NBR/LNER Reid "D29" Class 4-4-0
Class | NBR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D29 | 895 | 9895 | 2400 | 62400 | 07/1909 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/04/1948 |
20/04/1948 |
D29 | 896 | 9896 | 2401 | 62401 | 07/1909 | THJ W |
Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/1949 |
11/1949 |
D29 | 897 | 9897 | 2402 | 62402 | 08/1909 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/1949 |
06/1949 |
D29 | 898 | 9898 | 2403 | 62403 | 08/1909 | HAY W |
Haymarket Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/03/1948 |
02/03/1948 |
D29 | 899 | 9899 | 2404 | 62404 | 08/1909 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/1949 |
08/1949 |
D29 | 900 | 9900 | 2405 | 62405 | 09/1909 | STM HAY W |
St Margarets Haymarket Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1949 22/02/1951 |
22/02/1951 |
D29 | 243 | 9243 | 2406 | 62406 | 09/1911 | THJ W |
Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/1949 |
10/1949 |
D29 | 244 | 9244 | 2407 | 10/1911 | 12/1947 | ||||
D29 | 245 | 9245 | 2408 | 10/1911 | 11/1947 | ||||
D29 | 338 | 9338 | 2409 | 62409 | 10/1911 | DEE W |
Dundee Tay Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/10/1948 |
29/10/1948 |
D29 | 339 | 9339 | 2410 | 62410 | 10/1911 | DEE THJ W |
Dundee Tay Bridge Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/12/1949 24/12/1949 14/01/1952 |
14/01/1952 |
D29 | 340 | 9340 | 2411 | 62411 | 11/1911 | POL EFD THJ W |
Polmont Eastfield Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/09/1948 10/12/1949 14/11/1952 |
14/11/1952 |
D29 | 359 | 9359 | 2412 | 62412 | 12/1911 | DEE W |
Dundee Tay Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/01/1950 01/09/1950 |
01/09/1950 |
D29 | 360 | 9360 | 2413 | 62413 | 12/1911 | HAY W |
Haymarket Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/08/1950 |
26/08/1950 |
D29 | 361 | 9361 | 2414 | 12/1911 | 02/1946 | ||||
D29 | 362 | 9362 | 2415 | 12/1911 | 07/1947 |