Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 29 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 5932 Week
» 26895 Month
» 63648 Year
» 574750 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Gresley "J39" Class 0-6-0


Class LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR (Tmp) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
J39 1448 4700   64700 28/09/1926 NPT
MID
NPT
DAR
BLA
54C
52A
52G
W
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
Blaydon
Borough Gardens
Gateshead
Sunderland
Withdrawn
28/09/1926
07/04/1930
23/01/1936
23/03/1943
03/08/1943
04/01/1953
14/06/1959
01/11/1959
17/04/1961
17/04/1961
J39 1449 4701   64701 05/10/1926 NPT
MID
NPT
DAR
BLA
GHD
52B
52G
W
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
Blaydon
Gateshead
Heaton
Sunderland
Withdrawn
05/10/1926
07/04/1930
23/01/1936
23/03/1943
16/07/1943
18/09/1949
07/07/1957
13/12/1959
16/11/1962
16/11/1962
J39 1450 4702 4702 64702 14/10/1926 NPT
DAR
LIN
IMM
LIN
30A
41A
W
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
Lincoln
Immingham
Lincoln
Stratford
Sheffield Darnall
Withdrawn
14/10/1926
28/03/1943
15/09/1944
17/06/1945
21/10/1945
10/11/1957
07/12/1958
28/09/1959
28/09/1959
J39 1451 4703   64703 15/10/1926 HLD
BLA
53A
52B
52G
W
Hull Dairycoates
Blaydon
Hull Dairycoates
Heaton
Sunderland
Withdrawn
15/10/1926
25/11/1927
06/07/1952
07/12/1952
13/12/1959
29/03/1962
29/03/1962
J39 1452 4704   64704 21/10/1926 HLD
BLA
GHD
52G
W
Hull Dairycoates
Blaydon
Gateshead
Sunderland
Withdrawn
21/10/1926
25/11/1927
18/09/1949
01/11/1959
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1454 4705   64705 21/10/1926 HLD
BLA
HLD
BLA
52d
56B
56A
56B
W
Hull Dairycoates
Blaydon
Hull Dairycoates
Blaydon
Alnmouth
Ardsley
Wakefield
Ardsley
Withdrawn
21/10/1926
25/11/1927
04/09/1949
02/10/1949
16/06/1957
25/01/1959
12/06/1960
26/03/1961
29/03/1962
29/03/1962
J39 1455 4706   64706 21/10/1926 NPT
SBK
50A
51L
52G
W
Newport (Teeside)
Starbeck
York (North)
Thornaby
Sunderland
Withdrawn
21/10/1926
26/06/1939
13/09/1959
22/11/1959
21/01/1962
29/03/1962
29/03/1962
J39 1456 4707   64707 28/10/1926 NPT
DAR
BLA
GHD
54C
52A
52G
W
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
Blaydon
Gateshead
Borough Gardens
Gateshead
Sunderland
Withdrawn
28/10/1926
16/07/1934
03/08/1943
18/09/1949
04/01/1953
14/06/1959
13/11/1960
25/08/1961
25/08/1961
J39 1457 4708   64708 04/11/1926 NPT
DAR
STR
32B
30A
W
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
04/11/1926
16/07/1934
12/11/1935
15/10/1950
22/10/1950
18/08/1960
18/08/1960
J39 1458 4709   64709 09/11/1926 WHL
HAV
BLA
HTN
53A
W
West Hartlepool
Haverton Hill
Blaydon
Heaton
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
09/11/1926
07/11/1938
28/03/1943
07/11/1948
11/02/1952
23/11/1962
23/11/1962
J39 1459 4710   64710 12/11/1926 WHL
HAV
BLA
TWD
DAR
MID
51A
50B
54C
52A
52G
W
West Hartlepool
Haverton Hill
Blaydon
Tweedmouth
Darlington
Middlesbrough
Darlington
Neville Hill
Borough Gardens
Gateshead
Sunderland
Withdrawn
12/11/1926
07/11/1938
28/03/1943
08/09/1943
23/07/1945
13/06/1948
25/06/1950
03/09/1950
01/07/1951
14/06/1959
01/11/1959
17/04/1961
17/04/1961
J39 1481 4711   64711 17/11/1926 WHL
DAR
BLA
TWD
W
West Hartlepool
Darlington
Blaydon
Tweedmouth
Withdrawn
17/11/1926
28/03/1943
03/08/1943
28/02/1948
23/05/1962
23/05/1962
J39 1484 4712   64712 30/11/1926 IMM
STR
BFD
DON
ARD
MAR
ARD
DON
GOR
40A
40D
40A
40F
40E
W
Immingham
Stratford
Bradford Hammerton Street
Doncaster
Ardsley
March
Ardsley
Doncaster
Gorton
Lincoln
Tuxford
Lincoln
Boston
Colwick
Withdrawn
30/11/1926
13/10/1927
08/08/1933
21/08/1933
17/10/1933
12/02/1936
29/02/1936
19/10/1941
21/08/1943
13/06/1954
26/09/1954
09/01/1955
09/11/1958
01/03/1959
04/02/1960
04/02/1960
J39 1492 4713   64713 02/12/1926 IMM
DON
53A
52C
54C
52B
52A
52F
52G
W
Immingham
Doncaster
Hull Dairycoates
Blaydon
Borough Gardens
Heaton
Gateshead
Blyth (North)
Sunderland
Withdrawn
02/12/1926
28/02/1940
02/09/1951
30/11/1952
04/01/1953
16/06/1957
14/06/1959
15/01/1961
11/06/1961
18/04/1962
18/04/1962
J39 1493 4714 4714 64714 03/12/1926 IMM
GOR
LIN
ARD
DON
NWE
GOR
LIV
GOR
40A
36E
W
Immingham
Gorton
Lincoln
Ardsley
Doncaster
New England
Gorton
Brunswick
Gorton
Lincoln
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
03/12/1926
13/02/1931
10/06/1931
06/07/1939
19/10/1941
16/04/1942
10/06/1943
06/04/1947
13/05/1948
13/06/1954
04/01/1959
22/05/1959
22/05/1959
J39 1494 4715   64715 10/12/1926 IMM
LIN
IMM
LIN
IMM
LIN
38A
W
Immingham
Lincoln
Immingham
Lincoln
Immingham
Lincoln
Colwick
Withdrawn
10/12/1926
16/06/1929
29/07/1929
23/01/1944
17/06/1945
23/09/1945
10/07/1955
06/05/1959
06/05/1959
J39 1495 4716   64716 14/12/1926 IMM
LIN
IMM
MAR
CLK
GOR
ANN
CLK
40F
36A
W
Immingham
Lincoln
Immingham
March
Colwick
Gorton
Annesley
Colwick
Boston
Doncaster
Withdrawn
14/12/1926
16/06/1929
30/10/1929
03/09/1930
05/03/1936
11/04/1936
30/10/1943
30/03/1947
09/11/1958
01/03/1959
05/04/1961
05/04/1961
J39 1270 4717 4717 64717 11/03/1927 NPT
?
NPT
IMM
SHF
GOR
W
Newport (Teeside)
New Holland
Newport (Teeside)
Immingham
Sheffield Neepsend
Gorton
Withdrawn
11/03/1927
13/12/1927
06/02/1928
10/02/1928
18/03/1939
05/04/1941
02/08/1960
02/08/1960
J39 1496 4718 47l8 64718 12/04/1927 GOR
MAR
ARD
GOR
TFD
GOR
BRN
GOR
W
Gorton
March
Ardsley
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Barnsley
Gorton
Withdrawn
12/04/1927
02/07/1930
08/08/1930
13/08/1930
04/02/1938
13/01/1940
20/10/1946
27/04/1947
10/02/1962
10/02/1962
J39 1497 4719   64719 14/04/1927 GOR
LIV
GOR
LIV
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
ANN
CLK
35C
41A
51F
56B
W
Gorton
Brunswick
Gorton
Brunswick
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Annesley
Colwick
Spital Bridge
Sheffield Darnall
West Auckland
Ardsley
Withdrawn
14/04/1927
23/04/1927
20/05/1929
29/11/1929
30/03/1931
03/03/1937
05/01/1938
27/10/1939
16/11/1941
30/10/1943
30/03/1947
05/10/1952
07/12/1958
11/09/1960
17/06/1962
23/11/1962
23/11/1962
J39 1498 4720   64720 28/04/1927 GOR
MAR
ARD
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
ANN
CLK
37A
W
Gorton
March
Ardsley
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Annesley
Colwick
Ardsley
Withdrawn
28/04/1927
02/07/1930
06/08/1930
19/08/1930
05/01/1938
03/06/1938
11/10/1938
29/08/1939
30/10/1943
30/03/1947
20/05/1951
08/09/1961
08/09/1961
J39 1233 4721   64721 03/05/1927 GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
DON
W
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Doncaster
Withdrawn
03/05/1927
16/10/1933
16/08/1935
03/06/1938
27/10/1939
02/05/1945
15/02/1960
15/02/1960
J39 1255 4722   64722 10/05/1927 GOR
LIV
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
LIN
36A
W
Gorton
Brunswick
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Lincoln
Doncaster
Withdrawn
10/05/1927
20/05/1929
29/11/1929
01/09/1936
01/07/1937
26/02/1938
27/09/1938
16/09/1945
04/01/1959
15/02/1960
15/02/1960
J39 1263 4723 4723 64723 10/05/1927 GOR
TFD
38A
9F
38A
35C
40A
36A
W
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Colwick
Heaton Mersey
Colwick
Spital Bridge
Lincoln
Doncaster
Withdrawn
10/05/1927
16/11/1941
11/03/1951
05/08/1951
12/10/1952
13/10/1952
07/12/1958
01/03/1959
24/03/1961
24/03/1961
J39 1259 4724   64724 10/05/1927 ARD
MAR
CAR
MAR
CAM
MAR
NOR
IPS
32A
32C
32A
32B
W
Ardsley
March
Carlisle Canal
March
Cambridge
March
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
Lowestoft
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Withdrawn
10/05/1927
19/03/1936
08/06/1938
05/09/1938
12/12/1940
09/03/1941
29/08/1943
07/11/1943
30/04/1950
18/10/1953
24/01/1954
09/10/1955
08/02/1960
08/02/1960
J39 1265 4725   64725 13/05/1927 IMM
STR
BFD
DON
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
SHF
LIN
53A
50C
50B
50C
50A
51L
W
Immingham
Stratford
Bradford Hammerton Street
Doncaster
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Lincoln
Hull Dairycoates
Selby
Neville Hill
Selby
York (North)
Thornaby
Withdrawn
13/05/1927
13/10/1927
07/08/1933
01/09/1933
26/09/1933
16/10/1933
13/12/1942
30/09/1945
17/10/1947
25/09/1949
02/09/1951
10/10/1954
15/09/1957
26/07/1959
13/09/1959
13/12/1959
22/10/1961
22/10/1961
J39 1266 4726   64726 18/05/1927 IMM
STR
?
STR
IPS
MAR
NOR
IPS
LOW
NOR
32B
32G
32C
40A
W
Immingham
Stratford
Southend on Sea
Stratford
Ipswich
March
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Lowestoft
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Melton Constable
Lowestoft
Lincoln
Withdrawn
18/05/1927
14/10/1927
15/03/1930
26/04/1930
24/10/1941
31/12/1941
16/07/1943
24/10/1943
30/04/1946
26/03/1947
09/05/1954
15/06/1958
19/10/1958
30/11/1958
22/11/1960
22/11/1960
J39 1267 4727   64727 20/05/1927 IMM
STR
MAR
STR
PKS
STR
PKS
GOR
TFD
12B
9G
2F
W
Immingham
Stratford
March
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Carlisle Canal
Gorton
Woodford Halse
Withdrawn
20/05/1927
14/10/1927
28/02/1940
09/06/1943
19/01/1946
08/06/1946
25/09/1947
16/10/1949
18/10/1949
07/01/1951
08/11/1958
30/07/1962
27/10/1962
27/10/1962
J39 1272 4728   64728 25/05/1927 IMM
ARD
IMM
LIN
GOR
LIN
40F
W
Immingham
Ardsley
Immingham
Lincoln
Gorton
Lincoln
Boston
Withdrawn
25/05/1927
04/07/1929
19/08/1929
26/07/1930
20/02/1935
16/09/1945
09/11/1958
22/02/1960
22/02/1960
J39 1273 4729   64729 28/05/1927 IMM
LIN
CLK
DAR
CLK
NWE
38A
37A
40D
30A
31A
31B
40A
40E
40F
W
Immingham
Lincoln
Colwick
Darlington
Colwick
New England
Colwick
Ardsley
Tuxford
Stratford
Cambridge
March
Lincoln
Colwick
Boston
Withdrawn
28/05/1927
26/07/1930
19/12/1938
06/11/1943
05/04/1945
18/08/1946
19/03/1950
01/04/1951
27/09/1953
16/01/1955
15/05/1955
28/09/1958
07/12/1958
08/01/1959
25/01/1959
14/03/1961
14/03/1961
J39 1268 4730   64730 28/05/1927 IMM
STR
CLK
NOR
STR
PKS
40A
53A
50B
50C
50B
51L
W
Immingham
Stratford
Colwick
Norwich Thorpe
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Lincoln
Hull Dairycoates
Neville Hill
Selby
Neville Hill
Thornaby
Withdrawn
28/05/1927
14/10/1927
05/06/1943
14/01/1946
02/07/1947
16/01/1949
04/06/1950
02/09/1951
17/11/1951
26/09/1954
15/09/1957
01/11/1959
16/11/1962
16/11/1962
J39 1269 4731 4731 64731 30/05/1927 IMM
STR
MAR
STR
NOR
W
Immingham
Stratford
March
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
30/05/1927
08/10/1927
28/02/1940
27/05/1943
14/01/1946
27/07/1959
27/07/1959
J39 1274 4732   64732 30/05/1927 IMM
GOR
TFD
GOR
13D
SHF
BRN
CLK
14A
30A
14A
37A
W
Immingham
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Northwich
Sheffield Darnall
Barnsley
Colwick
Cricklewood East
Stratford
Cricklewood East
Ardsley
Withdrawn
30/05/1927
17/02/1928
27/09/1938
17/02/1939
05/12/1943
01/01/1944
27/10/1946
27/04/1947
15/12/1949
11/03/1951
01/04/1951
16/03/1952
25/08/1961
25/08/1961
J39 1277 4733   64733 08/06/1927 IMM
DON
IMM
SHF
RET
SHF
RET
DON
STR
PKS
STR
GOR
TFD
9F
12B
W
Immingham
Doncaster
Immingham
Sheffield Neepsend
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Sheffield Neepsend
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Doncaster
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Heaton Mersey
Carlisle Canal
Withdrawn
08/06/1927
05/08/1932
09/09/1932
27/11/1934
06/12/1934
14/04/1936
01/09/1936
23/08/1939
04/07/1940
19/01/1946
08/06/1946
12/10/1949
16/10/1949
22/05/1950
07/01/1951
19/10/1961
19/10/1961
J39 1275 4734   64734 09/06/1927 IMM
LIN
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
LIN
IMM
LIN
40D
40A
W
Immingham
Lincoln
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Lincoln
Immingham
Lincoln
Tuxford
Lincoln
Withdrawn
09/06/1927
19/06/1929
19/02/1935
26/05/1936
14/06/1937
26/09/1938
30/11/1939
16/09/1945
22/12/1946
27/04/1947
06/12/1953
14/02/1954
18/05/1959
18/05/1959
J39 1281 4735   64735 10/06/1927 IMM
LIN
CLK
GOR
TFD
GOR
BRN
CLK
40D
38A
W
Immingham
Lincoln
Colwick
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Barnsley
Colwick
Tuxford
Colwick
Withdrawn
10/06/1927
14/12/1929
25/09/1935
08/02/1937
29/08/1939
30/04/1941
20/10/1946
27/04/1947
27/09/1953
16/01/1955
03/08/1959
03/08/1959
J39 1282 4736   64736 16/06/1927 IMM
LIN
35C
41A
40E
W
Immingham
Lincoln
Spital Bridge
Sheffield Darnall
Colwick
Withdrawn
16/06/1927
22/06/1935
10/07/1955
07/12/1958
13/03/1960
10/07/1961
10/07/1961
J39 1286 4737   64737 23/06/1927 COP
ARD
GRA
GOR
LIV
GOR
13D
SHF
DON
W
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Grantham
Gorton
Brunswick
Gorton
Northwich
Sheffield Darnall
Doncaster
Withdrawn
23/06/1927
02/12/1936
12/07/1940
26/03/1941
03/05/1943
05/11/1943
05/12/1943
01/01/1944
22/09/1946
25/08/1959
25/08/1959
J39 1287 4738   64738 23/06/1927 GOR
LEI
ANN
CLK
NWE
40A
39A
35C
35A
39A
39B
39A
W
Gorton
Leicester (G.C.)
Annesley
Colwick
New England
Lincoln
Gorton
Spital Bridge
New England
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Gorton
Withdrawn
23/06/1927
22/07/1927
14/03/1935
09/08/1943
18/08/1946
11/06/1950
11/03/1951
21/06/1953
13/09/1953
27/09/1953
13/06/1954
17/11/1957
26/10/1960
26/10/1960
J39 1289 4739   64739 30/06/1927 DON
ARD
COP
ARD
BFD
ARD
ANN
CLK
GOR
ANN
CLK
38B
W
Doncaster
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Ardsley
Annesley
Colwick
Gorton
Annesley
Colwick
Annesley
Withdrawn
30/06/1927
21/07/1927
22/08/1929
07/10/1929
30/01/1931
10/08/1931
15/11/1934
09/08/1943
03/10/1943
30/10/1943
30/03/1947
03/11/1957
03/11/1962
03/11/1962
J39 1290 4740   64740 16/07/1927 ARD
RET
YK
RET
GOR
TFD
GOR
W
Ardsley
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
York (North)
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Withdrawn
16/07/1927
01/02/1936
19/06/1938
23/08/1938
19/11/1938
21/08/1940
30/09/1945
15/09/1962
15/09/1962
J39 1295 4741   64741 16/07/1927 ARD
STR
CLK
TFD
GOR
LIV
GOR
TFD
GOR
BID
GOR
40A
38A
40F
40A
W
Ardsley
Stratford
Colwick
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Brunswick
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Bidston
Gorton
Lincoln
Colwick
Boston
Lincoln
Withdrawn
16/07/1927
08/10/1927
30/05/1933
10/04/1934
30/12/1935
08/02/1937
05/11/1938
17/02/1939
21/08/1940
03/01/1950
10/01/1950
26/09/1954
10/07/1955
09/11/1958
03/1959
11/07/1960
11/07/1960
J39 1296 4742   64742 31/08/1927 ARD
STR
?
STR
CLK
TFD
GOR
LIV
GOR
2F
W
Ardsley
Stratford
Southend on Sea
Stratford
Colwick
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Brunswick
Gorton
Woodford Halse
Withdrawn
31/08/1927
08/10/1927
25/01/1930
01/02/1930
31/05/1933
28/03/1934
27/05/1936
26/07/1941
05/11/1943
01/06/1960
21/07/1962
21/07/1962
J39 1298 4743   64743 02/09/1927 IMM
GOR
W
Immingham
Gorton
Withdrawn
02/09/1927
20/02/1928
13/01/1961
13/01/1961
J39 2691 4744   64744 20/07/1928 GOR
LIV
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
39B
39A
W
Gorton
Brunswick
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Gorton
Withdrawn
20/07/1928
14/08/1935
08/02/1937
14/06/1937
26/09/1938
13/01/1940
13/04/1947
13/06/1954
17/11/1957
24/03/1962
24/03/1962
J39 2692 4745   64745 18/07/1928 GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
LIV
GOR
W
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Brunswick
Gorton
Withdrawn
18/07/1928
16/08/1935
03/03/1937
01/07/1937
11/10/1938
05/11/1938
26/07/1941
11/11/1961
11/11/1961
J39 2693 4746   64746 20/07/1928 GOR
TFD
GOR
NWE
BOS
GRA
NWE
SHF
40E
W
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
New England
Boston
Grantham
New England
Sheffield Darnall
Colwick
Withdrawn
20/07/1928
30/12/1935
26/02/1938
22/09/1938
28/09/1938
16/04/1945
09/02/1947
22/01/1950
13/03/1960
20/02/1961
20/02/1961
J39 2694 4747   64747 01/08/1928 GOR
LIV
GOR
CLK
ANN
CLK
38B
9G
2F
W
Gorton
Brunswick
Gorton
Colwick
Annesley
Colwick
Annesley
Gorton
Woodford Halse
Withdrawn
01/08/1928
05/06/1931
21/06/1933
04/11/1933
02/12/1933
30/03/1947
03/11/1957
28/08/1959
01/06/1960
10/11/1962
10/11/1962
J39 2695 4748   64748 06/08/1928 GOR
LIV
GOR
NWE
BOS
NWE
GOR
W
Gorton
Brunswick
Gorton
New England
Boston
New England
Gorton
Withdrawn
06/08/1928
21/06/1933
14/08/1935
23/09/1938
06/10/1938
16/04/1945
11/12/1949
01/07/1961
01/07/1961
J39 2696 4749   64749 08/08/1928 GOR
MAR
CLK
GRA
CLK
BFD
ARD
COP
ARD
W
Gorton
March
Colwick
Grantham
Colwick
Bradford Hammerton Street
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Withdrawn
08/08/1928
02/09/1930
29/02/1936
17/03/1942
13/05/1942
18/08/1946
16/11/1947
30/11/1947
02/05/1948
12/11/1962
12/11/1962
J39 2697 4750 4750 64750 09/08/1928 ARD
GRA
GOR
ANN
CLK
40D
30A
W
Ardsley
Grantham
Gorton
Annesley
Colwick
Tuxford
Stratford
Withdrawn
09/08/1928
12/07/1940
25/03/1941
30/10/1943
30/03/1947
27/09/1953
16/01/1955
13/11/1959
13/11/1959
J39 2698 4751   64751 14/08/1928 ARD
BFD
ARD
40D
30A
31A
31B
40A
W
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Ardsley
Tuxford
Stratford
Cambridge
March
Lincoln
Withdrawn
14/08/1928
31/05/1933
31/07/1933
27/09/1953
16/01/1955
15/05/1955
28/08/1958
07/12/1958
07/12/1959
07/12/1959
J39 2699 4752 4752 64752 15/08/1928 BFD
ARD
IPS
W
Bradford Hammerton Street
Ardsley
Ipswich
Withdrawn
15/08/1928
09/02/1936
11/09/1943
01/06/1959
01/06/1959
J39 2700 4753   64753 17/08/1928 ARD
BFD
ARD
SHF
39A
W
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Ardsley
Sheffield Darnall
Gorton
Withdrawn
17/08/1928
15/01/1936
17/02/1936
04/08/1946
27/10/1957
21/08/1959
21/08/1959
J39 2701 4754   64754 25/08/1928 ARD
W
Ardsley
Withdrawn
25/08/1928
12/11/1962
12/11/1962
J39 2702 4755   64755 27/08/1928 DON
MEX
DON
GOR
40A
40F
40A
W
Doncaster
Mexborough
Doncaster
Gorton
Lincoln
Boston
Lincoln
Withdrawn
27/08/1928
19/01/1929
24/01/1929
02/05/1934
13/06/1954
07/12/1958
01/03/1959
10/08/1959
10/08/1959
J39 2703 4756 4756 64756 31/08/1928 DON
LIN
GOR
LIV
GOR
LIN
STR
PKS
STR
COL
STR
DAR
MID
51A
51F
51D
51F
51D
51F
56B
W
Doncaster
Lincoln
Gorton
Brunswick
Gorton
Lincoln
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Darlington
Middlesbrough
Darlington
West Auckland
Middlesbrough
West Auckland
Middlesbrough
West Auckland
Ardsley
Withdrawn
31/08/1928
06/12/1929
14/02/1931
30/03/1931
04/06/1931
12/06/1931
11/10/1935
21/08/1938
26/03/1939
25/09/1939
03/12/1939
07/01/1945
27/06/1948
25/06/1950
30/07/1950
29/08/1954
06/03/1955
03/04/1955
26/06/1955
17/06/1962
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 2704 4757   64757 04/09/1928 DON
IMM
DON
CLK
ANN
LEI
ANN
CLK
37A
51L
W
Doncaster
Immingham
Doncaster
Colwick
Annesley
Leicester (G.C.)
Annesley
Colwick
Ardsley
Thornaby
Withdrawn
04/09/1928
10/07/1929
21/09/1929
20/09/1930
03/10/1930
13/03/1932
04/04/1932
30/03/1947
20/05/1951
16/10/1960
26/11/1962
26/11/1962
J39 2705 4758   64758 07/09/1928 DON
MEX
DON
GOR
DON
GOR
DON
51A
50B
51L
W
Doncaster
Mexborough
Doncaster
Gorton
Doncaster
Gorton
Doncaster
Darlington
Neville Hill
Thornaby
Withdrawn
07/09/1928
15/12/1928
16/04/1929
02/05/1934
04/12/1934
01/06/1944
02/05/1945
02/09/1951
06/07/1952
01/11/1959
16/11/1962
16/11/1962
J39 2706 4759   64759 12/09/1928 DON
ARD
COP
ARD
BFD
DON
RET
W
Doncaster
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Doncaster
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
12/09/1928
15/03/1934
11/04/1934
27/06/1934
26/03/1941
30/07/1945
05/10/1947
15/03/1960
15/03/1960
J39 2707 4760   64760 17/09/1928 DON
GOR
DON
ARD
BFD
ARD
W
Doncaster
Gorton
Doncaster
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Ardsley
Withdrawn
17/09/1928
02/05/1934
02/12/1934
01/07/1939
26/03/1941
11/07/1941
30/11/1962
30/11/1962
J39 2708 4761   64761 19/09/1928 DON
MAR
CAM
MAR
NOR
W
Doncaster
March
Cambridge
March
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
19/09/1928
28/07/1934
12/12/1940
09/03/1941
16/09/1943
06/11/1959
06/11/1959
J39 2709 4762 4762 64762 28/09/1928 GOR
ANN
LIN
ARD
ANN
LIN
ARD
ANN
CLK
W
Gorton
Annesley
Lincoln
Ardsley
Annesley
Lincoln
Ardsley
Annesley
Colwick
Withdrawn
28/09/1928
31/10/1928
24/06/1929
07/08/1929
20/08/1929
20/06/1930
05/08/1930
21/08/1930
30/03/1947
29/06/1959
29/06/1959
J39 2710 4763   64763 28/09/1928 GOR
ANN
LIN
ARD
ANN
LEI
CLK
37A
40D
38A
W
Gorton
Annesley
Lincoln
Ardsley
Annesley
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Ardsley
Tuxford
Colwick
Withdrawn
28/09/1928
10/11/1928
24/06/1929
14/08/1929
19/08/1929
23/08/1929
14/08/1943
20/05/1951
27/09/1953
16/01/1955
29/06/1959
29/06/1959
J39 2711 4764   64764 09/10/1928 YK
STR
30F
30A
31B
W
York (North)
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
09/10/1928
03/12/1928
28/10/1956
13/04/1958
25/05/1958
19/10/1960
19/10/1960
J39 2712 4765   64765 12/10/1928 YK
STR
PKS
STR
35C
30A
W
York (North)
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Spital Bridge
Stratford
Withdrawn
12/10/1928
22/11/1928
25/09/1947
16/01/1949
21/06/1953
30/08/1953
17/08/1960
17/08/1960
J39 2713 4766   64766 22/11/1928 YK
STR
ARD
STR
W
York (North)
Stratford
Ardsley
Stratford
Withdrawn
22/11/1928
03/12/1928
15/05/1949
18/09/1949
28/09/1959
28/09/1959
J39 2714 4767 4767 64767 22/11/1928 STR
YK
STR
COL
STR
PKS
STR
ARD
STR
32B
W
Stratford
York (North)
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Ardsley
Stratford
Ipswich
Withdrawn
14/01/1905
22/11/1928
03/12/1928
25/09/1939
03/12/1939
02/11/1941
16/11/1941
15/05/1949
28/09/1949
15/10/1950
13/01/1961
13/01/1961
J39 2715 4768   64768 26/11/1928 YK
STR
ARD
STR
W
York (North)
Stratford
Ardsley
Stratford
Withdrawn
26/11/1928
05/12/1928
15/05/1949
18/09/1949
18/05/1959
18/05/1959
J39 2716 4769   64769 27/11/1928 YK
STR
COL
STR
31B
W
York (North)
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
27/11/1928
07/12/1928
20/07/1941
03/08/1941
23/03/1958
21/01/1960
21/01/1960
J39 2717 4770   64770 29/11/1928 YK
STR
30F
30A
30F
31B
W
York (North)
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
March
Withdrawn
29/11/1928
18/01/1929
18/06/1950
24/06/1951
08/07/1951
23/03/1958
19/10/1960
19/10/1960
J39 2718 4771   64771 30/11/1928 STR
YK
STR
PKS
STR
32B
32A
30F
31B
W
Stratford
York (North)
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
Parkeston Quay
March
Withdrawn
15/04/1905
30/11/1928
07/12/1928
13/04/1941
19/01/1946
15/10/1950
14/01/1951
28/10/1956
20/04/1958
01/02/1960
01/02/1960
J39 2719 4772   64772 04/12/1928 STR
YK
PKS
COL
STR
COL
STR
31B
W
Stratford
York (North)
Parkeston Quay
Colchester
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
01/12/1928
04/12/1928
26/01/1929
30/07/1936
25/09/1939
03/12/1939
02/11/1941
23/03/1958
03/07/1961
03/07/1961
J39 2720 4773 4773 64773 06/12/1928 YK
STR
PKS
COL
STR
COL
STR
COL
STR
32B
30A
30F
30A
W
York (North)
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Colchester
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Withdrawn
06/12/1928
14/12/1928
25/01/1929
05/11/1935
25/09/1939
03/12/1939
20/07/1941
03/08/1941
19/01/1946
22/10/1950
19/01/1951
12/08/1951
13/04/1958
25/08/1959
25/08/1959
J39 2721 4774   64774 26/03/1929 YK
PKS
STR
PKS
STR
31B
W
York (North)
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
26/03/1929
09/04/1929
25/09/1939
24/06/1944
23/06/1945
23/03/1958
15/03/1960
15/03/1960
J39 2722 4775   64775 08/04/1929 YK
IPS
PKS
COL
STR
W
York (North)
Ipswich
Parkeston Quay
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
08/04/1929
18/04/1929
25/04/1929
03/04/1934
25/09/1939
26/08/1960
26/08/1960
J39 2723 4776   64776 10/04/1929 YK
IPS
PKS
COL
PKS
STR
PKS
STR
30F
W
York (North)
Ipswich
Parkeston Quay
Colchester
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Withdrawn
10/04/1929
18/04/1929
31/05/1929
26/01/1935
02/03/1935
25/09/1939
08/09/1940
19/01/1946
28/10/1956
17/08/1959
17/08/1959
J39 2724 4777   64777 15/04/1929 YK
IPS
PKS
COL
STR
30F
30A
W
York (North)
Ipswich
Parkeston Quay
Colchester
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Withdrawn
15/04/1929
20/04/1929
30/05/1929
26/03/1934
03/12/1939
18/06/1950
08/11/1959
04/01/1960
04/01/1960
J39 2725 4778   64778 22/04/1929 YK
STR
?
STR
DAR
AUK
41A
W
York (North)
Stratford
Southend on Sea
Stratford
Darlington
West Auckland
Sheffield Darnall
Withdrawn
22/04/1929
02/05/1929
02/08/1930
09/08/1930
14/12/1935
04/01/1948
11/09/1960
12/09/1960
12/09/1960
J39 2726 4779   64779 24/04/1929 YK
STR
PKS
STR
30F
30A
31B
W
York (North)
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
24/04/1929
01/05/1929
08/09/1940
13/04/1941
04/06/1950
08/07/1951
25/05/1958
20/09/1961
20/09/1961
J39 2727 4780   64780 30/04/1929 YK
STR
30F
30A
W
York (North)
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Withdrawn
30/04/1929
10/05/1929
04/06/1950
18/06/1950
04/01/1960
04/01/1960
J39 2728 4781   64781 10/05/1929 YK
STR
?
STR
?
STR
PKS
STR
30F
30A
W
York (North)
Stratford
Southend on Sea
Stratford
Southend on Sea
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Withdrawn
10/05/1929
15/06/1929
14/12/1929
12/04/1930
19/04/1930
09/08/1930
08/09/1940
23/06/1945
20/05/1951
24/06/1951
07/03/1960
07/03/1960
J39 2729 4782   64782 10/05/1929 YK
STR
31B
W
York (North)
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
10/05/1929
24/05/1929
20/04/1958
15/03/1960
15/03/1960
J39 2730 4783   64783 17/05/1929 YK
STR
?
STR
PKS
STR
30F
30A
35C
30A
W
York (North)
Stratford
Southend on Sea
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Spital Bridge
Stratford
Withdrawn
17/05/1929
24/05/1929
12/04/1930
19/04/1930
08/02/1948
16/01/1949
04/06/1950
18/06/1950
24/07/1955
04/09/1955
02/11/1960
02/11/1960
J39 2731 4784   64784 30/05/1929 STR
YK
EFD
STM
CAR
THJ
DEE
NOR
W
Stratford
York (North)
Eastfield
St Margarets
Carlisle Canal
Thornton Junction
Dundee Tay Bridge
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
14/10/1905
30/05/1929
31/05/1929
17/04/1943
05/03/1945
15/07/1946
04/11/1946
21/09/1947
20/08/1960
20/08/1960
J39 2732 4785   64785 29/05/1929 YK
EFD
STM
CAR
IPS
W
York (North)
Eastfield
St Margarets
Carlisle Canal
Ipswich
Withdrawn
29/05/1929
30/05/1929
17/04/1943
20/08/1945
28/03/1947
12/06/1959
12/06/1959
J39 2733 4786   64786 06/06/1929 PKD
EFD
STM
CAR
DEE
W
Parkhead
Eastfield
St Margarets
Carlisle Canal
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
06/06/1929
30/10/1931
17/04/1943
20/08/1945
18/06/1947
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
J39 2734 4787   64787 11/06/1929 PKD
EFD
DEE
CAR
PKS
STR
PKS
37A
30F
30A
W
Parkhead
Eastfield
Dundee Tay Bridge
Carlisle Canal
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Ardsley
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Withdrawn
11/06/1929
30/10/1931
07/11/1933
15/07/1946
20/03/1947
10/05/1947
16/01/1949
20/05/1951
24/06/1951
09/03/1958
01/06/1959
01/06/1959
J39 2735 4788   64788 14/06/1929 STM
TWD
MAL
SBK
YK
SEL
CAR
STR
PKS
30A
W
St Margarets
Tweedmouth
Malton
Starbeck
York (North)
Selby
Carlisle Canal
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Withdrawn
14/06/1929
19/03/1939
01/07/1939
29/09/1939
22/11/1939
29/02/1940
01/10/1940
07/03/1947
10/05/1947
09/03/1958
22/06/1959
22/06/1959
J39 2736 4789   64789 20/06/1929 STM
TWD
CON
CAR
STR
PKS
40A
35C
31B
W
St Margarets
Tweedmouth
Consett
Carlisle Canal
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Lincoln
Spital Bridge
March
Withdrawn
20/06/1929
19/03/1939
08/07/1939
19/10/1940
22/04/1947
08/02/1948
04/06/1950
12/10/1952
31/01/1960
11/07/1960
11/07/1960
J39 2737 4790   64790 26/06/1929 STM
CAR
DEE
62A
W
St Margarets
Carlisle Canal
Dundee Tay Bridge
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
26/06/1929
20/08/1945
28/09/1947
17/08/1959
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
J39 2738 4791   64791 03/07/1929 EFD
DAR
SALT
DAR
NEV
56G
56F
W
Eastfield
Darlington
Saltburn
Darlington
Neville Hill
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Withdrawn
03/07/1929
18/08/1943
30/12/1946
10/01/1947
29/01/1950
15/09/1957
12/01/1958
26/11/1962
26/11/1962
J39 2739 4792   64792 03/07/1929 CAR
STM
POL
DEE
62A
W
Carlisle Canal
St Margarets
Polmont
Dundee Tay Bridge
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
03/07/1929
01/1935
08/1940
18/08/1943
17/08/1959
04/01/1962
04/01/1962
J39 2740 4793   64793 09/07/1929 CAR
EFD
CAR
IPS
W
Carlisle Canal
Eastfield
Carlisle Canal
Ipswich
Withdrawn
09/07/1929
11/11/1931
01/02/1933
01/05/1947
26/11/1959
26/11/1959
J39 2741 4794   64794 12/07/1929 DEE
ABD
64A
64F
64A
64C
62A
W
Dundee Tay Bridge
Aberdeen Ferryhill
St Margarets
Bathgate
St Margarets
Dalry Road
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
12/07/1929
01/08/1929
18/12/1949
10/05/1953
31/01/1954
11/08/1958
18/12/1961
13/08/1962
13/08/1962
J39 2742 4795   64795 31/07/1929 ABD
64A
62C
W
Aberdeen Ferryhill
St Margarets
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
31/07/1929
10/03/1959
22/01/1962
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
J39 2770 4796   64796 28/08/1929 YK
IPS
PKS
IPS
PKS
ARD
56G
56F
56B
W
York (North)
Ipswich
Parkeston Quay
Ipswich
Parkeston Quay
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Ardsley
Withdrawn
28/08/1929
07/09/1929
21/09/1929
07/01/1935
09/02/1935
01/02/1936
16/06/1957
12/01/1958
14/06/1959
13/12/1962
13/12/1962
J39 2771 4797   64797 04/09/1929 YK
IPS
PKS
MAR
STR
PKS
STR
IPS
NOR
32C
32A
32C
32A
32C
W
York (North)
Ipswich
Parkeston Quay
March
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
Lowestoft
Norwich Thorpe
Lowestoft
Norwich Thorpe
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
04/09/1929
07/09/1929
26/01/1935
02/03/1936
25/05/1943
24/06/1944
23/06/1945
07/04/1946
19/05/1946
21/10/1951
10/02/1952
28/09/1952
28/12/1952
29/09/1957
28/09/1959
28/09/1959
J39 2772 4798   64798 11/09/1929 YK
IPS
STR
PKS
STR
MAR
STR
NOR
YAR
NOR
YAR
NOR
38E
38A
38B
W
York (North)
Ipswich
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
March
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
Woodford Halse
Colwick
Annesley
Withdrawn
11/09/1929
18/09/1929
09/05/1932
21/08/1938
26/03/1939
20/10/1939
28/05/1943
13/09/1944
09/10/1946
10/12/1946
12/10/1947
12/11/1947
16/04/1950
08/10/1950
03/11/1957
15/09/1962
15/09/1962
J39 2773 4799   64799 30/09/1929 YK
STR
NOR
YAR
NOR
37A
40D
30A
35A
30A
W
York (North)
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
Ardsley
Tuxford
Stratford
New England
Stratford
Withdrawn
30/09/1929
09/10/1929
15/04/1946
12/11/1947
04/01/1948
30/04/1950
27/09/1953
16/01/1955
28/10/1956
17/03/1957
27/07/1959
27/07/1959
J39 2774 4800   64800 20/09/1929 YK
STR
MAR
NOR
IPS
31B
W
York (North)
Stratford
March
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
March
Withdrawn
20/09/1929
28/09/1929
16/10/1939
12/09/1943
07/11/1943
25/10/1959
21/01/1960
21/01/1960
J39 2775 4801   64801 30/09/1929 YK
STR
MAR
STR
ARD
37C
56F
W
York (North)
Stratford
March
Stratford
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Withdrawn
30/09/1929
11/10/1929
16/10/1939
03/06/1943
30/09/1943
27/05/1956
12/01/1958
26/11/1962
26/11/1962
J39 2776 4802 4802 64802 07/10/1929 YK
STR
NOR
32F
32A
32G
32A
40A
40E
W
York (North)
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth Beach
Norwich Thorpe
Melton Constable
Norwich Thorpe
Lincoln
Colwick
Withdrawn
07/10/1929
15/10/1929
29/09/1944
24/06/1956
26/08/1956
06/01/1957
13/10/1957
30/11/1958
04/01/1959
25/07/1960
25/07/1960
J39 2777 4803 4803 64803 16/10/1929 YK
STR
?
STR
?
STR
COL
STR
NOR
IPS
30A
31A
W
York (North)
Stratford
Southend on Sea
Stratford
Southend on Sea
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Stratford
Cambridge
Withdrawn
16/10/1929
21/10/1929
18/01/1930
25/01/1930
01/02/1930
08/02/1930
25/09/1939
03/12/1939
22/09/1944
29/07/1946
14/10/1951
15/05/1955
28/09/1959
28/09/1959
J39 2778 4804   64804 18/10/1929 YK
STR
PKS
40A
30A
31B
41A
40E
W
York (North)
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Lincoln
Stratford
March
Sheffield Darnall
Colwick
Withdrawn
18/10/1929
28/10/1929
13/11/1943
04/06/1950
10/11/1957
26/11/1958
07/12/1958
13/03/1960
19/04/1961
19/04/1961
J39 2779 4805   64805 25/10/1929 YK
ANN
CLK
ANN
CLK
GOR
BID
GOR
38A
40D
30A
35A
30A
W
York (North)
Annesley
Colwick
Annesley
Colwick
Gorton
Bidston
Gorton
Colwick
Tuxford
Stratford
New England
Stratford
Withdrawn
25/10/1929
31/10/1929
04/11/1933
02/12/1933
30/03/1947
11/12/1949
25/12/1949
01/01/1950
14/05/1950
27/09/1953
16/01/1955
28/10/1956
17/03/1957
05/10/1959
05/10/1959
J39 2780 4806   64806 04/11/1929 YK
CLK
ANN
LIN
ARD
ANN
CLK
DAR
CLK
ARD
52B
52G
W
York (North)
Colwick
Annesley
Lincoln
Ardsley
Annesley
Colwick
Darlington
Colwick
Ardsley
Heaton
Sunderland
Withdrawn
04/11/1929
08/11/1929
15/11/1929
20/06/1930
04/08/1930
19/08/1930
09/08/1943
26/10/1943
16/02/1945
18/08/1946
13/12/1959
14/01/1962
17/05/1962
17/05/1962
J39 2781 4807   64807 07/11/1929 YK
CLK
ANN
CLK
GOR
38A
40D
30A
41A
W
York (North)
Colwick
Annesley
Colwick
Gorton
Colwick
Tuxford
Stratford
Sheffield Darnall
Withdrawn
07/11/1929
15/11/1929
19/11/1929
09/08/1943
03/10/1943
14/05/1950
27/09/1953
16/01/1955
07/12/1958
05/04/1960
05/04/1960
J39 2782 4808   64808 12/11/1929 YK
SHF
STV
SHF
W
York (North)
Sheffield Neepsend
Staveley (G.C.)
Sheffield Neepsend
Withdrawn
12/11/1929
16/11/1929
16/12/1937
29/07/1938
21/02/1961
21/02/1961
J39 2783 4809   64809 18/11/1929 YK
SHF
RET
SHF
YK
SHF
39A
2F
W
York (North)
Sheffield Neepsend
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Sheffield Neepsend
York (North)
Sheffield Neepsend
Gorton
Woodford Halse
Withdrawn
18/11/1929
21/11/1929
14/04/1936
06/07/1936
19/06/1938
12/08/1938
27/10/1957
01/06/1960
27/01/1962
27/01/1962
J39 2784 4810   64810 26/11/1929 YK
SHF
RET
SHF
BRN
GOR
39B
30A
30F
36A
36E
W
York (North)
Sheffield Neepsend
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Sheffield Neepsend
Barnsley
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Doncaster
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
26/11/1929
05/12/1929
17/06/1936
01/09/1936
24/10/1946
28/05/1947
29/08/1954
17/10/1954
20/03/1955
27/11/1955
25/09/1960
26/06/1961
26/06/1961
J39 2785 4811   64811 29/11/1929 YK
SHF
ARD
CLK
ARD
W
York (North)
Sheffield Neepsend
Ardsley
Colwick
Ardsley
Withdrawn
29/11/1929
10/12/1929
14/03/1934
12/02/1936
18/08/1946
30/03/1962
30/03/1962
J39 1418 4812   64812 11/12/1929 BLA
DAR
BLA
HLD
BLA
52c
52C
52A
52H
52G
W
Blaydon
Darlington
Blaydon
Hull Dairycoates
Blaydon
Alston
Blaydon
Gateshead
Tyne Dock
Sunderland
Withdrawn
11/12/1929
23/07/1945
29/08/1948
04/09/1949
02/10/1949
04/01/1953
07/06/1953
14/06/1959
26/02/1961
20/08/1961
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1425 4813   64813 19/12/1929 BLA
TWD
W
Blaydon
Tweedmouth
Withdrawn
19/12/1929
28/02/1948
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1466 4814   64814 03/01/1930 BLA
52A
52F
52B
52F
52d
W
Blaydon
Gateshead
Blyth (North)
Heaton
Blyth (North)
Alnmouth
Withdrawn
03/01/1930
14/06/1959
15/01/1961
30/07/1961
08/10/1961
08/04/1962
23/11/1962
23/11/1962
J39 1429 4815   64815 08/01/1930 BLA
Twd
BLA
Twd
52C
51C
W
Blaydon
Alnmouth
Blaydon
Alnmouth
Blaydon
West Hartlepool
Withdrawn
08/01/1930
22/03/1945
29/09/1946
13/04/1947
11/11/1956
09/10/1960
12/08/1961
12/08/1961
J39 1470 4816   64816 13/01/1930 YK
HLD
DAR
SKN
BLA
52B
W
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
Darlington
Stockton
Blaydon
Heaton
Withdrawn
13/01/1930
28/10/1937
20/11/1940
30/12/1940
23/06/1943
15/01/1961
13/12/1961
13/12/1961
J39 1487 4817   64817 18/01/1930 YK
HLD
SKN
BLA
HTN
51A
51D
51C
51J
51F
54A
56F
W
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
Stockton
Blaydon
Heaton
Darlington
Middlesbrough
West Hartlepool
Northallerton
West Auckland
Sunderland
Low Moor
Withdrawn
18/01/1930
22/10/1937
28/03/1943
21/06/1943
07/11/1948
19/11/1950
07/01/1951
14/09/1952
19/09/1954
06/03/1955
25/09/1955
25/01/1959
29/03/1962
29/03/1962
J39 1489 4818   64818 30/01/1930 NPT
DAR
SBK
50C
50A
51L
51F
56B
W
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
Starbeck
Selby
York (North)
Thornaby
West Auckland
Ardsley
Withdrawn
30/01/1930
28/03/1943
14/07/1943
14/06/1959
13/09/1959
22/11/1959
24/12/1961
17/06/1962
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1491 4819   64819 31/01/1930 NPT
DAR
MID
51A
50B
53A
W
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
Middlesbrough
Darlington
Neville Hill
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
31/01/1930
28/03/1943
13/06/1948
25/06/1950
27/08/1950
13/06/1954
12/09/1962
12/09/1962
J39 2786 4820   64820 13/02/1930 HTN
DEE
IPS
37A
W
Heaton
Dundee Tay Bridge
Ipswich
Ardsley
Withdrawn
13/02/1930
17/02/1930
15/06/1947
21/01/1951
24/05/1962
24/05/1962
J39 2787 4821   64821 17/02/1930 HTN
EFD
DAR
MID
50D
50A
51L
W
Heaton
Eastfield
Darlington
Middlesbrough
Starbeck
York (North)
Thornaby
Withdrawn
17/02/1930
27/02/1930
23/09/1943
15/01/1950
27/09/1953
13/09/1959
13/12/1959
16/11/1962
16/11/1962
J39 2788 4822   64822 24/02/1930 EFD
DAR
STM
DEE
W
Eastfield
Darlington
St Margarets
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
24/02/1930
11/07/1943
25/11/1943
30/04/1947
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
J39 2962 4823   64823 18/09/1931 GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
38A
40F
40E
W
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Colwick
Boston
Colwick
Withdrawn
18/09/1931
02/09/1936
24/02/1939
30/11/1939
11/03/1951
09/11/1958
08/11/1959
05/01/1961
05/01/1961
J39 2963 4824   64824 16/09/1931 GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
39B
39A
W
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Gorton
Withdrawn
16/09/1931
15/09/1936
04/02/1938
24/02/1939
13/04/1947
08/04/1951
27/10/1957
29/03/1960
29/03/1960
J39 2964 4825   64825 29/09/1931 PKS
ARD
52G
W
Parkeston Quay
Ardsley
Sunderland
Withdrawn
29/09/1931
07/02/1936
13/12/1959
02/11/1961
02/11/1961
J39 2965 4826   64826 13/10/1931 PKS
STR
IPS
MAR
NOR
IPS
31B
W
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Ipswich
March
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
March
Withdrawn
13/10/1931
18/01/1935
24/10/1941
25/10/1942
16/07/1943
26/04/1946
25/10/1959
08/02/1960
08/02/1960
J39 2966 4827   64827 09/12/1931 LIN
IMM
LIN
IMM
CLK
36A
W
Lincoln
Immingham
Lincoln
Immingham
Colwick
Doncaster
Withdrawn
09/12/1931
17/06/1945
09/12/1945
22/12/1946
27/04/1947
01/03/1959
01/02/1960
01/02/1960
J39 2967 4828   64828 29/10/1931 IMM
LIN
IMM
CLK
40D
30A
36A
36D
41F
W
Immingham
Lincoln
Immingham
Colwick
Tuxford
Stratford
Doncaster
Barnsley
Mexborough
Withdrawn
29/10/1931
06/11/1931
22/12/1946
27/04/1947
27/09/1953
16/01/1955
20/03/1955
02/06/1957
03/01/1960
21/03/1960
21/03/1960
J39 2968 4829   64829 24/11/1931 MAR
NOR
IPS
W
March
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Withdrawn
24/11/1931
06/10/1943
26/04/1946
18/05/1959
18/05/1959
J39 2969 4830   64830 16/12/1931 MAR
DON
STR
IPS
MAR
NWE
GRA
RET
W
March
Doncaster
Stratford
Ipswich
March
New England
Grantham
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
16/12/1931
07/08/1934
15/10/1934
24/10/1941
04/01/1942
04/07/1943
31/12/1945
28/09/1946
08/02/1960
08/02/1960
J39 2970 4831   64831 24/12/1931 MAR
DON
CLK
GRA
CLK
37A
53A
W
March
Doncaster
Colwick
Grantham
Colwick
Ardsley
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
24/12/1931
20/05/1937
04/06/1937
22/08/1940
06/09/1940
01/04/1951
10/05/1959
20/06/1961
20/06/1961
J39 2971 4832   64832 22/01/1932 MAR
CLK
LEI
CLK
W
March
Colwick
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Withdrawn
22/01/1932
28/04/1936
05/05/1938
14/09/1940
28/09/1959
28/09/1959
J39 2972 4833   64833 29/01/1932 MAR
NOR
YAR
NOR
37A
35C
35A
37A
53A
52G
W
March
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
Ardsley
Spital Bridge
New England
Ardsley
Hull Dairycoates
Sunderland
Withdrawn
29/01/1932
16/09/1943
08/10/1946
27/12/1946
21/01/1951
21/06/1953
13/09/1953
27/09/1953
10/05/1959
13/12/1959
26/11/1962
26/11/1962
J39 2973 4834   64834 17/02/1932 SHF
ARD
BFD
ARD
STR
IPS
NOR
IPS
W
Sheffield Neepsend
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Ardsley
Stratford
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Withdrawn
17/02/1932
02/05/1934
05/05/1934
02/02/1941
09/09/1943
12/09/1943
19/06/1949
19/10/1949
20/11/1959
20/11/1959
J39 2974 4835   64835 19/02/1932 SHF
BFD
DON
50B
51L
51F
W
Sheffield Neepsend
Bradford Hammerton Street
Doncaster
Neville Hill
Thornaby
West Auckland
Withdrawn
19/02/1932
18/04/1934
30/07/1945
02/09/1951
13/12/1959
11/09/1960
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 2975 4836   64836 10/03/1932 ANN
LEI
ANN
CLK
ARD
W
Annesley
Leicester (G.C.)
Annesley
Colwick
Ardsley
Withdrawn
10/03/1932
04/04/1932
02/03/1941
09/08/1943
18/08/1946
25/04/1962
25/04/1962
J39 2976 4837   64837 15/03/1932 CLK
GRA
CLK
37A
52B
W
Colwick
Grantham
Colwick
Ardsley
Heaton
Withdrawn
15/03/1932
17/03/1942
14/05/1942
20/05/1951
13/12/1959
17/11/1961
17/11/1961
J39 2977 4838   64838 27/05/1932 EFD
ABD
CAR
IPS
NOR
38E
38A
40D
30A
36A
W
Eastfield
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Carlisle Canal
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
Woodford Halse
Colwick
Tuxford
Stratford
Doncaster
Withdrawn
27/05/1932
13/04/1943
12/12/1943
24/03/1947
20/04/1947
16/04/1950
08/10/1950
27/09/1953
16/01/1955
20/03/1955
26/01/1960
26/01/1960
J39 2978 4839   64839 07/06/1932 EFD
ABD
STR
ARD
W
Eastfield
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Stratford
Ardsley
Withdrawn
07/06/1932
17/04/1943
23/09/1947
18/09/1949
09/10/1961
09/10/1961
J39 2979 4840   64840 15/06/1932 EFD
ABD
DEE
CAR
STR
ARD
W
Eastfield
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Dundee Tay Bridge
Carlisle Canal
Stratford
Ardsley
Withdrawn
15/06/1932
17/04/1943
12/12/1943
15/06/1946
24/09/1947
18/09/1949
27/11/1962
27/11/1962
J39 2980 4841   64841 16/06/1932 EFD
ABD
DEE
CAR
IPS
W
Eastfield
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Dundee Tay Bridge
Carlisle Canal
Ipswich
Withdrawn
16/06/1932
17/04/1943
12/12/1943
15/06/1946
15/04/1947
06/10/1959
06/10/1959
J39 1453 4842   64842 31/08/1932 NEV
HAV
BLA
52B
W
Neville Hill
Haverton Hill
Blaydon
Heaton
Withdrawn
31/08/1932
28/03/1943
19/06/1943
15/01/1961
18/04/1962
18/04/1962
J39 1469 4843   64843 06/10/1932 NEV
HAV
BLA
TWD
52G
W
Neville Hill
Haverton Hill
Blaydon
Tweedmouth
Sunderland
Withdrawn
06/10/1932
28/03/1943
19/06/1943
05/06/1949
20/08/1961
29/03/1962
29/03/1962
J39 1471 4844   64844 13/10/1932 DAR
BLA
TWD
W
Darlington
Blaydon
Tweedmouth
Withdrawn
13/10/1932
26/06/1943
14/08/1949
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1480 4845   64845 09/11/1932 DAR
SBK
50A
51L
W
Darlington
Starbeck
York (North)
Thornaby
Withdrawn
09/11/1932
05/07/1943
13/09/1959
13/12/1959
21/07/1961
21/07/1961
J39 1482 4846   64846 24/05/1933 HTN
DAR
BLA
BOR
52A
52F
52H
52G
W
Heaton
Darlington
Blaydon
Borough Gardens
Gateshead
Blyth (North)
Tyne Dock
Sunderland
Withdrawn
24/05/1933
28/03/1943
23/06/1943
22/01/1950
14/06/1959
15/01/1961
30/07/1961
20/08/1961
16/11/1962
16/11/1962
J39 1483 4847   64847 19/05/1933 HTN
DAR
MID
50D
50C
50A
52G
W
Heaton
Darlington
Middlesbrough
Starbeck
Selby
York (North)
Sunderland
Withdrawn
19/05/1933
28/03/1943
25/07/1948
27/09/1953
14/06/1959
13/09/1959
08/11/1959
16/11/1962
16/11/1962
J39 1412 4848   64848 15/03/1934 NPT
DAR
SBK
DAR
AUK
51D
51F
51D
51F
W
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
Starbeck
Darlington
West Auckland
Middlesbrough
West Auckland
Middlesbrough
West Auckland
Withdrawn
15/03/1934
28/03/1943
08/07/1943
14/01/1946
04/01/1948
29/08/1954
06/03/1955
03/04/1955
26/06/1955
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1463 4849   64849 19/03/1934 NPT
DAR
BLA
52B
52C
51C
W
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
Blaydon
Heaton
Blaydon
West Hartlepool
Withdrawn
19/03/1934
28/03/1943
26/06/1943
30/06/1957
10/11/1957
09/10/1960
16/11/1962
16/11/1962
J39 1467 4850   64850 22/03/1934 NPT
TWD
GHD
DAR
NEV
50C
50B
51L
50F
50B
W
Newport (Teeside)
Tweedmouth
Gateshead
Darlington
Neville Hill
Selby
Neville Hill
Thornaby
Malton
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
22/03/1934
19/06/1939
20/01/1940
28/03/1943
29/01/1950
26/09/1954
07/08/1955
01/11/1959
09/07/1961
25/02/1962
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1468 4851   64851 17/03/1934 NPT
DAR
SKN
BLA
DAR
Bla
54C
52A
52H
52G
W
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
Stockton
Blaydon
Darlington
Alston
Borough Gardens
Gateshead
Tyne Dock
Sunderland
Withdrawn
17/03/1934
05/11/1938
16/07/1940
21/06/1943
23/07/1945
02/01/1949
04/01/1953
14/06/1959
26/02/1961
20/08/1961
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1472 4852   64852 27/03/1934 MID
HAV
BLA
52A
52B
W
Middlesbrough
Haverton Hill
Blaydon
Gateshead
Heaton
Withdrawn
27/03/1934
12/10/1936
19/06/1943
04/03/1951
05/11/1961
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1488 4853   64853 14/12/1934 FER
BLA
GHD
52B
52G
52H
52G
W
Ferryhill (Co. Durham)
Blaydon
Gateshead
Heaton
Sunderland
Tyne Dock
Sunderland
Withdrawn
14/12/1934
24/08/1938
18/09/1949
18/10/1953
13/12/1959
30/07/1961
20/08/1961
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1490 4854   64854 20/12/1934 FER
DAR
SKN
BLA
TWD
54C
52A
52G
W
Ferryhill (Co. Durham)
Darlington
Stockton
Blaydon
Tweedmouth
Borough Gardens
Gateshead
Sunderland
Withdrawn
20/12/1934
07/11/1938
16/07/1940
21/06/1943
17/07/1949
04/01/1953
14/06/1959
11/09/1960
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1475 4855   64855 19/10/1934 NPT
DAR
SBK
50A
51L
52B
W
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
Starbeck
York (North)
Thornaby
Heaton
Withdrawn
19/10/1934
28/03/1943
10/07/1943
13/09/1959
13/12/1959
24/12/1961
20/08/1962
20/08/1962
J39 1476 4856   64856 24/10/1934 NPT
DAR
BLA
HTN
W
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
Blaydon
Heaton
Withdrawn
24/10/1934
28/03/1943
03/08/1943
23/10/1949
15/10/1962
15/10/1962
J39 1477 4857   64857 29/10/1934 NPT
SEL
YK
SEL
SBK
50A
51L
55H
W
Newport (Teeside)
Selby
York (North)
Selby
Starbeck
York (North)
Thornaby
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
29/10/1934
31/07/1939
23/10/1939
27/02/1940
20/07/1940
13/09/1959
22/11/1959
17/06/1962
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1478 4858   64858 14/11/1934 NPT
DAR
BLA
HLD
BLA
52G
W
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
Blaydon
Hull Dairycoates
Blaydon
Sunderland
Withdrawn
14/11/1934
28/03/1943
29/08/1948
04/09/1949
02/10/1949
15/01/1961
29/03/1962
29/03/1962
J39 1479 4859   64859 07/12/1934 NPT
MID
DAR
SBK
50A
51L
51F
56D
56B
W
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Darlington
Starbeck
York (North)
Thornaby
West Auckland
Mirfield
Ardsley
Withdrawn
07/12/1934
23/01/1936
28/03/1943
10/07/1943
13/09/1959
13/12/1959
24/12/1961
15/04/1962
18/11/1962
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1436 4860   64860 31/10/1935 NEV
SBK
50B
50C
52A
W
Neville Hill
Starbeck
Neville Hill
Selby
Gateshead
Withdrawn
31/10/1935
28/03/1943
13/06/1954
07/08/1955
30/08/1959
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1460 4861   64861 04/11/1935 NEV
SBK
SCA
50D
50A
51L
55H
W
Neville Hill
Starbeck
Scarborough
Starbeck
York (North)
Thornaby
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
04/11/1935
21/07/1937
25/09/1949
23/07/1950
13/09/1959
13/12/1959
26/11/1961
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1464 4862   64862 08/11/1935 NEV
SBK
DAR
WHL
51D
51C
51F
W
Neville Hill
Starbeck
Darlington
West Hartlepool
Middlesbrough
West Hartlepool
West Auckland
Withdrawn
08/11/1935
25/10/1937
14/01/1946
12/12/1948
25/02/1951
14/09/1952
06/03/1955
22/10/1961
22/10/1961
J39 1465 4863   64863 13/11/1935 SUN
CON
DAR
TWD
BLA
HTN
50B
W
Sunderland
Consett
Darlington
Tweedmouth
Blaydon
Heaton
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
13/11/1935
15/06/1936
28/03/1943
04/01/1948
28/02/1948
07/11/1948
12/02/1950
31/01/1962
31/01/1962
J39 1473 4864   64864 15/11/1935 SUN
CON
TDK
DAR
HLD
54C
52C
53A
52B
W
Sunderland
Consett
Tyne Dock
Darlington
Hull Dairycoates
Borough Gardens
Blaydon
Hull Dairycoates
Heaton
Withdrawn
15/11/1935
28/11/1938
14/11/1941
28/03/1943
04/01/1948
03/12/1950
04/01/1953
13/06/1954
16/06/1957
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1474 4865   64865 20/11/1935 DAR
BLA
HTN
52A
W
Darlington
Blaydon
Heaton
Gateshead
Withdrawn
20/11/1935
15/02/1948
07/11/1948
04/03/1951
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1485 4866   64866 26/11/1935 DAR
SBK
50A
52G
52B
W
Darlington
Starbeck
York (North)
Sunderland
Heaton
Withdrawn
26/11/1935
14/07/1943
13/09/1959
08/11/1959
13/12/1959
24/09/1962
24/09/1962
J39 1486 4867   64867 05/12/1935 NPT
MID
DAR
HLD
50B
50F
W
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Darlington
Hull Dairycoates
Neville Hill
Malton
Withdrawn
05/12/1935
23/01/1936
28/03/1943
28/12/1947
20/05/1951
10/06/1951
24/02/1962
24/02/1962
J39 1504 4868   64868 03/12/1935 HTN
DAR
Twd
DAR
Twd
W
Heaton
Darlington
Alnmouth
Darlington
Alnmouth
Withdrawn
03/12/1935
28/03/1943
26/10/1947
18/04/1948
16/05/1948
18/04/1962
18/04/1962
J39 1505 4869   64869 06/12/1935 HTN
DAR
BLA
52A
52F
52d
W
Heaton
Darlington
Blaydon
Gateshead
Blyth (North)
Alnmouth
Withdrawn
06/12/1935
28/03/1943
14/11/1948
09/07/1950
08/10/1961
08/04/1962
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1506 4870   64870 13/12/1935 WHL
DAR
HLD
54C
52C
50B
51L
W
West Hartlepool
Darlington
Hull Dairycoates
Borough Gardens
Blaydon
Neville Hill
Thornaby
Withdrawn
13/12/1935
28/03/1943
15/02/1948
24/12/1950
04/01/1953
26/06/1955
13/12/1959
18/01/1962
18/01/1962
J39 1584 4871   64871 20/12/1935 BLA
GHD
52B
W
Blaydon
Gateshead
Heaton
Withdrawn
20/12/1935
18/09/1949
07/07/1957
15/10/1962
15/10/1962
J39 2941 4872   64872 07/06/1935 DON
ARD
DON
RET
MAR
IPS
32A
37A
56G
56F
W
Doncaster
Ardsley
Doncaster
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
March
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Withdrawn
07/06/1935
09/08/1935
19/08/1935
26/08/1935
13/02/1936
25/02/1936
16/04/1950
30/04/1950
16/06/1957
12/01/1958
26/11/1962
26/11/1962
J39 2942 4873   64873 08/06/1935 DON
ARD
DON
STR
PKS
STR
PKS
35A
30A
W
Doncaster
Ardsley
Doncaster
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
New England
Stratford
Withdrawn
08/06/1935
09/08/1935
22/08/1935
28/08/1935
24/06/1944
23/06/1945
16/10/1949
28/10/1956
14/04/1957
18/05/1959
18/05/1959
J39 2943 4874   64874 13/06/1935 DON
STR
30F
35A
30A
40A
36A
W
Doncaster
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
New England
Stratford
Lincoln
Doncaster
Withdrawn
13/06/1935
30/08/1935
24/06/1951
28/10/1956
14/04/1957
21/12/1958
01/03/1959
17/04/1961
17/04/1961
J39 2944 4875   64875 19/06/1935 DON
STR
CAR
9G
2F
W
Doncaster
Stratford
Carlisle Canal
Gorton
Woodford Halse
Withdrawn
19/06/1935
13/09/1935
20/03/1947
08/11/1958
30/07/1962
20/10/1962
20/10/1962
J39 2945 4876   64876 21/06/1935 DON
ARD
DON
STR
37A
30A
36A
W
Doncaster
Ardsley
Doncaster
Stratford
Ardsley
Stratford
Doncaster
Withdrawn
21/06/1935
09/08/1935
19/08/1935
29/08/1935
24/06/1951
22/09/1952
27/11/1955
28/09/1959
28/09/1959
J39 2946 4877   64877 28/06/1935 DON
LIN
MAR
STR
CAR
W
Doncaster
Lincoln
March
Stratford
Carlisle Canal
Withdrawn
28/06/1935
24/07/1935
08/11/1935
13/06/1943
18/09/1947
27/10/1962
27/10/1962
J39 2947 4878   64878 03/07/1935 DON
SHF
W
Doncaster
Sheffield Neepsend
Withdrawn
03/07/1935
09/08/1935
18/02/1961
18/02/1961
J39 2948 4879   64879 05/07/1935 DON
SHF
GOR
BRN
GOR
LIV
GOR
39B
37A
W
Doncaster
Sheffield Neepsend
Gorton
Barnsley
Gorton
Brunswick
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Ardsley
Withdrawn
05/07/1935
09/08/1935
23/05/1944
24/10/1946
27/04/1947
12/06/1949
14/08/1949
08/04/1951
03/02/1952
13/11/1962
13/11/1962
J39 2949 4880   64880 10/07/1935 DON
GOR
MAR
PKS
STR
IPS
CAR
9G
W
Doncaster
Gorton
March
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Ipswich
Carlisle Canal
Gorton
Withdrawn
10/07/1935
29/08/1935
08/11/1935
07/02/1936
29/09/1939
29/10/1941
13/04/1947
20/12/1960
20/10/1962
20/10/1962
J39 2950 4881   64881 11/07/1935 DON
ARD
DON
GOR
MAR
IPS
MAR
NWE
LIN
40D
40A
W
Doncaster
Ardsley
Doncaster
Gorton
March
Ipswich
March
New England
Lincoln
Tuxford
Lincoln
Withdrawn
11/07/1935
07/08/1935
19/08/1935
04/09/1935
31/10/1935
12/02/1936
02/09/1942
05/07/1943
01/07/1945
15/11/1953
14/02/1954
28/09/1959
28/09/1959
J39 2951 4882   64882 06/08/1935 DON
CLK
MAR
STR
NOR
32B
32A
32B
32A
40A
40E
36E
W
Doncaster
Colwick
March
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
Lincoln
Colwick
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
06/08/1935
10/09/1935
04/10/1935
15/06/1943
08/12/1946
07/06/1953
20/09/1953
18/02/1955
13/10/1957
30/11/1958
04/01/1959
01/03/1959
11/04/1961
11/04/1961
J39 2952 4883 4883 64883 07/08/1935 DON
MAR
GRA
NWE
LIN
35C
33A
36A
W
Doncaster
March
Grantham
New England
Lincoln
Spital Bridge
Plaistow
Doncaster
Withdrawn
07/08/1935
12/03/1938
29/04/1942
21/07/1944
01/07/1945
12/10/1952
07/04/1957
26/05/1957
11/03/1960
11/03/1960
J39 2953 4884   64884 13/08/1935 DON
STR
NOR
CAR
W
Doncaster
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Carlisle Canal
Withdrawn
13/08/1935
14/09/1943
25/09/1944
23/09/1947
24/03/1962
24/03/1962
J39 2981 4885   64885 21/08/1935 DON
BFD
ARD
DON
W
Doncaster
Bradford Hammerton Street
Ardsley
Doncaster
Withdrawn
21/08/1935
22/02/1938
24/07/1940
30/07/1945
17/02/1961
17/02/1961
J39 2982 4886   64886 30/08/1935 DON
MEX
DON
ARD
NWE
GRA
RET
COP
40A
50B
56G
56F
56B
W
Doncaster
Mexborough
Doncaster
Ardsley
New England
Grantham
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Lincoln
Neville Hill
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Ardsley
Withdrawn
30/08/1935
07/12/1935
30/01/1937
04/08/1939
23/02/1940
18/01/1943
13/10/1946
10/04/1949
04/06/1950
02/09/1951
15/09/1957
12/01/1958
18/11/1962
27/11/1962
27/11/1962
J39 2983 4887   64887 04/09/1935 DON
MEX
DON
NWE
GRA
NWE
GRA
NWE
RET
COP
40A
40F
40E
W
Doncaster
Mexborough
Doncaster
New England
Grantham
New England
Grantham
New England
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Lincoln
Boston
Colwick
Withdrawn
04/09/1935
07/12/1935
21/07/1936
11/04/1942
17/03/1943
29/08/1943
06/01/1946
17/01/1946
07/10/1946
10/04/1949
04/06/1950
09/11/1958
01/03/1959
20/01/1960
20/01/1960
J39 2984 4888   64888 10/09/1935 DON
STR
PKS
CAR
W
Doncaster
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Carlisle Canal
Withdrawn
10/09/1935
12/10/1935
03/07/1943
17/03/1947
27/10/1962
27/10/1962
J39 2985 4889   64889 13/09/1935 DON
STR
IPS
LOW
NOR
40A
40E
W
Doncaster
Stratford
Ipswich
Lowestoft
Norwich Thorpe
Lincoln
Colwick
Withdrawn
13/09/1935
14/10/1935
06/09/1944
06/10/1946
26/03/1947
21/12/1958
08/11/1959
20/08/1960
20/08/1960
J39 2986 4890   64890 13/09/1935 DON
MAR
SHF
30A
31A
31B
40A
W
Doncaster
March
Sheffield Neepsend
Stratford
Cambridge
March
Lincoln
Withdrawn
13/09/1935
16/10/1935
13/05/1938
17/10/1954
25/09/1955
12/10/1958
07/12/1958
21/03/1960
21/03/1960
J39 2987 4891   64891 18/09/1935 DON
MAR
NWE
BOS
CLK
GRA
CLK
DON
38A
35C
33A
32B
31B
W
Doncaster
March
New England
Boston
Colwick
Grantham
Colwick
Doncaster
Colwick
Spital Bridge
Plaistow
Ipswich
March
Withdrawn
18/09/1935
21/10/1935
14/05/1938
17/05/1938
03/08/1939
14/07/1940
23/10/1940
23/08/1946
27/04/1952
12/04/1953
07/04/1957
26/05/1957
25/10/1959
08/02/1960
08/02/1960
J39 2988 4892 4892 64892 26/09/1935 DON
MAR
NOR
IPS
CAR
W
Doncaster
March
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Carlisle Canal
Withdrawn
26/09/1935
12/10/1935
16/07/1943
07/11/1946
10/06/1947
12/05/1961
12/05/1961
J39 2989 4893   64893 01/10/1935 DON
MAR
PKS
STR
IPS
DON
36E
W
Doncaster
March
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Ipswich
Doncaster
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
01/10/1935
11/10/1935
28/12/1935
03/12/1939
05/11/1941
17/10/1943
04/03/1951
11/07/1960
11/07/1960
J39 2990 4894   64894 04/10/1935 DON
IPS
W
Doncaster
Ipswich
Withdrawn
04/10/1935
30/10/1935
19/10/1959
19/10/1959
J39 2991 4895   64895 09/10/1935 DON
PKS
STR
IPS
LOW
IPS
CAR
W
Doncaster
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Ipswich
Lowestoft
Ipswich
Carlisle Canal
Withdrawn
09/10/1935
28/10/1935
08/09/1940
28/01/1946
17/04/1946
29/07/1946
28/03/1947
27/10/1962
27/10/1962
J39 2992 4896   64896 11/10/1935 DON
PKS
STR
PKS
STR
ARD
35C
33A
30F
30A
40A
W
Doncaster
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Ardsley
Spital Bridge
Plaistow
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Lincoln
Withdrawn
11/10/1935
04/11/1935
25/09/1939
03/12/1939
08/09/1940
07/09/1943
28/12/1952
07/04/1957
26/05/1957
09/03/1958
07/12/1958
27/08/1960
27/08/1960
J39 2993 4897   64897 17/10/1935 DON
PKS
STR
DAR
HLD
54C
52C
52d
W
Doncaster
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Darlington
Hull Dairycoates
Borough Gardens
Blaydon
Alnmouth
Withdrawn
17/10/1935
28/01/1936
08/09/1940
07/01/1945
04/01/1948
24/12/1950
04/01/1953
28/03/1954
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 2994 4898   64898 22/10/1935 DON
IPS
DON
RET
W
Doncaster
Ipswich
Doncaster
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
22/10/1935
13/03/1936
15/09/1943
05/10/1947
19/02/1960
19/02/1960
J39 2995 4899   64899 06/08/1936 DON
STR
CAR
W
Doncaster
Stratford
Carlisle Canal
Withdrawn
06/08/1936
21/01/1937
15/04/1947
27/10/1962
27/10/1962
J39 2996 4900   64900 05/08/1936 DON
IPS
YAR
NOR
IPS
32A
32G
32A
W
Doncaster
Ipswich
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
Melton Constable
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
05/08/1936
04/09/1936
15/01/1939
14/05/1939
02/07/1939
24/06/1951
07/11/1954
06/03/1955
27/07/1959
27/07/1959
J39 2997 4901 4901 64901 12/08/1936 DON
GOR
TFD
9G
35C
33A
35C
31B
W
Doncaster
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Northwich
Spital Bridge
Plaistow
Spital Bridge
March
Withdrawn
12/08/1936
25/09/1936
30/04/1941
01/04/1951
12/10/1952
07/04/1957
26/05/1957
31/01/1960
13/10/1961
13/10/1961
J39 2998 4902   64902 14/08/1936 DON
GOR
ARD
DON
35C
36D
41F
W
Doncaster
Gorton
Ardsley
Doncaster
Spital Bridge
Barnsley
Mexborough
Withdrawn
14/08/1936
11/09/1936
30/06/1939
30/07/1945
05/10/1952
25/11/1956
03/01/1960
11/03/1960
11/03/1960
J39 2999 4903   64903 19/08/1936 DON
SHF
BRN
GOR
SHF
37A
37C
56F
W
Doncaster
Sheffield Neepsend
Barnsley
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Withdrawn
19/08/1936
18/09/1936
20/10/1946
27/04/1947
17/10/1947
23/12/1951
16/03/1952
12/01/1958
13/04/1962
13/04/1962
J39 3000 4904   64904 21/08/1936 DON
SHF
LIN
51A
53A
52B
53A
50C
50A
53A
50E
50B
W
Doncaster
Sheffield Neepsend
Lincoln
Darlington
Hull Dairycoates
Heaton
Hull Dairycoates
Selby
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
Scarborough
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
21/08/1936
14/09/1936
01/07/1945
02/09/1951
06/07/1952
07/12/1952
13/06/1954
10/10/1954
13/09/1959
22/11/1959
11/09/1960
09/10/1960
22/10/1961
22/10/1961
J39 1803 4905   64905 02/09/1936 GOR
MAR
IPS
W
Gorton
March
Ipswich
Withdrawn
02/09/1936
02/10/1936
14/07/1941
28/09/1959
28/09/1959
J39 1813 4906   64906 04/09/1936 GOR
MAR
GRA
RET
W
Gorton
March
Grantham
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
04/09/1936
30/09/1936
02/05/1942
28/09/1946
12/04/1961
12/04/1961
J39 1824 4907   64907 23/09/1936 GOR
STR
ARD
37C
56F
W
Gorton
Stratford
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Withdrawn
23/09/1936
20/10/1936
18/09/1949
16/03/1952
12/01/1958
26/11/1962
26/11/1962
J39 1828 4908   64908 23/09/1936 GOR
CLK
DON
RET
W
Gorton
Colwick
Doncaster
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
23/09/1936
23/10/1936
23/08/1946
05/10/1947
22/03/1961
22/03/1961
J39 1854 4909   64909 25/09/1936 GOR
CLK
ARD
SHF
DON
W
Gorton
Colwick
Ardsley
Sheffield Darnall
Doncaster
Withdrawn
25/09/1936
14/11/1936
31/03/1946
28/07/1946
22/09/1946
05/04/1961
05/04/1961
J39 1856 4910   64910 30/09/1936 GOR
CLK
DON
53A
51D
51C
51J
51F
54A
53A
55H
52B
52d
W
Gorton
Colwick
Doncaster
Hull Dairycoates
Middlesbrough
West Hartlepool
Northallerton
West Auckland
Sunderland
Hull Dairycoates
Neville Hill
Heaton
Alnmouth
Withdrawn
30/09/1936
24/10/1936
23/08/1946
02/09/1951
18/11/1951
14/09/1952
19/09/1954
06/03/1955
25/09/1955
10/06/1956
11/09/1960
15/01/1961
19/08/1962
23/11/1962
23/11/1962
J39 1857 4911   64911 02/10/1936 GOR
CLK
ARD
37B
56B
56C
56B
W
Gorton
Colwick
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Withdrawn
02/10/1936
12/11/1936
31/03/1946
09/05/1954
09/03/1958
14/09/1958
06/11/1960
12/11/1962
12/11/1962
J39 1869 4912   64912 06/10/1936 GOR
STR
IPS
LOW
CAR
W
Gorton
Stratford
Ipswich
Lowestoft
Carlisle Canal
Withdrawn
06/10/1936
14/11/1936
22/10/1941
06/10/1946
24/03/1947
05/12/1959
05/12/1959
J39 1870 4913   64913 10/10/1936 GOR
STR
NOR
32G
32A
32G
32A
W
Gorton
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Melton Constable
Norwich Thorpe
Melton Constable
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
10/10/1936
12/11/1936
11/12/1946
22/04/1956
07/10/1956
06/01/1957
03/02/1957
21/10/1959
21/10/1959
J39 1532 4914   64914 14/10/1936 GOR
NPT
MID
DAR
SBK
DAR
HLD
W
Gorton
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Darlington
Starbeck
Darlington
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
14/10/1936
08/11/1936
06/02/1937
28/03/1943
14/07/1943
13/04/1947
28/12/1947
21/07/1961
21/07/1961
J39 1533 4915   64915 17/10/1936 GOR
NEV
NPT
MID
DAR
BLA
HTN
W
Gorton
Neville Hill
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Darlington
Blaydon
Heaton
Withdrawn
17/10/1936
12/11/1936
19/11/1936
06/02/1937
28/03/1943
26/06/1943
07/11/1948
29/03/1962
29/03/1962
J39 1534 4916   64916 21/10/1936 GOR
NPT
HLD
NPT
SEL
YK
SEL
DAR
SBK
DAR
WHL
52B
52d
W
Gorton
Newport (Teeside)
Hull Dairycoates
Newport (Teeside)
Selby
York (North)
Selby
Darlington
Starbeck
Darlington
West Hartlepool
Heaton
Alnmouth
Withdrawn
21/10/1936
11/11/1936
04/07/1938
12/10/1938
12/06/1939
21/10/1939
29/02/1940
28/03/1943
08/07/1943
13/04/1947
12/12/1948
19/09/1954
26/06/1955
25/08/1961
25/08/1961
J39 1536 4917   64917 23/10/1936 GOR
NEV
NPT
DAR
BLA
TWD
52d
W
Gorton
Neville Hill
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
Blaydon
Tweedmouth
Alnmouth
Withdrawn
23/10/1936
18/11/1936
19/11/1936
28/03/1943
27/07/1943
23/10/1949
09/09/1962
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1539 4918   64918 28/10/1936 GOR
NPT
DAR
GOR
14A
37A
W
Gorton
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
Gorton
Cricklewood East
Ardsley
Withdrawn
28/10/1936
24/11/1936
28/03/1943
22/06/1944
14/12/1949
16/03/1952
30/11/1962
30/11/1962
J39 1540 4919   64919 31/10/1936 GOR
SBK
WHL
DAR
SBK
SCA
50B
54C
54A
56F
W
Gorton
Starbeck
West Hartlepool
Darlington
Starbeck
Scarborough
Neville Hill
Borough Gardens
Sunderland
Low Moor
Withdrawn
31/10/1936
14/11/1936
19/11/1936
28/03/1943
29/08/1948
25/09/1949
01/10/1950
01/07/1951
01/02/1953
25/01/1959
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1543 4920   64920 04/11/1936 GOR
NPT
DAR
BLA
HTN
50B
W
Gorton
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
Blaydon
Heaton
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
04/11/1936
30/11/1936
28/03/1943
16/07/1943
07/11/1948
12/02/1950
16/11/1961
16/11/1961
J39 1544 4921   64921 09/11/1936 GOR
NEV
NPT
DAR
BLA
DAR
NEV
54C
52A
52H
52G
52B
W
Gorton
Neville Hill
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
Blaydon
Darlington
Neville Hill
Borough Gardens
Gateshead
Tyne Dock
Sunderland
Heaton
Withdrawn
09/11/1936
12/11/1936
19/11/1936
28/03/1943
26/06/1943
23/07/1945
29/01/1950
01/07/1951
14/06/1959
26/02/1961
20/08/1961
12/11/1961
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1545 4922   64922 13/11/1936 GOR
WHL
DAR
SBK
50B
50C
50B
W
Gorton
West Hartlepool
Darlington
Starbeck
Neville Hill
Selby
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
13/11/1936
11/12/1936
28/03/1943
05/07/1943
01/10/1950
26/09/1954
26/06/1955
23/11/1962
23/11/1962
J39 1547 4923   64923 26/11/1936 GOR
WHL
DAR
BLA
HTN
W
Gorton
West Hartlepool
Darlington
Blaydon
Heaton
Withdrawn
26/11/1936
19/12/1936
28/03/1943
27/07/1943
07/11/1948
15/10/1962
15/10/1962
J39 1563 4924   64924 31/03/1937 GOR
FER
BLA
Twd
BLA
Twd
W
Gorton
Ferryhill (Co. Durham)
Blaydon
Alnmouth
Blaydon
Alnmouth
Withdrawn
31/03/1937
25/04/1937
24/08/1938
08/09/1943
29/09/1946
13/04/1947
23/11/1962
23/11/1962
J39 1577 4925   64925 07/04/1937 GOR
TDK
DAR
BLA
TWD
W
Gorton
Tyne Dock
Darlington
Blaydon
Tweedmouth
Withdrawn
07/04/1937
03/05/1937
28/03/1943
29/08/1948
14/08/1949
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1580 4926   64926 12/04/1937 GOR
TDK
DAR
BLA
HLD
54C
52B
W
Gorton
Tyne Dock
Darlington
Blaydon
Hull Dairycoates
Borough Gardens
Heaton
Withdrawn
12/04/1937
06/05/1937
28/03/1943
27/07/1943
09/05/1948
04/02/1951
16/06/1957
15/10/1962
15/10/1962
J39 1585 4927   64927 16/04/1937 GOR
SUN
TWD
BLA
DAR
BLA
HLD
54C
51F
56D
56B
W
Gorton
Sunderland
Tweedmouth
Blaydon
Darlington
Blaydon
Hull Dairycoates
Borough Gardens
West Auckland
Mirfield
Ardsley
Withdrawn
16/04/1937
06/05/1937
08/07/1939
17/01/1940
28/03/1943
16/07/1943
09/05/1948
04/02/1951
10/06/1956
15/04/1962
18/11/1962
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1586 4928   64928 22/04/1937 GOR
SKN
MID
DAR
HLD
50F
W
Gorton
Stockton
Middlesbrough
Darlington
Hull Dairycoates
Malton
Withdrawn
22/04/1937
19/05/1937
10/01/1938
28/03/1943
01/03/1948
26/10/1952
21/07/1961
21/07/1961
J39 1587 4929   64929 29/04/1937 GOR
HAV
BLA
TWD
DAR
BOR
52A
52d
W
Gorton
Haverton Hill
Blaydon
Tweedmouth
Darlington
Borough Gardens
Gateshead
Alnmouth
Withdrawn
29/04/1937
25/05/1937
28/03/1943
08/09/1943
23/07/1945
16/05/1948
04/01/1953
16/06/1957
23/11/1962
23/11/1962
J39 1875 4930   64930 05/05/1937 GOR
CAR
9G
W
Gorton
Carlisle Canal
Gorton
Withdrawn
05/05/1937
28/05/1937
08/11/1958
03/07/1961
03/07/1961
J39 1880 4931   64931 19/05/1937 GOR
CAR
EFD
DAR
HLD
54C
52B
W
Gorton
Carlisle Canal
Eastfield
Darlington
Hull Dairycoates
Borough Gardens
Heaton
Withdrawn
19/05/1937
19/06/1937
27/05/1941
28/08/1943
04/01/1948
24/12/1950
16/06/1957
22/10/1961
22/10/1961
J39 1894 4932   64932 28/05/1937 GOR
CAR
W
Gorton
Carlisle Canal
Withdrawn
28/05/1937
21/06/1937
03/07/1961
03/07/1961
J39 1508 4933   64933 16/12/1937 HLD
SKN
BLA
TWD
DAR
50B
W
Hull Dairycoates
Stockton
Blaydon
Tweedmouth
Darlington
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
16/12/1937
28/03/1943
21/06/1943
08/09/1943
23/07/1945
10/09/1950
12/12/1962
12/12/1962
J39 1509 4934   64934 25/01/1938 HLD
SKN
BLA
HTN
50B
W
Hull Dairycoates
Stockton
Blaydon
Heaton
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
25/01/1938
28/03/1943
19/06/1943
07/11/1948
12/02/1950
17/12/1962
17/12/1962
J39 1535 4935   64935 11/02/1938 YK
SEL
SBK
SCA
50B
W
York (North)
Selby
Starbeck
Scarborough
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
11/02/1938
29/02/1940
20/07/1940
25/09/1949
07/01/1951
17/12/1962
17/12/1962
J39 1537 4936   64936 16/02/1938 NPT
DAR
BOR
52A
W
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
Borough Gardens
Gateshead
Withdrawn
16/02/1938
28/03/1943
15/02/1948
14/06/1959
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1538 4937   64937 18/02/1938 NPT
DAR
LIN
IMM
LIN
W
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
Lincoln
Immingham
Lincoln
Withdrawn
18/02/1938
28/03/1943
15/09/1944
22/12/1946
27/04/1947
15/02/1960
15/02/1960
J39 1541 4938   64938 24/02/1938 NPT
DAR
AUK
DAR
SBK
50F
50C
52A
W
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
West Auckland
Darlington
Starbeck
Malton
Selby
Gateshead
Withdrawn
24/02/1938
28/03/1943
19/01/1947
30/01/1947
14/11/1948
18/04/1954
14/06/1959
30/08/1959
16/11/1962
16/11/1962
J39 1542 4939   64939 02/03/1938 NPT
DAR
SBK
DAR
HLD
54C
54A
53A
52B
W
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
Starbeck
Darlington
Hull Dairycoates
Borough Gardens
Sunderland
Hull Dairycoates
Heaton
Withdrawn
02/03/1938
28/03/1943
14/07/1943
14/01/1946
04/01/1948
03/12/1950
01/02/1953
10/06/1956
16/06/1957
18/04/1962
18/04/1962
J39 1546 4940   64940 04/03/1938 NPT
DAR
BLA
51A
51D
51F
54A
53A
W
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
Blaydon
Darlington
Middlesbrough
West Auckland
Sunderland
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
04/03/1938
28/03/1943
29/08/1948
19/11/1950
07/01/1951
31/08/1952
25/09/1955
10/06/1956
17/12/1962
17/12/1962
J39 1548 4941   64941 09/03/1938 NPT
DAR
BLA
HLD
54C
52D
W
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
Blaydon
Hull Dairycoates
Borough Gardens
Tweedmouth
Withdrawn
09/03/1938
28/03/1943
14/07/1943
09/05/1948
20/05/1951
04/01/1953
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1551 4942   64942 16/03/1938 MID
SKN
BLA
DAR
SBK
50A
52G
52B
W
Middlesbrough
Stockton
Blaydon
Darlington
Starbeck
York (North)
Sunderland
Heaton
Withdrawn
16/03/1938
01/01/1940
19/06/1943
23/07/1945
29/08/1948
13/09/1959
20/03/1960
14/01/1962
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 1558 4943   64943 01/04/1938 MID
DAR
MID
DAR
NEV
53A
W
Middlesbrough
Darlington
Middlesbrough
Darlington
Neville Hill
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/04/1938
28/03/1943
10/01/1947
01/03/1947
29/01/1950
22/01/1959
17/12/1962
17/12/1962
J39 1560 4944   64944 07/04/1938 YK
SEL
SBK
50A
50B
W
York (North)
Selby
Starbeck
York (North)
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
07/04/1938
29/02/1940
20/07/1940
13/09/1959
13/12/1959
12/12/1962
12/12/1962
J39 1804 4945   64945 25/03/1938 STM
EFD
PKD
EFD
DAR
MID
DAR
HTN
W
St Margarets
Eastfield
Parkhead
Eastfield
Darlington
Middlesbrough
Darlington
Heaton
Withdrawn
25/03/1938
28/09/1942
18/01/1943
17/04/1943
18/07/1943
12/01/1947
29/01/1947
14/11/1948
15/10/1962
15/10/1962
J39 1808 4946   64946 31/03/1938 CAR
STM
64C
64A
62C
W
Carlisle Canal
St Margarets
Dalry Road
St Margarets
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
31/03/1938
22/03/1948
11/08/1958
27/08/1961
17/02/1962
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
J39 1835 4947   64947 08/04/1938 CAR
SEL
DAR
BLA
HTN
53A
50F
56G
56F
53A
55H
W
Carlisle Canal
Selby
Darlington
Blaydon
Heaton
Hull Dairycoates
Malton
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Hull Dairycoates
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
08/04/1938
01/01/1941
28/03/1943
22/08/1943
07/11/1948
11/02/1952
25/04/1954
15/09/1957
12/01/1958
08/06/1958
11/09/1960
23/05/1962
23/05/1962
J39 1862 4948   64948 12/04/1938 CAR
W
Carlisle Canal
Withdrawn
12/04/1938
11/04/1960
11/04/1960
J39 1896 4949   64949 21/04/1938 CAR
CON
DAR
TWD
BLA
50B
53A
52B
52d
W
Carlisle Canal
Consett
Darlington
Tweedmouth
Blaydon
Neville Hill
Hull Dairycoates
Heaton
Alnmouth
Withdrawn
21/04/1938
20/10/1940
28/03/1943
04/01/1948
24/02/1948
20/08/1950
13/06/1954
16/06/1957
11/05/1958
22/08/1962
22/08/1962
J39 1863 4950   64950 13/04/1938 CAR
EFD
DEE
W
Carlisle Canal
Eastfield
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
13/04/1938
06/1941
08/1943
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
J39 1898 4951   64951 25/04/1938 CLK
DON
35C
33A
33B
W
Colwick
Doncaster
Spital Bridge
Plaistow
Tilbury
Withdrawn
25/04/1938
14/09/1946
12/10/1952
07/04/1957
31/10/1959
14/03/1960
14/03/1960
J39 1903 4952 4952 64952 29/04/1938 CLK
ARD
SHF
DON
33A
33B
W
Colwick
Ardsley
Sheffield Darnall
Doncaster
Plaistow
Tilbury
Withdrawn
29/04/1938
31/03/1946
28/07/1946
22/09/1946
02/06/1957
31/10/1959
14/03/1960
14/03/1960
J39 1922 4953   64953 04/05/1938 NOR
IPS
STR
PKS
33A
33B
W
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Plaistow
Tilbury
Withdrawn
04/05/1938
22/10/1941
02/07/1947
18/01/1948
26/05/1957
30/10/1959
14/03/1960
14/03/1960
J39 1926 4954   64954 06/05/1938 DON
NWE
GOR
LIV
TFD
9G
35C
33A
33B
W
Doncaster
New England
Gorton
Brunswick
Trafford Park (LNER)
Northwich
Spital Bridge
Plaistow
Tilbury
Withdrawn
06/05/1938
11/04/1942
18/06/1943
06/04/1947
22/05/1950
01/04/1951
12/10/1952
26/05/1957
31/10/1959
15/03/1960
15/03/1960
J39 1927 4955 4955 64955 11/05/1938 SHF
DON
NWE
GOR
ANN
CLK
38B
9G
2F
W
Sheffield Neepsend
Doncaster
New England
Gorton
Annesley
Colwick
Annesley
Gorton
Woodford Halse
Withdrawn
11/05/1938
28/02/1940
11/04/1942
09/06/1943
30/10/1943
30/03/1947
03/11/1957
25/11/1960
05/04/1962
21/07/1962
21/07/1962
J39 1928 4956   64956 14/05/1938 IPS
MAR
GRA
RET
36A
33A
33B
W
Ipswich
March
Grantham
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Doncaster
Plaistow
Tilbury
Withdrawn
14/05/1938
11/05/1939
12/05/1942
13/10/1946
17/08/1952
26/05/1957
31/10/1959
15/03/1960
15/03/1960
J39 1930 4957   64957 14/05/1938 SHF
DON
STR
NOR
IPS
33A
33B
W
Sheffield Neepsend
Doncaster
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Plaistow
Tilbury
Withdrawn
14/05/1938
28/02/1940
05/09/1943
07/09/1944
07/11/1946
26/05/1957
31/10/1959
14/03/1960
14/03/1960
J39 1933 4958   64958 31/05/1938 STR
IPS
30A
31A
33A
33B
W
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Cambridge
Plaistow
Tilbury
Withdrawn
31/05/1938
11/12/1940
14/10/1951
25/09/1955
08/06/1958
31/10/1959
14/03/1960
14/03/1960
J39 1940 4959   64959 30/05/1938 STR
IPS
LOW
NOR
32C
30A
40A
W
Stratford
Ipswich
Lowestoft
Norwich Thorpe
Lowestoft
Stratford
Lincoln
Withdrawn
30/05/1938
29/01/1941
06/10/1946
26/03/1947
30/09/1951
14/10/1951
22/11/1953
01/01/1960
01/01/1960
J39 1942 4960   64960 03/06/1938 CAR
SHF
40A
40F
40A
W
Carlisle Canal
Sheffield Neepsend
Lincoln
Boston
Lincoln
Withdrawn
03/06/1938
12/09/1938
15/08/1954
09/11/1958
07/12/1958
01/02/1960
01/02/1960
J39 1943 4961   64961 09/06/1938 ARD
DON
ARD
DON
RET
40A
W
Ardsley
Doncaster
Ardsley
Doncaster
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Lincoln
Withdrawn
09/06/1938
19/10/1941
11/06/1944
30/07/1945
05/10/1947
04/01/1959
21/10/1959
21/10/1959
J39 1952 4962   64962 15/06/1938 ARD
NWE
STR
DON
NWE
GOR
39B
30A
33A
33B
W
Ardsley
New England
Stratford
Doncaster
New England
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Stratford
Plaistow
Tilbury
Withdrawn
15/06/1938
23/02/1940
24/06/1940
04/07/1940
11/04/1942
08/06/1943
08/04/1951
19/05/1957
08/06/1958
31/10/1959
16/03/1960
16/03/1960
J39 1965 4963   64963 17/06/1938 ARD
DON
MAR
STR
CAR
STM
64C
62C
W
Ardsley
Doncaster
March
Stratford
Carlisle Canal
St Margarets
Dalry Road
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
17/06/1938
19/10/1941
09/01/1943
25/05/1943
20/09/1947
22/03/1948
11/08/1958
06/06/1960
29/01/1962
29/01/1962
J39 1971 4964   64964 28/06/1938 NOR
IPS
CAR
W
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Carlisle Canal
Withdrawn
28/06/1938
01/02/1940
08/04/1947
24/04/1961
24/04/1961
J39 1974 4965   64965 02/07/1938 NOR
MAR
NOR
MAR
GRA
NWE
38A
35C
33A
33B
W
Norwich Thorpe
March
Norwich Thorpe
March
Grantham
New England
Colwick
Spital Bridge
Plaistow
Tilbury
Withdrawn
02/07/1938
23/06/1939
04/09/1939
13/10/1939
30/04/1942
09/02/1947
26/03/1950
12/10/1952
29/06/1958
31/10/1959
14/03/1960
14/03/1960
J39 1977 4966   64966 08/07/1938 ARD
DON
GOR
14A
30A
14A
37A
36A
40A
W
Ardsley
Doncaster
Gorton
Cricklewood East
Stratford
Cricklewood East
Ardsley
Doncaster
Lincoln
Withdrawn
08/07/1938
19/10/1941
21/08/1943
20/01/1950
11/03/1951
01/04/1951
16/03/1952
18/12/1955
04/01/1959
11/07/1960
11/07/1960
J39 1980 4967   64967 20/07/1938 ARD
BFD
ARD
DON
W
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Ardsley
Doncaster
Withdrawn
20/07/1938
02/12/1941
17/09/1944
30/07/1945
15/02/1960
15/02/1960
J39 1984 4968   64968 28/07/1938 STR
IPS
LOW
NOR
32B
32A
32G
32A
33A
33B
W
Stratford
Ipswich
Lowestoft
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
Melton Constable
Norwich Thorpe
Plaistow
Tilbury
Withdrawn
28/07/1938
06/09/1944
22/09/1946
26/03/1947
14/06/1953
07/10/1953
12/05/1957
28/07/1957
08/06/1958
31/10/1959
16/03/1960
16/03/1960
J39 1996 4969   64969 09/08/1938 MAR
GRA
BOS
NWE
GRA
NWE
SHF
37A
51F
56B
W
March
Grantham
Boston
New England
Grantham
New England
Sheffield Darnall
Ardsley
West Auckland
Ardsley
Withdrawn
09/08/1938
29/04/1942
18/03/1944
16/04/1945
02/08/1945
31/12/1945
22/01/1950
03/02/1952
16/10/1960
17/06/1962
30/11/1962
30/11/1962
J39 1997 4970   64970 24/08/1938 IPS
MAR
GRA
NWE
RET
W
Ipswich
March
Grantham
New England
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
24/08/1938
10/05/1939
30/04/1942
01/08/1945
06/10/1946
24/05/1961
24/05/1961
J39 3081 4971   64971 07/02/1941 HLD
DON
SHF
LIN
IMM
LIN
52B
W
Hull Dairycoates
Doncaster
Sheffield Neepsend
Lincoln
Immingham
Lincoln
Heaton
Withdrawn
11/02/1932
07/02/1941
30/03/1941
01/07/1945
22/12/1946
27/04/1947
02/09/1951
25/06/1962
25/06/1962
J39 3082 4972   64972 14/02/1941 DON
SHF
BRN
GOR
39B
37A
36A
W
Doncaster
Sheffield Neepsend
Barnsley
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Ardsley
Doncaster
Withdrawn
14/02/1941
30/03/1941
20/10/1946
27/04/1947
08/04/1951
23/12/1951
18/12/1955
11/12/1959
11/12/1959
J39 3083 4973   64973 28/02/1941 DON
SHF
30A
W
Doncaster
Sheffield Neepsend
Stratford
Withdrawn
28/02/1941
30/03/1941
17/10/1954
13/11/1959
13/11/1959
J39 3084 4974   64974 04/03/1941 DON
SHF
GOR
BRN
CLK
W
Doncaster
Sheffield Neepsend
Gorton
Barnsley
Colwick
Withdrawn
04/03/1941
30/03/1941
25/05/1944
20/10/1946
27/04/1947
31/08/1960
31/08/1960
J39 3085 4975   64975 17/03/1941 STM
CAR
ABD
64A
65D
W
St Margarets
Carlisle Canal
Aberdeen Ferryhill
St Margarets
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
17/03/1941
20/08/1945
16/10/1947
13/03/1959
29/08/1960
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
J39 3086 4976   64976 22/03/1941 DON
SHF
DON
38A
40D
38A
W
Doncaster
Sheffield Neepsend
Doncaster
Colwick
Tuxford
Colwick
Withdrawn
22/03/1941
30/03/1941
22/09/1946
27/04/1952
27/09/1953
16/01/1955
25/11/1959
25/11/1959
J39 3087 4977   64977 05/04/1941 DON
40A
40E
W
Doncaster
Lincoln
Colwick
Withdrawn
05/04/1941
02/09/1951
07/12/1958
04/02/1960
04/02/1960
J39 3088 4978   64978 24/04/1941 STM
DAR
HLD
WHL
51J
51F
52A
W
St Margarets
Darlington
Hull Dairycoates
West Hartlepool
Northallerton
West Auckland
Gateshead
Withdrawn
24/04/1941
22/11/1943
01/03/1948
20/03/1949
19/09/1954
18/11/1956
23/08/1959
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 3089 4979   64979 03/05/1941 NWE
GRA
CLK
ANN
CLK
ARD
51F
W
New England
Grantham
Colwick
Annesley
Colwick
Ardsley
West Auckland
Withdrawn
03/05/1941
11/05/1941
09/10/1941
13/10/1941
08/08/1943
18/08/1946
16/10/1960
05/01/1962
05/01/1962
J39 3090 4980   64980 03/05/1941 NWE
GRA
CLK
ANN
CLK
W
New England
Grantham
Colwick
Annesley
Colwick
Withdrawn
03/05/1941
11/05/1941
09/10/1941
13/10/1941
30/03/1947
30/12/1959
30/12/1959
J39 3091 4981   64981 13/05/1941 GRA
CLK
37A
38A
35C
33A
36A
W
Grantham
Colwick
Ardsley
Colwick
Spital Bridge
Plaistow
Doncaster
Withdrawn
13/05/1941
08/10/1941
20/05/1951
27/04/1952
12/04/1953
07/04/1957
02/06/1957
05/02/1960
05/02/1960
J39 3092 4982   64982 21/05/1941 STM
DAR
BLA
TWD
51A
51F
W
St Margarets
Darlington
Blaydon
Tweedmouth
Darlington
West Auckland
Withdrawn
21/05/1941
03/05/1944
29/08/1948
23/05/1949
19/11/1950
31/08/1952
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
J39 3093 4983   64983 05/06/1941 GRA
BOS
CLK
W
Grantham
Boston
Colwick
Withdrawn
05/06/1941
26/07/1941
08/10/1941
10/11/1959
10/11/1959
J39 3094 4984   64984 18/06/1941 GRA
NWE
BOS
CLK
DON
36E
36A
40A
W
Grantham
New England
Boston
Colwick
Doncaster
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Doncaster
Lincoln
Withdrawn
18/06/1941
22/07/1941
26/07/1941
08/10/1941
23/08/1946
28/01/1951
04/03/1951
02/09/1951
31/12/1959
31/12/1959
J39 3095 4985   64985 03/07/1941 NWE
BOS
CLK
ARD
30A
30F
35A
35C
31A
W
New England
Boston
Colwick
Ardsley
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
New England
Spital Bridge
Cambridge
Withdrawn
03/07/1941
30/07/1941
08/10/1941
18/08/1946
22/09/1952
27/11/1955
28/10/1956
14/04/1957
08/06/1958
31/12/1959
31/12/1959
J39 3096 4986   64986 18/07/1941 STM
HAW
STM
CAR
STM
64C
62A
W
St Margarets
Hawick
St Margarets
Carlisle Canal
St Margarets
Dalry Road
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
18/07/1941
20/08/1945
10/02/1947
21/04/1947
22/03/1948
11/08/1958
18/12/1961
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
J39 3097 4987   64987 08/08/1941 NWE
GRA
NWE
GRA
RET
36A
W
New England
Grantham
New England
Grantham
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Doncaster
Withdrawn
08/08/1941
18/01/1943
29/08/1943
18/11/1945
28/09/1946
17/08/1952
15/03/1961
15/03/1961
J39 3098 4988   64988 21/08/1941 DON
CLK
W
Doncaster
Colwick
Withdrawn
21/08/1941
09/09/1941
30/12/1959
30/12/1959