GNR/LNER Ivatt "J5" Class 0-6-0
GNR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 3021 | 5480 | 65480 | 06/1910 | 25/10/1954 | 44.33 | ||||||
22 | 3022 | 5481 | 65481 | 06/1910 | 26/10/1953 | 43.33 | ||||||
23 | 3023 | 5482 | 65482 | 06/1910 | 02/11/1953 | 43.42 | ||||||
24 | 3024 | 5483 | 65483 | 06/1910 | 31/12/1955 | 45.5 | ||||||
25 | 3025 | 5484 | 65484 | 06/1910 | 09/03/1953 | 42.75 | ||||||
26 | 3026 | 5485 | 65485 | 07/1910 | 06/12/1954 | 44.42 | ||||||
27 | 3027 | 5486 | 65486 | 06/1910 | 13/12/1954 | 44.5 | ||||||
28 | 3028 | 5487 | 65487 | 07/1910 | 08/06/1953 | 42.92 | ||||||
29 | 3029 | 5488 | 65488 | 07/1910 | 19/10/1953 | 43.25 | ||||||
30 | 3030 | 5489 | 65489 | 07/1910 | 07/12/1953 | 43.42 | ||||||
31 | 3031 | 5490 | 65490 | 10/1909 | 11/10/1954 | 45 | ||||||
32 | 3032 | 5491 | 65491 | 11/1909 | 12/10/1953 | 43.92 | ||||||
33 | 3033 | 5492 | 65492 | 11/1909 | 28/09/1953 | 43.83 | ||||||
34 | 3034 | 5493 | 65493 | 11/1909 | 02/08/1954 | 44.75 | ||||||
35 | 3035 | 5494 | 65494 | 12/1909 | 20/01/1955 | 45.08 | ||||||
36 | 3036 | 5495 | 65495 | 12/1909 | 09/08/1954 | 44.67 | ||||||
37 | 3037 | 5496 | 65496 | 12/1909 | 08/02/1954 | 44.17 | ||||||
38 | 3038 | 5497 | 65497 | 12/1909 | 23/11/1953 | 43.92 | ||||||
39 | 3039 | 5498 | 65498 | 12/1909 | 30/12/1955 | 46 | ||||||
40 | 3040 | 5499 | 65499 | 01/1910 | 20/04/1953 | 43.25 |