GNR/LNER Ivatt "D2" Class 4-4-0
GNR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Rebuilt From | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Rebuilt To | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1305 | 4305 | 2150 | 62150 | 11/1897 | 10/1923 from D3 |
05/1949 | 51.5 | |||||||
1320 | 4320 | 2151 | 62151 | 06/1898 | 06/1926 from D3 |
04/1949 | 50.83 | |||||||
1321 | 4321 | 2152 | 62152 | 06/1898 | 01/1949 | 50.58 | ||||||||
1322 | 4322 | 06/1898 | 07/1939 | 41.08 | ||||||||||
1323 | 4323 | 2153 | 62153 | 06/1898 | 04/1949 | 50.83 | ||||||||
1324 | 4324 | 2154 | 62154 | 06/1898 | 25/11/1950 | 52.42 | ||||||||
1325 | 4325 | 07/1898 | 12/1937 | 39.42 | ||||||||||
1326 | 4326 | 2155 | 62155 | 10/1898 | 26/02/1948 | 49.33 | ||||||||
1327 | 4327 | 2156 | 62156 | 10/1898 | 01/1949 | 50.25 | ||||||||
1328 | 4328 | 10/1898 | 10/1937 | 39 | ||||||||||
1329 | 4329 | 2157 | 62157 | 11/1898 | 08/04/1948 | 49.42 | ||||||||
1330 | 4330 | 2158 | 11/1898 | 03/1946 | 47.33 | |||||||||
1331 | 4331 | 2159 | 11/1898 | 07/1947 | 48.67 | |||||||||
1332 | 4332 | 2160 | 62160 | 11/1898 | 16/10/1948 | 49.92 | ||||||||
1333 | 4333 | 2161 | 62161 | 11/1898 | 07/1950 | 51.67 | ||||||||
1334 | 4334 | 11/1898 | 09/1936 | 37.83 | ||||||||||
1335 | 4335 | 2162 | 11/1898 | 07/1947 | 48.67 | |||||||||
1336 | 4336 | 09/1899 | 05/1937 | 37.67 | ||||||||||
1337 | 4337 | 2163 | 62163 | 10/1899 | 16/10/1948 | 49 | ||||||||
1338 | 4338 | 2164 | 10/1899 | 02/1946 | 46.33 | |||||||||
1339 | 4339 | 2165 | 62165 | 10/1899 | 03/1949 | 49.42 | ||||||||
1340 | 4340 | 2166 | 10/1899 | 07/1947 | 47.75 | |||||||||
1361 | 4361 | 2167 | 62167 | 11/1899 | 02/1949 | 49.25 | ||||||||
1362 | 4362 | 10/1899 | 06/1937 | 37.67 | ||||||||||
1363 | 4363 | 10/1899 | 06/1939 | 39.67 | ||||||||||
1364 | 4364 | 2168 | 11/1899 | 12/1947 | 48.08 | |||||||||
1365 | 4365 | 2169 | 62169 | 11/1899 | 02/07/1948 | 48.67 | ||||||||
1366 | 4366 | 2170 | 10/1900 | 08/1947 | 46.83 | |||||||||
1367 | 4367 | 10/1900 | 06/1939 | 38.67 | ||||||||||
1368 | 4368 | 2171 | 10/1900 | 04/1947 | 46.5 | |||||||||
1369 | 4369 | 2172 | 62172 | 10/1900 | 19/06/1951 | 50.67 | ||||||||
1370 | 4370 | 2173 | 62173 | 11/1900 | 05/1950 | Colwick | 49.5 | |||||||
1371 | 4371 | 2174 | 11/1900 | 09/1947 | 46.83 | |||||||||
1372 | 4372 | 11/1900 | 12/1938 | 38.08 | ||||||||||
1373 | 4373 | 2175 | 62175 | 11/1900 | 25/11/1948 | 48 | ||||||||
1374 | 4374 | 2176 | 12/1900 | 01/1947 | 46.08 | |||||||||
1375 | 4375 | 12/1900 | 12/1939 | 39 | ||||||||||
1376 | 4376 | 12/1900 | 11/1937 | 36.92 | ||||||||||
1377 | 4377 | 2177 | 62177 | 01/1901 | 10/1949 | 48.75 | ||||||||
1378 | 4378 | 01/1901 | 06/1937 | 36.42 | ||||||||||
1379 | 4379 | 2178 | 01/1901 | 07/1947 | 46.5 | |||||||||
1380 | 4380 | 2179 | 62179 | 11/1900 | 03/1949 | 48.33 | ||||||||
1381 | 4381 | 2180 | 62180 | 01/1901 | 05/1950 | 49.33 | ||||||||
1382 | 4382 | 11/1900 | 05/1937 | 36.5 | ||||||||||
1383 | 4383 | 2181 | 62181 | 12/1900 | 25/11/1950 | 49.92 | ||||||||
1384 | 4384 | 2182 | 12/1900 | 03/1946 | 45.25 | |||||||||
1385 | 4385 | 2183 | 12/1900 | 07/1947 | 46.58 | |||||||||
1386 | 4386 | 01/1903 | 03/1939 | 36.17 | ||||||||||
1387 | 4387 | 2184 | 02/1903 | 12/1947 | 44.83 | |||||||||
1388 | 4388 | 2185 | 02/1903 | 07/1947 | 44.42 | |||||||||
1389 | 4389 | 02/1903 | 04/1937 | 34.17 | ||||||||||
1390 | 4390 | 2186 | 05/1903 | 05/1947 | 44 | |||||||||
1391 | 4391 | 06/1903 | 08/1938 | 35.17 | ||||||||||
1392 | 4392 | 2187 | 62187 | 04/1903 | 01/10/1948 | 45.5 | ||||||||
1393 | 4393 | 2188 | 62188 | 02/1903 | 10/1949 | 46.67 | ||||||||
1394 | 4394 | 2189 | 62189 | 05/1903 | 25/11/1948 | 45.5 | ||||||||
1395 | 4395 | 2190 | 62190 | 03/1903 | 09/1949 | 46.5 | ||||||||
1396 | 4396 | 08/1907 | 08/1938 | 31 | ||||||||||
1397 | 4397 | 09/1907 | 11/1938 | 31.17 | ||||||||||
1398 | 4398 | 2191 | 10/1907 | 06/1947 | 39.67 | |||||||||
1399 | 4399 | 2192 | 10/1907 | 05/1946 | 38.58 | |||||||||
1180 | 4180 | 2193 | 62193 | 10/1907 | 06/1949 | Colwick | 41.67 | |||||||
41 | 2194 | 62194 | 04/1909 | 06/1949 | Colwick | 40.17 | ||||||||
42 | 2195 | 62195 | 04/1909 | 26/02/1948 | 38.83 | |||||||||
43 | 04/1909 | 06/1938 | 29.17 | |||||||||||
44 | 2196 | 05/1909 | 05/1947 | 38 | ||||||||||
45 | 2197 | 62197 | 05/1909 | 01/1949 | 39.67 | |||||||||
46 | 06/1909 | 11/1938 | 29.42 | |||||||||||
47 | 2198 | 62198 | 06/1909 | 27/08/1948 | 39.17 | |||||||||
48 | 2199 | 62199 | 06/1909 | 07/1949 | Colwick | 40.08 | ||||||||
49 | 2200 | 06/1909 | 07/1946 | 37.08 | ||||||||||
50 | 2201 | 06/1909 | 07/1947 | 38.08 |