Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 337 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 4511 Week
» 16680 Month
» 243441 Year
» 754543 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Raven "B16" Class 4-6-0


NER LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR (Interim) BR BR (Orig) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
846 1406 61475 61406 03/1920 Heaton 15/04/1963 Hull Dairycoates 43.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1963 43.19
926 1421 61421 12/1920 Tweedmouth 29/06/1964 York (North) 43.5 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 09/1964 43.78
2364 1435 61435 11/1922 York (North) 21/07/1964 Hull Dairycoates 41.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 02/11/1964 41.99
2366 1437 61437 04/01/1923 York (North) 29/06/1964 Hull Dairycoates 41.42 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/10/1964 41.80
2367 1438 61438 17/01/1923 Gateshead 29/06/1964 Hull Dairycoates 41.42 Cut Drapers (Hull) 05/10/1964 41.75
1372 1455 61455 19/10/1923 Heaton 09/09/1963 York (North) 39.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1963 40.02
1374 1457 61457 23/10/1923 York (North) 29/06/1964 York (North) 40.67 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 09/1964 40.93