Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 152 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6459 Week
» 21573 Month
» 324763 Year
» 1546328 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "J71" Class 0-6-0T


Company Old Number Company New Number Subtype Date Information
NER 1103 renumbered to LNER 8281   on 03/02/1946  
NER 1155 renumbered to LNER 8292   on 03/02/1946  
NER 1735 renumbered to LNER 8302   on 03/02/1946  
NER 1084 renumbered to LNER 8288   on 10/02/1946  
NER 1151 renumbered to LNER 8291   on 10/02/1946  
NER 1153 renumbered to LNER 8284   on 10/02/1946  
NER 1095 renumbered to LNER 8289   on 17/02/1946  
NER 1167 renumbered to LNER 8246   on 17/02/1946  
NER 1085 renumbered to LNER 8280   on 24/02/1946  
NER 1140 renumbered to LNER 8282   on 24/02/1946  
NER 1142 renumbered to LNER 8283   on 24/02/1946  
NER 1157 renumbered to LNER 8285   on 24/02/1946  
NER 1831 renumbered to LNER 8305   m/e 03/1946  
NER 1143 renumbered to LNER 8290   on 03/03/1946  
NER 1123 renumbered to LNER 8245   on 10/03/1946  
NER 1134 renumbered to LNER 8310   on 10/03/1946  
NER 1689 renumbered to LNER 8313   on 17/03/1946  
NER 1690 renumbered to LNER 8314   on 17/03/1946  
NER 1789 renumbered to LNER 8311   on 17/03/1946  
NER 1861 renumbered to LNER 8315   on 17/03/1946  
NER 1864 renumbered to LNER 8316   on 17/03/1946  
NER 1198 renumbered to LNER 8295   on 24/03/1946  
NER 1199 renumbered to LNER 8296   on 24/03/1946  
NER 103 renumbered to LNER 8262   m/e 04/1946  
NER 1083 renumbered to LNER 8252   m/e 04/1946  
NER 241 renumbered to LNER 8255   m/e 04/1946  
NER 338 renumbered to LNER 8259   m/e 04/1946  
NER 1196 renumbered to LNER 8293   m/e 05/1946  
NER 1197 renumbered to LNER 8294   m/e 05/1946  
NER 1688 renumbered to LNER 8312   m/e 05/1946  
NER 1832 renumbered to LNER 8306   m/e 05/1946  
NER 1833 renumbered to LNER 8307   m/e 05/1946  
NER 1834 renumbered to LNER 8308   m/e 05/1946  
NER 1836 renumbered to LNER 8309   m/e 05/1946  
NER 221 renumbered to LNER 8247   m/e 05/1946  
NER 224 renumbered to LNER 8248   m/e 05/1946  
NER 237 renumbered to LNER 8286   m/e 05/1946  
NER 239 renumbered to LNER 8253   m/e 05/1946  
NER 240 renumbered to LNER 8287   m/e 05/1946  
NER 70 renumbered to LNER 8235   m/e 05/1946  
NER 50 renumbered to LNER 8254   m/e 06/1946  
NER 501 renumbered to LNER 8251   m/e 06/1946  
NER 533 renumbered to LNER 8234   m/e 06/1946  
NER 541 renumbered to LNER 8244   m/e 06/1946  
NER 77 renumbered to LNER 8270   m/e 06/1946  
NER 972 renumbered to LNER 8297   m/e 06/1946  
NER 244 renumbered to LNER 8256   m/e 08/1946  
NER 254 renumbered to LNER 8257   m/e 08/1946  
NER 260 renumbered to LNER 8258   m/e 08/1946  
NER 977 renumbered to LNER 8299   m/e 08/1946  
NER 978 renumbered to LNER 8300   m/e 08/1946  
NER 54 renumbered to LNER 8261   m/e 09/1946  
NER 137 renumbered to LNER 8298   m/e 10/1946  
NER 299 renumbered to LNER 8231   m/e 10/1946  
NER 326 renumbered to LNER 8233   m/e 10/1946  
NER 165 renumbered to LNER 8230   m/e 11/1946  
NER 177 renumbered to LNER 8264   m/e 11/1946  
NER 179 renumbered to LNER 8265   m/e 11/1946  
NER 1796 renumbered to LNER 8303   m/e 11/1946  
NER 1797 renumbered to LNER 8304   m/e 11/1946  
NER 261 renumbered to LNER 8232   m/e 11/1946  
NER 272 renumbered to LNER 8237   m/e 11/1946  
NER 286 renumbered to LNER 8242   m/e 11/1946  
NER 482 renumbered to LNER 8268   m/e 11/1946  
NER 492 renumbered to LNER 8249   m/e 11/1946  
NER 494 renumbered to LNER 8239   m/e 11/1946  
NER 802 renumbered to LNER 8269   m/e 11/1946  
NER 161 renumbered to LNER 8271   m/e 12/1946  
NER 168 renumbered to LNER 8236   m/e 12/1946  
NER 181 renumbered to LNER 8266   m/e 12/1946  
NER 248 renumbered to LNER 8267   m/e 12/1946  
NER 252 renumbered to LNER 8272   m/e 12/1946  
NER 280 renumbered to LNER 8273   m/e 12/1946  
NER 301 renumbered to LNER 8274   m/e 12/1946  
NER 347 renumbered to LNER 8238   m/e 12/1946  
NER 400 renumbered to LNER 8260   m/e 12/1946  
NER 403 renumbered to LNER 8243   m/e 12/1946  
NER 449 renumbered to LNER 8275   m/e 12/1946  
NER 450 renumbered to LNER 8276   m/e 12/1946  
NER 495 renumbered to LNER 8250   m/e 12/1946  
NER 499 renumbered to LNER 8240   m/e 12/1946  
NER 577 renumbered to LNER 8279   m/e 12/1946  
NER 980 renumbered to LNER 8301   m/e 12/1946  
NER 176 renumbered to LNER 8263   m/e 01/1947  
NER 275 renumbered to LNER 8241   m/e 01/1947  
NER 452 renumbered to LNER 8277   m/e 01/1947  
NER 572 renumbered to LNER 8278   m/e 01/1947  
LNER 8235 renumbered to BR 68235   m/e 04/1948  
LNER 8248 renumbered to BR 68248   m/e 04/1948  
LNER 8250 renumbered to BR 68250   m/e 04/1948  
LNER 8278 renumbered to BR 68278   m/e 04/1948  
LNER 8290 renumbered to BR 68290   m/e 04/1948  
LNER 8240 renumbered to BR 68240   m/e 06/1948  
LNER 8256 renumbered to BR 68256   m/e 06/1948  
LNER 8307 renumbered to BR 68307   m/e 06/1948  
LNER 8262 renumbered to BR 68262   m/e 07/1948  
LNER 8291 renumbered to BR 68291   m/e 07/1948  
LNER 8305 renumbered to BR 68305   m/e 08/1948  
LNER 8233 renumbered to BR 68233   m/e 09/1948  
LNER 8276 renumbered to BR 68276   m/e 09/1948  
LNER 8283 renumbered to BR 68283   m/e 09/1948  
LNER 8309 renumbered to BR 68309   m/e 09/1948  
LNER 8271 renumbered to BR 68271   m/e 10/1948  
LNER 8302 renumbered to BR 68302   m/e 10/1948  
LNER 8245 renumbered to BR 68245   m/e 11/1948  
LNER 8295 renumbered to BR 68295   m/e 11/1948  
LNER 8313 renumbered to BR 68313   m/e 11/1948  
LNER 8264 renumbered to BR 68264   m/e 12/1948  
LNER 8275 renumbered to BR 68275   m/e 12/1948  
LNER 8255 renumbered to BR 68255   m/e 01/1949  
LNER 8292 renumbered to BR 68292   m/e 01/1949  
LNER 8260 renumbered to BR 68260   m/e 02/1949  
LNER 8265 renumbered to BR 68265   m/e 03/1949  
LNER 8301 renumbered to BR 68301   m/e 03/1949  
LNER 8246 renumbered to BR 68246   m/e 04/1949  
LNER 8232 renumbered to BR 68232   m/e 05/1949  
LNER 8263 renumbered to BR 68263   m/e 05/1949  
LNER 8293 renumbered to BR 68293   m/e 06/1949  
LNER 8294 renumbered to BR 68294   m/e 07/1949  
LNER 8268 renumbered to BR 68268   m/e 08/1949  
LNER 8296 renumbered to BR 68296   m/e 08/1949  
LNER 8300 renumbered to BR 68300   m/e 09/1949  
LNER 8299 renumbered to BR 68299   m/e 10/1949  
LNER 8242 renumbered to BR 68242   m/e 11/1949  
LNER 8266 renumbered to BR 68266   m/e 11/1949  
LNER 8303 renumbered to BR 68303   m/e 11/1949  
LNER 8259 renumbered to BR 68259   m/e 12/1949  
LNER 8286 renumbered to BR 68286   m/e 01/1950  
LNER 8287 renumbered to BR 68287   m/e 01/1950  
LNER 8280 renumbered to BR 68280   m/e 02/1950  
LNER 8236 renumbered to BR 68236   m/e 03/1950  
LNER 8270 renumbered to BR 68270   m/e 03/1950  
LNER 8238 renumbered to BR 68238   m/e 06/1950  
LNER 8281 renumbered to BR 68281   m/e 07/1950  
LNER 8253 renumbered to BR 68253   m/e 08/1950  
LNER 8284 renumbered to BR 68284   m/e 08/1950  
LNER 8267 renumbered to BR 68267   m/e 09/1950  
LNER 8269 renumbered to BR 68269   m/e 09/1950  
LNER 8273 renumbered to BR 68273   m/e 09/1950  
LNER 8297 renumbered to BR 68297   m/e 09/1950  
LNER 8308 renumbered to BR 68308   m/e 09/1950  
LNER 8314 renumbered to BR 68314   m/e 09/1950  
LNER 8234 renumbered to BR 68234   m/e 10/1950  
LNER 8289 renumbered to BR 68289   m/e 10/1950  
LNER 8282 renumbered to BR 68282   on 09/11/1950  
LNER 8306 renumbered to BR 68306   on 06/12/1950  
LNER 8252 renumbered to BR 68252   on 08/12/1950  
LNER 8244 renumbered to BR 68244   m/e 01/1951  
LNER 8316 renumbered to BR 68316   m/e 02/1951  
LNER 8279 renumbered to BR 68279   m/e 03/1951  
LNER 8258 renumbered to BR 68258   m/e 05/1951  
LNER 8312 renumbered to BR 68312   m/e 06/1951  
LNER 8298 renumbered to BR 68298   m/e 08/1951  
LNER 8230 renumbered to BR 68230   m/e 10/1951  
LNER 8254 renumbered to BR 68254   m/e 10/1951  
LNER 8304 renumbered to BR 68304   m/e 10/1951  
LNER 8251 renumbered to BR 68251   m/e 11/1951  
LNER 8272 renumbered to BR 68272   m/e 12/1951  
LNER 8239 renumbered to BR 68239   m/e 03/1952