Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 13 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 3379 Week
» 13 Month
» 336859 Year
» 1558424 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "J71" Class 0-6-0T


Class NER LNER BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
J71 144     11/1886 W Withdrawn 05/1937 05/1937
J71 165 8230 68230 11/1886 YK
53A
W
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/10/1955
25/01/1960
25/01/1960
J71 299 8231 68231 12/1886 YK
W
York (North)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1951
07/1951
J71 317     12/1886 W Withdrawn 05/1936 05/1936
J71 261 8232 68232 01/1887 HLD
W
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/02/1957
04/02/1957
J71 304     01/1887 W Withdrawn 02/1936 02/1936
J71 399     01/1887 W Withdrawn 11/1933 11/1933
J71 27     02/1887 W Withdrawn 09/1933 09/1933
J71 326 8233 68233 02/1887 WHL
W
West Hartlepool
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/02/1961
20/02/1961
J71 533 8234 68234 02/1887 GHD
W
Gateshead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/08/1954
21/08/1954
J71 70 8235 68235 04/1887 DAR
51F
W
Darlington
West Auckland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
07/11/1960
07/11/1960
J71 168 8236 68236 04/1887 DAR
W
Darlington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/11/1955
01/11/1955
J71 263     04/1887 W Withdrawn 05/1937 05/1937
J71 272 8237   05/1887 W Withdrawn 07/1947 07/1947
J71 278     05/1887 W Withdrawn 11/1935 11/1935
J71 347 8238 68238 05/1887 YK
20D
W
York (North)
Normanton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1951
10/09/1955
10/09/1955
J71 493     06/1887 W Withdrawn 07/1939 07/1939
J71 494 8239 68239 06/1887 DAR
W
Darlington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/11/1956
23/11/1956
J71 499 8240 68240 06/1887 YK
W
York (North)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/09/1956
10/09/1956
J71 811     06/1887 W Withdrawn 05/1937 05/1937
J71 242     04/1888 W Withdrawn 10/1936 10/1936
J71 268     04/1888 W Withdrawn 08/1939 08/1939
J71 275 8241   04/1888 W Withdrawn 07/1947 07/1947
J71 285     05/1888 W Withdrawn 12/1936 12/1936
J71 286 8242 68242 05/1888 HLD
51E
51F
W
Hull Dairycoates
Stockton
West Auckland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/04/1955
23/07/1955
04/08/1958
04/08/1958
J71 403 8243 68243 05/1888 HTN
W
Heaton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1950
03/1950
J71 541 8244 68244 06/1888 WHL
W
West Hartlepool
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/04/1958
12/04/1958
J71 584     06/1888 W Withdrawn 02/1935 02/1935
J71 1123 8245 68245 06/1888 HTN
51D
51L
W
Heaton
Middlesbrough
Thornaby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/05/1955
14/06/1958
27/04/1959
27/04/1959
J71 1163     06/1888 W Withdrawn 10/1933 10/1933
J71 1167 8246 68246 07/1889 YK
W
York (North)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/11/1958
24/11/1958
J71 84     07/1889 W Withdrawn 08/1933 08/1933
J71 221 8247 68247 07/1889 GHD
W
Gateshead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1951
08/1951
J71 224 8248 68248 08/1889 WHL
W
West Hartlepool
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/07/1951
03/07/1951
J71 225     08/1889 W Withdrawn 05/1937 05/1937
J71 453     08/1889 W Withdrawn 02/1939 02/1939
J71 492 8249 68249 08/1889 AUK
W
West Auckland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/1953
01/1953
J71 495 8250 68250 09/1889 YK
W
York (North)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/04/1959
06/04/1959
J71 496     09/1889 W Withdrawn 05/1937 05/1937
J71 501 8251 68251 09/1889 GHD
52B
53A
53B
53A
W
Gateshead
Heaton
Hull Dairycoates
Hull Botanic Gardens
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/12/1953
20/04/1957
20/07/1957
19/10/1957
12/01/1959
12/01/1959
J71 1083 8252 68252 05/1890 HLD
W
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/04/1957
15/04/1957
J71 239 8253 68253 05/1890 YK

W
York (North)

Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/12/1956
16/09/1957
16/09/1957
J71 50 8254 68254 06/1890 AUK
W
West Auckland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1960
07/11/1960
J71 241 8255 68255 06/1890 AUK
W
West Auckland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/08/1952
18/08/1952
J71 244 8256 68256 06/1890 HTN
W
Heaton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/07/1954
22/07/1954
J71 254 8257   06/1890 W Withdrawn 05/1947 05/1947
J71 260 8258 68258 07/1890 WHL
W
West Hartlepool
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/11/1954
09/11/1954
J71 296     07/1890 W Withdrawn 08/1933 08/1933
J71 338 8259 68259 07/1890 DAR
W
Darlington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/09/1955
14/09/1955
J71 400 8260 68260 07/1890 MID
51L
51E
W
Middlesbrough
Thornaby
Stockton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
27/12/1958
07/03/1960
07/03/1960
J71 54 8261   09/1890 W Withdrawn 03/1947 03/1947
J71 103 8262 68262 09/1890 GHD
54B
W
Gateshead
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/03/1957
25/01/1960
25/01/1960
J71 176 8263 68263 09/1890 WHL
52B
52A
52B
W
West Hartlepool
Heaton
Gateshead
Heaton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/09/1954
08/03/1958
02/05/1959
08/06/1959
08/06/1959
J71 177 8264 68264 09/1890 HTN
53A
W
Heaton
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/05/1957
25/01/1960
25/01/1960
J71 179 8265 68265 09/1890 GHD
52B
54B
W
Gateshead
Heaton
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/06/1951
17/01/1953
31/08/1959
31/08/1959
J71 181 8266 68266 09/1890 TDK
W
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/02/1957
18/02/1957
J71 248 8267 68267 09/1890 GHD
52C
52A
W
Gateshead
Blaydon
Gateshead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/06/1951
12/11/1955
14/11/1957
14/11/1957
J71 478     10/1890 W Withdrawn 09/1933 09/1933
J71 482 8268 68268 10/1890 YK
W
York (North)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/05/1952
26/05/1952
J71 802 8269 68269 10/1890 AUK
W
West Auckland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/10/1960
14/10/1960
J71 77 8270 68270 11/1891 GHD
W
Gateshead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/11/1955
21/11/1955
J71 161 8271 68271 11/1891 HTN
W
Heaton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/05/1954
10/05/1954
J71 252 8272 68272 11/1891 TDK
52B
52A
51L
W
Tyne Dock
Heaton
Gateshead
Thornaby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/01/1953
19/12/1953
31/01/1959
06/02/1961
06/02/1961
J71 280 8273 68273 11/1891 HTN
52C
50A
W
Heaton
Blaydon
York (North)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/06/1951
20/07/1957
14/11/1957
14/11/1957
J71 447     11/1891 W Withdrawn 05/1937 05/1937
J71 448     11/1891 W Withdrawn 05/1937 05/1937
J71 301 8274   01/1892 W Withdrawn 06/1947 06/1947
J71 401     01/1892 W Withdrawn 09/1936 09/1936
J71 449 8275 68275 01/1892 YK
50C
55E
W
York (North)
Selby
Normanton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/02/1956
19/09/1959
08/02/1961
08/02/1961
J71 450 8276 68276 01/1892 WHL
W
West Hartlepool
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/11/1956
19/11/1956
J71 451     01/1892 W Withdrawn 05/1937 05/1937
J71 452 8277 68277 01/1892 HLD
W
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1950
25/11/1950
J71 572 8278 68278 02/1892 HTN
52c
52B
54C
W
Heaton
Alston
Heaton
Borough Gardens
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1952
25/09/1954
15/12/1956
06/02/1961
06/02/1961
J71 577 8279 68279 02/1892 DAR
W
Darlington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/06/1957
18/06/1957
J71 1085 8280 68280 02/1892 YK
W
York (North)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/05/1957
02/05/1957
J71 1103 8281 68281 02/1892 DAR
51C
53A
W
Darlington
West Hartlepool
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/09/1951
20/06/1953
23/11/1953
23/11/1953
J71 1140 8282 68282 03/1892 YK
W
York (North)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/10/1953
26/10/1953
J71 1142 8283 68283 03/1892 GHD
W
Gateshead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/07/1959
30/07/1959
J71 1153 8284 68284 03/1892 BLA
53C
53A
W
Blaydon
Hull Springhead
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/10/1953
20/02/1954
10/10/1955
10/10/1955
J71 1157 8285 68285 03/1892 SEL
W
Selby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/10/1948
04/10/1948
J71 237 8286 68286 07/1892 YK
W
York (North)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/06/1952
16/06/1952
J71 240 8287 68287 07/1892 BOR
W
Borough Gardens
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/11/1956
26/11/1956
J71 402     07/1892 W Withdrawn 09/1933 09/1933
J71 1084 8288 68288 07/1892 HLD
W
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1950
25/11/1950
J71 1095 8289 68289 07/1892 BOR
W
Borough Gardens
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/06/1955
20/06/1955
J71 1143 8290 68290 07/1892 WHL
51D
51L
W
West Hartlepool
Middlesbrough
Thornaby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/10/1955
14/06/1958
12/01/1959
12/01/1959
J71 1144     07/1892 W Withdrawn 05/1937 05/1937
J71 1151 8291 68291 08/1892 WHL
W
West Hartlepool
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/05/1956
26/05/1956
J71 1155 8292 68292 08/1892 YK
20D
W
York (North)
Normanton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1951
16/10/1954
16/10/1954
J71 1314     08/1892 W Withdrawn 05/1937 05/1937
J71 1196 8293 68293 11/1892 YK
W
York (North)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/09/1956
10/09/1956
J71 1197 8294 68294 11/1892 YK
20D
W
York (North)
Normanton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1951
10/11/1956
10/11/1956
J71 1198 8295 68295 11/1892 WHL
51F
W
West Hartlepool
West Auckland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/07/1957
23/02/1959
23/02/1959
J71 1199 8296 68296 11/1892 HLB
W
Hull Botanic Gardens
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/07/1958
19/07/1958
J71 969     01/1893 W Withdrawn 09/1933 09/1933
J71 972 8297 68297 01/1893 YK
W
York (North)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/05/1956
26/05/1956
J71 137 8298 68298 01/1893 YK
W
York (North)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/03/1957
27/03/1957
J71 977 8299 68299 01/1893 BOR
W
Borough Gardens
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/12/1952
01/12/1952
J71 978 8300 68300 01/1893 DAR
W
Darlington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/03/1955
07/03/1955
J71 980 8301 68301 01/1893 WHL
W
West Hartlepool
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/11/1956
26/11/1956
J71 1666     11/1894 W Withdrawn 08/1933 08/1933
J71 1735 8302 68302 11/1894 WHL
W
West Hartlepool
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/08/1951
30/08/1951
J71 1796 8303 68303 11/1894 MID
W
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/06/1955
13/06/1955
J71 1797 8304 68304 12/1894 HLD
W
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/11/1954
09/11/1954
J71 1831 8305 68305 12/1894 SKN
W
Stockton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/11/1958
24/11/1958
J71 1832 8306 68306 12/1894 WHL
W
West Hartlepool
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/07/1958
19/07/1958
J71 1833 8307 68307 12/1894 MID
W
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/06/1955
20/06/1955
J71 1834 8308 68308 12/1894 DAR
W
Darlington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1958
19/05/1958
J71 1835     12/1894 W Withdrawn 05/1937 05/1937
J71 1836 8309 68309 12/1894 GHD
50A
W
Gateshead
York (North)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/04/1959
14/04/1960
14/04/1960
J71 1134 8310 68310 08/1895 YK
W
York (North)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1950
12/1950
J71 1758     09/1895 W Withdrawn 09/1933 09/1933
J71 1789 8311 68311 09/1895 HLD
W
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1951
08/1951
J71 1688 8312 68312 10/1895 MID
51L
W
Middlesbrough
Thornaby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
02/02/1959
02/02/1959
J71 1689 8313 68313 10/1895 SEL
W
Selby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/09/1956
03/09/1956
J71 1690 8314 68314 10/1895 GHD
52D
W
Gateshead
Tweedmouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/01/1960
14/04/1960
14/04/1960
J71 1861 8315   10/1895 W Withdrawn 04/1946 04/1946
J71 1862     10/1895 W Withdrawn 05/1937 05/1937
J71 1863     11/1895 W Withdrawn 05/1937 05/1937
J71 1864 8316 68316 11/1895 HLD
54C
51C
W
Hull Dairycoates
Borough Gardens
West Hartlepool
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/02/1953
20/06/1959
14/10/1960
14/10/1960