NER/LNER Worsdell "J26" Class 0-6-0
Class | NER | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
J26 | 132 | 5730 | 65730 | 06/1904 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 21/01/1959 |
21/01/1959 |
J26 | 243 | 5731 | 65731 | 06/1904 | NPT 51F W |
Newport (Teeside) West Auckland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/10/1955 18/06/1962 |
18/06/1962 |
J26 | 342 | 5732 | 65732 | 06/1904 | WHL NPT 51L W |
West Hartlepool Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 14/06/1958 04/11/1959 |
04/11/1959 |
J26 | 434 | 5733 | 65733 | 06/1904 | MID 51B 51B 51F W |
Middlesbrough Newport (Teeside) Newport (Teeside) West Auckland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/12/1951 19/01/1952 22/10/1955 02/01/1959 |
02/01/1959 |
J26 | 442 | 5734 | 65734 | 06/1904 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 14/10/1958 |
14/10/1958 |
J26 | 543 | 5735 | 65735 | 06/1904 | NPT 51F W |
Newport (Teeside) West Auckland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/10/1955 18/06/1962 |
18/06/1962 |
J26 | 554 | 5736 | 65736 | 06/1904 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 20/02/1961 |
20/02/1961 |
J26 | 555 | 5737 | 65737 | 06/1904 | NPT 51D 51D 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Middlesbrough Middlesbrough Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/12/1951 19/01/1952 14/06/1958 20/10/1959 |
20/10/1959 |
J26 | 1159 | 5738 | 65738 | 06/1904 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 04/02/1959 |
04/02/1959 |
J26 | 1172 | 5739 | 65739 | 06/1904 | NPT 51E 51E W |
Newport (Teeside) Stockton Stockton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/02/1951 24/03/1951 04/02/1959 |
04/02/1959 |
J26 | 1043 | 5740 | 65740 | 09/1904 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 28/01/1959 |
28/01/1959 |
J26 | 1057 | 5741 | 65741 | 10/1904 | 51L W |
Thornaby Withdrawn |
14/06/1958 23/10/1961 |
23/10/1961 |
J26 | 1098 | 5742 | 65742 | 10/1904 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 21/02/1959 |
21/02/1959 |
J26 | 1130 | 5743 | 65743 | 10/1904 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 04/06/1962 |
04/06/1962 |
J26 | 1369 | 5744 | 65744 | 10/1904 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 21/02/1959 |
21/02/1959 |
J26 | 1671 | 5745 | 65745 | 11/1904 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 11/12/1961 |
11/12/1961 |
J26 | 1674 | 5746 | 65746 | 11/1904 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 19/07/1958 |
19/07/1958 |
J26 | 1676 | 5747 | 65747 | 11/1904 | WHL 51E 51L W |
West Hartlepool Stockton Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/05/1959 20/06/1959 16/04/1962 |
16/04/1962 |
J26 | 1678 | 5748 | 65748 | 12/1904 | WHL W |
West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/01/1959 |
15/01/1959 |
J26 | 1773 | 5749 | 65749 | 12/1904 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 05/03/1959 |
05/03/1959 |
J26 | 835 | 5753 | 65753 | 05/1905 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 15/05/1961 |
15/05/1961 |
J26 | 881 | 5754 | 65754 | 05/1905 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 19/07/1958 |
19/07/1958 |
J26 | 1146 | 5755 | 65755 | 05/1905 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 04/06/1962 |
04/06/1962 |
J26 | 1390 | 5763 | 65763 | 06/1905 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 29/01/1962 |
29/01/1962 |
J26 | 1194 | 5764 | 65764 | 06/1905 | MID 51E 51E W |
Middlesbrough Stockton Stockton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1952 21/06/1952 04/03/1959 |
04/03/1959 |
J26 | 1200 | 5765 | 65765 | 06/1905 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 19/07/1958 |
19/07/1958 |
J26 | 1202 | 5766 | 65766 | 06/1905 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 18/02/1959 |
18/02/1959 |
J26 | 1208 | 5767 | 65767 | 06/1905 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 19/07/1958 |
19/07/1958 |
J26 | 1370 | 5768 | 65768 | 06/1905 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 04/06/1962 |
04/06/1962 |
J26 | 1781 | 5769 | 65769 | 06/1905 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 23/10/1961 |
23/10/1961 |
J26 | 1360 | 5750 | 65750 | 04/1905 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 18/02/1959 |
18/02/1959 |
J26 | 1670 | 5751 | 65751 | 04/1905 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 08/01/1962 |
08/01/1962 |
J26 | 816 | 5752 | 65752 | 05/1905 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 19/07/1958 |
19/07/1958 |
J26 | 1673 | 5756 | 65756 | 05/1905 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 04/06/1962 |
04/06/1962 |
J26 | 1698 | 5757 | 65757 | 05/1905 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 16/04/1962 |
16/04/1962 |
J26 | 67 | 5758 | 65758 | 06/1905 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 22/01/1959 |
22/01/1959 |
J26 | 233 | 5759 | 65759 | 06/1905 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 28/01/1959 |
28/01/1959 |
J26 | 379 | 5760 | 65760 | 06/1905 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 24/07/1961 |
24/07/1961 |
J26 | 406 | 5761 | 65761 | 06/1905 | 51L W |
Thornaby Withdrawn |
14/06/1958 18/06/1962 |
18/06/1962 |
J26 | 1139 | 5762 | 65762 | 06/1905 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 03/01/1961 |
03/01/1961 |
J26 | 412 | 5770 | 65770 | 09/1905 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 25/02/1959 |
25/02/1959 |
J26 | 1366 | 5771 | 65771 | 09/1905 | MID 51E 51E W |
Middlesbrough Stockton Stockton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1952 21/06/1952 15/01/1959 |
15/01/1959 |
J26 | 438 | 5772 | 65772 | 10/1905 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 18/06/1962 |
18/06/1962 |
J26 | 517 | 5773 | 65773 | 10/1905 | NPT 51L 51E 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Stockton Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 07/02/1959 20/06/1959 18/06/1962 |
18/06/1962 |
J26 | 525 | 5774 | 65774 | 10/1905 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 31/07/1961 |
31/07/1961 |
J26 | 765 | 5775 | 65775 | 11/1905 | MID 51L W |
Middlesbrough Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 25/02/1959 |
25/02/1959 |
J26 | 818 | 5776 | 65776 | 11/1905 | MID 51L W |
Middlesbrough Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 18/06/1962 |
18/06/1962 |
J26 | 831 | 5777 | 65777 | 11/1905 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 05/09/1960 |
05/09/1960 |
J26 | 1131 | 5778 | 65778 | 12/1905 | NPT 51L W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 31/07/1961 |
31/07/1961 |
J26 | 1777 | 5779 | 65779 | 12/1905 | MID 51L W |
Middlesbrough Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 27/03/1961 |
27/03/1961 |