GNR/LNER Ivatt "J2" Class 0-6-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/1946 | Condemned | 5024 | COND | ||||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 5015 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 5016 | BOS | Boston | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 5017 | BOS | Boston | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 5018 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 5019 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 5020 | BOS | Boston | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 5021 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 5022 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 5023 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | |||
11/06/1949 | Reallocation | 5018 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | CLK | Colwick | |
11/06/1949 | Reallocation | 5019 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | CLK | Colwick | |
05/11/1949 | Reallocation | 5018 | CLK | Colwick | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | |
05/11/1949 | Reallocation | 5019 | CLK | Colwick | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | |
31/05/1950 | Reallocation | 65023 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | 38A | Colwick | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 65023 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 5018 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | 38A | Colwick | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 5019 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | 38A | Colwick | |
11/1950 | Condemned | 65021 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | COND | ||
29/09/1951 | Reallocation | 65015 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | 38A | Colwick | |
20/10/1951 | Reallocation | 65015 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
02/03/1953 | Condemned | 65019 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
19/10/1953 | Condemned | 65016 | BOS | Boston | COND | ||
09/11/1953 | Condemned | 65023 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
16/11/1953 | Condemned | 65018 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
14/12/1953 | Condemned | 65015 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
14/12/1953 | Condemned | 65022 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | COND | ||
01/1954 | Condemned | 65017 | BOS | Boston | COND | ||
12/07/1954 | Condemned | 65020 | BOS | Boston | COND |