LNER Riddles "J94" Class 0-6-0ST
Date | Number (at time) | Depot (at time) | Code | Details | Ref | Link |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wed 21/07/1954 | 68080 | 40B | Gateshead Works visit: Around the works. - Undergoing overhaul. | RO 9/1954 | ||
Sun 15/08/1954 | 68030 | 6F | Gorton Works visit: Around the works. | RO 9/1954 | ||
Sat 11/02/1961 | 68010, 68043, 68063, 68064 |
52C, 51A, 6F, 9G |
Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard. Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard. Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Scrap road. Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside stripping shop. |
|||
Sat 11/11/1961 | 68007, 68025, 68050 |
51A, 51A, 51A |
Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sun 25/03/1962 | 68011, 68024, 68035, 68063, 68064 |
56B, 51A, 51A, Wdn, Wdn |
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Darlington shed. Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Works yard. Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Works yard. Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Scrapyard. Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Works yard. |
SLS 5/1962 | ||
Fri 08/06/1962 | 68030 | Wdn | Derby Works visit: Around the works - Shop road. | SLS 7/1962 |