GNR/LNER Ivatt "D1" Class 4-4-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/1946 | Condemned | 2202 | COND | ||||
03/1946 | Condemned | 2204 | COND | ||||
06/1946 | Condemned | 2206 | COND | ||||
06/1946 | Condemned | 2213 | COND | ||||
12/1946 | Condemned | 2211 | COND | ||||
07/1947 | Condemned | 2212 | COND | ||||
09/1947 | Condemned | 2216 | COND | ||||
12/1947 | Condemned | 2210 | COND | ||||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2203 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2205 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2207 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2208 | HAW | Hawick | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2209 | STG | Stirling | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2214 | HAY | Haymarket | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2215 | PTH | Perth (LNER) | |||
26/06/1948 | Reallocation | 2207 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
02/10/1948 | Reallocation | 2214 | HAY | Haymarket | HAW | Hawick | |
08/11/1948 | Condemned | 2205 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | COND | ||
08/11/1948 | Condemned | 2207 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
10/1949 | Condemned | 62214 | HAW | Hawick | COND | ||
12/11/1949 | Reallocation | 62203 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | CLK | Colwick | |
10/02/1950 | Condemned | 62215 | 63A | COND | |||
13/07/1950 | Condemned | 62208 | HAW | Hawick | COND | ||
31/08/1950 | Condemned | 62203 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
11/11/1950 | Condemned | 62209 | STG | Stirling | COND |