Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 884 Today
» 1151 Yesterday
» 3106 Week
» 19757 Month
» 213601 Year
» 724703 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NBR/LNER Holmes "J36" Class 0-6-0


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Tue 17/08/1954 65282,
65282,
65288,
65288
64F,
64F,
64A,
64A
  Inverurie Works visit: Around the works.
Inverurie Works visit: Around the works.
Inverurie Works visit: Around the works.
Inverurie Works visit: Around the works.
RO 9/1954  
Sat 10/03/1962 65246,
65246
Wdn,
Wdn
  Inverurie Works visit.: Around the works. - Cemetery - boiler and/or firebox only.
Inverurie Works visit.: Around the works. - Cemetery - boiler and/or firebox only.
   
Sat 02/06/1962 65297,
65297,
65318,
65318,
65319,
65319
68B,
68B,
Wdn,
Wdn,
62B,
62B
  Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - Outside - awaiting shopping.
Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - Outside - awaiting shopping.
Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - In the "Cemetery"
Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - In the "Cemetery"
Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
SLS 7/1962  
Sun 03/06/1962 65230,
65230,
65280,
65280
65C,
65C,
Wdn,
Wdn
  At Bo'ness: In store SLS 7/1962