Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1072 Today
» 1104 Yesterday
» 3313 Week
» 33603 Month
» 336793 Year
» 1558358 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "J71" Class 0-6-0T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
08/1933 Condemned 84       COND  
08/1933 Condemned 296       COND  
08/1933 Condemned 1666       COND  
09/1933 Condemned 27       COND  
09/1933 Condemned 478       COND  
09/1933 Condemned 402       COND  
09/1933 Condemned 969       COND  
09/1933 Condemned 1758       COND  
10/1933 Condemned 1163       COND  
11/1933 Condemned 399       COND  
02/1935 Condemned 584       COND  
11/1935 Condemned 278       COND  
02/1936 Condemned 304       COND  
05/1936 Condemned 317       COND  
09/1936 Condemned 401       COND  
10/1936 Condemned 242       COND  
12/1936 Condemned 285       COND  
05/1937 Condemned 144       COND  
05/1937 Condemned 263       COND  
05/1937 Condemned 811       COND  
05/1937 Condemned 225       COND  
05/1937 Condemned 496       COND  
05/1937 Condemned 447       COND  
05/1937 Condemned 448       COND  
05/1937 Condemned 451       COND  
05/1937 Condemned 1144       COND  
05/1937 Condemned 1314       COND  
05/1937 Condemned 1835       COND  
05/1937 Condemned 1862       COND  
05/1937 Condemned 1863       COND  
02/1939 Condemned 453       COND  
07/1939 Condemned 493       COND  
08/1939 Condemned 268       COND  
04/1946 Condemned 8315       COND  
03/1947 Condemned 8261       COND  
05/1947 Condemned 8257       COND  
06/1947 Condemned 8274       COND  
07/1947 Condemned 8237       COND  
07/1947 Condemned 8241       COND  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8230     YK York (North)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8231     YK York (North)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8232     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8233     WHL West Hartlepool  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8234     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8235     DAR Darlington  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8236     DAR Darlington  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8238     YK York (North)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8239     DAR Darlington  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8240     YK York (North)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8242     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8243     HTN Heaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8244     WHL West Hartlepool  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8245     HTN Heaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8246     YK York (North)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8247     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8248     WHL West Hartlepool  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8249     AUK West Auckland  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8250     YK York (North)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8251     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8252     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8253     YK York (North)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8254     AUK West Auckland  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8255     AUK West Auckland  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8256     HTN Heaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8258     WHL West Hartlepool  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8259     DAR Darlington  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8260     MID Middlesbrough  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8262     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8263     WHL West Hartlepool  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8264     HTN Heaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8265     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8266     TDK Tyne Dock  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8267     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8268     YK York (North)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8269     AUK West Auckland  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8270     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8271     HTN Heaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8272     TDK Tyne Dock  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8273     HTN Heaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8275     YK York (North)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8276     WHL West Hartlepool  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8277     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8278     HTN Heaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8279     DAR Darlington  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8280     YK York (North)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8281     DAR Darlington  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8282     YK York (North)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8283     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8284     BLA Blaydon  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8285     SEL Selby  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8286     YK York (North)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8287     BOR Borough Gardens  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8288     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8289     BOR Borough Gardens  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8290     WHL West Hartlepool  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8291     WHL West Hartlepool  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8292     YK York (North)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8293     YK York (North)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8294     YK York (North)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8295     WHL West Hartlepool  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8296     HLB Hull Botanic Gardens  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8297     YK York (North)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8298     YK York (North)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8299     BOR Borough Gardens  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8300     DAR Darlington  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8301     WHL West Hartlepool  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8302     WHL West Hartlepool  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8303     MID Middlesbrough  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8304     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8305     SKN Stockton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8306     WHL West Hartlepool  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8307     MID Middlesbrough  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8308     DAR Darlington  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8309     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8310     YK York (North)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8311     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8312     MID Middlesbrough  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8313     SEL Selby  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8314     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 8316     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
04/10/1948 Condemned 8285 SEL Selby   COND  
03/1950 Condemned 68243 HTN Heaton   COND  
25/11/1950 Condemned 68277 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
25/11/1950 Condemned 68288 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
12/1950 Condemned 68310 YK York (North)   COND  
23/06/1951 Reallocation 68265 GHD Gateshead 52B Heaton  
23/06/1951 Reallocation 68267 GHD Gateshead 52C Blaydon  
23/06/1951 Reallocation 68273 HTN Heaton 52C Blaydon  
07/1951 Condemned 68231 YK York (North)   COND  
03/07/1951 Condemned 68248 WHL West Hartlepool   COND  
08/1951 Condemned 68247 GHD Gateshead   COND  
08/1951 Condemned 68311 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
30/08/1951 Condemned 68302 WHL West Hartlepool   COND  
22/09/1951 Reallocation 68281 DAR Darlington 51C West Hartlepool  
29/12/1951 Reallocation 68238 YK York (North) 20D Normanton  
29/12/1951 Reallocation 68292 YK York (North) 20D Normanton  
29/12/1951 Reallocation 68294 YK York (North) 20D Normanton  
26/05/1952 Condemned 68268 YK York (North)   COND  
16/06/1952 Condemned 68286 YK York (North)   COND  
18/08/1952 Condemned 68255 AUK West Auckland   COND  
15/11/1952 Reallocation 68278 HTN Heaton 52C.1 Alston  
01/12/1952 Condemned 68299 BOR Borough Gardens   COND  
01/1953 Condemned 68249 AUK West Auckland   COND  
17/01/1953 Reallocation 68265 52B Heaton 54B Tyne Dock  
17/01/1953 Reallocation 68272 TDK Tyne Dock 52B Heaton  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 68316 HLD Hull Dairycoates 54C Borough Gardens  
20/06/1953 Reallocation 68281 51C West Hartlepool 53A Hull Dairycoates  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 68284 BLA Blaydon 53C Hull Springhead  
26/10/1953 Condemned 68282 YK York (North)   COND  
23/11/1953 Condemned 68281 53A Hull Dairycoates   COND  
19/12/1953 Reallocation 68251 GHD Gateshead 52B Heaton  
19/12/1953 Reallocation 68272 52B Heaton 52A Gateshead  
20/02/1954 Reallocation 68284 53C Hull Springhead 53A Hull Dairycoates  
10/05/1954 Condemned 68271 HTN Heaton   COND  
22/07/1954 Condemned 68256 HTN Heaton   COND  
21/08/1954 Condemned 68234 GHD Gateshead   COND  
25/09/1954 Reallocation 68263 WHL West Hartlepool 52B Heaton  
25/09/1954 Reallocation 68278 52C.1 Alston 52B Heaton  
16/10/1954 Condemned 68292 20D Normanton   COND  
09/11/1954 Condemned 68258 WHL West Hartlepool   COND  
09/11/1954 Condemned 68304 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
07/03/1955 Condemned 68300 DAR Darlington   COND  
23/04/1955 Reallocation 68242 HLD Hull Dairycoates 51E Stockton  
14/05/1955 Reallocation 68245 HTN Heaton 51D Middlesbrough  
13/06/1955 Condemned 68303 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
20/06/1955 Condemned 68289 BOR Borough Gardens   COND  
20/06/1955 Condemned 68307 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
23/07/1955 Reallocation 68242 51E Stockton 51F West Auckland  
10/09/1955 Condemned 68238 20D Normanton   COND  
14/09/1955 Condemned 68259 DAR Darlington   COND  
10/10/1955 Condemned 68284 53A Hull Dairycoates   COND  
22/10/1955 Reallocation 68230 YK York (North) 53A Hull Dairycoates  
22/10/1955 Reallocation 68290 WHL West Hartlepool 51D Middlesbrough  
01/11/1955 Condemned 68236 DAR Darlington   COND  
12/11/1955 Reallocation 68267 52C Blaydon 52A Gateshead  
21/11/1955 Condemned 68270 GHD Gateshead   COND  
18/02/1956 Reallocation 68275 YK York (North) 50C Selby  
26/05/1956 Condemned 68291 WHL West Hartlepool   COND  
26/05/1956 Condemned 68297 YK York (North)   COND  
03/09/1956 Condemned 68313 SEL Selby   COND  
10/09/1956 Condemned 68240 YK York (North)   COND  
10/09/1956 Condemned 68293 YK York (North)   COND  
10/11/1956 Condemned 68294 20D Normanton   COND  
19/11/1956 Condemned 68276 WHL West Hartlepool   COND  
23/11/1956 Condemned 68239 DAR Darlington   COND  
26/11/1956 Condemned 68287 BOR Borough Gardens   COND  
26/11/1956 Condemned 68301 WHL West Hartlepool   COND  
15/12/1956 Reallocation 68278 52B Heaton 54C Borough Gardens  
04/02/1957 Condemned 68232 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
18/02/1957 Condemned 68266 TDK Tyne Dock   COND  
16/03/1957 Reallocation 68262 GHD Gateshead 54B Tyne Dock  
27/03/1957 Condemned 68298 YK York (North)   COND  
15/04/1957 Condemned 68252 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
20/04/1957 Reallocation 68251 52B Heaton 53A Hull Dairycoates  
02/05/1957 Condemned 68280 YK York (North)   COND  
18/05/1957 Reallocation 68264 HTN Heaton 53A Hull Dairycoates  
18/06/1957 Condemned 68279 DAR Darlington   COND  
20/07/1957 Reallocation 68251 53A Hull Dairycoates 53B Hull Botanic Gardens  
20/07/1957 Reallocation 68273 52C Blaydon 50A York (North)  
20/07/1957 Reallocation 68295 WHL West Hartlepool 51F West Auckland  
16/09/1957 Condemned 68253 55E     COND  
19/10/1957 Reallocation 68251 53B Hull Botanic Gardens 53A Hull Dairycoates  
14/11/1957 Condemned 68267 52A Gateshead   COND  
14/11/1957 Condemned 68273 50A York (North)   COND  
08/03/1958 Reallocation 68263 52B Heaton 52A Gateshead  
12/04/1958 Condemned 68244 WHL West Hartlepool   COND  
19/05/1958 Condemned 68308 DAR Darlington   COND  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 68235 DAR Darlington 51F West Auckland  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 68245 51D Middlesbrough 51L Thornaby  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 68260 MID Middlesbrough 51L Thornaby  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 68290 51D Middlesbrough 51L Thornaby  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 68312 MID Middlesbrough 51L Thornaby  
19/07/1958 Condemned 68296 HLB Hull Botanic Gardens   COND  
19/07/1958 Condemned 68306 WHL West Hartlepool   COND  
04/08/1958 Condemned 68242 51F West Auckland   COND  
24/11/1958 Condemned 68246 YK York (North)   COND  
24/11/1958 Condemned 68305 SKN Stockton   COND  
27/12/1958 Reallocation 68260 51L Thornaby 51E Stockton  
12/01/1959 Condemned 68251 53A Hull Dairycoates   COND  
12/01/1959 Condemned 68290 51L Thornaby   COND  
31/01/1959 Reallocation 68272 52A Gateshead 51L Thornaby  
02/02/1959 Condemned 68312 51L Thornaby   COND  
23/02/1959 Condemned 68295 51F West Auckland   COND  
06/04/1959 Condemned 68250 YK York (North)   COND  
18/04/1959 Reallocation 68309 GHD Gateshead 50A York (North)  
27/04/1959 Condemned 68245 51L Thornaby   COND  
02/05/1959 Reallocation 68263 52A Gateshead 52B Heaton  
08/06/1959 Condemned 68263 52B Heaton   COND  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 68316 54C Borough Gardens 51C West Hartlepool  
30/07/1959 Condemned 68283 GHD Gateshead   COND  
31/08/1959 Condemned 68265 54B Tyne Dock   COND  
19/09/1959 Reallocation 68275 50C Selby 55E Normanton  
23/01/1960 Reallocation 68314 GHD Gateshead 52D Tweedmouth  
25/01/1960 Condemned 68230 53A Hull Dairycoates   COND  
25/01/1960 Condemned 68262 54B Tyne Dock   COND  
25/01/1960 Condemned 68264 53A Hull Dairycoates   COND  
07/03/1960 Condemned 68260 51E Stockton   COND  
14/04/1960 Condemned 68309 50A York (North)   COND  
14/04/1960 Condemned 68314 52D Tweedmouth   COND  
14/10/1960 Condemned 68269 AUK West Auckland   COND  
14/10/1960 Condemned 68316 51C West Hartlepool   COND  
07/11/1960 Condemned 68235 51F West Auckland   COND  
07/11/1960 Condemned 68254 AUK West Auckland   COND  
06/02/1961 Condemned 68272 51L Thornaby   COND  
06/02/1961 Condemned 68278 54C Borough Gardens   COND  
08/02/1961 Condemned 68275 55E Normanton   COND  
20/02/1961 Condemned 68233 WHL West Hartlepool   COND