Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1057 Today
» 1104 Yesterday
» 3298 Week
» 33588 Month
» 336778 Year
» 1558343 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "J71" Class 0-6-0T


NER LNER BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
144 11/1886 05/1937 50.5
165 8230 68230 11/1886 25/01/1960 York (North) 73.17
299 8231 68231 12/1886 07/1951 York (North) 64.58
317 12/1886 05/1936 49.42
261 8232 68232 01/1887 04/02/1957 Hull Dairycoates 70.08
304 01/1887 02/1936 49.08
399 01/1887 11/1933 46.83
27 02/1887 09/1933 46.58
326 8233 68233 02/1887 20/02/1961 West Hartlepool 74
533 8234 68234 02/1887 21/08/1954 Gateshead 67.5
70 8235 68235 04/1887 07/11/1960 Darlington 73.58
168 8236 68236 04/1887 01/11/1955 Darlington 68.58
263 04/1887 05/1937 50.08
272 8237 05/1887 07/1947 60.17
278 05/1887 11/1935 48.5
347 8238 68238 05/1887 10/09/1955 York (North) 68.33
493 06/1887 07/1939 52.08
494 8239 68239 06/1887 23/11/1956 Darlington 69.42
499 8240 68240 06/1887 10/09/1956 York (North) 69.25
811 06/1887 05/1937 49.92
242 04/1888 10/1936 48.5
268 04/1888 08/1939 51.33
275 8241 04/1888 07/1947 59.25
285 05/1888 12/1936 48.58
286 8242 68242 05/1888 04/08/1958 Hull Dairycoates 70.25
403 8243 68243 05/1888 03/1950 Heaton 61.83
541 8244 68244 06/1888 12/04/1958 West Hartlepool 69.83
584 06/1888 02/1935 46.67
1123 8245 68245 06/1888 27/04/1959 Heaton 70.83
1163 06/1888 10/1933 45.33
1167 8246 68246 07/1889 24/11/1958 York (North) 69.33
84 07/1889 08/1933 44.08
221 8247 68247 07/1889 08/1951 Gateshead 62.08
224 8248 68248 08/1889 03/07/1951 West Hartlepool 61.92
225 08/1889 05/1937 47.75
453 08/1889 02/1939 49.5
492 8249 68249 08/1889 01/1953 West Auckland 63.42
495 8250 68250 09/1889 06/04/1959 York (North) 69.58
496 09/1889 05/1937 47.67
501 8251 68251 09/1889 12/01/1959 Gateshead 69.33
1083 8252 68252 05/1890 15/04/1957 Hull Dairycoates 66.92
239 8253 68253 05/1890 16/09/1957 York (North) 67.33
50 8254 68254 06/1890 07/11/1960 West Auckland 70.42
241 8255 68255 06/1890 18/08/1952 West Auckland 62.17
244 8256 68256 06/1890 22/07/1954 Heaton 64.08
254 8257 06/1890 05/1947 56.92
260 8258 68258 07/1890 09/11/1954 West Hartlepool 64.33
296 07/1890 08/1933 43.08
338 8259 68259 07/1890 14/09/1955 Darlington 65.17
400 8260 68260 07/1890 07/03/1960 Middlesbrough 69.67
54 8261 09/1890 03/1947 56.5
103 8262 68262 09/1890 25/01/1960 Gateshead 69.33
176 8263 68263 09/1890 08/06/1959 West Hartlepool 68.75
177 8264 68264 09/1890 25/01/1960 Heaton 69.33
179 8265 68265 09/1890 31/08/1959 Gateshead 68.92
181 8266 68266 09/1890 18/02/1957 Tyne Dock 66.42
248 8267 68267 09/1890 14/11/1957 Gateshead 67.17
478 10/1890 09/1933 42.92
482 8268 68268 10/1890 26/05/1952 York (North) 61.58
802 8269 68269 10/1890 14/10/1960 West Auckland 70
77 8270 68270 11/1891 21/11/1955 Gateshead 64
161 8271 68271 11/1891 10/05/1954 Heaton 62.5
252 8272 68272 11/1891 06/02/1961 Tyne Dock 69.25
280 8273 68273 11/1891 14/11/1957 Heaton 66
447 11/1891 05/1937 45.5
448 11/1891 05/1937 45.5
301 8274 01/1892 06/1947 55.42
401 01/1892 09/1936 44.67
449 8275 68275 01/1892 08/02/1961 York (North) 69.08
450 8276 68276 01/1892 19/11/1956 West Hartlepool 64.83
451 01/1892 05/1937 45.33
452 8277 68277 01/1892 25/11/1950 Hull Dairycoates 58.83
572 8278 68278 02/1892 06/02/1961 Heaton 69
577 8279 68279 02/1892 18/06/1957 Darlington 65.33
1085 8280 68280 02/1892 02/05/1957 York (North) 65.25
1103 8281 68281 02/1892 23/11/1953 Darlington 61.75
1140 8282 68282 03/1892 26/10/1953 York (North) 61.58
1142 8283 68283 03/1892 30/07/1959 Gateshead 67.33
1153 8284 68284 03/1892 10/10/1955 Blaydon 63.58
1157 8285 68285 03/1892 04/10/1948 56.58
237 8286 68286 07/1892 16/06/1952 York (North) 59.92
240 8287 68287 07/1892 26/11/1956 Borough Gardens 64.33
402 07/1892 09/1933 41.17
1084 8288 68288 07/1892 25/11/1950 Hull Dairycoates 58.33
1095 8289 68289 07/1892 20/06/1955 Borough Gardens 62.92
1143 8290 68290 07/1892 12/01/1959 West Hartlepool 66.5
1144 07/1892 05/1937 44.83
1151 8291 68291 08/1892 26/05/1956 West Hartlepool 63.75
1155 8292 68292 08/1892 16/10/1954 York (North) 62.17
1314 08/1892 05/1937 44.75
1196 8293 68293 11/1892 10/09/1956 York (North) 63.83
1197 8294 68294 11/1892 10/11/1956 York (North) 64
1198 8295 68295 11/1892 23/02/1959 West Hartlepool 66.25
1199 8296 68296 11/1892 19/07/1958 Hull Botanic Gardens 65.67
969 01/1893 09/1933 40.67
972 8297 68297 01/1893 26/05/1956 York (North) 63.33
137 8298 68298 01/1893 27/03/1957 York (North) 64.17
977 8299 68299 01/1893 01/12/1952 Borough Gardens 59.92
978 8300 68300 01/1893 07/03/1955 Darlington 62.17
980 8301 68301 01/1893 26/11/1956 West Hartlepool 63.83
1666 11/1894 08/1933 38.75
1735 8302 68302 11/1894 30/08/1951 West Hartlepool 56.75
1796 8303 68303 11/1894 13/06/1955 Middlesbrough 60.58
1797 8304 68304 12/1894 09/11/1954 Hull Dairycoates 59.92
1831 8305 68305 12/1894 24/11/1958 Stockton 63.92
1832 8306 68306 12/1894 19/07/1958 West Hartlepool 63.58
1833 8307 68307 12/1894 20/06/1955 Middlesbrough 60.5
1834 8308 68308 12/1894 19/05/1958 Darlington 63.42
1835 12/1894 05/1937 42.42
1836 8309 68309 12/1894 14/04/1960 Gateshead 65.33
1134 8310 68310 08/1895 12/1950 York (North) 55.33
1758 09/1895 09/1933 38
1789 8311 68311 09/1895 08/1951 Hull Dairycoates 55.92
1688 8312 68312 10/1895 02/02/1959 Middlesbrough 63.33
1689 8313 68313 10/1895 03/09/1956 Selby 60.92
1690 8314 68314 10/1895 14/04/1960 Gateshead 64.5
1861 8315 10/1895 04/1946 50.5
1862 10/1895 05/1937 41.58
1863 11/1895 05/1937 41.5
1864 8316 68316 11/1895 14/10/1960 Hull Dairycoates 64.92