Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 337 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 4511 Week
» 16680 Month
» 243441 Year
» 754543 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NBR/LNER Reid "J37" Class 0-6-0


Class NBR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
J37 8 9008 4536 64536 12/1914 PTH
64A
W
Perth (LNER)
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/09/1958
05/1959
05/1959
J37 13 9013 4537 64537 12/1914 DEE
65F
W
Dundee Tay Bridge
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/05/1964
06/1964
06/1964
J37 44 9044 4538 64538 12/1914 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1959
12/1959
J37 62 9062 4539 64539 01/1915 HAW
64A
W
Hawick
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/11/1959
09/1961
09/1961
J37 113 9113 4540 64540 01/1915 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
J37 136 9136 4541 64541 04/1915 EFD
67C
62B
W
Eastfield
Ayr
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/04/1962
06/07/1963
07/1964
07/1964
J37 222 9222 4542 64542 04/1915 STG
62B
65E
W
Stirling
Dundee Tay Bridge
Kipps
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/07/1957
21/11/1959
10/1961
10/1961
J37 255 9255 4543 64543 04/1915 STM
62C
W
St Margarets
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/05/1957
10/12/1962
10/12/1962
J37 260 9260 4544 64544 04/1915 STG
62B
65E
W
Stirling
Dundee Tay Bridge
Kipps
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/07/1957
21/11/1959
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
J37 261 9261 4545 64545 05/1915 DFU
62B
62C
W
Dunfermline Upper
Dundee Tay Bridge
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/12/1956
19/12/1959
25/06/1962
25/06/1962
J37 263 9263 4546 64546 11/1915 THJ
W
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1964
05/1964
J37 429 9429 4547 64547 11/1915 STM
64C
64A
62B
W
St Margarets
Dalry Road
St Margarets
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1951
01/11/1952
25/04/1964
12/1966
12/1966
J37 430 9430 4548 64548 11/1915 DEE
65E
65A
W
Dundee Tay Bridge
Kipps
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/02/1951
31/08/1957
11/1963
11/1963
J37 431 9431 4549 64549 11/1915 THJ
W
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1964
07/1964
J37 432 9432 4550 64550 12/1915 THJ
62C
W
Thornton Junction
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/12/1962
12/1963
12/1963
J37 433 9433 4551 64551 06/1916 POL
W
Polmont
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1963
09/1963
J37 434 9434 4552 64552 06/1916 STM
62C
W
St Margarets
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/06/1962
10/1964
10/1964
J37 435 9435 4553 64553 06/1916 THJ
64F
W
Thornton Junction
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1952
08/03/1962
08/03/1962
J37 436 9436 4554 64554 06/1916 DFU
64C
64F
W
Dunfermline Upper
Dalry Road
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/10/1956
27/01/1962
01/1964
01/1964
J37 437 9437 4565 64555 06/1916 STM
62C
W
St Margarets
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/09/1964
10/1964
10/1964
J37 88 9088 4556 64556 06/1918 STG
62B
W
Stirling
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/12/1956
17/12/1962
17/12/1962
J37 89 9089 4557 64557 06/1918 STM
62A
62B
W
St Margarets
Thornton Junction
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/01/1963
19/01/1963
10/1963
10/1963
J37 123 9123 4558 64558 06/1918 EFD
62B
W
Eastfield
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1963
09/1965
09/1965
J37 139 9139 4559 64559 06/1918 PKD
65A
W
Parkhead
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/01/1963
11/1963
11/1963
J37 151 9151 4560 64560 07/1918 DFU
W
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1961
03/1961
J37 157 9157 4561 64561 07/1918 DFU
64C
64A
62C
W
Dunfermline Upper
Dalry Road
St Margarets
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/10/1956
08/04/1961
25/01/1964
05/1964
05/1964
J37 158 9158 4562 64562 07/1918 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1963
11/1963
J37 161 9161 4563 64563 07/1918 PKD
65A
62B
W
65A
Parkhead
Eastfield
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
Eastfield
01/01/1948
19/01/1963
26/09/1964
10/1964
31/10/1964
10/1964
J37 162 9162 4564 64564 07/1918 THJ
W
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1964
06/1964
J37 167 9167 4565 64565 07/1918 THJ
W
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1961
10/1961
J37 274 9274 4566 64566 08/1918 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/04/1962
09/04/1962
J37 292 9292 4567 64567 08/1918 DFU
W
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1960
03/1960
J37 295 9295 4568 64568 08/1918 DFU
W
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1963
08/1963
J37 297 9297 4569 64569 08/1918 STG
64C
64F
62A
62B
W
Stirling
Dalry Road
Bathgate
Thornton Junction
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/04/1959
27/01/1962
28/11/1964
26/11/1966
12/1966
12/1966
J37 304 9304 4570 64570 08/1918 POL
65F
62A
W
Polmont
Grangemouth
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/05/1964
31/10/1964
19/11/1966
19/11/1966
J37 305 9305 4571 64571 08/1918 POL
65F
62C
W
Polmont
Grangemouth
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/05/1964
31/10/1964
10/1965
10/1965
J37 314 9314 4572 64572 08/1918 STM
W
62A
St Margarets
Withdrawn
Thornton Junction
01/01/1948
09/1964
26/09/1964
09/1964
J37 315 9315 4573 64573 08/1918 PKD
62C
W
Parkhead
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/09/1962
10/1964
10/1964
J37 454 9454 4574 64574 08/1918 DFU
64C
64A
65E
W
Dunfermline Upper
Dalry Road
St Margarets
Kipps
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/10/1956
27/09/1958
17/01/1959
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
J37 455 9455 4575 64575 09/1918 DEE
W
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1963
12/1963
J37 456 9456 4576 64576 08/1918 STM
62A
62B
W
St Margarets
Thornton Junction
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/01/1963
19/01/1963
04/1967
04/1967
J37 457 9457 4577 64577 09/1918 STM
62A
62B
W
St Margarets
Thornton Junction
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/01/1963
19/01/1963
08/1966
08/1966
J37 458 9458 4578 64578 09/1918 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/05/1962
21/05/1962
J37 459 9459 4579 64579 09/1918 EFD
65E
W
Eastfield
Kipps
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/04/1951
12/1963
12/1963
J37 460 9460 4580 64580 09/1918 EFD
65F
W
Eastfield
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/06/1964
10/1965
10/1965
J37 461 9461 4581 64581 10/1918 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
J37 462 9462 4582 64582 10/1918 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1963
11/1963
J37 463 9463 4583 64583 10/1918 EFD
64F
W
Eastfield
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/06/1951
12/1963
12/1963
J37 464 9464 4584 64584 10/1918 PKD
W
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1959
07/1959
J37 465 9465 4585 64585 11/1918 STG
62B
62C
W
Stirling
Dundee Tay Bridge
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/07/1957
16/01/1960
30/12/1964
30/12/1964
J37 466 9466 4586 64586 11/1918 STM
62A
W
St Margarets
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/01/1963
06/1964
06/1964
J37 467 9467 4587 64587 11/1918 DEE
W
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1964
06/1964
J37 468 9468 4588 64588 11/1918 PTH
65F
65C
64A
62A
W
Perth (LNER)
Grangemouth
Parkhead
St Margarets
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/01/1959
26/09/1959
08/09/1962
19/01/1963
06/1966
06/1966
J37 469 9469 4589 64589 11/1918 POL
65F
W
Polmont
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/01/1959
05/1963
05/1963
J37 476 9476 4590 64590 12/1918 DFU
64A
W
Dunfermline Upper
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/11/1952
14/05/1962
14/05/1962
J37 477 9477 4591 64591 01/1919 PTH
64A
62A
W
Perth (LNER)
St Margarets
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/09/1958
26/09/1964
10/1964
10/1964
J37 478 9478 4592 64592 01/1919 STM
65F
65K
65F
W
St Margarets
Grangemouth
Polmont
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/01/1959
24/03/1962
30/05/1964
07/1965
07/1965
J37 479 9479 4593 64593 01/1919 DEE
65F
65E
65F
W
65K
Dundee Tay Bridge
Grangemouth
Kipps
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
Polmont
01/01/1948
17/01/1959
18/11/1961
19/01/1963
11/1963
02/11/1963
11/1963
J37 480 9480 4594 64594 01/1919 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
J37 313 9313 4595 64595 11/1919 STM
62A
W
St Margarets
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1963
03/1966
03/1966
J37 470 9470 4596 64596 11/1919 THJ
W
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1961
04/1961
J37 471 9471 4597 64597 11/1919 THJ
64A
62C
62B
W
Thornton Junction
St Margarets
Dunfermline Upper
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/11/1952
11/05/1957
06/07/1963
08/1966
08/1966
J37 472 9472 4598 64598 11/1919 THJ
62B
W
Thornton Junction
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1950
09/1962
09/1962
J37 473 9473 4599 64599 11/1919 STM
62C
W
St Margarets
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/04/1964
10/1965
10/1965
J37 485 9485 4600 64600 11/1919 THJ
62B
W
Thornton Junction
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/08/1959
07/1963
07/1963
J37 486 9486 4601 64601 11/1919 EFD
64F
64A
W
62C
65F
Eastfield
Bathgate
St Margarets
Withdrawn
Dunfermline Upper (Re-instd)
Grangemouth
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
16/05/1953
29/12/1962
11/02/1963
16/03/1963
29/12/1962
J37 487 9487 4602 64602 11/1919 THJ
62B
62A
62B
W
Thornton Junction
Dundee Tay Bridge
Thornton Junction
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/08/1959
20/08/1966
26/11/1966
22/04/1967
22/04/1967
J37 488 9488 4603 64603 11/1919 STM
62A
62C
W
St Margarets
Thornton Junction
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/01/1963
19/01/1963
12/1963
12/1963
J37 489 9489 4604 64604 12/1919 DFU
W
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1962
08/1962
J37 296 9296 4605 64605 12/1919 STM
62A
62C
W
St Margarets
Thornton Junction
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/01/1963
19/01/1963
06/1964
06/1964
J37 300 9300 4606 64606 12/1919 STM
64F
62A
W
St Margarets
Bathgate
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/02/1964
28/11/1964
07/1966
07/1966
J37 301 9301 4607 64607 12/1919 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/08/1962
13/08/1962
J37 302 9302 4608 64608 12/1919 STM
62B
W
St Margarets
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1963
08/1966
08/1966
J37 303 9303 4609 64609 01/1920 PKD
W
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
J37 306 9306 4610 64610 01/1920 EFD
65F
62C
W
Eastfield
Grangemouth
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/01/1963
04/12/1965
02/1966
02/1966
J37 401 9401 4611 64611 01/1920 EFD
65K
65F
62C
62B
W
Eastfield
Polmont
Grangemouth
Dunfermline Upper
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1962
19/01/1963
31/10/1964
26/11/1966
22/04/1967
22/04/1967
J37 402 9402 4612 64612 01/1920 THJ
64D
64C
64A
W
64A
Thornton Junction
Carstairs
Dalry Road
St Margarets
Withdrawn
St Margarets (Re-instd)
01/01/1948
01/10/1955
12/05/1956
27/09/1958
29/12/1962
01/1963
29/12/1962
J37 403 9403 4613 64613 01/1920 POL
W
62B
Polmont
Withdrawn
Dundee Tay Bridge
01/01/1948
01/1964
25/01/1964
01/1964
J37 491 9491 4614 64614 01/1920 STM
64F
W
St Margarets
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/02/1964
12/1964
12/1964
J37 46 9046 4615 64615 12/1920 DEE
W
62B
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
Dundee Tay Bridge (Re-instd)
01/01/1948
29/12/1962
01/1963
29/12/1962
J37 72 9072 4616 64616 12/1920 THJ
W
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1963
12/1963
J37 73 9073 4617 64617 12/1920 DFU

62C
W
Dunfermline Upper

Dunfermline Upper (Re-instd)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1962
01/1963
11/02/1963
11/02/1963
J37 84 9084 4618 64618 12/1920 THJ
W
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/11/1966
19/11/1966
J37 109 9109 4619 64619 12/1920 DEE
W
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1963
12/1963
J37 110 9110 4620 64620 12/1920 DEE
62C
62B
W
Dundee Tay Bridge
Dunfermline Upper
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/09/1966
26/11/1966
22/04/1967
22/04/1967
J37 111 9111 4621 64621 01/1921 POL
65F
W
Polmont
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/01/1963
05/1965
05/1965
J37 171 9171 4622 64622 01/1921 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
J37 175 9175 4623 64623 01/1921 EFD
65K
65F
62C
62B
W
Eastfield
Polmont
Grangemouth
Dunfermline Upper
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/12/1963
30/05/1964
31/10/1964
18/11/1966
19/11/1966
19/11/1966
J37 272 9272 4624 64624 01/1921 STM
62B
W
St Margarets
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1963
01/1966
01/1966
J37 273 9273 4625 64625 01/1921 STM
64F
64A
62C
62A
W
St Margarets
Bathgate
St Margarets
Dunfermline Upper
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/08/1963
07/09/1963
25/04/1964
27/06/1964
09/1965
09/1965
J37 299 9299 4626 64626 02/1921 PKD
67C
W
Parkhead
Ayr
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/04/1962
11/1963
11/1963
J37 506 9506 4627 64627 02/1921 DEE
W
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1963
10/1963
J37 507 9507 4628 64628 02/1921 DFU
65E
W
Dunfermline Upper
Kipps
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/10/1957
29/03/1962
29/03/1962
J37 508 9508 4629 64629 02/1921 THJ
W
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1963
10/1963
J37 517 9517 4630 64630 06/1921 DFU
W
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1962
09/1962
J37 98 9098 4631 64631 06/1921 DEE
W
62B
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
Dundee Tay Bridge (Re-instd)
01/01/1948
29/12/1962
01/1963
29/12/1962
J37 101 9101 4632 64632 06/1921 EFD
65K
65A
62A
W
Eastfield
Polmont
Eastfield
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1963
28/12/1963
22/08/1964
12/1965
12/1965
J37 103 9103 4633 64633 06/1921 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1964
06/1964
J37 33 9033 4634 64634 07/1921 DEE
64D
64F
W
Dundee Tay Bridge
Carstairs
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1955
12/05/1956
01/1964
01/1964
J37 104 9104 4635 64635 08/1921 THJ
W
62C
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
Dunfermline Upper (Re-instd)
01/01/1948
29/12/1962
01/1963
29/12/1962
J37 128 9128 4636 64636 08/1921 STM
65F
W
St Margarets
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/05/1964
10/1964
10/1964
J37 105 9105 4637 64637 09/1921 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1962
08/1962
J37 143 9143 4638 64638 09/1921 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
J37 518 9518 4639 64639 10/1921 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1962
29/12/1962