GCR/LNER Robinson "D9" Class 4-4-0
Class | GCR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D9 | 1013 | 6013 | 2300 | 62300 | 10/1901 | TFD W |
Trafford Park (LNER) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/1949 |
11/1949 |
D9 | 1014 | 6014 | 2301 | 62301 | 10/1901 | TFD W |
Trafford Park (LNER) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/1950 |
04/1950 |
D9 | 1015 | 6015 | 2302 | 62302 | 10/1901 | LIN LIV W |
Lincoln Brunswick Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 20/03/1950 |
20/03/1950 |
D9 | 1016 | 6016 | 2303 | 62303 | 10/1901 | LIV W |
Brunswick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/08/1949 |
15/08/1949 |
D9 | 1017 | 6017 | 2304 | 62304 | 10/1901 | SHF LIV LIV W |
Sheffield Neepsend Brunswick Brunswick Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 01/1950 16/01/1950 |
16/01/1950 |
D9 | 1018 | 6018 | 2305 | 62305 | 02/1902 | KL TFD W |
Kings Lynn Trafford Park (LNER) Withdrawn |
11/1935 01/01/1948 24/07/1950 |
24/07/1950 |
D9 | 1019 | 6019 | 2306 | 62306 | 02/1902 | LIV W |
Brunswick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/1949 |
01/1949 |
D9 | 1020 | 6020 | 02/1902 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1943 | 02/1943 | ||
D9 | 1021 | 6021 | 2307 | 62307 | 02/1902 | TFD W |
Trafford Park (LNER) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/06/1950 |
12/06/1950 |
D9 | 1022 | 6022 | 02/1902 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1942 | 08/1942 | ||
D9 | 1023 | 6023 | 2308 | 62308 | 02/1902 | LIV W |
Brunswick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/08/1949 |
15/08/1949 |
D9 | 1024 | 6024 | 2309 | 62309 | 02/1902 | PBE LIV W |
Peterborough East Brunswick Withdrawn |
11/1935 01/01/1948 21/11/1949 |
21/11/1949 |
D9 | 1025 | 6025 | 2310 | 03/1902 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1945 | 11/1945 | |
D9 | 1026 | 6026 | 2311 | 62311 | 03/1902 | WAL W |
Walton on the Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/07/1949 |
18/07/1949 |
D9 | 1027 | 6027 | 2312 | 62312 | 03/1902 | TFD W |
Trafford Park (LNER) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/1950 |
04/1950 |
D9 | 1028 | 6028 | 03/1902 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1939 | 05/1939 | ||
D9 | 1029 | 6029 | 2313 | 62313 | 03/1902 | TFD W |
Trafford Park (LNER) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/10/1949 |
12/10/1949 |
D9 | 1030 | 6030 | 2314 | 62314 | 03/1902 | STP W |
Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/05/1949 |
09/05/1949 |
D9 | 1031 | 6031 | 2315 | 62315 | 03/1902 | PBE LIV W |
Peterborough East Brunswick Withdrawn |
11/1935 01/01/1948 18/07/1949 |
18/07/1949 |
D9 | 1032 | 6032 | 2316 | 03/1902 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1945 | 03/1945 | |
D9 | 1033 | 6033 | 2317 | 62317 | 03/1902 | TFD W |
Trafford Park (LNER) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/07/1949 |
18/07/1949 |
D9 | 1034 | 6034 | 2318 | 62318 | 03/1902 | LIV W |
Brunswick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/11/1949 |
21/11/1949 |
D9 | 1035 | 6035 | 2319 | 62319 | 04/1902 | LIV W |
Brunswick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/07/1949 |
18/07/1949 |
D9 | 1036 | 6036 | 2320 | 04/1902 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1946 | 01/1946 | |
D9 | 1037 | 6037 | 2321 | 62321 | 05/1902 | LIV W |
Brunswick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/10/1949 |
12/10/1949 |
D9 | 1038 | 6038 | 2322 | 62322 | 03/1903 | STP W |
Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/1949 |
01/1949 |
D9 | 1039 | 6039 | 2323 | 03/1903 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1946 | 01/1946 | |
D9 | 1040 | 6040 | 2324 | 62324 | 03/1903 | PBE LIV W |
Peterborough East Brunswick Withdrawn |
11/1935 01/01/1948 07/11/1949 |
07/11/1949 |
D9 | 1041 | 6041 | 2325 | 62325 | 03/1903 | TFD W |
Trafford Park (LNER) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/02/1950 |
06/02/1950 |
D9 | 1042 | 6042 | 03/1903 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1939 | 07/1939 | ||
D9 | 104 | 5104 | 2326 | 03/1904 | W DAR NLN |
Withdrawn Darlington Northallerton |
09/1944 10/01/1948 28/02/1948 |
09/1944 | |
D9 | 105 | 5105 | 2327 | 03/1904 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1945 | 06/1945 | |
D9 | 106 | 5106 | 2328 | 04/1904 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1947 | 03/1947 | |
D9 | 107 | 5107 | 2329 | 62329 | 04/1904 | TFD W |
Trafford Park (LNER) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/1949 |
02/1949 |
D9 | 108 | 5108 | 2330 | 62330 | 04/1904 | TFD W |
Trafford Park (LNER) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/08/1949 |
15/08/1949 |
D9 | 109 | 5109 | 2331 | 04/1904 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1946 | 09/1946 | |
D9 | 110 | 5110 | 05/1904 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1942 | 03/1942 | ||
D9 | 111 | 5111 | 2332 | 62332 | 05/1904 | LIV W |
Brunswick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1949 |
09/1949 |
D9 | 112 | 5112 | 2333 | 62333 | 05/1904 | RET LIV W |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Brunswick Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 12/12/1949 |
12/12/1949 |
D9 | 113 | 5113 | 06/1904 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1939 | 06/1939 |