NBR/LNER Reid "D34" Class 4-4-0
Class | Number | Built | Name | Name Date | Notes | Removed | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Glen | 149 | 09/1913 | GLENFINNAN | 09/1913 | 10/08/1960 | ||
Glen | 221 | 09/1913 | GLEN ORCHY | 09/1913 | 03/09/1958 | ||
Glen | 256 | 09/1913 | GLEN DOUGLAS | 09/1913 | 17/12/1962 | ||
Glen | 258 | 09/1913 | GLEN ROY | 09/1913 | 05/05/1959 | ||
Glen | 266 | 10/1913 | GLEN FALLOCH | 10/1913 | 24/03/1960 | ||
Glen | 307 | 12/1913 | GLEN NEVIS | 12/1913 | 12/09/1959 | ||
Glen | 405 | 12/1913 | GLEN SPEAN | 12/1913 | 13/05/1949 | ||
Glen | 406 | 12/1913 | GLEN CROE | 12/1913 | 02/06/1961 | ||
Glen | 407 | 12/1913 | GLEN BEASDALE | 12/1913 | 29/06/1959 | ||
Glen | 408 | 12/1913 | GLEN SLOY | 12/1913 | 03/02/1950 | ||
Glen | 100 | 05/1917 | GLEN DOCHART | 05/1917 | 28/10/1959 | ||
Glen | 291 | 05/1917 | GLEN QUOICH | 05/1917 | 15/12/1959 | ||
Glen | 298 | 05/1917 | GLEN SHEIL | 05/1917 | 02/06/1961 | ||
Glen | 153 | 06/1917 | GLEN FRUIN | 06/1917 | 12/10/1959 | ||
Glen | 241 | 07/1917 | GLEN OGLE | 07/1917 | 16/09/1949 | ||
Glen | 242 | 03/1919 | GLEN MAMIE | 03/1919 | 02/03/1960 | ||
Glen | 270 | 03/1919 | GLEN GARRY | 03/1919 | 24/04/1959 | ||
Glen | 278 | 04/1919 | GLEN LYON | 04/1919 | 06/11/1961 | ||
Glen | 281 | 04/1919 | GLEN MURRAN | 04/1919 | 29/03/1960 | ||
Glen | 287 | 04/1919 | GLEN GYLE | 04/1919 | 02/1946 | ||
Glen | 304 | 04/1920 | GLEN ALADALE | 04/1920 | 31/10/1960 | ||
Glen | 503 | 05/1920 | GLEN ARKLET | 05/1920 | 10/09/1959 | ||
Glen | 505 | 05/1920 | GLEN CONA | 05/1920 | 16/12/1947 | ||
Glen | 490 | 05/1920 | GLEN DESSARY | 05/1920 | 18/12/1959 | ||
Glen | 502 | 05/1920 | GLEN FINTAIG | 05/1920 | 19/02/1959 | ||
Glen | 34 | 06/1920 | GLEN GARVIN | 06/1920 | 11/06/1959 | ||
Glen | 35 | 06/1920 | GLEN GLOY | 06/1920 | 25/06/1960 | ||
Glen | 492 | 07/1920 | GLEN GAU | 07/1920 | 24/04/1959 | ||
Glen | 493 | 07/1920 | GLEN LUSS | 07/1920 | 10/04/1961 | ||
Glen | 494 | 08/1920 | GLEN LOY | 08/1920 | 20/11/1961 | ||
Glen | 495 | 08/1920 | GLEN MALLIE | 08/1920 | 23/02/1960 | ||
Glen | 496 | 09/1920 | GLEN MOIDART | 09/1920 | 24/03/1960 |