Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 124 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 2713 Week
» 24755 Month
» 131069 Year
» 642171 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NBR/LNER Holmes "J36" Class 0-6-0


Class NBR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
J36 604 9604 5210 65210 08/1888 KPS
W
Kipps
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
J36 605 9605     08/1888 W Withdrawn 11/1917
07/1919
06/1934
06/1934
J36 606 9606     08/1888 W Withdrawn 06/1933 06/1933
J36 607 9607     08/1888 W Withdrawn 08/1934 08/1934
J36 608 9608     08/1888 W Withdrawn 10/1917
04/1919
06/1937
06/1937
J36 609 9609     08/1888 W Withdrawn 05/1934 05/1934
J36 613 9613     07/1889 W Withdrawn 02/1936 02/1936
J36 614 9614     07/1889 W Withdrawn 12/1937 12/1937
J36 615 9615     07/1889 W Withdrawn 10/1917
06/1919
04/1935
04/1935
J36 616 9616     09/1889 W Withdrawn 09/1937 09/1937
J36 617 9617 5211 65211 09/1889 BGT
65C
W
Bathgate
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/05/1957
16/07/1962
16/07/1962
J36 618 9618     09/1889 W Withdrawn 02/1936 02/1936
J36 619 9619     10/1889 W Withdrawn 10/1935 10/1935
J36 620 9620     10/1889 W Withdrawn 10/1917
05/1919
06/1937
06/1937
J36 621 9621     10/1889 W Withdrawn 10/1917
06/1919
04/1937
04/1937
J36 622 9622 5213 65213 11/1889
PTH
61A
W
(Re-instd)
Perth (LNER)
Kittybrewster
Withdrawn
09/1939
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
04/1957
04/1957
J36 145 9145     11/1889 W Withdrawn 08/1935 08/1935
J36 172 9172 5212   11/1889
W
(Re-instd)
Withdrawn
01/1940
07/1947
07/1947
J36 623 9623 5214 65214 01/1890 PKD
65F
67D
W
Parkhead
Grangemouth
Ardrossan
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/11/1961
24/03/1962
11/1963
11/1963
J36 624 9624     01/1890 W Withdrawn 08/1937 08/1937
J36 625 9625 5215 65215 01/1890 KPS
W
Kipps
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1950
04/1950
J36 626 9626     01/1890 W Withdrawn 12/1935 12/1935
J36 627 9627     01/1890 W Withdrawn 11/1917
04/1919
04/1936
04/1936
J36 628 9628 5216 65216 01/1890
CAR
66A
65E
W
(Re-instd)
Carlisle Canal
Polmadie
Kipps
Withdrawn
10/1917
04/1919
09/1939
01/01/1948
22/12/1956
12/03/1960
30/04/1962
30/04/1962
J36 629 9629     03/1890 W Withdrawn 08/1937 08/1937
J36 630 9630     03/1890 W Withdrawn 03/1936 03/1936
J36 631 9631     03/1890 W Withdrawn 10/1917
06/1919
03/1939
03/1939
J36 632 9632 5218 65218 04/1890 THJ
65A
W
Thornton Junction
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/07/1960
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
J36 173 9173     04/1890 W Withdrawn 04/1936 04/1936
J36 176 9176 5217 65217 04/1890
STM
65F
W
(Re-instd)
St Margarets
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
10/1917
05/1919
10/1939
01/01/1948
13/02/1960
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
J36 643 9643 5219   02/1891 W Withdrawn 10/1917
05/1919
07/1947
07/1947
J36 644 9644 5220 65220 02/1891 POL
W
Polmont
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/03/1948
23/03/1948
J36 645 9645 5221 65221 02/1891 EFD
61A
W
Eastfield
Kittybrewster
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/03/1959
07/1959
07/1959
J36 646 9646 5222 65222 02/1891 POL
65F
W
Polmont
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
10/1917
05/1919
01/01/1948
11/03/1961
11/1963
11/1963
J36 647 9647 5223   02/1891 W Withdrawn 10/1917
06/1919
09/1947
09/1947
J36 648 9648 5224 65224 02/1891 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
10/1917
05/1919
01/01/1948
05/1963
05/1963
J36 649 9649 5225 65225 04/1891 BGT
W
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1957
10/1957
J36 650 9650 5226 65226 04/1891 KPS
W
Kipps
Withdrawn
10/1917
05/1919
01/01/1948
04/1951
04/1951
J36 651 9651 5227 65227 05/1891 EFD
61A
61A
61C
61A
61B
64F
W
Eastfield
Kittybrewster
Kittybrewster
Keith
Kittybrewster
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/03/1959
11/04/1959
29/08/1959
26/09/1959
01/07/1961
01/07/1961
08/1961
08/1961
J36 652 9652 5228 65228 05/1891 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
J36 653 9653 5229 65229 05/1891 BGT
W
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1960
05/1960
J36 654 9654 5230 65230 05/1891 BGT
65C
W
Bathgate
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/10/1959
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
J36 655 9655 5231 65231 07/1891 BGT
W
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1952
04/1952
J36 656 9656 5232 65232 07/1891 HAW
66A
65E
W
Hawick
Polmadie
Kipps
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/12/1956
12/03/1960
10/1961
10/1961
J36 657 9657 5233 65233 07/1891 POL
64G
64F
W
Polmont
Hawick
Bathgate
Withdrawn
10/1917
05/1919
01/01/1948
22/11/1958
19/12/1959
12/1960
12/1960
J36 658 9658 5234 65234 07/1891 BGT
64A
W
Bathgate
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/09/1964
22/04/1967
22/04/1967
J36 659 9659 5235 65235 08/1891 BGT
64B
W
Bathgate
Haymarket
Withdrawn
10/1917
04/1919
01/01/1948
17/05/1952
10/1961
10/1961
J36 660 9660 5236 65236 08/1891 KPS
W
Kipps
Withdrawn
10/1917
06/1919
01/01/1948
04/1956
04/1956
J36 661 9661     11/1891 W Withdrawn 11/1917
04/1919
01/1939
01/1939
J36 662 9662     11/1891 W Withdrawn 11/1917
04/1919
04/1937
04/1937
J36 179 9179     11/1891 W Withdrawn 12/1937 12/1937
J36 45 9045 5246 65246 12/1891 POL
65F
65C
W
Polmont
Grangemouth
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/01/1959
26/09/1959
11/01/1962
11/01/1962
J36 68 9068 5247 65247 12/1891 KPS
61B
61A
61B
61C
W
Kipps
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Kittybrewster
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Keith
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
07/08/1954
31/08/1957
21/12/1957
07/1959
07/1959
J36 183 9183 5248 65248 12/1891 BGT
W
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1956
05/1956
J36 663 9663 5237 65237 10/1891 FW
65A
12C
W
Fort William
Eastfield
Carlisle Canal
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/07/1957
13/12/1958
10/11/1962
10/11/1962
J36 664 9664 5238 65238 10/1891 KPS
W
Kipps
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1951
07/1951
J36 665 9665     10/1891 W Withdrawn 04/1931 04/1931
J36 666 9666     10/1891 W Withdrawn 10/1917
06/1919
11/1935
11/1935
J36 667 9667 5239 65239 10/1891 DFU
65C
W
Dunfermline Upper
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/05/1960
01/1961
01/1961
J36 668 9668 5240 65240 11/1891 HAY
W
Haymarket
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1952
05/1952
J36 669 9669 5241 65241 11/1891 POL
65F
65E
W
Polmont
Grangemouth
Kipps
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/01/1959
13/02/1960
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
J36 670 9670 5242 65242 11/1891 HAW
64A
61B
W
61A
Hawick
St Margarets
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Withdrawn
Kittybrewster
01/01/1948
26/12/1953
21/01/1956
08/1957
31/08/1957
08/1957
J36 671 9671     11/1891 W Withdrawn 07/1937 07/1937
J36 672 9672     12/1891 W Withdrawn 01/1931 01/1931
J36 673 9673 5243 65243 12/1891 HAY
64C
64F
W
Haymarket
Dalry Road
Bathgate
Withdrawn
11/1917
06/1919
01/01/1948
05/10/1963
25/01/1964
07/1966
07/1966
J36 674 9674     12/1891 W Withdrawn 04/1943 04/1943
J36 675 9675 5244 65244 12/1891 POL
W
Polmont
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1957
08/1957
J36 676 9676     12/1891 W Withdrawn 10/1917
07/1919
10/1926
10/1926
J36 677 9677 5245 65245 12/1891 KPS
W
Kipps
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1951
05/1951
J36 678 9678 5249 65249 02/1892 KPS
W
Kipps
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1960
10/1960
J36 679 9679 5250 65250 02/1892 BGT
W
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1957
02/1957
J36 680 9680 5251 65251 02/1892 STM
61A
61C
64F
W
St Margarets
Kittybrewster
Keith
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/05/1957
11/02/1961
01/07/1961
11/1963
11/1963
J36 681 9681 5252 65252 02/1892 DFU
62A
W
Dunfermline Upper
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/01/1951
05/1960
05/1960
J36 682 9682 5253 65253 02/1892 DFU
W
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
11/1917
05/1919
01/01/1948
05/1963
05/1963
J36 683 9683 5254 65254 02/1892 BGT
W
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1951
04/1951
J36 684 9684 5255 65255 02/1892 KPS
W
Kipps
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1951
09/1951
J36 685 9685 5256 65256 02/1892 KPS
W
Kipps
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/04/1948
14/04/1948
J36 686 9686 5257 65257 02/1892 POL
65F
W
Polmont
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1962
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
J36 687 9687 5258 65258 02/1892 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/03/1962
05/03/1962
J36 688 9688 5259 65259 02/1892 HAW
64F
W
Hawick
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/11/1955
07/1959
07/1959
J36 689 9689 5260 65260 03/1892 KPS
W
Kipps
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
J36 690 9690 5261 65261 03/1892 BGT
W
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1963
06/1963
J36 691 9691     03/1892 W Withdrawn 06/1945 06/1945
J36 692 9692 5263   03/1892 W Withdrawn 10/1946 10/1946
J36 247 9247 5264 65264 07/1892 KPS
W
Kipps
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1952
07/1952
J36 248 9248 5265 65265 07/1892 BGT
W
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1963
12/1963
J36 357 9357 5266 65266 07/1892 KPS
W
Kipps
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/05/1962
21/05/1962
J36 358 9358 5267 65267 07/1892 STM
61B
61C
64F
W
St Margarets
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Keith
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/11/1955
12/05/1956
01/07/1961
11/1966
11/1966
J36 611 9611 5268 65268 08/1892 POL
64F
W
Polmont
Bathgate
Withdrawn
11/1917
06/1919
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
01/11/1962
01/11/1962
J36 612 9612 5269   08/1892 W Withdrawn 10/1917
06/1919
07/1947
07/1947
J36 177 9177 5274 65274 01/1893 PKD
W
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1950
12/1950
J36 180 9180 5275 65275 01/1893 POL
64G
65K
65F
W
Polmont
Hawick
Polmont
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/08/1958
27/01/1962
08/09/1962
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
J36 181 9181 5270 65270 03/1893 EFD
65C
W
Eastfield
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/07/1957
02/1958
02/1958
J36 182 9182 5271 65271 03/1893 BGT
W
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1952
08/1952
J36 250 9250 5272   03/1893 W Withdrawn 08/1947 08/1947
J36 280 9280 5273 65273 03/1893 EFD
65C
67D
W
Eastfield
Parkhead
Ardrossan
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/04/1958
24/03/1962
11/1963
11/1963
J36 705 9705 5276 65276 06/1896 BGT
W
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1961
03/1961
J36 706 9706 5277 65277 06/1896 BGT
61C
64F
W
Bathgate
Keith
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/09/1959
06/05/1961
06/1963
06/1963
J36 707 9707 5278 65278 06/1896 BGT
W
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/1952
01/1952
J36 708 9708 5279 65279 06/1896 HAW
W
Hawick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1951
03/1951
J36 709 9709 5280 65280 06/1896 BGT
64E
W
Bathgate
Polmont
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/12/1956
21/05/1962
21/05/1962
J36 710 9710 5281 65281 06/1896 STG
64F
W
Stirling
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/10/1960
07/1961
07/1961
J36 711 9711 5282 65282 11/1896 BGT
W
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/1966
01/1966
J36 712 9712 5283 65283 11/1896 PKD
W
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1952
12/1952
J36 713 9713 5284   11/1896 W Withdrawn 07/1947 07/1947
J36 714 9714 5285 65285 11/1896 KPS
65B
65D
W
Kipps
St Rollox (Balornock)
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/09/1962
11/05/1963
11/1963
11/1963
J36 715 9715 5286 65286 12/1896 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1952
02/1952
J36 716 9716 5287 65287 12/1896 KPS
65F
W
Kipps
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/05/1963
06/1963
06/1963
J36 717 9717 5288 65288 04/1897 STM
62C
W
St Margarets
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/12/1963
06/1967
06/1967
J36 718 9718 5289 65289 04/1897 KPS
W
Kipps
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1948
03/1948
J36 719 9719 5290 65290 04/1897 POL
64F
W
Polmont
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/12/1956
08/1963
08/1963
J36 720 9720 5291 65291 05/1897 THJ
W
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1950
11/1950
J36 721 9721 5292 65292 05/1897 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1951
02/1951
J36 722 9722 5293 65293 06/1897 CAR
W
Carlisle Canal
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/11/1962
10/11/1962
J36 723 9723 5294 65294 07/1897 KPS
W
Kipps
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1950
03/1950
J36 724 9724 5295 65295 07/1897 BLA
65C
W
Blaydon
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
04/1961
04/1961
J36 725 9725 5296 65296 07/1897 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/02/1962
26/02/1962
J36 726 9726 5297 65297 07/1897 PTH
61C
61A
61B
68B
65D
68B
67B
64A
64F
W
Perth (LNER)
Keith
Kittybrewster
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Dumfries
Dawsholm
Dumfries
Hurlford
St Margarets
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/10/1956
11/04/1959
01/07/1961
26/08/1961
30/12/1961
24/03/1962
14/07/1962
06/07/1963
06/07/1963
01/1966
01/1966
J36 727 9727 5298 65298 07/1897 PKD
W
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1951
03/1951
J36 728 9728 5299   07/1897 W Withdrawn 10/1947 10/1947
J36 741 9741     10/1898 W Withdrawn 05/1943 05/1943
J36 742 9742 5300 65300 10/1898 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1962
16/07/1962
J36 743 9743 5301   10/1898 W Withdrawn 02/1947 02/1947
J36 744 9744 5302   10/1898 W Withdrawn 07/1947 07/1947
J36 745 9745 5303 65303 10/1898 BGT
61A
61B
65B
W
Bathgate
Kittybrewster
Aberdeen Ferryhill
St Rollox (Balornock)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/06/1956
01/07/1961
26/08/1961
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
J36 746 9746 5304 65304 10/1898 CAR
66A
61A
61C
61B
65B
65J
W
Carlisle Canal
Polmadie
Kittybrewster
Keith
Aberdeen Ferryhill
St Rollox (Balornock)
Stirling
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/12/1956
16/03/1957
13/04/1957
01/07/1961
26/08/1961
21/10/1961
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
J36 747 9747 5305 65305 12/1898 STM
61B
61C
64F
W
St Margarets
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Keith
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/03/1959
12/03/1960
06/05/1961
26/02/1962
26/02/1962
J36 748 9748 5306 65306 01/1899 POL
65F
W
Polmont
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/03/1961
16/07/1962
16/07/1962
J36 749 9749 5307 65307 01/1899 STG
62A
64F
W
Stirling
Thornton Junction
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/07/1962
03/08/1963
12/1963
12/1963
J36 750 9750 5308 65308 01/1899 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1951
06/1951
J36 751 9751 5309 65309 01/1899 PTH
64F
W
Perth (LNER)
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/10/1960
06/1964
06/1964
J36 752 9752 5310 65310 01/1899 STM
61B
61C
61B
65B
65J
W
St Margarets
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Keith
Aberdeen Ferryhill
St Rollox (Balornock)
Stirling
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/03/1959
11/04/1959
01/07/1961
29/07/1961
21/10/1961
16/07/1962
16/07/1962
J36 753 9753 5311 65311 03/1899 STM
64C
64A
64E
65F
W
65K
St Margarets
Dalry Road
St Margarets
Polmont
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
Polmont
01/01/1948
19/05/1951
01/11/1952
09/06/1956
07/09/1963
11/1963
02/11/1963
11/1963
J36 754 9754 5312 65312 03/1899 CAR
W
Carlisle Canal
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/11/1962
10/11/1962
J36 755 9755 5313 65313 03/1899 POL
65A
63B
W
Polmont
Eastfield
Fort William
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/03/1961
11/03/1961
30/07/1962
30/07/1962
J36 756 9756 5314 65314 04/1899 BGT
W
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1955
08/1955
J36 757 9757 5315 65315 04/1899 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/04/1962
30/04/1962
J36 758 9758 5316 65316 04/1899 STM
64G
64E
64G
64F
W
St Margarets
Hawick
Polmont
Hawick
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/04/1951
02/08/1958
23/09/1961
16/06/1962
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
J36 759 9759 5317 65317 05/1899 HAW
W
Hawick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1960
07/1960
J36 760 9760 5318 65318 05/1899 BGT
W
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/05/1962
31/05/1962
J36 761 9761 5319 65319 05/1899 DEE
64F
W
64A
Dundee Tay Bridge
Bathgate
Withdrawn
St Margarets
01/01/1948
29/01/1966
09/1966
24/09/1966
09/1966
J36 762 9762 5320 65320 05/1899 DFU
65C
W
Dunfermline Upper
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/05/1960
30/04/1962
30/04/1962
J36 763 9763 5321 65321 05/1899 CAR
W
Carlisle Canal
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/11/1962
10/11/1962
J36 764 9764 5322 65322 06/1899 STG
W
Stirling
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1951
07/1951
J36 771 9771 5323 65323 01/1900 DFU
W
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1963
12/1963
J36 772 9772 5324 65324 01/1900 PKD
W
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1957
02/1957
J36 773 9773 5325 65325 01/1900 KPS
65B
66B
65D
W
Kipps
St Rollox (Balornock)
Motherwell
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/01/1963
16/02/1963
13/04/1963
11/1963
11/1963
J36 774 9774 5326   01/1900 W Withdrawn 10/1946 10/1946
J36 775 9775 5327 65327 01/1900 BGT
64A
62C
62A
W
Bathgate
St Margarets
Dunfermline Upper
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
28/12/1963
29/05/1965
13/11/1965
13/11/1965
J36 776 9776 5328 65328 01/1900 DEE
W
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1948
03/1948
J36 777 9777 5329 65329 03/1900 POL
64A
64F
W
Polmont
St Margarets
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1951
03/08/1963
12/1963
12/1963
J36 778 9778 5330 65330 03/1900 DEE
64G
W
Dundee Tay Bridge
Hawick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/10/1960
18/06/1962
18/06/1962
J36 779 9779 5331 65331 03/1900 BLA
64F
64G
66B
W
Blaydon
Bathgate
Hawick
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1951
17/05/1952
16/02/1963
08/1963
08/1963
J36 780 9780 5332   03/1900 W Withdrawn 08/1947 08/1947
J36 781 9781 5333 65333 05/1900 DEE
W
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1959
09/1959
J36 782 9782 5334 65334 05/1900 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
J36 783 9783 5335 65335 07/1900 EFD
65D
65C
65F
W
Eastfield
Dawsholm
Parkhead
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/12/1960
19/05/1962
08/09/1962
11/1963
11/1963
J36 784 9784 5336   07/1900 W Withdrawn 10/1947 10/1947
J36 785 9785 5337 65337 07/1900 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1948
04/1948
J36 786 9786 5338 65338 07/1900 POL
64A
61A
61C
61B
62C
62B
62C
W
Polmont
St Margarets
Kittybrewster
Keith
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Dunfermline Upper
Dundee Tay Bridge
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/06/1956
26/10/1957
11/04/1959
01/07/1961
29/07/1961
19/01/1963
16/02/1963
12/1963
12/1963
J36 787 9787 5339 65339 07/1900 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1961
03/1961
J36 788 9788 5340 65340 07/1900 HAW
W
Hawick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/1952
01/1952
J36 789 9789 5341 65341 12/1900 BGT
W
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1963
07/1963
J36 790 9790 5342 65342 12/1900 BGT
W
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1960
02/1960
J36 791 9791 5343 65343 12/1900 BLA
65E
W
Blaydon
Kipps
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1951
02/1960
02/1960
J36 792 9792 5344 65344 12/1900 BGT
64A
W
Bathgate
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/09/1960
25/10/1962
25/10/1962
J36 793 9793 5345 65345 12/1900 THJ
64F
62A
W
Thornton Junction
Bathgate
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/01/1966
31/12/1966
06/1967
06/1967
J36 794 9794 5346 65346 12/1900 STG
W
Stirling
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1964
06/1964