Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 147 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6454 Week
» 21568 Month
» 324758 Year
» 1546323 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GNR/LNER Ivatt "J2" Class 0-6-0


Class GNR LNER (1946) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
J2 71 5015 65015 08/1912 LEI
38A
W
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/10/1951
14/12/1953
14/12/1953
J2 72 5016 65016 08/1912 BOS
W
Boston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/10/1953
19/10/1953
J2 73 5017 66017 08/1912 BOS
W
Boston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/1954
01/1954
J2 74 5018 65018 09/1912 LEI
W
Leicester (G.C.)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/11/1953
16/11/1953
J2 75 5019 65019 09/1912 LEI
W
Leicester (G.C.)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/03/1953
02/03/1953
J2 76 5020 65020 09/1912 BOS
W
Boston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1954
12/07/1954
J2 77 5021 65021 09/1912 LEI
W
Leicester (G.C.)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1950
11/1950
J2 78 5022 65022 10/1912 LEI
W
Leicester (G.C.)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/12/1953
14/12/1953
J2 79 5023 65023 10/1912 LEI
38A
W
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/05/1950
09/11/1953
09/11/1953
J2 80 5024   10/1912 W Withdrawn 07/1946 07/1946