GNR/LNER Ivatt "J6" Class 0-6-0
GNR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
521 | 3521 | 4170 | 64170 | 08/1911 | 03/07/1961 | 49.92 | 49.95 | |||||
522 | 3522 | 4171 | 64171 | 09/1911 | 20/09/1961 | 50 | 50.12 | |||||
523 | 3523 | 4172 | 64172 | 09/1911 | 07/03/1960 | 48.5 | 48.53 | |||||
524 | 3524 | 4173 | 64173 | 10/1911 | 11/01/1961 | 49.25 | 49.29 | |||||
525 | 3525 | 4174 | 64174 | 10/1911 | 20/09/1961 | 49.92 | 50.04 | |||||
526 | 3526 | 4175 | 64175 | 10/1911 | 01/06/1960 | 48.67 | 48.78 | |||||
527 | 3527 | 4176 | 64176 | 11/1911 | 24/03/1959 | 47.33 | 47.53 | |||||
528 | 3528 | 4177 | 64177 | 11/1911 | 21/02/1962 | 50.25 | 50.29 | |||||
529 | 3529 | 4178 | 64178 | 11/1911 | 27/04/1960 | 48.42 | 48.53 | |||||
530 | 3530 | 4179 | 64179 | 11/1911 | 05/05/1960 | 48.5 | 48.53 | |||||
531 | 3531 | 4180 | 64180 | 11/1911 | 03/03/1960 | 48.33 | 48.45 | |||||
532 | 3532 | 4181 | 64181 | 11/1911 | 01/08/1959 | 47.75 | 47.78 | |||||
533 | 3533 | 4182 | 64182 | 12/1911 | 29/11/1960 | 48.92 | 49.04 | |||||
534 | 3534 | 4183 | 64183 | 12/1911 | 08/11/1958 | 46.92 | 47.12 | |||||
535 | 3535 | 4184 | 64184 | 12/1911 | 20/11/1959 | 47.92 | 48.03 |