Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 337 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 4511 Week
» 16680 Month
» 243441 Year
» 754543 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Raven "B16" Class 4-6-0


NER LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR (Interim) BR BR (Orig) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
840 1400 61469 61400 12/1919 Heaton 19/10/1960 York (North) 40.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1960 40.95
841 1401 61470 61401 12/1919 Heaton 23/11/1959 Neville Hill 39.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1960 40.11
842 1402 61471 61402 12/1919 Heaton 05/09/1960 Neville Hill 40.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1960 40.78
843 1403 61472 61403 12/1919 Heaton 20/04/1964 Hull Dairycoates 44.33 Cut Drapers (Hull) 09/11/1964 44.93
844 1404 61473 61404 12/1919 York (North) 25/09/1961 York (North) 41.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1961 41.95
845 1405 61474 61405 04/1920 York (North) 20/01/1958 Selby 37.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1958 37.94
846 1406 61475 61406 03/1920 Heaton 15/04/1963 Hull Dairycoates 43.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1963 43.19
847 1407 61476 61407 03/1920 York (North) 16/09/1963 Mirfield 43.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1963 43.78
848 1408 61477 61408 04/1920 York (North) 01/02/1960 York (North) 39.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1960 39.86
849 1409 61478 61409 04/1920 York (North) 12/12/1960 York (North) 40.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1960 40.70
906 1410 61410 06/1920 Heaton 03/10/1960 York (North) 40.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1960 40.36
908 1411 61411 08/1920 York (North) 25/09/1961 Mirfield 41.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1962 42.28
909 1412 E1412 61412 08/1920 Tweedmouth 25/09/1961 Mirfield 41.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1963 43.28
911 1413 61413 08/1920 York (North) 25/09/1961 Mirfield 41.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1963 42.61
914 1414 61414 09/1920 Heaton 25/09/1961 Mirfield 41 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1961 41.19
915 1415 61415 09/1920 York (North) 25/09/1961 Neville Hill 41 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1963 42.52
920 1416 61416 09/1920 Gateshead 12/05/1961 Mirfield 40.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1961 40.69
921 1417 61417 10/1920 York (North) 03/09/1962 York (North) 41.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1962 42.19
922 1418 61418 11/1920 Heaton 29/06/1964 Hull Dairycoates 43.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/10/1964 43.94
923 1419 61419 11/1920 York (North) 25/09/1961 York (North) 40.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1963 42.52
924 1420 61420 12/1920 Tweedmouth 23/09/1963 Hull Dairycoates 42.75 Cut Drapers (Hull) 02/02/1964 43.16
925 12/1920 York (North) 13/06/1942 York (North) 21.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
926 1421 61421 12/1920 Tweedmouth 29/06/1964 York (North) 43.5 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 09/1964 43.78
927 1422 61422 12/1920 York (North) 25/09/1961 York (North) 40.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1961 41.03
928 1423 E1423 61423 01/1921 Tweedmouth 25/09/1961 York (North) 40.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1961 40.86
929 1424 61424 02/1921 Neville Hill 05/10/1960 York (North) 39.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1960 39.69
930 1425 61425 02/1921 Heaton 25/09/1961 York (North) 40.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1961 40.78
931 1426 61426 03/1921 Neville Hill 29/09/1959 York (North) 38.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1959 38.61
932 1427 61427 03/1921 Heaton 07/03/1960 Neville Hill 39 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1960 39.03
933 1428 61428 03/1921 York (North) 31/10/1960 Neville Hill 39.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1960 39.70
934 1429 61429 04/1921 Heaton 25/09/1961 Neville Hill 40.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1961 40.53
936 1430 61430 04/1921 York (North) 01/10/1959 York (North) 38.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1959 38.53
937 1431 E1431 61431 05/1921 Heaton 25/09/1961 York (North) 40.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1961 40.61
942 1432 61432 06/1921 York (North) 03/07/1961 Neville Hill 40.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1961 40.36
943 1433 61433 06/1921 Heaton 30/11/1959 York (North) 38.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1960 38.61
2363 1434 61434 11/1922 Gateshead 29/06/1964 York (North) 41.58 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 09/1964 41.86
2364 1435 61435 11/1922 York (North) 21/07/1964 Hull Dairycoates 41.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 02/11/1964 41.99
2365 1436 61436 12/1922 Gateshead 25/09/1961 York (North) 38.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1962 39.27
2366 1437 61437 04/01/1923 York (North) 29/06/1964 Hull Dairycoates 41.42 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/10/1964 41.80
2367 1438 61438 17/01/1923 Gateshead 29/06/1964 Hull Dairycoates 41.42 Cut Drapers (Hull) 05/10/1964 41.75
2368 1439 61439 19/02/1923 York (North) 20/08/1962 York (North) 39.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1962 39.76
2369 1440 61440 08/03/1923 Gateshead 15/08/1960 York (North) 37.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1960 37.72
2370 1441 61441 12/03/1923 York (North) 27/10/1959 York (North) 36.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1959 36.70
2371 1442 61442 28/03/1923 Gateshead 01/02/1960 Neville Hill 36.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1960 36.91
2372 1443 61443 17/04/1923 York (North) 25/09/1961 York (North) 38.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1961 38.61
2373 1444 61444 04/05/1923 York (North) 29/06/1964 Hull Dairycoates 41.08 Cut Drapers (Hull) 28/09/1964 41.43
2374 1445 61445 19/05/1923 York (North) 04/07/1961 Scarborough 38.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 08/1961 38.27
2375 1446 61446 23/05/1923 Gateshead 17/01/1961 Neville Hill 37.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 04/1961 37.92
2376 1447 E1447 61447 29/05/1923 York (North) 25/09/1961 Mirfield 38.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1961 38.49
2377 1448 61448 06/06/1923 Gateshead 29/06/1964 York (North) 41 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 09/1964 41.31
2378 1449 61449 29/06/1923 York (North) 03/07/1963 Mirfield 40.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1963 40.24
2379 1450 61450 30/06/1923 Gateshead 25/09/1961 York (North) 38.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1962 38.66
2380 1451 61451 31/07/1923 York (North) 25/09/1961 York (North) 38.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1961 38.32
2381 1452 61452 16/08/1923 Gateshead 25/09/1961 York (North) 38.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1962 38.53
2382 1453 61453 31/08/1923 York (North) 17/06/1963 Hull Dairycoates 39.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/1963 39.90
1371 1454 61454 29/09/1923 York (North) 29/06/1964 York (North) 40.75 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 09/1964 40.99
1372 1455 61455 19/10/1923 Heaton 09/09/1963 York (North) 39.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1963 40.02
1373 1456 61456 19/10/1923 Heaton 01/08/1960 York (North) 36.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1960 36.93
1374 1457 61457 23/10/1923 York (North) 29/06/1964 York (North) 40.67 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 09/1964 40.93
1375 1458 E1458 61458 30/10/1923 Tweedmouth 02/11/1959 York (North) 36.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1959 36.15
1376 1459 61459 31/10/1923 Tweedmouth 25/09/1961 York (North) 37.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1962 38.32
1377 1460 61460 10/11/1923 York (North) 15/09/1961 York (North) 37.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1963 39.29
1378 1461 61461 15/11/1923 Tweedmouth 16/09/1963 Mirfield 39.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1963 40.11
1379 1462 61462 21/11/1923 Heaton 29/05/1961 York (North) 37.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1961 37.59
1380 1463 61463 29/11/1923 Neville Hill 29/06/1964 Hull Dairycoates 40.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 21/09/1964 40.84
1381 1464 61464 04/12/1923 Darlington 16/09/1963 Mirfield 39.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1963 40.06
1382 1465 61465 13/12/1923 Darlington 25/01/1960 York (North) 36.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1961 37.12
1383 1466 61466 20/12/1923 Heaton 24/07/1961 York (North) 37.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1961 37.93
1384 1467 E1467 61467 01/01/1924 Tweedmouth 08/06/1964 Hull Dairycoates 40.42 Cut Drapers (Hull) 26/10/1964 40.85
1385 1468 61468 01/01/1924 Heaton 16/09/1963 Mirfield 39.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1964 40.15