1931 | DON 31B 41A 40E W |
Doncaster March Sheffield Darnall Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1953 22/09/1956 12/12/1959 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 1125 | 1908 | 61908 | 04/1931 | MAR WFD GOR GOR 32A 32A 31B 32C 32C 32A 31B 41H 41F W |
March Woodford Halse Gorton Gorton Norwich Thorpe Norwich Thorpe March Lowestoft Lowestoft Norwich Thorpe March Staveley (G.C.) Mexborough Withdrawn |
11/1935 01/01/1948 07/1949 02/07/1949 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 19/05/1951 13/10/1951 20/10/1951 29/12/1951 06/02/1960 20/02/1960 24/06/1961 19/01/1962 |
19/01/1962 | |
K3 | 1133 | 1909 | 61909 | 04/1931 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1960 |
01/04/1960 | |
K3 | 1135 | 1910 | 61910 | 04/1931 | DON 39A 39A 2F W |
Doncaster Gorton Gorton Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/05/1950 31/05/1950 19/03/1960 21/07/1962 |
21/07/1962 | |
K3 | 1137 | 1911 | 61911 | 05/1931 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1959 |
30/11/1959 | |
K3 | 1141 | 1912 | 61912 | 05/1931 | IMM 40A 34A W |
Immingham Lincoln Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/10/1961 21/04/1962 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 1154 | 1913 | 61913 | 05/1931 | WFD GOR GOR 2F W |
Woodford Halse Gorton Gorton Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1949 02/07/1949 18/07/1959 17/02/1962 |
17/02/1962 | |
K3 | 1156 | 1914 | 61914 | 05/1931 | MAR GOR 38A 40B 40E W |
March Gorton Colwick Immingham Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/01/1950 19/06/1954 06/08/1960 23/09/1961 23/08/1962 |
23/08/1962 | |
K3 | 1158 | 1915 | 61915 | 05/1931 | NWE 36A 36A 31B W |
New England Doncaster Doncaster March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/02/1952 22/03/1952 24/10/1953 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 1162 | 1916 | 61916 | 05/1931 | STM 12B 12B W |
St Margarets Carlisle Canal Carlisle Canal Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/07/1951 11/08/1951 31/12/1960 |
31/12/1960 | |
K3 | 1164 | 1917 | 61917 | 05/1931 | HTN 52D 52D 56B W |
Heaton Tweedmouth Tweedmouth Ardsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/01/1952 26/01/1952 16/09/1961 26/11/1962 |
26/11/1962 | |
K3 | 1166 | 1918 | 61918 | 06/1931 | DON 32A 32C 32A 32C 32A 31B W |
Doncaster Norwich Thorpe Lowestoft Norwich Thorpe Lowestoft Norwich Thorpe March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1953 12/11/1955 24/03/1956 21/04/1956 25/05/1956 18/06/1960 28/03/1962 |
28/03/1962 | |
K3 | 1302 | 1919 | 61919 | 07/1934 | MAR GOR 40A W |
March Gorton Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/01/1950 19/06/1954 29/06/1961 |
29/06/1961 | |
K3 | 1304 | 1920 | 61920 | 07/1934 | HLD W |
Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/09/1961 |
18/09/1961 | |
K3 | 1308 | 1921 | 61921 | 07/1934 | NOR YAR NOR 31B 31B 40A 40A 30A 30A 30F 31B W |
Norwich Thorpe Yarmouth South Town Norwich Thorpe March March Lincoln Lincoln Stratford Stratford Parkeston Quay March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/10/1948 25/12/1948 30/06/1951 21/07/1951 12/07/1952 19/07/1952 18/10/1952 01/11/1952 12/04/1958 18/06/1960 25/07/1961 |
25/07/1961 | |
K3 | 1310 | 1922 | 61922 | 08/1934 | HLD W |
Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/05/1962 |
07/05/1962 | |
K3 | 1324 | 1923 | 61923 | 08/1934 | HLD 52B 50B W |
Hull Dairycoates Heaton Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/10/1958 23/01/1960 30/04/1962 |
30/04/1962 | |
K3 | 1306 | 1924 | 61924 | 09/1934 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/12/1960 |
20/12/1960 | |
K3 | 2934 | 1925 | 61925 | 09/1934 | LIN 36A W |
Lincoln Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/12/1957 24/07/1961 |
24/07/1961 | |
K3 | 2935 | 1926 | 61926 | 09/1934 | LOW 32A 31B 41H 40A W |
Lowestoft Norwich Thorpe March Staveley (G.C.) Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/11/1959 06/02/1960 27/02/1960 26/03/1960 10/04/1962 |
10/04/1962 | |
K3 | 2936 | 1927 | 61927 | 01/1935 | HLD 52B 52B 50B W |
Hull Dairycoates Heaton Heaton Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/09/1952 04/10/1952 23/01/1960 17/07/1961 |
17/07/1961 | |
K3 | 2937 | 1928 | 61928 | 01/1935 | GHD HTN STM W |
Gateshead Heaton St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 19/02/1949 05/02/1960 |
05/02/1960 | |
K3 | 1325 | 1929 | 61929 | 08/1934 | NWE 31B W |
New England March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1953 04/07/1962 |
04/07/1962 | |
K3 | 1332 | 1930 | 61930 | 09/1934 | GHD 52D 52D 52H 50B W |
Gateshead Tweedmouth Tweedmouth Tyne Dock Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/01/1952 26/01/1952 14/10/1961 20/01/1962 17/12/1962 |
17/12/1962 | |
K3 | 1333 | 1931 | 61931 | 09/1934 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/07/1959 |
24/07/1959 | |
K3 | 1339 | 1932 | 61932 | 09/1934 | HLD 52B 52B 52D 52D 52B 53A W |
Hull Dairycoates Heaton Heaton Tweedmouth Tweedmouth Heaton Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/09/1952 04/10/1952 13/12/1952 27/12/1952 23/01/1954 22/10/1955 12/02/1962 |
12/02/1962 | |
K3 | 1399 | 1933 | 61933 | 09/1934 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/11/1962 |
04/11/1962 | |
K3 | 1307 | 1934 | 61934 | 01/1935 | HLD 52D 56B W |
Hull Dairycoates Tweedmouth Ardsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 16/09/1961 26/11/1962 |
26/11/1962 | |
K3 | 1322 | 1935 | 61935 | 01/1935 | HLD W |
Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/07/1962 |
23/07/1962 | |
K3 | 2938 | 1936 | 61936 | 01/1935 | CAR W |
Carlisle Canal Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/11/1961 |
25/11/1961 | |
K3 | 2939 | 1937 | 61937 | 01/1935 | CAR 31B 12C W |
Carlisle Canal March Carlisle Canal Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/07/1959 20/02/1960 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 | |
K3 | 2940 | 1938 | 61938 | 01/1935 | NWE MAR 41A W |
New England March Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/06/1949 22/09/1956 29/12/1961 |
29/12/1961 | |
K3 | 2425 | 1939 | 61939 | 08/1935 | NOR LOW NOR LOW NOR 40A 40E 40B W |
Norwich Thorpe Lowestoft Norwich Thorpe Lowestoft Norwich Thorpe Lincoln Colwick Immingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/10/1948 26/03/1949 22/10/1949 07/01/1950 10/12/1960 17/12/1960 20/01/1962 04/11/1962 |
04/11/1962 | |
K3 | 2426 | 1940 | 61940 | 08/1935 | MAR 36A W |
March Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/09/1956 04/05/1962 |
04/05/1962 | |
K3 | 2427 | 1941 | 61941 | 08/1935 | HLD W |
Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/07/1961 |
31/07/1961 | |
K3 | 2428 | 1942 | 61942 | 08/1935 | NOR NOR 31B 31B 40A 40A 30A 30A 30F 31B W |
Norwich Thorpe Norwich Thorpe March March Lincoln Lincoln Stratford Stratford Parkeston Quay March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/01/1950 30/06/1951 21/07/1951 12/07/1952 19/07/1952 18/10/1952 01/11/1952 08/03/1958 18/06/1960 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 2438 | 1943 | 61943 | 08/1935 | WFD ANN 31B 40F 41A 40E W |
Woodford Halse Annesley March Boston Sheffield Darnall Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/09/1948 24/10/1953 23/07/1955 14/12/1957 12/12/1959 09/1962 |
09/1962 | |
K3 | 2439 | 1944 | 61944 | 09/1935 | LIN 40B 40E W |
Lincoln Immingham Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/12/1960 20/01/1962 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 2440 | 1945 | 61945 | 09/1935 | HLD W |
Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/02/1962 |
26/02/1962 | |
K3 | 2442 | 1946 | 61946 | 09/1935 | NWE MAR W |
New England March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/02/1949 14/06/1962 |
14/06/1962 | |
K3 | 2443 | 1947 | 61947 | 09/1935 | NOR LOW YAR NOR 31B 31B 38A W |
Norwich Thorpe Lowestoft Yarmouth South Town Norwich Thorpe March March Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 09/10/1948 25/12/1948 30/06/1951 21/07/1951 22/09/1956 01/08/1962 |
01/08/1962 | |
K3 | 2447 | 1948 | 61948 | 09/1935 | MAR W |
March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/03/1962 |
28/03/1962 | |
K3 | 2448 | 1949 | 61949 | 09/1935 | LOW 32A 40A 40E 36A W |
Lowestoft Norwich Thorpe Lincoln Colwick Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/01/1959 10/12/1960 17/12/1960 23/09/1961 10/04/1962 |
10/04/1962 | |
K3 | 2449 | 1950 | 61950 | 09/1935 | NWE MAR GOR 39B 40A 40B 40E 40B 40A 36A W |
New England March Gorton Sheffield Darnall Lincoln Immingham Colwick Immingham Lincoln Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/06/1949 07/01/1950 19/06/1954 23/10/1954 14/05/1955 24/12/1960 15/07/1961 20/01/1962 22/09/1962 04/11/1962 |
04/11/1962 | |
K3 | 2450 | 1951 | 61951 | 10/1935 | NWE 30A 30A 40A 40E 36A W |
New England Stratford Stratford Lincoln Colwick Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/10/1952 01/11/1952 10/12/1960 17/12/1960 19/08/1961 04/11/1962 |
04/11/1962 | |
K3 | 2451 | 1952 | 61952 | 10/1935 | HTN 52D 52D 50B W |
Heaton Tweedmouth Tweedmouth Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/12/1952 27/12/1952 16/09/1961 06/12/1962 |
06/12/1962 | |
K3 | 2459 | 1953 | 61953 | 10/1935 | NWE NOR LOW NOR 32C 32A 40E 36A W |
New England Norwich Thorpe Lowestoft Norwich Thorpe Lowestoft Norwich Thorpe Colwick Doncaster Withdrawn |
11/1935 01/01/1948 28/08/1948 25/12/1948 24/10/1953 23/01/1954 17/12/1960 23/09/1961 14/03/1962 |
14/03/1962 | |
K3 | 2461 | 1954 | 61954 | 10/1935 | NWE MAR NWE 41A 31B 32A 31B W |
New England March New England Sheffield Darnall March Norwich Thorpe March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/05/1948 09/10/1948 22/09/1956 21/03/1959 04/07/1959 01/08/1959 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 2463 | 1955 | 61955 | 10/1935 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/05/1960 |
27/05/1960 | |
K3 | 2466 | 1956 | 61956 | 10/1935 | GOR WFD GOR GOR 40B 40B W |
Gorton Woodford Halse Gorton Gorton Immingham Immingham Withdrawn |
11/1935 01/01/1948 07/1949 02/07/1949 02/06/1951 23/06/1951 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 2467 | 1957 | 61957 | 11/1935 | GOR NOR 32D 32A 32C 32A 40E W |
Gorton Norwich Thorpe Yarmouth South Town Norwich Thorpe Lowestoft Norwich Thorpe Colwick Withdrawn |
11/1935 01/01/1948 19/01/1957 16/02/1957 15/06/1957 14/12/1957 17/12/1960 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 2468 | 1958 | 61958 | 11/1935 | LOW 41H 41J 41F W |
Lowestoft Staveley (G.C.) Langwith Junction Mexborough Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1960 24/06/1961 16/09/1961 31/05/1962 |
31/05/1962 | |
K3 | 2417 | 1959 | 61959 | 05/1936 | LOW NOR LOW 41H 41F 41C 41H W |
Lowestoft Norwich Thorpe Lowestoft Staveley (G.C.) Mexborough Sheffield Millhouses Staveley (G.C.) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/10/1948 22/01/1949 05/03/1960 18/06/1960 29/07/1961 16/09/1961 13/11/1961 |
13/11/1961 | |
K3 | 2429 | 1960 | 61960 | 05/1936 | LIN 40B W |
Lincoln Immingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/07/1961 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 2445 | 1961 | 61961 | 05/1936 | NWE 31B 31B 32C 32C 31B 31B 36A W |
New England March March Lowestoft Lowestoft March March Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/05/1950 30/06/1950 08/10/1950 21/10/1950 23/12/1950 31/12/1950 22/09/1956 02/10/1961 |
02/10/1961 | |
K3 | 2446 | 1962 | 61962 | 05/1936 | HTN MAR HTN 52D 52D 52B 52D 52H 50B W |
Heaton March Heaton Tweedmouth Tweedmouth Heaton Tweedmouth Tyne Dock Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 06/11/1948 19/01/1952 26/01/1952 11/10/1958 17/09/1960 14/10/1961 20/01/1962 19/12/1962 |
19/12/1962 | |
K3 | 2453 | 1963 | 61963 | 06/1936 | IMM 40A 40A 30A 30A 30F 31B W |
Immingham Lincoln Lincoln Stratford Stratford Parkeston Quay March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/07/1952 19/07/1952 18/10/1952 01/11/1952 20/12/1958 18/06/1960 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 2455 | 1964 | 61964 | 06/1936 | LIN 36A W |
Lincoln Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/12/1957 07/07/1961 |
07/07/1961 | |
K3 | 2458 | 1965 | 61965 | 06/1936 | HLD W |
Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/12/1962 |
03/12/1962 | |
K3 | 2465 | 1966 | 61966 | 06/1936 | LIN 39A 39A 38E 40B 40E W |
Lincoln Gorton Gorton Woodford Halse Immingham Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/02/1952 23/02/1952 14/12/1957 08/01/1958 15/07/1961 19/02/1962 |
19/02/1962 | |
K3 | 2471 | 1967 | 61967 | 07/1936 | NWE 41A W |
New England Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/09/1956 03/04/1961 |
03/04/1961 | |
K3 | 2472 | 1968 | 61968 | 08/1936 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/10/1961 |
23/10/1961 | |
K3 | 2470 | 1969 | 61969 | 10/1936 | HTN 52D 52D 52H 50B W |
Heaton Tweedmouth Tweedmouth Tyne Dock Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/12/1952 27/12/1952 14/10/1961 20/01/1962 17/12/1962 |
17/12/1962 | |
K3 | 2473 | 1970 | 61970 | 10/1936 | NOR NOR 32D 32A 32D 32A 32C 32A 40E 36A W |
Norwich Thorpe Norwich Thorpe Yarmouth South Town Norwich Thorpe Yarmouth South Town Norwich Thorpe Lowestoft Norwich Thorpe Colwick Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/01/1948 25/05/1956 21/07/1956 19/01/1957 16/03/1957 14/06/1958 11/10/1958 07/01/1961 19/08/1961 04/11/1962 |
04/11/1962 | |
K3 | 2498 | 1971 | 61971 | 10/1936 | NOR NOR NOR 32F 32D 32A 32A 40E W |
Norwich Thorpe Norwich Thorpe Norwich Thorpe Yarmouth Beach Yarmouth South Town Norwich Thorpe Norwich Thorpe Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/01/1948 07/01/1950 29/10/1950 25/11/1950 23/12/1950 31/12/1950 07/01/1961 20/03/1961 |
20/03/1961 | |
K3 | 2499 | 1972 | 61972 | 10/1936 | NWE 40E 36A W |
New England Colwick Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/01/1961 19/08/1961 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 3813 | 1973 | 61973 | 11/1936 | NOR LOW 32A 41H 40E 40A 36A W |
Norwich Thorpe Lowestoft Norwich Thorpe Staveley (G.C.) Colwick Lincoln Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/10/1948 10/01/1959 16/04/1960 09/06/1962 23/06/1962 22/09/1962 04/11/1962 |
04/11/1962 | |
K3 | 3814 | 1974 | 61974 | 11/1936 | ANN 38A 40B W |
Annesley Colwick Immingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/02/1955 24/12/1960 02/07/1962 |
02/07/1962 | |
K3 | 3815 | 1975 | 61975 | 11/1936 | ANN 38A 38B 56B 56F W |
Annesley Colwick Annesley Ardsley Low Moor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/09/1956 15/12/1956 16/05/1959 17/06/1961 04/09/1961 |
04/09/1961 | |
K3 | 3816 | 1976 | 61976 | 11/1936 | ANN 41H 41J 41A W |
Annesley Staveley (G.C.) Langwith Junction Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/04/1960 24/06/1961 16/09/1961 04/01/1962 |
04/01/1962 | |
K3 | 3817 | 1977 | 61977 | 11/1936 | ANN 38A 38A 30A 30A 30F 40A 40E W |
Annesley Colwick Colwick Stratford Stratford Parkeston Quay Lincoln Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/02/1952 22/03/1952 18/10/1952 01/11/1952 20/12/1958 10/12/1960 17/12/1960 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 3818 | 1978 | 61978 | 11/1936 | DON 35A W |
Doncaster New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/11/1956 17/08/1961 |
17/08/1961 | |
K3 | 3819 | 1979 | 61979 | 12/1936 | ANN 35A W |
Annesley New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/11/1956 16/10/1961 |
16/10/1961 | |
K3 | 3820 | 1980 | 61980 | 12/1936 | ANN 56B W |
Annesley Ardsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/05/1959 17/12/1962 |
17/12/1962 | |
K3 | 3821 | 1981 | 61981 | 12/1936 | LOW 31B 32C 32C 32A 32C 32C 32A 32C 32A 41H 41F 40E 40A 36A W |
Lowestoft March Lowestoft Lowestoft Norwich Thorpe Lowestoft Lowestoft Norwich Thorpe Lowestoft Norwich Thorpe Staveley (G.C.) Mexborough Colwick Lincoln Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/05/1951 13/10/1951 20/10/1951 29/12/1951 18/10/1952 01/11/1952 14/02/1953 21/03/1953 18/04/1953 19/03/1960 24/06/1961 09/06/1962 23/06/1962 22/09/1962 04/11/1962 |
04/11/1962 | |
K3 | 3822 | 1982 | 61982 | 12/1936 | LIN 38A 38A 30A 30A 38A W |
Lincoln Colwick Colwick Stratford Stratford Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/10/1950 21/10/1950 18/10/1952 01/11/1952 22/09/1956 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
K3 | 3823 | 1983 | 61983 | 12/1936 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/07/1959 |
10/07/1959 | |
K3 | 3824 | 1984 | 61984 | 12/1936 | HTN 52D 56B W |
Heaton Tweedmouth Ardsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/09/1960 16/09/1961 02/11/1962 |
02/11/1962 | |
K3 | 3825 | 1985 | 61985 | 01/1937 | GHD HTN 52D 52D 50B W |
Gateshead Heaton Tweedmouth Tweedmouth Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 19/01/1952 26/01/1952 26/11/1960 21/12/1962 |
21/12/1962 | |
K3 | 3826 | 1986 | 61986 | 01/1937 | GHD HTN 52H 51L 50B W |
Gateshead Heaton Tyne Dock Thornaby Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 10/12/1960 24/12/1960 17/06/1961 28/05/1962 |
28/05/1962 | |
K3 | 3827 | 1987 | 61987 | 01/1937 | HTN MAR HTN 52H 50B W |
Heaton March Heaton Tyne Dock Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 06/11/1948 10/12/1960 05/08/1961 19/03/1962 |
19/03/1962 | |
K3 | 3828 | 1988 | 61988 | 01/1937 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/11/1959 |
16/11/1959 | |
K3 | 3829 | 1989 | 61989 | 02/1937 | NOR LOW NOR 32C 32A 32C 32A 32D 32A 41H 41F 41C 41H W |
Norwich Thorpe Lowestoft Norwich Thorpe Lowestoft Norwich Thorpe Lowestoft Norwich Thorpe Yarmouth South Town Norwich Thorpe Staveley (G.C.) Mexborough Sheffield Millhouses Staveley (G.C.) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/10/1948 25/12/1948 24/10/1953 23/01/1954 24/07/1954 13/11/1954 08/01/1958 08/03/1958 26/03/1960 24/06/1961 22/07/1961 16/09/1961 19/06/1962 |
19/06/1962 | |
K3 | 3830 | 1990 | 61990 | 02/1937 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/10/1960 |
13/10/1960 | |
K3 | 3831 | 1991 | 61991 | 02/1937 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/05/1959 |
07/05/1959 | |
K3 | 3832 | 1992 | 61992 | 02/1937 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/06/1960 |
06/06/1960 |