GNR/LNER Ivatt "C1" Class 4-4-2
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/03/1923 | Reallocation | 300 | GRA | Grantham | |||
10/03/1923 | Reallocation | 1447 | DON | Doncaster | |||
06/05/1923 | Reallocation | 1428 | GRA | Grantham | |||
06/1923 | Reallocation | 1420 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
06/1923 | Reallocation | 1434 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
06/1923 | Reallocation | 1449 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
23/06/1923 | Reallocation | 1438 | GRA | Grantham | |||
23/06/1923 | Reallocation | 1439 | GRA | Grantham | |||
29/06/1923 | Reallocation | 1433 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
12/1923 | Reallocation | 1447 | DON | Doncaster | YK | York (North) | |
23/12/1923 | Reallocation | 1428 | GRA | Grantham | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
03/02/1924 | Reallocation | 1402 | DON | Doncaster | |||
03/02/1924 | Reallocation | 1416 | DON | Doncaster | |||
17/02/1924 | Reallocation | 251 | GRA | Grantham | |||
24/02/1924 | Reallocation | 1418 | DON | Doncaster | |||
02/03/1924 | Reallocation | 1448 | GRA | Grantham | |||
09/03/1924 | Reallocation | 273 | GRA | Grantham | |||
04/1924 | Reallocation | 1424 | YK | York (North) | |||
14/04/1924 | Reallocation | 4426 | KX | Kings Cross | |||
29/04/1924 | Reallocation | 4411 | KX | Kings Cross | |||
03/05/1924 | Reallocation | 4419 | DAR | Darlington | |||
11/05/1924 | Reallocation | 3284 | KX | Kings Cross | |||
25/05/1924 | Reallocation | 3300 | GRA | Grantham | KX | Kings Cross | |
08/06/1924 | Reallocation | 3294 | NWE | New England | |||
08/06/1924 | Reallocation | 4406 | NWE | New England | |||
15/06/1924 | Reallocation | 3282 | NWE | New England | |||
12/07/1924 | Reallocation | 3288 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |||
03/08/1924 | Reallocation | 4404 | KX | Kings Cross | |||
10/08/1924 | Reallocation | 4437 | KX | Kings Cross | |||
26/08/1924 | Reallocation | 4408 | KX | Kings Cross | |||
20/09/1924 | Reallocation | 274 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |||
25/10/1924 | Condemned | 1300 | COND | ||||
07/02/1925 | Reallocation | 1443 | NWE | New England | |||
03/1925 | Reallocation | 4417 | NWE | New England | |||
07/04/1925 | Reallocation | 4408 | KX | Kings Cross | NWE | New England | |
12/04/1925 | Reallocation | 3295 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
18/04/1925 | Reallocation | 4443 | NWE | New England | LIV | Brunswick | |
26/04/1925 | Reallocation | 273 | GRA | Grantham | DON | Doncaster | |
27/04/1925 | Reallocation | 4412 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
28/04/1925 | Reallocation | 4443 | LIV | Brunswick | NWE | New England | |
29/04/1925 | Reallocation | 4402 | DON | Doncaster | LIV | Brunswick | |
27/05/1925 | Reallocation | 3287 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
04/06/1925 | Reallocation | 3277 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
11/06/1925 | Reallocation | 3293 | NWE | New England | |||
25/08/1925 | Reallocation | 3272 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
31/08/1925 | Reallocation | 4433 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
07/09/1925 | Reallocation | 3280 | LIV | Brunswick | |||
14/09/1925 | Reallocation | 4436 | ARD | Ardsley | |||
02/10/1925 | Reallocation | 4437 | KX | Kings Cross | NWE | New England | |
05/10/1925 | Reallocation | 4436 | ARD | Ardsley | KX | Kings Cross | |
06/10/1925 | Reallocation | 3274 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | KX | Kings Cross | |
27/10/1925 | Reallocation | 4419 | DAR | Darlington | GHD | Gateshead | |
05/12/1925 | Reallocation | 4419 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
22/01/1926 | Reallocation | 4400 | NWE | New England | |||
01/02/1926 | Reallocation | 4419 | HTN | Heaton | ARD | Ardsley | |
05/02/1926 | Reallocation | 4437 | NWE | New England | LIV | Brunswick | |
18/02/1926 | Reallocation | 4419 | ARD | Ardsley | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
15/06/1926 | Reallocation | 3280 | LIV | Brunswick | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
04/09/1926 | Reallocation | 3290 | KX | Kings Cross | |||
09/10/1926 | Reallocation | 3290 | KX | Kings Cross | NWE | New England | |
05/01/1927 | Condemned | 3292 | COND | ||||
07/01/1927 | Reallocation | 4433 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
14/01/1927 | Reallocation | 4451 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
16/02/1927 | Reallocation | 4419 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | STM | St Margarets | |
01/03/1927 | Reallocation | 4419 | STM | St Margarets | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
04/03/1927 | Reallocation | 4419 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ARD | Ardsley | |
08/03/1927 | Reallocation | 4437 | LIV | Brunswick | KX | Kings Cross | |
11/03/1927 | Reallocation | 4418 | DON | Doncaster | NWE | New England | |
11/03/1927 | Reallocation | 4421 | DON | Doncaster | |||
12/03/1927 | Reallocation | 3287 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | DON | Doncaster | |
14/03/1927 | Reallocation | 4402 | LIV | Brunswick | KX | Kings Cross | |
02/07/1927 | Reallocation | 3251 | GRA | Grantham | KX | Kings Cross | |
02/07/1927 | Reallocation | 4419 | ARD | Ardsley | KX | Kings Cross | |
07/01/1928 | Reallocation | 4408 | NWE | New England | CAM | Cambridge | |
09/01/1928 | Reallocation | 4444 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
10/03/1928 | Reallocation | 4419 | KX | Kings Cross | GRA | Grantham | |
12/03/1928 | Reallocation | 4444 | CAM | Cambridge | KX | Kings Cross | |
17/03/1928 | Reallocation | 3286 | KX | Kings Cross | |||
24/05/1928 | Reallocation | 4408 | CAM | Cambridge | NWE | New England | |
14/06/1928 | Reallocation | 3288 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | KX | Kings Cross | |
14/06/1928 | Reallocation | 4427 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |||
04/07/1928 | Reallocation | 3276 | ARD | Ardsley | |||
14/07/1928 | Reallocation | 3276 | ARD | Ardsley | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
04/08/1928 | Reallocation | 4402 | KX | Kings Cross | DON | Doncaster | |
04/08/1928 | Reallocation | 4419 | GRA | Grantham | KX | Kings Cross | |
20/09/1928 | Reallocation | 4404 | KX | Kings Cross | CAM | Cambridge | |
29/09/1928 | Reallocation | 4419 | KX | Kings Cross | NEV | Neville Hill | |
22/11/1928 | Reallocation | 4430 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
17/12/1928 | Reallocation | 3276 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
20/12/1928 | Reallocation | 4402 | DON | Doncaster | CAM | Cambridge | |
1929 | Reallocation | 3278 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |||
16/02/1929 | Reallocation | 3278 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | KX | Kings Cross | |
16/02/1929 | Reallocation | 4437 | KX | Kings Cross | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |
02/03/1929 | Reallocation | 4455 | KX | Kings Cross | |||
16/03/1929 | Reallocation | 3297 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
21/03/1929 | Reallocation | 4455 | KX | Kings Cross | DON | Doncaster | |
29/04/1929 | Reallocation | 4419 | NEV | Neville Hill | KX | Kings Cross | |
07/05/1929 | Reallocation | 4441 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
12/07/1929 | Reallocation | 3287 | DON | Doncaster | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
30/11/1929 | Reallocation | 3272 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | KX | Kings Cross | |
04/12/1929 | Reallocation | 3272 | KX | Kings Cross | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |
31/01/1930 | Reallocation | 3295 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | KX | Kings Cross | |
13/02/1930 | Reallocation | 4403 | NWE | New England | |||
13/02/1930 | Reallocation | 4443 | NWE | New England | GRA | Grantham | |
24/03/1930 | Reallocation | 4403 | NWE | New England | GRA | Grantham | |
24/03/1930 | Reallocation | 4443 | GRA | Grantham | NWE | New England | |
27/10/1930 | Reallocation | 4403 | GRA | Grantham | NWE | New England | |
12/05/1932 | Reallocation | 4433 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
03/08/1932 | Reallocation | 3280 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
19/09/1932 | Reallocation | 3277 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | DON | Doncaster | |
20/09/1932 | Reallocation | 4423 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |||
07/11/1932 | Reallocation | 3276 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
20/12/1932 | Reallocation | 3296 | DON | Doncaster | |||
09/03/1933 | Reallocation | 4404 | CAM | Cambridge | NWE | New England | |
09/05/1933 | Reallocation | 3296 | DON | Doncaster | GRA | Grantham | |
19/07/1933 | Reallocation | 4439 | GRA | Grantham | CAM | Cambridge | |
17/08/1933 | Reallocation | 4413 | GRA | Grantham | |||
08/09/1933 | Reallocation | 4413 | GRA | Grantham | NWE | New England | |
14/09/1933 | Reallocation | 4453 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |||
06/11/1933 | Reallocation | 4453 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | DON | Doncaster | |
08/02/1934 | Reallocation | 3273 | DON | Doncaster | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
26/02/1934 | Reallocation | 4451 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | KX | Kings Cross | |
08/08/1934 | Reallocation | 3299 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
21/08/1934 | Reallocation | 4442 | KX | Kings Cross | |||
29/10/1934 | Reallocation | 4440 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
29/10/1934 | Reallocation | 4441 | CAM | Cambridge | KX | Kings Cross | |
07/11/1934 | Reallocation | 4440 | CAM | Cambridge | KX | Kings Cross | |
07/11/1934 | Reallocation | 4441 | KX | Kings Cross | CAM | Cambridge | |
04/01/1935 | Reallocation | 4440 | KX | Kings Cross | CAM | Cambridge | |
04/01/1935 | Reallocation | 4441 | CAM | Cambridge | KX | Kings Cross | |
09/02/1935 | Reallocation | 4443 | NWE | New England | KX | Kings Cross | |
12/02/1935 | Reallocation | 3279 | NWE | New England | |||
24/09/1935 | Reallocation | 4441 | KX | Kings Cross | DON | Doncaster | |
30/09/1935 | Reallocation | 4460 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |||
11/1935 | Reallocation | 3286 | KX | Kings Cross | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |
11/1935 | Reallocation | 4451 | KX | Kings Cross | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |
29/11/1935 | Reallocation | 3286 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |
29/11/1935 | Reallocation | 4451 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 4424 | YK | York (North) | YK | York (North) | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 4447 | YK | York (North) | YK | York (North) | |
17/06/1936 | Reallocation | 4447 | YK | York (North) | SEL | Selby | |
29/08/1936 | Reallocation | 4447 | SEL | Selby | YK | York (North) | |
26/11/1936 | Reallocation | 4460 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | NWE | New England | |
04/12/1936 | Reallocation | 4423 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | DON | Doncaster | |
23/02/1937 | Reallocation | 4449 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |
08/03/1937 | Reallocation | 4434 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |
13/03/1937 | Reallocation | 3273 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | KX | Kings Cross | |
16/08/1937 | Reallocation | 3273 | KX | Kings Cross | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
17/08/1937 | Reallocation | 4454 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
26/09/1937 | Reallocation | 3280 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | DON | Doncaster | |
09/10/1937 | Reallocation | 3273 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | KX | Kings Cross | |
12/10/1937 | Reallocation | 4454 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | DON | Doncaster | |
02/01/1938 | Reallocation | 4434 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | KX | Kings Cross | |
03/01/1938 | Reallocation | 3280 | DON | Doncaster | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
07/01/1938 | Reallocation | 4419 | KX | Kings Cross | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |
06/02/1938 | Reallocation | 3273 | KX | Kings Cross | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
20/02/1938 | Reallocation | 4411 | KX | Kings Cross | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |
26/04/1938 | Reallocation | 4416 | DON | Doncaster | CAM | Cambridge | |
28/05/1938 | Reallocation | 4431 | NWE | New England | |||
08/06/1938 | Reallocation | 3299 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
05/07/1938 | Reallocation | 3282 | NWE | New England | CLK | Colwick | |
13/07/1938 | Reallocation | 3278 | KX | Kings Cross | CLK | Colwick | |
07/08/1938 | Reallocation | 4434 | KX | Kings Cross | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |
08/08/1938 | Reallocation | 4428 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
05/10/1938 | Reallocation | 4440 | CAM | Cambridge | KX | Kings Cross | |
30/11/1938 | Reallocation | 3296 | GRA | Grantham | NWE | New England | |
30/11/1938 | Reallocation | 4414 | NWE | New England | |||
30/11/1938 | Reallocation | 4446 | NWE | New England | |||
01/01/1939 | Reallocation | 3297 | CAM | Cambridge | KX | Kings Cross | |
04/01/1939 | Reallocation | 4402 | CAM | Cambridge | CLK | Colwick | |
16/02/1939 | Reallocation | 3286 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | KX | Kings Cross | |
16/02/1939 | Reallocation | 3288 | KX | Kings Cross | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |
17/02/1939 | Reallocation | 3274 | KX | Kings Cross | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |
17/02/1939 | Reallocation | 4427 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | KX | Kings Cross | |
18/02/1939 | Reallocation | 3297 | KX | Kings Cross | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |
18/02/1939 | Reallocation | 4449 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | KX | Kings Cross | |
25/06/1939 | Reallocation | 4430 | CAM | Cambridge | GRA | Grantham | |
07/07/1939 | Reallocation | 4400 | NWE | New England | LIN | Lincoln | |
08/07/1939 | Reallocation | 3300 | KX | Kings Cross | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
06/08/1939 | Reallocation | 3276 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | DON | Doncaster | |
06/08/1939 | Reallocation | 3298 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
17/08/1939 | Reallocation | 3286 | KX | Kings Cross | LIN | Lincoln | |
21/09/1939 | Reallocation | 4416 | CAM | Cambridge | NWE | New England | |
29/09/1939 | Reallocation | 4439 | CAM | Cambridge | NWE | New England | |
14/02/1940 | Reallocation | 3296 | NWE | New England | LIN | Lincoln | |
17/02/1940 | Reallocation | 3286 | LIN | Lincoln | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
17/02/1940 | Reallocation | 4400 | LIN | Lincoln | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
14/03/1940 | Reallocation | 3286 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | LIN | Lincoln | |
15/03/1940 | Reallocation | 4400 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | LIN | Lincoln | |
30/03/1940 | Reallocation | 4452 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
01/04/1940 | Reallocation | 4425 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
04/11/1940 | Reallocation | 3299 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ARD | Ardsley | |
04/11/1940 | Reallocation | 4428 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ARD | Ardsley | |
27/04/1941 | Reallocation | 4444 | KX | Kings Cross | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |
11/05/1941 | Reallocation | 4427 | KX | Kings Cross | LIN | Lincoln | |
11/05/1941 | Reallocation | 4440 | KX | Kings Cross | LIN | Lincoln | |
13/05/1941 | Reallocation | 3291 | LIN | Lincoln | |||
06/10/1941 | Reallocation | 4408 | NWE | New England | CLK | Colwick | |
11/10/1941 | Reallocation | 3275 | CLK | Colwick | |||
14/10/1941 | Reallocation | 4440 | LIN | Lincoln | DON | Doncaster | |
15/10/1941 | Reallocation | 3291 | LIN | Lincoln | DON | Doncaster | |
15/10/1941 | Reallocation | 3299 | ARD | Ardsley | DON | Doncaster | |
15/10/1941 | Reallocation | 4428 | ARD | Ardsley | DON | Doncaster | |
09/12/1941 | Reallocation | 3301 | DON | Doncaster | |||
10/12/1941 | Reallocation | 4436 | KX | Kings Cross | DON | Doncaster | |
21/03/1942 | Reallocation | 4414 | NWE | New England | CLK | Colwick | |
21/03/1942 | Reallocation | 4446 | NWE | New England | CLK | Colwick | |
16/08/1942 | Reallocation | 4433 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ARD | Ardsley | |
20/09/1942 | Reallocation | 3300 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ARD | Ardsley | |
21/11/1942 | Reallocation | 3299 | DON | Doncaster | LIN | Lincoln | |
06/12/1942 | Reallocation | 3276 | DON | Doncaster | LIN | Lincoln | |
15/02/1943 | Reallocation | 4445 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |||
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 3300 | ARD | Ardsley | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 3273 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 3287 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 3298 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 4412 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 4420 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 4425 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 4452 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
23/05/1943 | Reallocation | 4433 | ARD | Ardsley | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
23/05/1943 | Reallocation | 4445 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ARD | Ardsley | |
02/06/1943 | Reallocation | 4431 | NWE | New England | KX | Kings Cross | |
01/07/1943 | Reallocation | 4424 | YK | York (North) | DON | Doncaster | |
01/07/1943 | Reallocation | 4447 | YK | York (North) | DON | Doncaster | |
16/07/1943 | Condemned | 4459 | COND | ||||
31/07/1943 | Reallocation | 3275 | CLK | Colwick | KX | Kings Cross | |
29/12/1943 | Reallocation | 3278 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
29/12/1943 | Reallocation | 4402 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
03/02/1944 | Condemned | 4430 | GRA | Grantham | COND | ||
29/02/1944 | Condemned | 4426 | KX | Kings Cross | COND | ||
09/03/1944 | Reallocation | 3285 | KX | Kings Cross | |||
11/03/1944 | Condemned | 4437 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | COND | ||
22/03/1944 | Reallocation | 4429 | KX | Kings Cross | |||
23/03/1944 | Reallocation | 4438 | GRA | Grantham | KX | Kings Cross | |
25/03/1944 | Reallocation | 4404 | NWE | New England | KX | Kings Cross | |
26/03/1944 | Reallocation | 4404 | KX | Kings Cross | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |
26/03/1944 | Reallocation | 4429 | KX | Kings Cross | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |
06/06/1944 | Condemned | 4407 | COND | ||||
25/06/1944 | Reallocation | 3277 | DON | Doncaster | KX | Kings Cross | |
25/06/1944 | Reallocation | 4415 | NWE | New England | |||
25/06/1944 | Reallocation | 4432 | NWE | New England | |||
25/06/1944 | Reallocation | 4440 | DON | Doncaster | KX | Kings Cross | |
25/06/1944 | Reallocation | 4441 | DON | Doncaster | KX | Kings Cross | |
05/07/1944 | Reallocation | 3291 | DON | Doncaster | CLK | Colwick | |
10/07/1944 | Reallocation | 3289 | CLK | Colwick | |||
13/07/1944 | Reallocation | 4425 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | DON | Doncaster | |
14/07/1944 | Reallocation | 4453 | DON | Doncaster | CLK | Colwick | |
17/07/1944 | Reallocation | 3298 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | CLK | Colwick | |
21/07/1944 | Reallocation | 3296 | LIN | Lincoln | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
21/07/1944 | Reallocation | 4420 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | DON | Doncaster | |
17/08/1944 | Reallocation | 3286 | LIN | Lincoln | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
15/10/1944 | Reallocation | 3289 | CLK | Colwick | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
21/10/1944 | Condemned | 4431 | KX | Kings Cross | COND | ||
28/10/1944 | Condemned | 4414 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
31/01/1945 | Condemned | 3277 | KX | Kings Cross | COND | ||
12/02/1945 | Reallocation | 3287 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | DON | Doncaster | |
12/02/1945 | Reallocation | 3296 | LNG | Langwith Junction | LIN | Lincoln | |
20/02/1945 | Condemned | 4418 | NWE | New England | COND | ||
20/02/1945 | Condemned | 4427 | LIN | Lincoln | COND | ||
04/04/1945 | Condemned | 3298 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
21/04/1945 | Condemned | 3291 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
21/04/1945 | Condemned | 4417 | NWE | New England | COND | ||
26/04/1945 | Reallocation | 4410 | KX | Kings Cross | |||
26/04/1945 | Condemned | 4434 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | COND | ||
28/04/1945 | Reallocation | 4422 | KX | Kings Cross | |||
05/05/1945 | Condemned | 3275 | KX | Kings Cross | COND | ||
20/05/1945 | Reallocation | 3286 | LNG | Langwith Junction | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
25/05/1945 | Condemned | 3299 | LIN | Lincoln | COND | ||
08/07/1945 | Reallocation | 3289 | LNG | Langwith Junction | LIN | Lincoln | |
26/07/1945 | Condemned | 3278 | DON | Doncaster | COND | ||
26/07/1945 | Condemned | 4408 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
26/07/1945 | Condemned | 4432 | NWE | New England | COND | ||
31/08/1945 | Condemned | 4461 | COND | ||||
09/09/1945 | Reallocation | 3286 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | LIN | Lincoln | |
02/10/1945 | Condemned | 4444 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | COND | ||
06/10/1945 | Condemned | 3287 | DON | Doncaster | COND | ||
12/10/1945 | Reallocation | 4415 | NWE | New England | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |
20/10/1945 | Condemned | 4416 | NWE | New England | COND | ||
27/10/1945 | Condemned | 4460 | NWE | New England | COND | ||
09/11/1945 | Condemned | 3290 | NWE | New England | COND | ||
07/12/1945 | Condemned | 3296 | LIN | Lincoln | COND | ||
09/12/1945 | Reallocation | 4445 | ARD | Ardsley | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
20/12/1945 | Condemned | 3289 | LIN | Lincoln | COND | ||
20/12/1945 | Condemned | 4435 | COND | ||||
04/01/1946 | Condemned | 2843 | NWE | New England | COND | ||
05/01/1946 | Condemned | 2805 | LIN | Lincoln | COND | ||
26/01/1946 | Condemned | 2813 | KX | Kings Cross | COND | ||
16/02/1946 | Condemned | 2836 | NWE | New England | COND | ||
27/02/1946 | Condemned | 2882 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
30/03/1946 | Condemned | 2887 | COND | ||||
02/05/1946 | Condemned | 2803 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | COND | ||
02/05/1946 | Condemned | 2814 | KX | Kings Cross | COND | ||
02/05/1946 | Condemned | 2863 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | COND | ||
02/05/1946 | Condemned | 2873 | KX | Kings Cross | COND | ||
05/05/1946 | Reallocation | 3293 | NWE | New England | KX | Kings Cross | |
09/06/1946 | Reallocation | 3294 | NWE | New England | BOS | Boston | |
15/06/1946 | Condemned | 2858 | DON | Doncaster | COND | ||
15/06/1946 | Condemned | 2878 | GRA | Grantham | COND | ||
15/06/1946 | Condemned | 2880 | COND | ||||
27/07/1946 | Condemned | 2883 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
28/07/1946 | Reallocation | 3273 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | KX | Kings Cross | |
28/07/1946 | Reallocation | 4412 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | KX | Kings Cross | |
07/08/1946 | Reallocation | 3301 | DON | Doncaster | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
07/09/1946 | Condemned | 2884 | DON | Doncaster | COND | ||
28/09/1946 | Condemned | 2852 | KX | Kings Cross | COND | ||
20/10/1946 | Reallocation | 2811 | CLK | Colwick | KX | Kings Cross | |
20/10/1946 | Reallocation | 2876 | CLK | Colwick | KX | Kings Cross | |
26/10/1946 | Condemned | 2809 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | COND | ||
16/11/1946 | Condemned | 2831 | COND | ||||
01/01/1947 | Condemned | 2855 | DON | Doncaster | COND | ||
02/01/1947 | Condemned | 2869 | NWE | New England | COND | ||
05/01/1947 | Reallocation | 2801 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | KX | Kings Cross | |
05/01/1947 | Reallocation | 2817 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | KX | Kings Cross | |
05/01/1947 | Reallocation | 2822 | BOS | Boston | GRA | Grantham | |
05/01/1947 | Reallocation | 2825 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | KX | Kings Cross | |
05/01/1947 | Reallocation | 2834 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | KX | Kings Cross | |
05/01/1947 | Reallocation | 2841 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | KX | Kings Cross | |
05/01/1947 | Reallocation | 2845 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | KX | Kings Cross | |
05/01/1947 | Reallocation | 2859 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | KX | Kings Cross | |
05/01/1947 | Reallocation | 2881 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | KX | Kings Cross | |
18/01/1947 | Reallocation | 2849 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | KX | Kings Cross | |
22/01/1947 | Reallocation | 2821 | KX | Kings Cross | NWE | New England | |
22/01/1947 | Reallocation | 2870 | KX | Kings Cross | NWE | New England | |
22/01/1947 | Reallocation | 2879 | KX | Kings Cross | NWE | New England | |
22/01/1947 | Reallocation | 2888 | NWE | New England | |||
23/01/1947 | Condemned | 2872 | KX | Kings Cross | COND | ||
30/01/1947 | Condemned | 2802 | KX | Kings Cross | COND | ||
30/01/1947 | Condemned | 2811 | KX | Kings Cross | COND | ||
01/02/1947 | Reallocation | 2821 | NWE | New England | KX | Kings Cross | |
01/02/1947 | Reallocation | 2876 | KX | Kings Cross | NWE | New England | |
05/02/1947 | Condemned | 2825 | KX | Kings Cross | COND | ||
29/04/1947 | Condemned | 2840 | KX | Kings Cross | COND | ||
29/04/1947 | Condemned | 2845 | KX | Kings Cross | COND | ||
29/04/1947 | Condemned | 2888 | NWE | New England | COND | ||
20/05/1947 | Condemned | 2842 | KX | Kings Cross | COND | ||
27/05/1947 | Condemned | 2853 | DON | Doncaster | COND | ||
04/07/1947 | Condemned | 2833 | NWE | New England | COND | ||
04/07/1947 | Condemned | 2879 | NWE | New England | COND | ||
28/07/1947 | Condemned | 2800 | KX | Kings Cross | COND | ||
05/08/1947 | Condemned | 2832 | DON | Doncaster | COND | ||
05/08/1947 | Condemned | 2850 | DON | Doncaster | COND | ||
05/08/1947 | Condemned | 2851 | DON | Doncaster | COND | ||
05/08/1947 | Condemned | 2866 | DON | Doncaster | COND | ||
05/08/1947 | Condemned | 2886 | COND | ||||
08/08/1947 | Condemned | 2801 | KX | Kings Cross | COND | ||
08/08/1947 | Condemned | 2823 | KX | Kings Cross | COND | ||
08/08/1947 | Condemned | 2834 | KX | Kings Cross | COND | ||
08/08/1947 | Condemned | 2841 | KX | Kings Cross | COND | ||
08/08/1947 | Condemned | 2859 | KX | Kings Cross | COND | ||
08/08/1947 | Condemned | 2868 | KX | Kings Cross | COND | ||
14/08/1947 | Condemned | 2835 | COND | ||||
21/08/1947 | Condemned | 2812 | COND | ||||
17/10/1947 | Condemned | 2815 | LIN | Lincoln | COND | ||
06/12/1947 | Condemned | 2830 | LIN | Lincoln | COND | ||
03/01/1948 | Condemned | 2876 | NWE | New England | COND | ||
14/02/1948 | Condemned | 62808 | NWE | New England | COND | ||
14/02/1948 | Condemned | 2870 | NWE | New England | COND | ||
21/02/1948 | Reallocation | 2804 | 98W | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||
21/05/1948 | Condemned | 2871 | KX | Kings Cross | COND | ||
12/06/1948 | Reallocation | 62817 | KX | Kings Cross | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |
12/06/1948 | Reallocation | 2881 | KX | Kings Cross | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |
19/06/1948 | Reallocation | 62828 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |
02/07/1948 | Condemned | 2821 | KX | Kings Cross | COND | ||
19/07/1948 | Condemned | 62849 | KX | Kings Cross | COND | ||
22/07/1948 | Condemned | 62829 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | COND | ||
22/01/1949 | Condemned | 2875 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | COND | ||
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 2803 | 98W | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
29/04/1949 | Condemned | 2881 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | COND | ||
27/05/1949 | Condemned | 62810 | COND | ||||
25/06/1949 | Reallocation | 62817 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
09/07/1949 | Reallocation | 2854 | DON | Doncaster | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
09/07/1949 | Reallocation | 2877 | DON | Doncaster | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
29/08/1949 | Condemned | 62828 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | COND | ||
07/11/1949 | Condemned | 2877 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
19/11/1949 | Reallocation | 62885 | DON | Doncaster | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
23/01/1950 | Condemned | 62839 | COND | ||||
23/01/1950 | Condemned | 62885 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
03/04/1950 | Condemned | 2854 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
08/05/1950 | Condemned | 62817 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
27/11/1950 | Condemned | 62822 | GRA | Grantham | COND |