LNER Gresley "D49" Class 4-4-0
Class | Number | Built | Name | Name Date | Notes | Removed | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shire/Hunt | 234 | 29/10/1927 | YORKSHIRE | 29/10/1927 | 08/10/1958 | 08/10/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 251 | 26/11/1927 | DERBYSHIRE | 26/11/1927 | 24/09/1959 | 24/09/1959 | |
Shire/Hunt | 253 | 11/1927 | OXFORDSHIRE | 11/1927 | 12/11/1958 | 12/11/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 256 | 08/12/1927 | HERTFORDSHIRE | 08/12/1927 | 24/06/1958 | 24/06/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 264 | 14/12/1927 | STIRLINGSHIRE | 14/12/1927 | 18/08/1958 | 18/08/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 265 | 22/12/1927 | LANARKSHIRE | 22/12/1927 | 30/11/1959 | 30/11/1959 | |
Shire/Hunt | 266 | 28/12/1927 | FORFARSHIRE | 28/12/1927 | 03/02/1958 | 03/02/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 236 | 14/01/1928 | LANCASHIRE | 14/01/1928 | 06/10/1959 | 06/10/1959 | |
Shire/Hunt | 270 | 20/01/1928 | ARGYLLSHIRE | 20/01/1928 | 04/05/1959 | 04/05/1959 | |
Shire/Hunt | 277 | 24/01/1928 | BERWICKSHIRE | 24/01/1928 | 01/01/1960 | 01/01/1960 | |
Shire/Hunt | 245 | 07/02/1928 | LINCOLNSHIRE | 07/02/1928 | 03/10/1960 | 03/10/1960 | |
Shire/Hunt | 281 | 09/02/1928 | DUMBARTONSHIRE | 09/02/1928 | 01/05/1961 | 01/05/1961 | |
Shire/Hunt | 246 | 20/02/1928 | MORAYSHIRE | 20/02/1928 | 03/07/1961 | 03/07/1961 | |
Shire/Hunt | 249 | 21/02/1928 | ABERDEENSHIRE | 21/02/1928 | 09/09/1957 | 09/09/1957 | |
Shire/Hunt | 250 | 02/03/1928 | PERTHSHIRE | 02/03/1928 | 26/08/1959 | 26/08/1959 | |
Shire/Hunt | 306 | 06/03/1928 | ROXBURGHSHIRE | 06/03/1928 | 29/06/1959 | 29/06/1959 | |
Shire/Hunt | 307 | 17/03/1928 | KINCARDINESHIRE | 17/03/1928 | 28/04/1961 | 28/04/1961 | |
Shire/Hunt | 309 | 26/03/1928 | BANFFSHIRE | 26/03/1928 | 13/01/1961 | 13/01/1961 | |
Shire/Hunt | 310 | 03/05/1928 | KINROSS-SHIRE | 03/05/1928 | 24/04/1961 | 24/04/1961 | |
Shire/Hunt | 311 | 05/05/1928 | PEEBLES-SHIRE | 05/05/1928 | 01/01/1960 | 01/01/1960 | |
Shire/Hunt | 318 | 07/05/1928 | CAMBRIDGESHIRE | 07/05/1928 | 06/10/1959 | 06/10/1959 | |
Shire/Hunt | 320 | 23/05/1928 | WARWICKSHIRE | 23/05/1928 | 18/08/1958 | 18/08/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 322 | 10/07/1928 | HUNTINGDONSHIRE | 10/07/1928 | 20/10/1959 | 20/10/1959 | |
Shire/Hunt | 327 | 11/07/1928 | NOTTINGHAMSHIRE | 11/07/1928 | 16/01/1961 | 16/01/1961 | |
Shire/Hunt | 335 | 28/08/1928 | BEDFORDSHIRE | 28/08/1928 | 17/12/1957 | 17/12/1957 | |
Shire/Hunt | 329 | 30/08/1928 | INVERNESS-SHIRE | 30/08/1928 | 10/11/1958 | 10/11/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 352 | 15/03/1929 | THE MEYNELL | 15/03/1929 | 18/12/1957 | 18/12/1957 | |
Shire/Hunt | 336 | 01/06/1929 | THE QUORN | 01/06/1929 | 16/01/1961 | 16/01/1961 | |
Shire/Hunt | 2753 | 20/02/1929 | CHESHIRE | 20/02/1929 | 29/10/1959 | 29/10/1959 | |
Shire/Hunt | 2754 | 08/04/1929 | RUTLANDSHIRE | 08/04/1929 | 01/05/1961 | 01/05/1961 | |
Shire/Hunt | 2755 | 15/03/1929 | BERKSHIRE | 15/03/1929 | 11/12/1958 | 11/12/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 2756 | 21/03/1929 | SELKIRKSHIRE | 21/03/1929 | 03/04/1959 | 03/04/1959 | |
Shire/Hunt | 2757 | 28/03/1929 | DUMFRIES-SHIRE | 28/03/1929 | 03/11/1958 | 03/11/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 2758 | 28/03/1929 | NORTHUMBERLAND | 28/03/1929 | 24/04/1961 | 24/04/1961 | |
Shire/Hunt | 2759 | 05/1929 | CUMBERLAND | 05/1929 | 04/03/1961 | 04/03/1961 | |
Shire/Hunt | 2760 | 20/06/1929 | WESTMORLAND | 20/06/1929 | 25/08/1958 | 25/08/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 201 | 20/04/1932 | THE BRAMHAM MOOR | 20/04/1932 | 19/06/1958 | 19/06/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 211 | 04/05/1932 | THE YORK AND AINSTY | 04/05/1932 | 01/01/1958 | 01/01/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 220 | 03/05/1932 | THE ZETLAND | 03/05/1932 | 21/09/1959 | 21/09/1959 | |
Shire/Hunt | 232 | 17/05/1932 | THE BADSWORTH | 17/05/1932 | 11/10/1960 | 11/10/1960 | |
Shire/Hunt | 235 | 02/06/1932 | THE BEDALE | 02/06/1932 | 01/08/1960 | 01/08/1960 | |
Shire/Hunt | 247 | 14/07/1932 | THE BLANKNEY | 14/07/1932 | 30/10/1958 | 30/10/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 255 | 03/08/1932 | THE BRAES OF DERWENT | 03/08/1932 | 12/11/1958 | 12/11/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 269 | 23/08/1932 | THE CLEVELAND | 23/08/1932 | 09/05/1960 | 09/05/1960 | |
Shire/Hunt | 273 | 12/10/1932 | THE HOLDERNESS | 12/10/1932 | 30/12/1960 | 30/12/1960 | |
Shire/Hunt | 282 | 24/10/1932 | THE HURWORTH | 24/10/1932 | 16/03/1959 | 16/03/1959 | |
Shire/Hunt | 283 | 18/08/1933 | THE MIDDLETON | 18/08/1933 | 16/05/1958 | 16/05/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 288 | 21/08/1933 | THE PERCY | 21/08/1933 | 04/03/1961 | 04/03/1961 | |
Shire/Hunt | 292 | 23/08/1933 | THE SOUTHWOLD | 23/08/1933 | 17/12/1957 | 17/12/1957 | |
Shire/Hunt | 297 | 30/08/1933 | THE COTTESMORE | 30/08/1933 | 02/07/1958 | 02/07/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 298 | 01/09/1933 | THE PYTCHLEY | 01/09/1933 | 04/11/1958 | 04/11/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 205 | 10/07/1934 | THE ALBRIGHTON | 10/07/1934 | 13/03/1959 | 13/03/1959 | |
Shire/Hunt | 214 | 14/07/1934 | THE ATHERSTONE | 14/07/1934 | 29/07/1958 | 29/07/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 217 | 17/07/1934 | THE BELVOIR | 17/07/1934 | 22/09/1959 | 22/09/1959 | |
Shire/Hunt | 222 | 20/07/1934 | THE BERKELEY | 20/07/1934 | 03/11/1958 | 03/11/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 226 | 23/07/1934 | THE BILSDALE | 23/07/1934 | 12/11/1958 | 12/11/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 230 | 10/08/1934 | THE BROCKLESBY | 10/08/1934 | 30/04/1958 | 30/04/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 238 | 17/08/1934 | THE BURTON | 17/08/1934 | 10/12/1957 | 10/12/1957 | |
Shire/Hunt | 258 | 22/08/1934 | THE CATTISTOCK | 22/08/1934 | 11/12/1957 | 11/12/1957 | |
Shire/Hunt | 274 | 28/08/1934 | THE CRAVEN | 28/08/1934 | 13/01/1961 | 13/01/1961 | |
Shire/Hunt | 279 | 03/09/1934 | THE COTSWOLD | 03/09/1934 | 21/10/1959 | 21/10/1959 | |
Shire/Hunt | 353 | 12/09/1934 | THE DERWENT | 12/09/1934 | 06/12/1957 | 06/12/1957 | |
Shire/Hunt | 357 | 22/09/1934 | THE FERNIE | 22/09/1934 | 13/10/1960 | 13/10/1960 | |
Shire/Hunt | 359 | 28/09/1934 | THE FITZWILLIAM | 28/09/1934 | 16/01/1961 | 16/01/1961 | |
Shire/Hunt | 361 | 02/10/1934 | THE GARTH | 02/10/1934 | 13/11/1958 | 13/11/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 362 | 11/10/1934 | THE GOATHLAND | 11/10/1934 | 16/01/1961 | 16/01/1961 | |
Shire/Hunt | 363 | 15/11/1934 | THE GRAFTON | 15/11/1934 | 30/09/1958 | 30/09/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 364 | 19/11/1934 | THE GROVE | 19/11/1934 | 20/10/1958 | 20/10/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 365 | 01/12/1934 | THE MORPETH | 01/12/1934 | 03/11/1952 | 03/11/1952 | |
Shire/Hunt | 366 | 07/12/1934 | THE OAKLEY | 07/12/1934 | 12/09/1958 | 12/09/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 368 | 12/12/1934 | THE PUCKERIDGE | 12/12/1934 | 23/09/1959 | 23/09/1959 | |
Shire/Hunt | 370 | 15/01/1935 | THE RUFFORD | 15/01/1935 | 17/10/1958 | 17/10/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 374 | 22/01/1935 | THE SINNUNGTON | 22/01/1935 | 24/09/1958 | 24/09/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 375 | 26/01/1935 | THE SOUTH DURHAM | 26/01/1935 | 05/08/1958 | 05/08/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 376 | 02/02/1935 | THE STAINTONDALE | 02/02/1935 | 13/11/1958 | 13/11/1958 | |
Shire/Hunt | 377 | 11/02/1935 | THE TYNEDALE | 11/02/1935 | 04/12/1958 | 04/12/1958 |