Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 29 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 5932 Week
» 26895 Month
» 63648 Year
» 574750 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Gresley "J39" Class 0-6-0


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Thu 05/08/1954 64708,
64807,
64970
30A,
40D,
36E
  Stratford Works visit: Around the works.
Stratford Works visit: Around the works.
Stratford Works visit: Around the works.
RO 9/1954  
Thu 05/08/1954 64768,
64826,
64976,
64984,
64987
30A,
32B,
40D,
40A,
36A
  Stratford Works visit: Around the works.
Stratford Works visit: Around the works.
Stratford Works visit: Around the works.
Stratford Works visit: Around the works. - Freshly painted on shed/yard.
Stratford Works visit: Around the works.
RO 9/1954  
Sun 15/08/1954 64709,
64720,
64732,
64741,
64810,
64823,
64845,
64878,
64983,
64988
53A,
37A,
37A,
39A,
39A,
38A,
50D,
SHF,
38A,
38A
  Gorton Works visit: Around the works.
Gorton Works visit: Around the works. - Awaiting works.
Gorton Works visit: Around the works.
Gorton Works visit: Around the works.
Gorton Works visit: Around the works. - Awaiting works.
Gorton Works visit: Around the works.
Gorton Works visit: Around the works.
Gorton Works visit: Around the works.
Gorton Works visit: Around the works. - Awaiting works.
Gorton Works visit: Around the works. - Awaiting works.
RO 9/1954  
Sat 11/02/1961 64979 51F   Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Scrap road.    
Sun 18/03/1962 64744 9G   Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside erecting shop.    
Sun 25/03/1962 64979 Wdn   Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Scrapyard. SLS 5/1962  
Wed 18/04/1962 64963 Wdn   Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - Awaiting cutting up. SLS 5/1962  
Sat 02/06/1962 64963 Wdn   Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - In the "Cemetery" SLS 7/1962