NBR/LNER Reid "D29" Class 4-4-0
NBR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
895 | 9895 | 2400 | 62400 | 07/1909 | 20/04/1948 | 38.75 | ||||||
896 | 9896 | 2401 | 62401 | 07/1909 | 11/1949 | 40.33 | ||||||
897 | 9897 | 2402 | 62402 | 08/1909 | 06/1949 | St Margarets | 39.83 | |||||
898 | 9898 | 2403 | 62403 | 08/1909 | 02/03/1948 | 38.58 | ||||||
899 | 9899 | 2404 | 62404 | 08/1909 | 08/1949 | 40 | ||||||
900 | 9900 | 2405 | 62405 | 09/1909 | 22/02/1951 | 41.42 | ||||||
243 | 9243 | 2406 | 62406 | 09/1911 | 10/1949 | 38.08 | ||||||
244 | 9244 | 2407 | 10/1911 | 12/1947 | 36.17 | |||||||
245 | 9245 | 2408 | 10/1911 | 11/1947 | 36.08 | |||||||
338 | 9338 | 2409 | 62409 | 10/1911 | 29/10/1948 | 37 | ||||||
339 | 9339 | 2410 | 62410 | 10/1911 | 14/01/1952 | 40.25 | ||||||
340 | 9340 | 2411 | 62411 | 11/1911 | 14/11/1952 | 41 | 41.20 | |||||
359 | 9359 | 2412 | 62412 | 12/1911 | 01/09/1950 | 38.75 | 38.78 | |||||
360 | 9360 | 2413 | 62413 | 12/1911 | 26/08/1950 | 38.67 | ||||||
361 | 9361 | 2414 | 12/1911 | 02/1946 | 34.17 | |||||||
362 | 9362 | 2415 | 12/1911 | 07/1947 | 35.58 |