NER/LNER Worsdell "D20" Class 4-4-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/1935 | Reallocation | 2101 | SBK | Starbeck | |||
12/1935 | Reallocation | 1206 | SBK | Starbeck | |||
01/1943 | Condemned | 1147 | COND | ||||
05/1943 | Condemned | 1234 | COND | ||||
06/1944 | Condemned | 2109 | COND | ||||
12/1944 | Condemned | 2017 | COND | ||||
01/1945 | Condemned | 1206 | SBK | Starbeck | COND | ||
05/1946 | Condemned | 2394 | COND | ||||
11/1946 | Condemned | 2356 | COND | ||||
10/1947 | Condemned | 2364 | COND | ||||
12/1947 | Condemned | 2350 | COND | ||||
12/1947 | Condemned | 2393 | COND | ||||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2340 | SEL | Selby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2341 | SEL | Selby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2342 | SBK | Starbeck | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2343 | SBK | Starbeck | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2344 | TWD | Tweedmouth | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2345 | BRI | Bridlington | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2347 | TWD | Tweedmouth | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2348 | SEL | Selby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2349 | BLA | Blaydon | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2351 | TWD | Tweedmouth | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2352 | TWD | Tweedmouth | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2353 | BRI | Bridlington | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2354 | TWD | Tweedmouth | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2355 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2357 | TWD | Tweedmouth | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2358 | TWD | Tweedmouth | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2359 | WHL | West Hartlepool | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2360 | SBK | Starbeck | BLA | Blaydon | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 62361 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2362 | TWD | Tweedmouth | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2363 | SBK | Starbeck | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2365 | SKN | Stockton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2366 | SBK | Starbeck | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 62367 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2369 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 62370 | SBK | Starbeck | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2371 | BLA | Blaydon | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2372 | SEL | Selby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2373 | SBK | Starbeck | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2374 | SEL | Selby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2375 | SBK | Starbeck | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2376 | SEL | Selby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 62377 | TWD | Tweedmouth | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2378 | SEL | Selby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2379 | YK | York (North) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2380 | TWD | Tweedmouth | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2381 | SEL | Selby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 62382 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2383 | BRI | Bridlington | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2384 | WHL | West Hartlepool | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 62386 | SEL | Selby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2387 | WHL | West Hartlepool | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2388 | NLN | Northallerton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2389 | SBK | Starbeck | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 62390 | SKN | Stockton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2391 | NLN | Northallerton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2392 | SBK | Starbeck | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2395 | SBK | Starbeck | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2396 | TWD | Tweedmouth | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2397 | NLN | Northallerton | |||
10/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2384 | WHL | West Hartlepool | SEL | Selby | |
17/01/1948 | Condemned | 62367 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | COND | ||
07/02/1948 | Reallocation | 2357 | TWD | Tweedmouth | TWD | Tweedmouth | |
15/05/1948 | Reallocation | 2349 | BLA | Blaydon | TWD | Tweedmouth | |
22/05/1948 | Reallocation | 2355 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | BRI | Bridlington | |
21/08/1948 | Reallocation | 2366 | SBK | Starbeck | SEL | Selby | |
02/10/1948 | Reallocation | 62387 | WHL | West Hartlepool | SEL | Selby | |
20/11/1948 | Reallocation | 2369 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | YK | York (North) | |
20/11/1948 | Reallocation | 2372 | SEL | Selby | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
20/11/1948 | Reallocation | 62379 | YK | York (North) | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
20/11/1948 | Reallocation | 62387 | SEL | Selby | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
29/11/1948 | Condemned | 62390 | SKN | Stockton | COND | ||
08/01/1949 | Reallocation | 62347 | TWD | Tweedmouth | SKN | Stockton | |
15/01/1949 | Reallocation | 2384 | SEL | Selby | SBK | Starbeck | |
05/1949 | Condemned | 62377 | TWD | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 62353 | BRI | Bridlington | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 62359 | WHL | West Hartlepool | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 62365 | SKN | Stockton | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 2372 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 62379 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | SKN | Stockton | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 2384 | SBK | Starbeck | SEL | Selby | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 62387 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | BRI | Bridlington | |
11/06/1949 | Reallocation | 62396 | TWD | Tweedmouth | TWD | Tweedmouth | |
23/07/1949 | Reallocation | 2384 | SEL | Selby | SBK | Starbeck | |
13/08/1949 | Reallocation | 2345 | BRI | Bridlington | NLN | Northallerton | |
13/08/1949 | Reallocation | 62362 | TWD | Tweedmouth | BRI | Bridlington | |
13/08/1949 | Reallocation | 62397 | NLN | Northallerton | BRI | Bridlington | |
12/1949 | Reallocation | 62353 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | BRI | Bridlington | |
12/1949 | Reallocation | 62359 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | NLN | Northallerton | |
12/1949 | Reallocation | 62363 | SBK | Starbeck | SEL | Selby | |
12/1949 | Reallocation | 62383 | BRI | Bridlington | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
12/1949 | Reallocation | 62396 | ALN | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
10/12/1949 | Reallocation | 62353 | BRI | Bridlington | BRI | Bridlington | |
10/12/1949 | Reallocation | 62359 | NLN | Northallerton | NLN | Northallerton | |
10/12/1949 | Reallocation | 62383 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
10/12/1949 | Reallocation | 62396 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 62363 | SEL | Selby | SEL | Selby | |
14/01/1950 | Reallocation | 62345 | NLN | Northallerton | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
25/03/1950 | Reallocation | 62347 | SKN | Stockton | 51J | Northallerton | |
25/03/1950 | Reallocation | 62379 | SKN | Stockton | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
17/04/1950 | Reallocation | 62375 | SBK | Starbeck | 53D | Bridlington | |
17/04/1950 | Reallocation | 62397 | BRI | Bridlington | 50D | Starbeck | |
30/04/1950 | Reallocation | 62344 | ALN | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
30/04/1950 | Reallocation | 62362 | BRI | Bridlington | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
30/04/1950 | Reallocation | 62365 | ALN | 53D | Bridlington | ||
30/04/1950 | Reallocation | 2395 | SBK | Starbeck | 50C | Selby | |
17/09/1950 | Reallocation | 62369 | YK | York (North) | 50D | Starbeck | |
17/09/1950 | Reallocation | 62397 | 50D | Starbeck | 50A | York (North) | |
23/09/1950 | Reallocation | 62369 | 50D | Starbeck | 50D | Starbeck | |
23/09/1950 | Reallocation | 62397 | 50A | York (North) | 50A | York (North) | |
01/10/1950 | Reallocation | 62343 | SBK | Starbeck | 50C | Selby | |
01/10/1950 | Reallocation | 62384 | SBK | Starbeck | 50C | Selby | |
01/10/1950 | Reallocation | 62397 | 50A | York (North) | 50C | Selby | |
15/10/1950 | Reallocation | 62342 | SBK | Starbeck | 50C | Selby | |
21/10/1950 | Reallocation | 62343 | 50C | Selby | 50C | Selby | |
21/10/1950 | Reallocation | 62384 | 50C | Selby | 50C | Selby | |
21/10/1950 | Reallocation | 62397 | 50C | Selby | 50C | Selby | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 62342 | 50C | Selby | 50C | Selby | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 62344 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 62365 | 53D | Bridlington | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 62344 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 62365 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
08/01/1951 | Condemned | 62357 | ALN | COND | |||
20/01/1951 | Reallocation | 62345 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | 50C | Selby | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 62345 | 50C | Selby | 50C | Selby | |
02/1951 | Condemned | 62361 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | COND | ||
02/1951 | Condemned | 62376 | SEL | Selby | COND | ||
02/1951 | Condemned | 62382 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | COND | ||
27/02/1951 | Condemned | 62340 | SEL | Selby | COND | ||
27/02/1951 | Condemned | 62348 | SEL | Selby | COND | ||
06/03/1951 | Condemned | 62369 | 50D | Starbeck | COND | ||
07/03/1951 | Condemned | 62341 | SEL | Selby | COND | ||
13/03/1951 | Condemned | 62342 | 50C | Selby | COND | ||
13/03/1951 | Condemned | 62366 | SEL | Selby | COND | ||
20/03/1951 | Condemned | 62363 | SEL | Selby | COND | ||
28/03/1951 | Condemned | 62344 | 52D | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
04/1951 | Condemned | 62370 | SBK | Starbeck | COND | ||
02/04/1951 | Condemned | 62354 | ALN | COND | |||
04/04/1951 | Condemned | 62365 | 52D | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
10/04/1951 | Condemned | 62379 | 51C | West Hartlepool | COND | ||
11/04/1951 | Condemned | 62353 | BRI | Bridlington | COND | ||
11/04/1951 | Condemned | 62362 | 52D | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 62358 | 52DALN | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
02/06/1951 | Reallocation | 62388 | NLN | Northallerton | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
07/06/1951 | Condemned | 62391 | NLN | Northallerton | COND | ||
09/06/1951 | Reallocation | 62373 | SBK | Starbeck | 51J | Northallerton | |
16/06/1951 | Reallocation | 62389 | SBK | Starbeck | 50C | Selby | |
16/06/1951 | Reallocation | 62392 | SBK | Starbeck | 50C | Selby | |
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 62355 | 52DALN | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 2372 | WHL | West Hartlepool | 51J | Northallerton | |
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 62373 | 51J | Northallerton | 51J | Northallerton | |
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 62375 | 52DALN | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 62383 | 52DALN | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 62388 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 62389 | 50C | Selby | 50C | Selby | |
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 62392 | 50C | Selby | 50C | Selby | |
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 62396 | 52DALN | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
04/08/1951 | Reallocation | 62345 | 50C | Selby | 50A | York (North) | |
18/08/1951 | Reallocation | 62345 | 50A | York (North) | 50A | York (North) | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 62389 | 50C | Selby | 50B | Neville Hill | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 62397 | 50C | Selby | 50B | Neville Hill | |
19/07/1952 | Reallocation | 62389 | 50B | Neville Hill | 50B | Neville Hill | |
19/07/1952 | Reallocation | 62397 | 50B | Neville Hill | 50B | Neville Hill | |
09/08/1952 | Reallocation | 62396 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62359 | NLN | Northallerton | 51F | West Auckland | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62388 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 51J | Northallerton | |
15/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62359 | 51F | West Auckland | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
15/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62388 | 51J | Northallerton | 51J | Northallerton | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62359 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
14/02/1953 | Reallocation | 62343 | 50Fs1 | 50A | York (North) | ||
14/02/1953 | Reallocation | 62388 | 51J | Northallerton | 54B | Tyne Dock | |
23/02/1953 | Condemned | 62373 | 51J | Northallerton | COND | ||
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 62371 | ALN | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 62388 | 54B | Tyne Dock | 51J | Northallerton | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 62396 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
20/06/1953 | Reallocation | 62349 | ALN | 52A | Gateshead | ||
20/06/1953 | Reallocation | 62352 | TWD | Tweedmouth | 52B | Heaton | |
20/06/1953 | Reallocation | 62360 | ALN | 52A | Gateshead | ||
20/06/1953 | Reallocation | 62371 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52A | Gateshead | |
20/06/1953 | Reallocation | 62375 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52A | Gateshead | |
20/06/1953 | Reallocation | 62387 | ALN | 52B | Heaton | ||
24/10/1953 | Reallocation | 62349 | 52A | Gateshead | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
24/10/1953 | Reallocation | 62352 | 52B | Heaton | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
24/10/1953 | Reallocation | 62360 | 52A | Gateshead | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
24/10/1953 | Reallocation | 62371 | 52A | Gateshead | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
24/10/1953 | Reallocation | 62375 | 52A | Gateshead | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
23/01/1954 | Reallocation | 62372 | 51J | Northallerton | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
26/04/1954 | Condemned | 62388 | 51J | Northallerton | COND | ||
22/05/1954 | Reallocation | 62349 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52C | Blaydon | |
22/05/1954 | Reallocation | 62359 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 51J | Northallerton | |
31/05/1954 | Condemned | 62392 | 50C | Selby | COND | ||
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 62352 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52A | Gateshead | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 62360 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52A | Gateshead | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 62375 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52A | Gateshead | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 62380 | TWD | Tweedmouth | 52A | Gateshead | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 62396 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52A | Gateshead | |
29/06/1954 | Condemned | 62352 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
06/09/1954 | Condemned | 62389 | 50B | Neville Hill | COND | ||
23/09/1954 | Condemned | 62380 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
14/10/1954 | Condemned | 62374 | SEL | Selby | COND | ||
19/10/1954 | Condemned | 62358 | 52D | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
19/10/1954 | Condemned | 62371 | 52D | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
23/10/1954 | Reallocation | 62360 | 52A | Gateshead | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
23/10/1954 | Reallocation | 62375 | 52A | Gateshead | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
23/10/1954 | Reallocation | 62396 | 52A | Gateshead | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
13/11/1954 | Reallocation | 62343 | 50A | York (North) | 50C | Selby | |
15/11/1954 | Condemned | 62347 | 51J | Northallerton | COND | ||
23/11/1954 | Condemned | 62351 | TWD | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
23/07/1955 | Reallocation | 62349 | 52C | Blaydon | 50C | Selby | |
23/07/1955 | Reallocation | 62359 | 51J | Northallerton | 50B | Neville Hill | |
23/07/1955 | Reallocation | 62372 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 50B | Neville Hill | |
23/07/1955 | Reallocation | 62387 | 52B | Heaton | 50C | Selby | |
23/07/1955 | Reallocation | 62396 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 50C | Selby | |
15/08/1955 | Condemned | 62384 | 50C | Selby | COND | ||
26/10/1955 | Condemned | 62359 | 50B | Neville Hill | COND | ||
14/11/1955 | Condemned | 62355 | 52D | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
02/02/1956 | Condemned | 62349 | 50C | Selby | COND | ||
18/02/1956 | Reallocation | 62345 | 50A | York (North) | 50C | Selby | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 62372 | 50B | Neville Hill | 53D | Bridlington | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 62381 | SEL | Selby | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 62396 | 50C | Selby | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 62397 | 50B | Neville Hill | 53D | Bridlington | |
08/10/1956 | Condemned | 62343 | 50C | Selby | COND | ||
11/10/1956 | Condemned | 62345 | 50C | Selby | COND | ||
19/10/1956 | Condemned | 62386 | SEL | Selby | COND | ||
23/10/1956 | Condemned | 62360 | 52D | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
05/11/1956 | Condemned | 62372 | 53D | Bridlington | COND | ||
05/11/1956 | Condemned | 62378 | SEL | Selby | COND | ||
15/12/1956 | Reallocation | 62395 | 50C | Selby | 50A | York (North) | |
04/02/1957 | Condemned | 62397 | 53D | Bridlington | COND | ||
07/05/1957 | Condemned | 62375 | 52D | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
13/05/1957 | Condemned | 62383 | 52D | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
20/07/1957 | Reallocation | 62387 | 50C | Selby | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
20/07/1957 | Reallocation | 62395 | 50A | York (North) | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
02/09/1957 | Condemned | 62387 | 52D | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
19/10/1957 | Reallocation | 62381 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
19/10/1957 | Reallocation | 62396 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
19/11/1957 | Condemned | 62381 | 52D | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
20/11/1957 | Condemned | 62395 | 52D | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
12/1957 | Condemned | 62396 | 52D | Tweedmouth | COND |