Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 337 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 4511 Week
» 16680 Month
» 243441 Year
» 754543 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NBR/LNER Reid "J37" Class 0-6-0


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Tue 17/08/1954 64542,
64552,
64553,
64583,
64591,
64600,
64629,
64634
63B,
64A,
64F,
64F,
PTH,
62A,
62A,
62B
  Inverurie Works visit: Around the works.
Inverurie Works visit: Around the works.
Inverurie Works visit: Around the works. - Outside the Works.
Inverurie Works visit: Around the works.
Inverurie Works visit: Around the works.
Inverurie Works visit: Around the works. - Outside the Works.
Inverurie Works visit: Around the works. - Outside the Works.
Inverurie Works visit: Around the works.
RO 9/1954  
Sat 10/03/1962 64553,
64572
Wdn,
64A
  Inverurie Works visit.: Around the works. - Awaiting shopping.
Inverurie Works visit.: Around the works. - Awaiting shopping.
   
Wed 18/04/1962 64566,
64572,
64606,
64628
Wdn,
64A,
64A,
Wdn
  Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - Awaiting cutting up.
Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - In shops.
Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - In shops.
Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - Being cut up.
SLS 5/1962  
Sat 02/06/1962 64537,
64542,
64547,
64572,
64579,
64590,
64606,
64625
62B,
Wdn,
64A,
64A,
65E,
Wdn,
64A,
64A
  Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. SLS 7/1962