Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 549 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18352 Week
» 71368 Month
» 190895 Year
» 3217748 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
NBR/LNER Reid "D34" Class 4-4-0
Class |
NBR |
NBR (Pres) |
LNER (1924) |
LNER (1946) |
BR |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
Glen |
149
|
|
9149
|
2467
|
62467
|
09/1913 |
10/08/1960 |
Gravity sanding fitted |
09/1935 |
Glen |
221
|
|
9221
|
2468
|
62468
|
09/1913 |
03/09/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
10/1935 |
Glen |
256
|
256
|
9256
|
2469
|
62469
|
09/1913 |
17/12/1962 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
09/1935 |
Glen |
258
|
|
9258
|
2470
|
62470
|
09/1913 |
05/05/1959 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
06/1935 |
Glen |
266
|
|
9266
|
2471
|
62471
|
10/1913 |
24/03/1960 |
Gravity sanding fitted |
05/1935 |
Glen |
307
|
|
9307
|
2472
|
62472
|
12/1913 |
12/09/1959 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
03/1936 |
Glen |
405
|
|
9405
|
2473
|
(62473)
|
12/1913 |
13/05/1949 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
03/1936 |
Glen |
406
|
|
9406
|
2474
|
62474
|
12/1913 |
02/06/1961 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
11/1935 |
Glen |
407
|
|
9407
|
2475
|
62475
|
12/1913 |
29/06/1959 |
Gravity sanding fitted |
01/1936 |
Glen |
408
|
|
9408
|
2476
|
(62476)
|
12/1913 |
03/02/1950 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
12/1936 |
Glen |
100
|
|
9100
|
2477
|
62477
|
05/1917 |
28/10/1959 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
06/1936 |
Glen |
291
|
|
9291
|
2478
|
62478
|
05/1917 |
15/12/1959 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
09/1935 |
Glen |
298
|
|
9298
|
2479
|
62479
|
05/1917 |
02/06/1961 |
Gravity sanding fitted |
03/1936 |
Glen |
153
|
|
9153
|
2480
|
62480
|
06/1917 |
12/10/1959 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
11/1935 |
Glen |
241
|
|
9241
|
2481
|
(62481)
|
07/1917 |
16/09/1949 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
06/1935 |
Glen |
242
|
|
9242
|
2482
|
62482
|
03/1919 |
02/03/1960 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
03/1935 |
Glen |
270
|
|
9270
|
2483
|
62483
|
03/1919 |
24/04/1959 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
05/1935 |
Glen |
278
|
|
9278
|
2484
|
62484
|
04/1919 |
06/11/1961 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
11/1936 |
Glen |
281
|
|
9281
|
2485
|
62485
|
04/1919 |
29/03/1960 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
07/1935 |
Glen |
287
|
|
9287
|
(2486)
|
|
04/1919 |
02/1946 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
09/1935 |
Glen |
304
|
|
9304
|
2488
|
62488
|
04/1920 |
31/10/1960 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
04/1935 |
Glen |
503
|
|
9503
|
2487
|
62487
|
05/1920 |
10/09/1959 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
11/1935 |
Glen |
505
|
|
9505
|
2491
|
|
05/1920 |
16/12/1947 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
05/1935 |
Glen |
490
|
|
9490
|
2489
|
62489
|
05/1920 |
18/12/1959 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
06/1936 |
Glen |
502
|
|
9502
|
2490
|
62490
|
05/1920 |
19/02/1959 |
Gravity sanding fitted |
11/1935 |
Glen |
34
|
|
9034
|
2492
|
62492
|
06/1920 |
11/06/1959 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
06/1935 |
Glen |
35
|
|
9035
|
2493
|
62493
|
06/1920 |
25/06/1960 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
11/1935 |
Glen |
492
|
|
9492
|
2494
|
62494
|
07/1920 |
24/04/1959 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
09/1936 |
Glen |
493
|
|
9493
|
2495
|
62495
|
07/1920 |
10/04/1961 |
Gravity sanding fitted |
06/1935 |
Glen |
494
|
|
9494
|
2496
|
62496
|
08/1920 |
20/11/1961 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
07/1936 |
Glen |
495
|
|
9495
|
2497
|
62497
|
08/1920 |
23/02/1960 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
08/1936 |
Glen |
496
|
|
9496
|
2498
|
62498
|
09/1920 |
24/03/1960 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
01/1937 |