Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 399 Today
» 1059 Yesterday
» 399 Week
» 17199 Month
» 333430 Year
» 844532 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NBR/LNER Holmes "J36" Class 0-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
10/1926 Condemned 9676 98LR     COND  
01/1931 Condemned 9672       COND  
04/1931 Condemned 9665       COND  
06/1933 Condemned 9606       COND  
05/1934 Condemned 9609       COND  
06/1934 Condemned 9605 98LR     COND  
08/1934 Condemned 9607       COND  
04/1935 Condemned 9615 98LR     COND  
08/1935 Condemned 9145       COND  
10/1935 Condemned 9619       COND  
11/1935 Condemned 9666 98LR     COND  
12/1935 Condemned 9626       COND  
02/1936 Condemned 9613       COND  
02/1936 Condemned 9618       COND  
03/1936 Condemned 9630       COND  
04/1936 Condemned 9627 98LR     COND  
04/1936 Condemned 9173       COND  
04/1937 Condemned 9621 98LR     COND  
04/1937 Condemned 9662 98LR     COND  
06/1937 Condemned 9608 98LR     COND  
06/1937 Condemned 9620 98LR     COND  
07/1937 Condemned 9671       COND  
08/1937 Condemned 9624       COND  
08/1937 Condemned 9629       COND  
09/1937 Condemned 9616       COND  
12/1937 Condemned 9614       COND  
12/1937 Condemned 9179       COND  
01/1939 Condemned 9661 98LR     COND  
03/1939 Condemned 9631 98LR     COND  
04/1943 Condemned 9674       COND  
05/1943 Condemned 9741       COND  
06/1945 Condemned 9691       COND  
10/1946 Condemned 5263       COND  
10/1946 Condemned 5326       COND  
02/1947 Condemned 5301       COND  
07/1947 Condemned 5212 ?     COND  
07/1947 Condemned 5219 98LR     COND  
07/1947 Condemned 5269 98LR     COND  
07/1947 Condemned 5284       COND  
07/1947 Condemned 5302       COND  
08/1947 Condemned 5272       COND  
08/1947 Condemned 5332       COND  
09/1947 Condemned 5223 98LR     COND  
10/1947 Condemned 5299       COND  
10/1947 Condemned 5336       COND  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5210     KPS Kipps  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5211     BGT Bathgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5213 ?   PTH Perth (LNER)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5214     PKD Parkhead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5215     KPS Kipps  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5216 ?   CAR Carlisle Canal  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5218     THJ Thornton Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5217 ?   STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5220     POL Polmont  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5221     EFD Eastfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5222 98LR   POL Polmont  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5224 98LR   STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5225     BGT Bathgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5226 98LR   KPS Kipps  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5227     EFD Eastfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5228     EFD Eastfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5229     BGT Bathgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5230     BGT Bathgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5231     BGT Bathgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5232     HAW Hawick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5233 98LR   POL Polmont  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5234     BGT Bathgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5235 98LR   BGT Bathgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5236 98LR   KPS Kipps  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5246     POL Polmont  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5247     KPS Kipps  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5248     BGT Bathgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5237     FW Fort William  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5238     KPS Kipps  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5239     DFU Dunfermline Upper  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5240     HAY Haymarket  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5241     POL Polmont  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5242     HAW Hawick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5243 98LR   HAY Haymarket  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5244     POL Polmont  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5245     KPS Kipps  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5249     KPS Kipps  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5250     BGT Bathgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5251     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5252     DFU Dunfermline Upper  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5253 98LR   DFU Dunfermline Upper  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5254     BGT Bathgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5255     KPS Kipps  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5256     KPS Kipps  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5257     POL Polmont  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5258     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5259     HAW Hawick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5260     KPS Kipps  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5261     BGT Bathgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5264     KPS Kipps  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5265     BGT Bathgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5266     KPS Kipps  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5267     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5268 98LR   POL Polmont  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5274     PKD Parkhead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5275     POL Polmont  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5270     EFD Eastfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5271     BGT Bathgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5273     EFD Eastfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5276     BGT Bathgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5277     BGT Bathgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5278     BGT Bathgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5279     HAW Hawick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5280     BGT Bathgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5281     STG Stirling  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5282     BGT Bathgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5283     PKD Parkhead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5285     KPS Kipps  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5286     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5287     KPS Kipps  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5288     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5289     KPS Kipps  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5290     POL Polmont  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5291     THJ Thornton Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5292     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5293     CAR Carlisle Canal  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5294     KPS Kipps  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5295     BLA Blaydon  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5296     EFD Eastfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5297     PTH Perth (LNER)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5298     PKD Parkhead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5300     EFD Eastfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5303     BGT Bathgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5304     CAR Carlisle Canal  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5305     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5306     POL Polmont  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5307     STG Stirling  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5308     EFD Eastfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5309     PTH Perth (LNER)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5310     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5311     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5312     CAR Carlisle Canal  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5313     POL Polmont  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5314     BGT Bathgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5315     EFD Eastfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5316     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5317     HAW Hawick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5318     BGT Bathgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5319     DEE Dundee Tay Bridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5320     DFU Dunfermline Upper  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5321     CAR Carlisle Canal  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5322     STG Stirling  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5323     DFU Dunfermline Upper  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5324     PKD Parkhead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5325     KPS Kipps  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5327     BGT Bathgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5328     DEE Dundee Tay Bridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5329     POL Polmont  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5330     DEE Dundee Tay Bridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5331     BLA Blaydon  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5333     DEE Dundee Tay Bridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5334     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5335     EFD Eastfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5337     EFD Eastfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5338     POL Polmont  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5339     EFD Eastfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5340     HAW Hawick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5341     BGT Bathgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5342     BGT Bathgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5343     BLA Blaydon  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5344     BGT Bathgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5345     THJ Thornton Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 5346     STG Stirling  
03/1948 Condemned 5289 KPS Kipps   COND  
03/1948 Condemned 5328 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge   COND  
23/03/1948 Condemned 5220 POL Polmont   COND  
04/1948 Condemned 5337 EFD Eastfield   COND  
14/04/1948 Condemned 5256 KPS Kipps   COND  
03/1950 Condemned 65294 KPS Kipps   COND  
04/1950 Condemned 65215 KPS Kipps   COND  
11/1950 Condemned 65291 THJ Thornton Junction   COND  
12/1950 Condemned 65274 PKD Parkhead   COND  
20/01/1951 Reallocation 65252 DFU Dunfermline Upper 62A Thornton Junction  
02/1951 Condemned 65292 STM St Margarets   COND  
03/1951 Condemned 65279 HAW Hawick   COND  
03/1951 Condemned 65298 PKD Parkhead   COND  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 65295 BLA Blaydon 65C Parkhead  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 65327 BGT Bathgate 64A St Margarets  
04/1951 Condemned 65226 KPS Kipps   COND  
04/1951 Condemned 65254 BGT Bathgate   COND  
21/04/1951 Reallocation 65316 STM St Margarets 64G Hawick  
05/1951 Condemned 65245 KPS Kipps   COND  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 65311 STM St Margarets 64C Dalry Road  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 5331 BLA Blaydon 64F Bathgate  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 5343 BLA Blaydon 65E Kipps  
06/1951 Condemned 65308 EFD Eastfield   COND  
07/1951 Condemned 65238 KPS Kipps   COND  
07/1951 Condemned 65322 STG Stirling   COND  
09/1951 Condemned 65255 KPS Kipps   COND  
09/09/1951 Reallocation 65329 POL Polmont 64A St Margarets  
01/1952 Condemned 65278 BGT Bathgate   COND  
01/1952 Condemned 65340 HAW Hawick   COND  
02/1952 Condemned 65286 STM St Margarets   COND  
23/02/1952 Reallocation 65268 POL Polmont 64F Bathgate  
04/1952 Condemned 65231 BGT Bathgate   COND  
05/1952 Condemned 65240 HAY Haymarket   COND  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 65235 BGT Bathgate 64B Haymarket  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 65331 64F Bathgate 64G Hawick  
07/1952 Condemned 65264 KPS Kipps   COND  
08/1952 Condemned 65271 BGT Bathgate   COND  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 65311 64C Dalry Road 64A St Margarets  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 65213 PTH Perth (LNER) 61A Kittybrewster  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 65247 KPS Kipps 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill  
12/1952 Condemned 65283 PKD Parkhead   COND  
26/12/1953 Reallocation 65242 HAW Hawick 64A St Margarets  
07/08/1954 Reallocation 65247 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 61A Kittybrewster  
08/1955 Condemned 65314 BGT Bathgate   COND  
26/11/1955 Reallocation 65259 HAW Hawick 64F Bathgate  
26/11/1955 Reallocation 65267 STM St Margarets 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill  
21/01/1956 Reallocation 65242 64A St Margarets 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill  
04/1956 Condemned 65236 KPS Kipps   COND  
05/1956 Condemned 65248 BGT Bathgate   COND  
12/05/1956 Reallocation 65267 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 61C Keith  
09/06/1956 Reallocation 65303 BGT Bathgate 61A Kittybrewster  
09/06/1956 Reallocation 65311 64A St Margarets 64E Polmont  
09/06/1956 Reallocation 65338 POL Polmont 64A St Margarets  
27/10/1956 Reallocation 65297 PTH Perth (LNER) 61C Keith  
22/12/1956 Reallocation 65216 CAR Carlisle Canal 66A Polmadie  
22/12/1956 Reallocation 65232 HAW Hawick 66A Polmadie  
22/12/1956 Reallocation 65280 BGT Bathgate 64E Polmont  
22/12/1956 Reallocation 65290 POL Polmont 64F Bathgate  
22/12/1956 Reallocation 65304 CAR Carlisle Canal 66A Polmadie  
02/1957 Condemned 65250 BGT Bathgate   COND  
02/1957 Condemned 65324 PKD Parkhead   COND  
16/03/1957 Reallocation 65304 66A Polmadie 61A Kittybrewster  
04/1957 Condemned 65213 61A Kittybrewster   COND  
13/04/1957 Reallocation 65304 61A Kittybrewster 61C Keith  
11/05/1957 Reallocation 65211 BGT Bathgate 65C Parkhead  
11/05/1957 Reallocation 65251 STM St Margarets 61A Kittybrewster  
06/07/1957 Reallocation 65237 FW Fort William 65A Eastfield  
06/07/1957 Reallocation 65270 EFD Eastfield 65C Parkhead  
08/1957 Condemned 65242 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill   COND  
08/1957 Condemned 65244 POL Polmont   COND  
31/08/1957 Reallocation 65247 61A Kittybrewster 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill  
31/08/1957 Reallocation 65242 98W   61A Kittybrewster  
10/1957 Condemned 65225 BGT Bathgate   COND  
26/10/1957 Reallocation 65338 64A St Margarets 61A Kittybrewster  
21/12/1957 Reallocation 65247 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 61C Keith  
02/1958 Condemned 65270 65C Parkhead   COND  
12/04/1958 Reallocation 65273 EFD Eastfield 65C Parkhead  
02/08/1958 Reallocation 65275 POL Polmont 64G Hawick  
02/08/1958 Reallocation 65316 64G Hawick 64E Polmont  
22/11/1958 Reallocation 65233 POL Polmont 64G Hawick  
13/12/1958 Reallocation 65237 65A Eastfield 12C Carlisle Canal  
17/01/1959 Reallocation 65246 POL Polmont 65F Grangemouth  
17/01/1959 Reallocation 65241 POL Polmont 65F Grangemouth  
14/03/1959 Reallocation 65221 EFD Eastfield 61A Kittybrewster  
14/03/1959 Reallocation 65227 EFD Eastfield 61A Kittybrewster  
14/03/1959 Reallocation 65305 STM St Margarets 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill  
14/03/1959 Reallocation 65310 STM St Margarets 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill  
11/04/1959 Reallocation 65227 61A Kittybrewster 61A Kittybrewster  
11/04/1959 Reallocation 65297 61C Keith 61A Kittybrewster  
11/04/1959 Reallocation 65310 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 61C Keith  
11/04/1959 Reallocation 65338 61A Kittybrewster 61C Keith  
07/1959 Condemned 65221 61A Kittybrewster   COND  
07/1959 Condemned 65247 61C Keith   COND  
07/1959 Condemned 65259 64F Bathgate   COND  
29/08/1959 Reallocation 65227 61A Kittybrewster 61C Keith  
09/1959 Condemned 65333 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge   COND  
26/09/1959 Reallocation 65227 61C Keith 61A Kittybrewster  
26/09/1959 Reallocation 65246 65F Grangemouth 65C Parkhead  
26/09/1959 Reallocation 65277 BGT Bathgate 61C Keith  
24/10/1959 Reallocation 65230 BGT Bathgate 65C Parkhead  
19/12/1959 Reallocation 65233 64G Hawick 64F Bathgate  
02/1960 Condemned 65342 BGT Bathgate   COND  
02/1960 Condemned 65343 65E Kipps   COND  
13/02/1960 Reallocation 65217 STM St Margarets 65F Grangemouth  
13/02/1960 Reallocation 65241 65F Grangemouth 65E Kipps  
12/03/1960 Reallocation 65216 66A Polmadie 65E Kipps  
12/03/1960 Reallocation 65232 66A Polmadie 65E Kipps  
12/03/1960 Reallocation 65305 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 61C Keith  
05/1960 Condemned 65229 BGT Bathgate   COND  
05/1960 Condemned 65252 62A Thornton Junction   COND  
07/05/1960 Reallocation 65239 DFU Dunfermline Upper 65C Parkhead  
07/05/1960 Reallocation 65320 DFU Dunfermline Upper 65C Parkhead  
07/1960 Condemned 65317 HAW Hawick   COND  
02/07/1960 Reallocation 65218 THJ Thornton Junction 65A Eastfield  
24/09/1960 Reallocation 65344 BGT Bathgate 64A St Margarets  
10/1960 Condemned 65249 KPS Kipps   COND  
22/10/1960 Reallocation 65281 STG Stirling 64F Bathgate  
22/10/1960 Reallocation 65309 PTH Perth (LNER) 64F Bathgate  
22/10/1960 Reallocation 65330 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 64G Hawick  
12/1960 Condemned 65233 64F Bathgate   COND  
17/12/1960 Reallocation 65335 EFD Eastfield 65D Dawsholm  
01/1961 Condemned 65239 65C Parkhead   COND  
11/02/1961 Reallocation 65251 61A Kittybrewster 61C Keith  
03/1961 Condemned 65276 BGT Bathgate   COND  
03/1961 Condemned 65339 EFD Eastfield   COND  
11/03/1961 Reallocation 65222 POL Polmont 65F Grangemouth  
11/03/1961 Reallocation 65306 POL Polmont 65F Grangemouth  
11/03/1961 Reallocation 65313 65A Eastfield 63B Fort William  
11/03/1961 Reallocation 65313 POL Polmont 65A Eastfield  
04/1961 Condemned 65295 65C Parkhead   COND  
06/05/1961 Reallocation 65277 61C Keith 64F Bathgate  
06/05/1961 Reallocation 65305 61C Keith 64F Bathgate  
07/1961 Condemned 65281 64F Bathgate   COND  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 65227 61A Kittybrewster 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 65227 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 64F Bathgate  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 65251 61C Keith 64F Bathgate  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 65267 61C Keith 64F Bathgate  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 65297 61A Kittybrewster 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 65303 61A Kittybrewster 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 65304 61C Keith 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 65310 61C Keith 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 65338 61C Keith 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill  
29/07/1961 Reallocation 65310 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 65B St Rollox (Balornock)  
29/07/1961 Reallocation 65338 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 62C Dunfermline Upper  
08/1961 Condemned 65227 64F Bathgate   COND  
26/08/1961 Reallocation 65297 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 68B Dumfries  
26/08/1961 Reallocation 65303 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 65B St Rollox (Balornock)  
26/08/1961 Reallocation 65304 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 65B St Rollox (Balornock)  
23/09/1961 Reallocation 65316 64E Polmont 64G Hawick  
10/1961 Condemned 65232 65E Kipps   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 65235 64B Haymarket   COND  
21/10/1961 Reallocation 65304 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 65J Stirling  
21/10/1961 Reallocation 65310 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 65J Stirling  
18/11/1961 Reallocation 65214 PKD Parkhead 65F Grangemouth  
30/12/1961 Reallocation 65297 68B Dumfries 65D Dawsholm  
11/01/1962 Condemned 65246 65C Parkhead   COND  
27/01/1962 Reallocation 65275 64G Hawick 65K Polmont  
26/02/1962 Condemned 65296 EFD Eastfield   COND  
26/02/1962 Condemned 65305 64F Bathgate   COND  
05/03/1962 Condemned 65258 STM St Margarets   COND  
24/03/1962 Reallocation 65214 65F Grangemouth 67D Ardrossan  
24/03/1962 Reallocation 65257 POL Polmont 65F Grangemouth  
24/03/1962 Reallocation 65273 65C Parkhead 67D Ardrossan  
24/03/1962 Reallocation 65297 65D Dawsholm 68B Dumfries  
30/04/1962 Condemned 65216 65E Kipps   COND  
30/04/1962 Condemned 65315 EFD Eastfield   COND  
30/04/1962 Condemned 65320 65C Parkhead   COND  
19/05/1962 Reallocation 65335 65D Dawsholm 65C Parkhead  
21/05/1962 Condemned 65266 KPS Kipps   COND  
21/05/1962 Condemned 65280 64E Polmont   COND  
31/05/1962 Condemned 65318 BGT Bathgate   COND  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 65316 64G Hawick 64F Bathgate  
18/06/1962 Condemned 65330 64G Hawick   COND  
14/07/1962 Reallocation 65297 68B Dumfries 67B Hurlford  
14/07/1962 Reallocation 65307 STG Stirling 62A Thornton Junction  
16/07/1962 Condemned 65211 65C Parkhead   COND  
16/07/1962 Condemned 65300 EFD Eastfield   COND  
16/07/1962 Condemned 65306 65F Grangemouth   COND  
16/07/1962 Condemned 65310 65J Stirling   COND  
30/07/1962 Condemned 65313 63B Fort William   COND  
08/09/1962 Reallocation 65275 65K Polmont 65F Grangemouth  
08/09/1962 Reallocation 65335 65C Parkhead 65F Grangemouth  
29/09/1962 Reallocation 65285 KPS Kipps 65B St Rollox (Balornock)  
08/10/1962 Condemned 65210 KPS Kipps   COND  
08/10/1962 Condemned 65218 65A Eastfield   COND  
08/10/1962 Condemned 65217 65F Grangemouth   COND  
08/10/1962 Condemned 65230 65C Parkhead   COND  
08/10/1962 Condemned 65241 65E Kipps   COND  
08/10/1962 Condemned 65257 65F Grangemouth   COND  
08/10/1962 Condemned 65260 KPS Kipps   COND  
08/10/1962 Condemned 65304 65J Stirling   COND  
08/10/1962 Condemned 65334 STM St Margarets   COND  
25/10/1962 Condemned 65344 64A St Margarets   COND  
01/11/1962 Condemned 65268 64F Bathgate   COND  
10/11/1962 Condemned 65237 12C Carlisle Canal   COND  
10/11/1962 Condemned 65293 CAR Carlisle Canal   COND  
10/11/1962 Condemned 65312 CAR Carlisle Canal   COND  
10/11/1962 Condemned 65321 CAR Carlisle Canal   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 65228 EFD Eastfield   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 65275 65F Grangemouth   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 65303 65B St Rollox (Balornock)   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 65316 64F Bathgate   COND  
19/01/1963 Reallocation 65325 KPS Kipps 65B St Rollox (Balornock)  
19/01/1963 Reallocation 65338 62C Dunfermline Upper 62B Dundee Tay Bridge  
16/02/1963 Reallocation 65325 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 66B Motherwell  
16/02/1963 Reallocation 65331 64G Hawick 66B Motherwell  
16/02/1963 Reallocation 65338 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 62C Dunfermline Upper  
13/04/1963 Reallocation 65325 66B Motherwell 65D Dawsholm  
05/1963 Condemned 65224 STM St Margarets   COND  
05/1963 Condemned 65253 DFU Dunfermline Upper   COND  
11/05/1963 Reallocation 65285 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 65D Dawsholm  
11/05/1963 Reallocation 65287 KPS Kipps 65F Grangemouth  
06/1963 Condemned 65261 BGT Bathgate   COND  
06/1963 Condemned 65277 64F Bathgate   COND  
06/1963 Condemned 65287 65F Grangemouth   COND  
07/1963 Condemned 65341 BGT Bathgate   COND  
06/07/1963 Reallocation 65297 67B Hurlford 64A St Margarets  
06/07/1963 Reallocation 65297 64A St Margarets 64F Bathgate  
08/1963 Condemned 65290 64F Bathgate   COND  
08/1963 Condemned 65331 66B Motherwell   COND  
03/08/1963 Reallocation 65307 62A Thornton Junction 64F Bathgate  
03/08/1963 Reallocation 65329 64A St Margarets 64F Bathgate  
07/09/1963 Reallocation 65311 64E Polmont 65F Grangemouth  
05/10/1963 Reallocation 65243 HAY Haymarket 64C Dalry Road  
11/1963 Condemned 65214 67D Ardrossan   COND  
11/1963 Condemned 65222 65F Grangemouth   COND  
11/1963 Condemned 65251 64F Bathgate   COND  
11/1963 Condemned 65273 67D Ardrossan   COND  
11/1963 Condemned 65285 65D Dawsholm   COND  
11/1963 Condemned 65311 65F Grangemouth   COND  
11/1963 Condemned 65325 65D Dawsholm   COND  
11/1963 Condemned 65335 65F Grangemouth   COND  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 65311 98W   65K Polmont  
12/1963 Condemned 65265 BGT Bathgate   COND  
12/1963 Condemned 65307 64F Bathgate   COND  
12/1963 Condemned 65323 DFU Dunfermline Upper   COND  
12/1963 Condemned 65329 64F Bathgate   COND  
12/1963 Condemned 65338 62C Dunfermline Upper   COND  
28/12/1963 Reallocation 65288 STM St Margarets 62C Dunfermline Upper  
28/12/1963 Reallocation 65327 64A St Margarets 62C Dunfermline Upper  
25/01/1964 Reallocation 65243 64C Dalry Road 64F Bathgate  
06/1964 Condemned 65309 64F Bathgate   COND  
06/1964 Condemned 65346 STG Stirling   COND  
26/09/1964 Reallocation 65234 BGT Bathgate 64A St Margarets  
29/05/1965 Reallocation 65327 62C Dunfermline Upper 62A Thornton Junction  
13/11/1965 Condemned 65327 62A Thornton Junction   COND  
01/1966 Condemned 65282 BGT Bathgate   COND  
01/1966 Condemned 65297 64F Bathgate   COND  
29/01/1966 Reallocation 65319 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 64F Bathgate  
29/01/1966 Reallocation 65345 THJ Thornton Junction 64F Bathgate  
07/1966 Condemned 65243 64F Bathgate   COND  
09/1966 Condemned 65319 64F Bathgate   COND  
24/09/1966 Reallocation 65319 98W   64A St Margarets  
11/1966 Condemned 65267 64F Bathgate   COND  
31/12/1966 Reallocation 65345 64F Bathgate 62A Thornton Junction  
22/04/1967 Condemned 65234 64A St Margarets   COND  
06/1967 Condemned 65288 62C Dunfermline Upper   COND  
06/1967 Condemned 65345 62A Thornton Junction   COND