GCR/LNER Robinson "J11" Class 0-6-0 - 'Pom-Pom'
GCR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Rebuilt To | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1047 | 6047 | 4324 | 64324 | 10/1902 | 23/09/1962 | 59.92 | |||||||
205 | 5205 | 4332 | 64332 | 10/1903 | 23/09/1962 | 58.92 | |||||||
206 | 5206 | 4333 | 64333 | 10/1903 | 09/08/1962 | 58.83 | |||||||
225 | 5225 | 4346 | 64346 | 04/1904 | 23/09/1962 | 58.42 | |||||||
231 | 5231 | 4352 | 64352 | 04/1904 | 29/08/1961 | 57.33 | |||||||
177 | 5177 | 4354 | 64354 | 11/1903 | 21/10/1962 | 58.92 | |||||||
208 | 5208 | 4359 | 64359 | 02/1904 | 15/04/1961 | 57.17 | |||||||
232 | 5232 | 4362 | 64362 | 04/1904 | 23/09/1962 | 58.42 | |||||||
240 | 5240 | 4364 | 64364 | 07/1904 | 25/07/1961 | 57 | |||||||
244 | 5244 | 4373 | 64373 | 07/1904 | 23/09/1962 | 58.17 | |||||||
246 | 5246 | 4375 | 64375 | 07/1904 | 15/09/1962 | 58.17 | |||||||
250 | 5250 | 4379 | 64379 | 08/1904 | 23/09/1962 | 58.08 | |||||||
1078 | 6078 | 4386 | 64386 | 08/1905 | 23/09/1962 | 57.08 | |||||||
1117 | 6117 | 4393 | 64393 | 07/1906 | 26/06/1962 | 55.92 | |||||||
1118 | 6118 | 4394 | 64394 | 08/1906 | 24/08/1962 | 56 | |||||||
1119 | 6119 | 4395 | 64395 | 08/1906 | 31/01/1962 | 55.42 | |||||||
287 | 5287 | 4402 | 64402 | 03/1907 | 25/07/1961 | 54.33 | |||||||
291 | 5291 | 4406 | 64406 | 04/1907 | 23/09/1962 | 55.42 | |||||||
302 | 5302 | 4417 | 64417 | 08/1907 | 29/08/1961 | 54 | |||||||
303 | 5303 | 4418 | 64418 | 08/1907 | 25/11/1961 | 54.25 | |||||||
305 | 5305 | 4420 | 64420 | 09/1907 | 09/06/1962 | 54.75 | |||||||
313 | 5313 | 4427 | 64427 | 11/1907 | 25/07/1961 | 53.67 | |||||||
326 | 5326 | 4439 | 64439 | 05/1908 | 25/02/1961 | 52.75 | |||||||
328 | 5328 | 4441 | 64441 | 09/1908 | 10/02/1961 | 52.42 | |||||||
329 | 5329 | 4442 | 64442 | 10/1908 | 23/09/1962 | 53.92 | |||||||
952 | 5952 | 4450 | 64450 | 04/1910 | 06/04/1962 | 52 |