Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 719 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31369 Week
» 130014 Month
» 332678 Year
» 3359531 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
NBR/LNER Holmes "J83" Class 0-6-0T
Class |
NBR |
LNER (1924) |
LNER (1946) |
BR |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
J83 |
802
|
9802
|
8449
|
68449
|
09/1900 |
17/09/1958 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
10/1952 |
J83 |
805
|
9805
|
8452
|
68452
|
03/1901 |
27/06/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
09/1944 |
J83 |
816
|
9816
|
8463
|
68463
|
04/1901 |
24/11/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
07/1945 |
J83 |
819
|
9819
|
8466
|
68466
|
04/1901 |
23/12/1958 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
12/1952 |
J83 |
823
|
9823
|
8470
|
68470
|
04/1901 |
08/10/1962 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
02/1953 |
J83 |
825
|
9825
|
8472
|
68472
|
04/1901 |
12/02/1962 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
08/1944 |
J83 |
826
|
9826
|
8473
|
68473
|
04/1901 |
26/05/1956 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
06/1945 |
J83 |
827
|
9827
|
8474
|
68474
|
04/1901 |
18/04/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
12/1944 |
J83 |
828
|
9828
|
8475
|
68475
|
05/1901 |
10/03/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
04/1947 |
J83 |
829
|
9829
|
8476
|
68476
|
05/1901 |
16/03/1956 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
02/1944 |
J83 |
830
|
9830
|
8477
|
68477
|
05/1901 |
29/12/1962 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
12/1944 |
J83 |
831
|
9831
|
8478
|
68478
|
05/1901 |
24/11/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
03/1945 |
J83 |
832
|
9832
|
8479
|
68479
|
05/1901 |
08/10/1962 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
09/1944 |
J83 |
833
|
9833
|
8480
|
68480
|
05/1901 |
12/03/1959 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
12/1944 |
J83 |
834
|
9834
|
8481
|
68481
|
05/1901 |
12/02/1962 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
01/1944 |