GNR/LNER Ivatt "J1" Class 0-6-0
Class | GNR | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
J1 | 1 | 5000 | 08/1908 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1947 | 08/1947 | |
J1 | 2 | 5001 | 09/1908 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1947 | 08/1947 | |
J1 | 3 | 5002 | 65002 | 09/1908 | NWE 38A 38A W |
New England Colwick Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/11/1952 29/11/1952 21/08/1954 |
21/08/1954 |
J1 | 4 | 5003 | 65003 | 09/1908 | CLK HIT W |
Colwick Hitchin (GNR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 12/01/1953 |
12/01/1953 |
J1 | 5 | 5004 | 65004 | 09/1908 | NWE 38A W |
New England Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/05/1952 17/11/1952 |
17/11/1952 |
J1 | 6 | 5005 | 65005 | 09/1908 | NWE W |
New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/05/1952 |
19/05/1952 |
J1 | 7 | 5006 | 65006 | 10/1908 | NWE W |
New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1951 |
07/1951 |
J1 | 8 | 5007 | 65007 | 10/1908 | LEI CLK W |
Leicester (G.C.) Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 04/02/1952 |
04/02/1952 |
J1 | 9 | 5008 | 65008 | 10/1908 | CLK W |
Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/03/1952 |
24/03/1952 |
J1 | 10 | 5009 | 65009 | 10/1908 | LEI CLK LEI 38A W |
Leicester (G.C.) Colwick Leicester (G.C.) Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 11/12/1948 02/07/1950 31/03/1952 |
31/03/1952 |
J1 | 11 | 5010 | 65010 | 10/1908 | CLK HIT W |
Colwick Hitchin (GNR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 19/01/1953 |
19/01/1953 |
J1 | 12 | 5011 | 11/1908 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1947 | 08/1947 | |
J1 | 13 | 5012 | 11/1908 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1947 | 08/1947 | |
J1 | 14 | 5013 | 65013 | 11/1908 | CLK HIT W |
Colwick Hitchin (GNR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 22/11/1954 |
22/11/1954 |
J1 | 15 | 5014 | 65014 | 11/1908 | CLK W |
Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/08/1953 |
05/08/1953 |