GNR/LNER Ivatt "C1" Class 4-4-2
Class | LNER (1924) | GNR | LNER (1924 Tmp) | LNER (1946) | BR | BR (BR Tmp) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
C1 | 3251 | 251 | 251 | 2800 | 12/1902 | GRA KX W |
Grantham Kings Cross Withdrawn |
17/02/1924 02/07/1927 28/07/1947 |
28/07/1947 | ||
C1 | 3272 | 272 | 2801 | 04/1904 | SHF KX HIT KX W |
Sheffield Neepsend Kings Cross Hitchin (GNR) Kings Cross Withdrawn |
25/08/1925 30/11/1929 04/12/1929 05/01/1947 08/08/1947 |
08/08/1947 | |||
C1 | 3273 | 273 | 273 | 2802 | 04/1904 | GRA DON SHF KX SHF KX SHF SHF KX W |
Grantham Doncaster Sheffield Neepsend Kings Cross Sheffield Neepsend Kings Cross Sheffield Neepsend Sheffield Darnall Kings Cross Withdrawn |
09/03/1924 26/04/1925 08/02/1934 13/03/1937 16/08/1937 09/10/1937 06/02/1938 11/04/1943 28/07/1946 30/01/1947 |
30/01/1947 | ||
C1 | 3274 | 274 | 2803 | 04/1904 | COP KX HIT W NPT |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Kings Cross Hitchin (GNR) Withdrawn Newport (Teeside) |
20/09/1924 06/10/1925 17/02/1939 02/05/1946 12/02/1949 |
02/05/1946 | |||
C1 | 3275 | 275 | 2804 | 05/1904 | CLK KX W HAV |
Colwick Kings Cross Withdrawn Haverton Hill |
11/10/1941 31/07/1943 05/05/1945 21/02/1948 |
05/05/1945 | |||
C1 | 3276 | 276 | 276 | 2805 | 05/1904 | ARD COP SHF SHF DON LIN W |
Ardsley Copley Hill (Leeds) Sheffield Neepsend Sheffield Neepsend Doncaster Lincoln Withdrawn |
04/07/1928 14/07/1928 17/12/1928 07/11/1932 06/08/1939 06/12/1942 05/01/1946 |
05/01/1946 | ||
C1 | 3277 | 277 | 2806 | 05/1904 | SHF DON KX W |
Sheffield Neepsend Doncaster Kings Cross Withdrawn |
04/06/1925 19/09/1932 25/06/1944 31/01/1945 |
31/01/1945 | |||
C1 | 3278 | 278 | 2807 | 05/1904 | HIT KX CLK DON W |
Hitchin (GNR) Kings Cross Colwick Doncaster Withdrawn |
1929 16/02/1929 13/07/1938 29/12/1943 26/07/1945 |
26/07/1945 | |||
C1 | 3279 | 279 | 2808 | 62808 | 06/1904 | NWE W |
New England Withdrawn |
12/02/1935 14/02/1948 |
14/02/1948 | ||
C1 | 3280 | 280 | 2809 | 06/1904 | LIV SHF COP DON COP W |
Brunswick Sheffield Neepsend Copley Hill (Leeds) Doncaster Copley Hill (Leeds) Withdrawn |
07/09/1925 15/06/1926 03/08/1932 26/09/1937 03/01/1938 26/10/1946 |
26/10/1946 | |||
C1 | 3281 | 281 | 281 | 2810 | 62810 | 06/1904 | W | Withdrawn | 27/05/1949 | 27/05/1949 | |
C1 | 3282 | 282 | 2811 | 06/1904 | NWE CLK KX W |
New England Colwick Kings Cross Withdrawn |
15/06/1924 05/07/1938 20/10/1946 30/01/1947 |
30/01/1947 | |||
C1 | 3283 | 283 | 283 | 2812 | 06/1904 | W | Withdrawn | 21/08/1947 | 21/08/1947 | ||
C1 | 3284 | 284 | 2813 | 07/1904 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
11/05/1924 26/01/1946 |
26/01/1946 | |||
C1 | 3285 | 285 | 2814 | 06/1904 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
09/03/1944 02/05/1946 |
02/05/1946 | |||
C1 | 3286 | 286 | 2815 | 06/1904 | KX HIT HIT KX LIN RET LIN LNG RET LIN W |
Kings Cross Hitchin (GNR) Hitchin (GNR) Kings Cross Lincoln Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Lincoln Langwith Junction Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Lincoln Withdrawn |
17/03/1928 11/1935 29/11/1935 16/02/1939 17/08/1939 17/02/1940 14/03/1940 17/08/1944 20/05/1945 09/09/1945 17/10/1947 |
17/10/1947 | |||
C1 | 3287 | 287 | 2816 | 07/1904 | SHF DON SHF SHF DON W |
Sheffield Neepsend Doncaster Sheffield Neepsend Sheffield Darnall Doncaster Withdrawn |
27/05/1925 12/03/1927 12/07/1929 11/04/1943 12/02/1945 06/10/1945 |
06/10/1945 | |||
C1 | 3288 | 288 | 2817 | 62817 | 08/1904 | HIT KX HIT KX HIT SHF W |
Hitchin (GNR) Kings Cross Hitchin (GNR) Kings Cross Hitchin (GNR) Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
12/07/1924 14/06/1928 16/02/1939 05/01/1947 12/06/1948 25/06/1949 08/05/1950 |
08/05/1950 | ||
C1 | 3289 | 289 | 2818 | 07/1904 | CLK LNG LIN W |
Colwick Langwith Junction Lincoln Withdrawn |
10/07/1944 15/10/1944 08/07/1945 20/12/1945 |
20/12/1945 | |||
C1 | 3290 | 290 | 2819 | 08/1904 | KX NWE W |
Kings Cross New England Withdrawn |
04/09/1926 09/10/1926 09/11/1945 |
09/11/1945 | |||
C1 | 3291 | 291 | 2820 | 08/1904 | LIN DON CLK W |
Lincoln Doncaster Colwick Withdrawn |
13/05/1941 15/10/1941 05/07/1944 21/04/1945 |
21/04/1945 | |||
C1 | 3292 | 292 | 03/1905 | W | Withdrawn | 05/01/1927 | 05/01/1927 | ||||
C1 | 3293 | 293 | 293 | 2821 | 05/1905 | NWE KX NWE KX W |
New England Kings Cross New England Kings Cross Withdrawn |
11/06/1925 05/05/1946 22/01/1947 01/02/1947 02/07/1948 |
02/07/1948 | ||
C1 | 3294 | 294 | 2822 | 62822 | 05/1905 | NWE BOS GRA W |
New England Boston Grantham Withdrawn |
08/06/1924 09/06/1946 05/01/1947 27/11/1950 |
27/11/1950 | ||
C1 | 3295 | 295 | 2823 | 05/1905 | SHF KX W |
Sheffield Neepsend Kings Cross Withdrawn |
12/04/1925 31/01/1930 08/08/1947 |
08/08/1947 | |||
C1 | 3296 | 296 | 2824 | 05/1905 | DON GRA NWE LIN LNG LIN W |
Doncaster Grantham New England Lincoln Langwith Junction Lincoln Withdrawn |
20/12/1932 09/05/1933 30/11/1938 14/02/1940 21/07/1944 12/02/1945 07/12/1945 |
07/12/1945 | |||
C1 | 3297 | 297 | 297 | 2825 | 05/1905 | CAM KX HIT KX W |
Cambridge Kings Cross Hitchin (GNR) Kings Cross Withdrawn |
16/03/1929 01/01/1939 18/02/1939 05/01/1947 05/02/1947 |
05/02/1947 | ||
C1 | 3298 | 298 | 2826 | 05/1905 | SHF SHF CLK W |
Sheffield Neepsend Sheffield Darnall Colwick Withdrawn |
06/08/1939 11/04/1943 17/07/1944 04/04/1945 |
04/04/1945 | |||
C1 | 3299 | 299 | 299 | 2827 | 06/1905 | SHF COP ARD DON LIN W |
Sheffield Neepsend Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Doncaster Lincoln Withdrawn |
08/08/1934 08/06/1938 04/11/1940 15/10/1941 21/11/1942 25/05/1945 |
25/05/1945 | ||
C1 | 3300 | 300 | 2828 | 62828 | 06/1905 | GRA KX COP ARD COP HIT W |
Grantham Kings Cross Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Copley Hill (Leeds) Hitchin (GNR) Withdrawn |
10/03/1923 25/05/1924 08/07/1939 20/09/1942 28/03/1943 19/06/1948 29/08/1949 |
29/08/1949 | ||
C1 | 3301 | 301 | 2829 | 62829 | 06/1905 | DON COP W |
Doncaster Copley Hill (Leeds) Withdrawn |
09/12/1941 07/08/1946 22/07/1948 |
22/07/1948 | ||
C1 | 4300 | 1300 | 07/1905 | W | Withdrawn | 25/10/1924 | 25/10/1924 | ||||
C1 | 4400 | 1400 | 2830 | 06/1905 | NWE LIN RET LIN W |
New England Lincoln Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Lincoln Withdrawn |
22/01/1926 07/07/1939 17/02/1940 15/03/1940 06/12/1947 |
06/12/1947 | |||
C1 | 4401 | 1401 | 2831 | 06/1905 | W | Withdrawn | 16/11/1946 | 16/11/1946 | |||
C1 | 4402 | 1402 | 2832 | 06/1905 | DON LIV KX DON CAM CLK DON W |
Doncaster Brunswick Kings Cross Doncaster Cambridge Colwick Doncaster Withdrawn |
03/02/1924 29/04/1925 14/03/1927 04/08/1928 20/12/1928 04/01/1939 29/12/1943 05/08/1947 |
05/08/1947 | |||
C1 | 4403 | 1403 | 2833 | 06/1905 | NWE GRA NWE W |
New England Grantham New England Withdrawn |
13/02/1930 24/03/1930 27/10/1930 04/07/1947 |
04/07/1947 | |||
C1 | 4404 | 1404 | 2834 | 06/1905 | KX CAM NWE KX HIT KX W |
Kings Cross Cambridge New England Kings Cross Hitchin (GNR) Kings Cross Withdrawn |
03/08/1924 20/09/1928 09/03/1933 25/03/1944 26/03/1944 05/01/1947 08/08/1947 |
08/08/1947 | |||
C1 | 4405 | 1405 | 2835 | 06/1905 | W | Withdrawn | 14/08/1947 | 14/08/1947 | |||
C1 | 4406 | 1406 | 2836 | 06/1905 | NWE W |
New England Withdrawn |
08/06/1924 16/02/1946 |
16/02/1946 | |||
C1 | 4407 | 1407 | 2837 | 07/1905 | W | Withdrawn | 06/06/1944 | 06/06/1944 | |||
C1 | 4408 | 1408 | 2838 | 07/1905 | KX NWE CAM NWE CLK W |
Kings Cross New England Cambridge New England Colwick Withdrawn |
26/08/1924 07/04/1925 07/01/1928 24/05/1928 06/10/1941 26/07/1945 |
26/07/1945 | |||
C1 | 4409 | 1409 | 2839 | 62839 | 07/1905 | W | Withdrawn | 23/01/1950 | 23/01/1950 | ||
C1 | 4410 | 1410 | 2840 | 08/1905 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
26/04/1945 29/04/1947 |
29/04/1947 | |||
C1 | 4411 | 1411 | 2841 | 03/1906 | KX HIT KX W |
Kings Cross Hitchin (GNR) Kings Cross Withdrawn |
29/04/1924 20/02/1938 05/01/1947 08/08/1947 |
08/08/1947 | |||
C1 | 4412 | 1412 | 2842 | 03/1906 | SHF SHF KX W |
Sheffield Neepsend Sheffield Darnall Kings Cross Withdrawn |
27/04/1925 11/04/1943 28/07/1946 20/05/1947 |
20/05/1947 | |||
C1 | 4413 | 1413 | 1413 | 2843 | 03/1906 | GRA NWE W |
Grantham New England Withdrawn |
17/08/1933 08/09/1933 04/01/1946 |
04/01/1946 | ||
C1 | 4414 | 1414 | 1414 | 2844 | 03/1906 | NWE CLK W |
New England Colwick Withdrawn |
30/11/1938 21/03/1942 28/10/1944 |
28/10/1944 | ||
C1 | 4415 | 1415 | 2845 | 04/1906 | NWE HIT KX W |
New England Hitchin (GNR) Kings Cross Withdrawn |
25/06/1944 12/10/1945 05/01/1947 29/04/1947 |
29/04/1947 | |||
C1 | 4416 | 1416 | 1416 | 2846 | 04/1906 | DON CAM NWE W |
Doncaster Cambridge New England Withdrawn |
03/02/1924 26/04/1938 21/09/1939 20/10/1945 |
20/10/1945 | ||
C1 | 4417 | 1417 | 2847 | 04/1906 | NWE W |
New England Withdrawn |
03/1925 21/04/1945 |
21/04/1945 | |||
C1 | 4418 | 1418 | 2848 | 05/1906 | DON NWE W |
Doncaster New England Withdrawn |
24/02/1924 11/03/1927 20/02/1945 |
20/02/1945 | |||
C1 | 4419 | 1419 | 2849 | 62849 | 05/1906 | DAR GHD HTN ARD COP STM COP ARD KX GRA KX NEV KX HIT KX W |
Darlington Gateshead Heaton Ardsley Copley Hill (Leeds) St Margarets Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Kings Cross Grantham Kings Cross Neville Hill Kings Cross Hitchin (GNR) Kings Cross Withdrawn |
03/05/1924 27/10/1925 05/12/1925 01/02/1926 18/02/1926 16/02/1927 01/03/1927 04/03/1927 02/07/1927 10/03/1928 04/08/1928 29/09/1928 29/04/1929 07/01/1938 18/01/1947 19/07/1948 |
19/07/1948 | ||
C1 | 4420 | 1420 | 2850 | 05/1906 | SHF SHF DON W |
Sheffield Neepsend Sheffield Darnall Doncaster Withdrawn |
06/1923 11/04/1943 21/07/1944 05/08/1947 |
05/08/1947 | |||
C1 | 4421 | 1421 | 2851 | 08/1907 | DON W |
Doncaster Withdrawn |
11/03/1927 05/08/1947 |
05/08/1947 | |||
C1 | 4422 | 1422 | 2852 | 03/1907 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
28/04/1945 28/09/1946 |
28/09/1946 | |||
C1 | 4423 | 1423 | 2853 | 04/1907 | COP DON W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Doncaster Withdrawn |
20/09/1932 04/12/1936 27/05/1947 |
27/05/1947 | |||
C1 | 4424 | 1424 | 2854 | 04/1907 | YK YK DON SHF W |
York (North) York (North) Doncaster Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
04/1924 01/1936 01/07/1943 09/07/1949 03/04/1950 |
03/04/1950 | |||
C1 | 4425 | 1425 | 2855 | 04/1907 | SHF SHF DON W |
Sheffield Neepsend Sheffield Darnall Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/04/1940 11/04/1943 13/07/1944 01/01/1947 |
01/01/1947 | |||
C1 | 4426 | 1426 | 2856 | 05/1907 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
14/04/1924 29/02/1944 |
29/02/1944 | |||
C1 | 4427 | 1427 | 1427 | 2857 | 05/1907 | HIT KX LIN W |
Hitchin (GNR) Kings Cross Lincoln Withdrawn |
14/06/1928 17/02/1939 11/05/1941 20/02/1945 |
20/02/1945 | ||
C1 | 4428 | 1428 | 2858 | 05/1907 | GRA SHF COP ARD DON W |
Grantham Sheffield Neepsend Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Doncaster Withdrawn |
06/05/1923 23/12/1923 08/08/1938 04/11/1940 15/10/1941 15/06/1946 |
15/06/1946 | |||
C1 | 4429 | 1429 | 2859 | 05/1907 | KX HIT KX W |
Kings Cross Hitchin (GNR) Kings Cross Withdrawn |
22/03/1944 26/03/1944 05/01/1947 08/08/1947 |
08/08/1947 | |||
C1 | 4430 | 1430 | 1430 | 2860 | 06/1907 | CAM GRA W |
Cambridge Grantham Withdrawn |
22/11/1928 25/06/1939 03/02/1944 |
03/02/1944 | ||
C1 | 4431 | 1431 | 2861 | 06/1907 | NWE KX W |
New England Kings Cross Withdrawn |
28/05/1938 02/06/1943 21/10/1944 |
21/10/1944 | |||
C1 | 4432 | 1432 | 1432 | 2862 | 11/1907 | NWE W |
New England Withdrawn |
25/06/1944 26/07/1945 |
26/07/1945 | ||
C1 | 4433 | 1433 | 2863 | 11/1907 | SHF RET SHF COP ARD COP W |
Sheffield Neepsend Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Sheffield Neepsend Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Copley Hill (Leeds) Withdrawn |
29/06/1923 31/08/1925 07/01/1927 12/05/1932 16/08/1942 23/05/1943 02/05/1946 |
02/05/1946 | |||
C1 | 4434 | 1434 | 2864 | 11/1907 | SHF HIT KX HIT W |
Sheffield Neepsend Hitchin (GNR) Kings Cross Hitchin (GNR) Withdrawn |
06/1923 08/03/1937 02/01/1938 07/08/1938 26/04/1945 |
26/04/1945 | |||
C1 | 4435 | 1435 | 2865 | 11/1907 | W | Withdrawn | 20/12/1945 | 20/12/1945 | |||
C1 | 4436 | 1436 | 2866 | 11/1907 | ARD KX DON W |
Ardsley Kings Cross Doncaster Withdrawn |
14/09/1925 05/10/1925 10/12/1941 05/08/1947 |
05/08/1947 | |||
C1 | 4437 | 1437 | 2867 | 03/1908 | KX NWE LIV KX HIT W |
Kings Cross New England Brunswick Kings Cross Hitchin (GNR) Withdrawn |
10/08/1924 02/10/1925 05/02/1926 08/03/1927 16/02/1929 11/03/1944 |
11/03/1944 | |||
C1 | 4438 | 1438 | 2868 | 03/1908 | GRA KX W |
Grantham Kings Cross Withdrawn |
23/06/1923 23/03/1944 08/08/1947 |
08/08/1947 | |||
C1 | 4439 | 1439 | 2869 | 03/1908 | GRA CAM NWE W |
Grantham Cambridge New England Withdrawn |
23/06/1923 19/07/1933 29/09/1939 02/01/1947 |
02/01/1947 | |||
C1 | 4440 | 1440 | 2870 | 03/1908 | CAM KX CAM KX LIN DON KX NWE W |
Cambridge Kings Cross Cambridge Kings Cross Lincoln Doncaster Kings Cross New England Withdrawn |
29/10/1934 07/11/1934 04/01/1935 05/10/1938 11/05/1941 14/10/1941 25/06/1944 22/01/1947 14/02/1948 |
14/02/1948 | |||
C1 | 4441 | 1441 | 2871 | 03/1908 | CAM KX CAM KX DON KX W |
Cambridge Kings Cross Cambridge Kings Cross Doncaster Kings Cross Withdrawn |
07/05/1929 29/10/1934 07/11/1934 04/01/1935 24/09/1935 25/06/1944 21/05/1948 |
21/05/1948 | |||
C1 | 4442 | 1442 | 2872 | 05/1908 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
21/08/1934 23/01/1947 |
23/01/1947 | |||
C1 | 4443 | 1443 | 2873 | 04/1908 | NWE LIV NWE GRA NWE KX W |
New England Brunswick New England Grantham New England Kings Cross Withdrawn |
07/02/1925 18/04/1925 28/04/1925 13/02/1930 24/03/1930 09/02/1935 02/05/1946 |
02/05/1946 | |||
C1 | 4444 | 1444 | 2874 | 04/1908 | CAM KX HIT W |
Cambridge Kings Cross Hitchin (GNR) Withdrawn |
09/01/1928 12/03/1928 27/04/1941 02/10/1945 |
02/10/1945 | |||
C1 | 4445 | 1445 | 2875 | 05/1908 | COP ARD COP W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Copley Hill (Leeds) Withdrawn |
15/02/1943 23/05/1943 09/12/1945 22/01/1949 |
22/01/1949 | |||
C1 | 4446 | 1446 | 1446 | 2876 | 05/1908 | NWE CLK KX NWE W |
New England Colwick Kings Cross New England Withdrawn |
30/11/1938 21/03/1942 20/10/1946 01/02/1947 03/01/1948 |
03/01/1948 | ||
C1 | 4447 | 1447 | 2877 | 2877 | 06/1908 | DON YK YK SEL YK DON SHF W |
Doncaster York (North) York (North) Selby York (North) Doncaster Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
10/03/1923 12/1923 01/1936 17/06/1936 29/08/1936 01/07/1943 09/07/1949 07/11/1949 |
07/11/1949 | ||
C1 | 4448 | 1448 | 1448 | 2878 | 07/1908 | GRA W |
Grantham Withdrawn |
02/03/1924 15/06/1946 |
15/06/1946 | ||
C1 | 4449 | 1449 | 2879 | 07/1908 | SHF HIT KX NWE W |
Sheffield Neepsend Hitchin (GNR) Kings Cross New England Withdrawn |
06/1923 23/02/1937 18/02/1939 22/01/1947 04/07/1947 |
04/07/1947 | |||
C1 | 4450 | 1450 | 2880 | 07/1908 | W | Withdrawn | 15/06/1946 | 15/06/1946 | |||
C1 | 4451 | 1451 | 2881 | 07/1908 | SHF KX HIT HIT KX HIT W |
Sheffield Neepsend Kings Cross Hitchin (GNR) Hitchin (GNR) Kings Cross Hitchin (GNR) Withdrawn |
14/01/1927 26/02/1934 11/1935 29/11/1935 05/01/1947 12/06/1948 29/04/1949 |
29/04/1949 | |||
C1 | 4452 | 1452 | 2882 | 08/1910 | SHF SHF W |
Sheffield Neepsend Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
30/03/1940 11/04/1943 27/02/1946 |
27/02/1946 | |||
C1 | 4453 | 1453 | 2883 | 08/1910 | COP DON CLK W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Doncaster Colwick Withdrawn |
14/09/1933 06/11/1933 14/07/1944 27/07/1946 |
27/07/1946 | |||
C1 | 4454 | 1454 | 2884 | 08/1910 | SHF DON W |
Sheffield Neepsend Doncaster Withdrawn |
17/08/1937 12/10/1937 07/09/1946 |
07/09/1946 | |||
C1 | 4455 | 1455 | 1455 | 2885 | 62885 | 08/1910 | KX DON SHF W |
Kings Cross Doncaster Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
02/03/1929 21/03/1929 19/11/1949 23/01/1950 |
23/01/1950 | |
C1 | 4456 | 1456 | 2886 | 09/1910 | W | Withdrawn | 05/08/1947 | 05/08/1947 | |||
C1 | 4457 | 1457 | 2887 | 09/1910 | W | Withdrawn | 30/03/1946 | 30/03/1946 | |||
C1 | 4458 | 1458 | 2888 | 10/1910 | NWE W |
New England Withdrawn |
22/01/1947 29/04/1947 |
29/04/1947 | |||
C1 | 4459 | 1459 | 2889 | 10/1910 | W | Withdrawn | 16/07/1943 | 16/07/1943 | |||
C1 | 4460 | 1460 | 2890 | 10/1910 | COP NWE W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) New England Withdrawn |
30/09/1935 26/11/1936 27/10/1945 |
27/10/1945 | |||
C1 | 4461 | 1461 | 2891 | 11/1910 | W | Withdrawn | 31/08/1945 | 31/08/1945 |