Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 337 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 4511 Week
» 16680 Month
» 243441 Year
» 754543 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Raven "B16" Class 4-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
12/1919 To Service 840   NEW HTN Heaton  
12/1919 To Service 841   NEW HTN Heaton  
12/1919 To Service 842   NEW HTN Heaton  
12/1919 To Service 843   NEW HTN Heaton  
12/1919 To Service 844   NEW YK York (North)  
03/1920 To Service 846   NEW HTN Heaton  
03/1920 To Service 847   NEW YK York (North)  
04/1920 To Service 845   NEW YK York (North)  
04/1920 To Service 848   NEW YK York (North)  
04/1920 To Service 849   NEW YK York (North)  
06/1920 To Service 906   NEW HTN Heaton  
08/1920 To Service 908   NEW YK York (North)  
08/1920 To Service 909   NEW TWD Tweedmouth  
08/1920 To Service 911   NEW YK York (North)  
09/1920 To Service 914   NEW HTN Heaton  
09/1920 To Service 915   NEW YK York (North)  
09/1920 To Service 920   NEW GHD Gateshead  
10/1920 To Service 921   NEW YK York (North)  
11/1920 To Service 922   NEW HTN Heaton  
11/1920 To Service 923   NEW YK York (North)  
12/1920 To Service 924   NEW TWD Tweedmouth  
12/1920 To Service 925   NEW YK York (North)  
12/1920 To Service 926   NEW TWD Tweedmouth  
12/1920 To Service 927   NEW YK York (North)  
01/1921 To Service 928   NEW TWD Tweedmouth  
02/1921 To Service 929   NEW NEV Neville Hill  
02/1921 To Service 930   NEW HTN Heaton  
03/1921 To Service 931   NEW NEV Neville Hill  
03/1921 To Service 932   NEW HTN Heaton  
03/1921 To Service 933   NEW YK York (North)  
04/1921 To Service 934   NEW HTN Heaton  
04/1921 To Service 936   NEW YK York (North)  
05/1921 To Service 937   NEW HTN Heaton  
06/1921 To Service 942   NEW YK York (North)  
06/1921 To Service 943   NEW HTN Heaton  
11/1922 To Service 2363   NEW GHD Gateshead  
11/1922 To Service 2364   NEW YK York (North)  
12/1922 To Service 2365   NEW GHD Gateshead  
04/01/1923 To Service 2366   NEW YK York (North)  
17/01/1923 To Service 2367   NEW GHD Gateshead  
19/02/1923 To Service 2368   NEW YK York (North)  
08/03/1923 To Service 2369   NEW GHD Gateshead  
12/03/1923 To Service 2370   NEW YK York (North)  
28/03/1923 To Service 2371   NEW GHD Gateshead  
17/04/1923 To Service 2372   NEW YK York (North)  
05/1923 Reallocation 915 YK York (North) SEL Selby  
04/05/1923 To Service 2373   NEW YK York (North)  
19/05/1923 To Service 2374   NEW YK York (North)  
23/05/1923 To Service 2375   NEW GHD Gateshead  
29/05/1923 To Service 2376   NEW YK York (North)  
30/05/1923 Reallocation 2368 YK York (North) SEL Selby  
06/06/1923 To Service 2377   NEW GHD Gateshead  
29/06/1923 To Service 2378   NEW YK York (North)  
30/06/1923 To Service 2379   NEW GHD Gateshead  
31/07/1923 To Service 2380   NEW YK York (North)  
16/08/1923 To Service 2381   NEW GHD Gateshead  
31/08/1923 To Service 2382   NEW YK York (North)  
01/09/1923 Reallocation 2368 SEL Selby YK York (North)  
29/09/1923 To Service 1371   NEW YK York (North)  
19/10/1923 To Service 1372   NEW HTN Heaton  
19/10/1923 To Service 1373   NEW HTN Heaton  
23/10/1923 To Service 1374   NEW YK York (North)  
30/10/1923 To Service 1375   NEW TWD Tweedmouth  
31/10/1923 To Service 1376   NEW TWD Tweedmouth  
10/11/1923 To Service 1377   NEW YK York (North)  
15/11/1923 To Service 1378   NEW TWD Tweedmouth  
21/11/1923 To Service 1379   NEW HTN Heaton  
29/11/1923 To Service 1380   NEW NEV Neville Hill  
04/12/1923 To Service 1381   NEW DAR Darlington  
13/12/1923 To Service 1382   NEW DAR Darlington  
20/12/1923 To Service 1383   NEW HTN Heaton  
01/01/1924 To Service 1384   NEW TWD Tweedmouth  
01/01/1924 To Service 1385   NEW HTN Heaton  
19/03/1924 Reallocation 915 SEL Selby DAR Darlington  
08/05/1924 Reallocation 924 TWD Tweedmouth YK York (North)  
08/05/1924 Reallocation 1384 TWD Tweedmouth YK York (North)  
01/07/1924 Reallocation 932 HTN Heaton BLA Blaydon  
15/07/1924 Reallocation 845 YK York (North) SCA Scarborough  
22/09/1924 Reallocation 911 YK York (North) GOR Gorton  
01/10/1924 Reallocation 845 SCA Scarborough YK York (North)  
01/1925 Reallocation 922 HTN Heaton TDK Tyne Dock  
01/1925 Reallocation 2365 GHD Gateshead BLA Blaydon  
07/01/1925 Reallocation 943 HTN Heaton TDK Tyne Dock  
06/03/1925 Reallocation 911 GOR Gorton YK York (North)  
06/07/1925 Reallocation 942 YK York (North) SCA Scarborough  
07/07/1925 Reallocation 924 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
07/07/1925 Reallocation 1384 YK York (North) HLD Hull Dairycoates  
28/09/1925 Reallocation 942 SCA Scarborough YK York (North)  
22/10/1927 Reallocation 933 YK York (North) TWD Tweedmouth  
25/11/1927 Reallocation 925 YK York (North) HLD Hull Dairycoates  
14/05/1928 Reallocation 923 YK York (North) SCA Scarborough  
11/06/1928 Reallocation 921 YK York (North) TWD Tweedmouth  
15/06/1928 Reallocation 936 YK York (North) HLD Hull Dairycoates  
15/06/1928 Reallocation 942 YK York (North) HLD Hull Dairycoates  
27/05/1929 Reallocation 2380 YK York (North) HLD Hull Dairycoates  
27/05/1929 Reallocation 1371 YK York (North) HLD Hull Dairycoates  
27/05/1929 Reallocation 1374 YK York (North) HLD Hull Dairycoates  
22/07/1929 Reallocation 921 TWD Tweedmouth YK York (North)  
22/07/1929 Reallocation 926 TWD Tweedmouth YK York (North)  
01/08/1929 Reallocation 928 TWD Tweedmouth HLD Hull Dairycoates  
09/08/1929 Reallocation 933 TWD Tweedmouth HLD Hull Dairycoates  
29/08/1929 Reallocation 1376 TWD Tweedmouth HLD Hull Dairycoates  
30/08/1929 Reallocation 909 TWD Tweedmouth HLD Hull Dairycoates  
16/09/1929 Reallocation 1375 TWD Tweedmouth HLD Hull Dairycoates  
03/10/1929 Reallocation 908 YK York (North) SCA Scarborough  
03/10/1929 Reallocation 923 SCA Scarborough YK York (North)  
09/10/1929 Reallocation 1378 TWD Tweedmouth HLD Hull Dairycoates  
31/10/1929 Reallocation 914 HTN Heaton NEV Neville Hill  
02/11/1929 Reallocation 908 SCA Scarborough YK York (North)  
22/11/1929 Reallocation 1383 HTN Heaton NEV Neville Hill  
14/01/1930 Reallocation 845 YK York (North) SCA Scarborough  
27/11/1930 Reallocation 840 HTN Heaton HLD Hull Dairycoates  
27/11/1930 Reallocation 841 HTN Heaton HLD Hull Dairycoates  
27/11/1930 Reallocation 842 HTN Heaton HLD Hull Dairycoates  
27/11/1930 Reallocation 1385 HTN Heaton HLD Hull Dairycoates  
30/03/1931 Reallocation 930 HTN Heaton HLD Hull Dairycoates  
30/03/1931 Reallocation 934 HTN Heaton HLD Hull Dairycoates  
30/03/1931 Reallocation 937 HTN Heaton HLD Hull Dairycoates  
30/03/1931 Reallocation 2367 GHD Gateshead HLD Hull Dairycoates  
30/03/1931 Reallocation 2369 GHD Gateshead HLD Hull Dairycoates  
30/03/1931 Reallocation 2379 GHD Gateshead HLD Hull Dairycoates  
23/06/1931 Reallocation 848 YK York (North) HLB Hull Botanic Gardens  
23/06/1931 Reallocation 849 YK York (North) HLB Hull Botanic Gardens  
23/06/1931 Reallocation 2371 GHD Gateshead YK York (North)  
23/06/1931 Reallocation 1373 HTN Heaton YK York (North)  
20/07/1931 Reallocation 1372 HTN Heaton TWD Tweedmouth  
20/07/1931 Reallocation 1379 HTN Heaton TWD Tweedmouth  
28/10/1931 Reallocation 911 YK York (North) TWD Tweedmouth  
28/10/1931 Reallocation 921 YK York (North) TWD Tweedmouth  
22/06/1932 Reallocation 848 HLB Hull Botanic Gardens NEV Neville Hill  
22/06/1932 Reallocation 849 HLB Hull Botanic Gardens NEV Neville Hill  
13/07/1933 Reallocation 2374 YK York (North) SUN Sunderland  
19/01/1934 Reallocation 2374 SUN Sunderland YK York (North)  
16/10/1934 Reallocation 906 HTN Heaton HLD Hull Dairycoates  
16/10/1934 Reallocation 911 TWD Tweedmouth YK York (North)  
16/10/1934 Reallocation 921 TWD Tweedmouth YK York (North)  
16/10/1934 Reallocation 1372 TWD Tweedmouth YK York (North)  
16/10/1934 Reallocation 1379 TWD Tweedmouth NEV Neville Hill  
18/10/1934 Reallocation 843 HTN Heaton HLD Hull Dairycoates  
18/10/1934 Reallocation 846 HTN Heaton HLD Hull Dairycoates  
29/06/1936 Reallocation 920 GHD Gateshead YK York (North)  
29/06/1936 Reallocation 2381 GHD Gateshead YK York (North)  
29/12/1936 Reallocation 922 TDK Tyne Dock HLD Hull Dairycoates  
15/01/1937 Reallocation 2377 GHD Gateshead BLA Blaydon  
16/01/1937 Reallocation 2375 GHD Gateshead DAR Darlington  
19/01/1937 Reallocation 1373 YK York (North) HLD Hull Dairycoates  
22/03/1937 Reallocation 943 TDK Tyne Dock HLD Hull Dairycoates  
31/05/1937 Reallocation 2363 GHD Gateshead YK York (North)  
28/09/1937 Reallocation 2377 BLA Blaydon HLD Hull Dairycoates  
30/09/1937 Reallocation 932 BLA Blaydon YK York (North)  
30/09/1937 Reallocation 2365 BLA Blaydon HLD Hull Dairycoates  
27/05/1939 Reallocation 934 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
01/06/1939 Reallocation 925 HLD Hull Dairycoates SCA Scarborough  
04/06/1939 Reallocation 2379 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
04/06/1939 Reallocation 1373 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
06/03/1940 Reallocation 928 HLD Hull Dairycoates NEV Neville Hill  
06/03/1940 Reallocation 1375 HLD Hull Dairycoates NEV Neville Hill  
25/03/1940 Reallocation 943 HLD Hull Dairycoates CUD Cudworth  
11/05/1940 Reallocation 1371 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
25/05/1940 Reallocation 925 SCA Scarborough YK York (North)  
30/05/1940 Reallocation 942 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
30/05/1940 Reallocation 2369 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
01/06/1940 Reallocation 843 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
01/06/1940 Reallocation 922 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
01/06/1940 Reallocation 1385 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
05/07/1940 Reallocation 943 CUD Cudworth YK York (North)  
07/11/1940 Reallocation 843 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
07/11/1940 Reallocation 847 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
26/08/1941 Reallocation 906 HLD Hull Dairycoates DAR Darlington  
29/08/1941 Reallocation 1382 DAR Darlington HLD Hull Dairycoates  
04/04/1942 Reallocation 933 HLD Hull Dairycoates DAR Darlington  
13/06/1942 Condemned 925 YK York (North)   COND  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 840 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 841 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 842 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 843 NEV Neville Hill YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 845 SCA Scarborough YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 846 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 847 NEV Neville Hill YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 848 NEV Neville Hill YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 849 NEV Neville Hill YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 906 DAR Darlington YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 909 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 914 NEV Neville Hill YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 915 DAR Darlington YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 924 NEV Neville Hill YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 928 NEV Neville Hill YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 929 NEV Neville Hill YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 930 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 931 NEV Neville Hill YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 933 DAR Darlington YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 936 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 937 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 2365 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 2367 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 2375 DAR Darlington YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 2377 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 2380 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 1374 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 1375 NEV Neville Hill YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 1376 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 1378 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 1379 NEV Neville Hill YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 1380 NEV Neville Hill YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 1381 DAR Darlington YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 1382 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 1383 NEV Neville Hill YK York (North)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 1384 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
06/05/1946 Reallocation 840 YK York (North) SKN Stockton  
06/05/1946 Reallocation 842 YK York (North) SKN Stockton  
06/05/1946 Reallocation 911 YK York (North) SKN Stockton  
06/05/1946 Reallocation 936 YK York (North) SKN Stockton  
06/05/1946 Reallocation 942 YK York (North) SKN Stockton  
29/09/1946 Reallocation 915 YK York (North) DAR Darlington  
29/09/1946 Reallocation 1446 YK York (North) DAR Darlington  
27/07/1947 Reallocation 1415 DAR Darlington YK York (North)  
27/07/1947 Reallocation 1430 SKN Stockton YK York (North)  
27/07/1947 Reallocation 1446 DAR Darlington YK York (North)  
24/08/1947 Reallocation 1413 SKN Stockton YK York (North)  
31/08/1947 Reallocation 1402 SKN Stockton YK York (North)  
31/08/1947 Reallocation 1432 SKN Stockton YK York (North)  
25/10/1947 Reallocation 1400 SKN Stockton YK York (North)  
07/08/1949 Reallocation 61400 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
07/08/1949 Reallocation 61401 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
07/08/1949 Reallocation 61402 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
07/08/1949 Reallocation 61408 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
07/08/1949 Reallocation 61409 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
07/08/1949 Reallocation 61410 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
07/08/1949 Reallocation 1411 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
07/08/1949 Reallocation 1412 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
07/08/1949 Reallocation 61413 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
07/08/1949 Reallocation 61414 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
07/08/1949 Reallocation 61415 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
07/08/1949 Reallocation 1416 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
07/08/1949 Reallocation 1427 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
07/08/1949 Reallocation 61428 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
07/08/1949 Reallocation 1429 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
07/08/1949 Reallocation 61430 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
07/08/1949 Reallocation 1431 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
07/08/1949 Reallocation 61432 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
07/08/1949 Reallocation 61440 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
07/08/1949 Reallocation 61441 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
07/08/1949 Reallocation 61442 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
07/08/1949 Reallocation 1445 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
07/08/1949 Reallocation 61446 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
07/08/1949 Reallocation 61447 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
28/08/1949 Reallocation 1425 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
28/08/1949 Reallocation 1433 YK York (North) NEV Neville Hill  
11/09/1949 Reallocation 61404 YK York (North) HLD Hull Dairycoates  
11/09/1949 Reallocation 61408 NEV Neville Hill HLD Hull Dairycoates  
11/09/1949 Reallocation 1416 NEV Neville Hill HLD Hull Dairycoates  
11/09/1949 Reallocation 1419 YK York (North) HLD Hull Dairycoates  
11/09/1949 Reallocation 1426 YK York (North) HLD Hull Dairycoates  
11/09/1949 Reallocation 61430 NEV Neville Hill HLD Hull Dairycoates  
11/09/1949 Reallocation 61441 NEV Neville Hill HLD Hull Dairycoates  
11/09/1949 Reallocation 61443 YK York (North) HLD Hull Dairycoates  
11/09/1949 Reallocation 1450 YK York (North) HLD Hull Dairycoates  
11/09/1949 Reallocation 61451 YK York (North) HLD Hull Dairycoates  
11/09/1949 Reallocation 1452 YK York (North) HLD Hull Dairycoates  
11/09/1949 Reallocation 1456 YK York (North) HLD Hull Dairycoates  
11/09/1949 Reallocation 1458 YK York (North) HLD Hull Dairycoates  
11/09/1949 Reallocation 61459 YK York (North) HLD Hull Dairycoates  
11/09/1949 Reallocation 61460 YK York (North) HLD Hull Dairycoates  
11/09/1949 Reallocation 61462 YK York (North) HLD Hull Dairycoates  
11/09/1949 Reallocation 61465 YK York (North) HLD Hull Dairycoates  
11/09/1949 Reallocation 1466 YK York (North) HLD Hull Dairycoates  
04/12/1949 Reallocation 61404 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
04/12/1949 Reallocation 61408 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
04/12/1949 Reallocation 1416 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
04/12/1949 Reallocation 1419 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
04/12/1949 Reallocation 1423 YK York (North) YK York (North)  
04/12/1949 Reallocation 1426 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
04/12/1949 Reallocation 61430 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
04/12/1949 Reallocation 61441 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
04/12/1949 Reallocation 61443 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
04/12/1949 Reallocation 1450 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
04/12/1949 Reallocation 61451 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
04/12/1949 Reallocation 61452 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
04/12/1949 Reallocation 1456 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
04/12/1949 Reallocation 1458 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
04/12/1949 Reallocation 61459 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
04/12/1949 Reallocation 61460 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
04/12/1949 Reallocation 61462 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
04/12/1949 Reallocation 61465 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
04/12/1949 Reallocation 1466 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
06/05/1951 Reallocation 61473 YK York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
06/05/1951 Reallocation 61474 YK York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
06/05/1951 Reallocation 61416 YK York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
06/05/1951 Reallocation 1419 YK York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
06/05/1951 Reallocation 61422 YK York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
06/05/1951 Reallocation 61424 YK York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
06/05/1951 Reallocation 61426 YK York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
06/05/1951 Reallocation 61436 YK York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
06/05/1951 Reallocation 61441 YK York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
06/05/1951 Reallocation 61443 YK York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
06/05/1951 Reallocation 61451 YK York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
06/05/1951 Reallocation 61452 YK York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
06/05/1951 Reallocation 61456 YK York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
06/05/1951 Reallocation 61458 YK York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
06/05/1951 Reallocation 61459 YK York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
06/05/1951 Reallocation 61460 YK York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
06/05/1951 Reallocation 61462 YK York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
06/05/1951 Reallocation 61465 YK York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
06/05/1951 Reallocation 61466 YK York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
01/07/1951 Reallocation 61445 NEV Neville Hill 50E Scarborough  
21/10/1951 Reallocation 61416 50B Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
21/10/1951 Reallocation 61426 50B Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
21/10/1951 Reallocation 61441 50B Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
21/10/1951 Reallocation 61456 50B Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
21/10/1951 Reallocation 61459 50B Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
04/11/1951 Reallocation 61451 50B Neville Hill 50E Scarborough  
17/02/1952 Reallocation 61419 50B Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
17/02/1952 Reallocation 61436 50B Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
17/02/1952 Reallocation 61443 50B Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
17/02/1952 Reallocation 61451 50E Scarborough 50A York (North)  
17/02/1952 Reallocation 61460 50B Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
07/06/1953 Reallocation 61422 50B Neville Hill 50C Selby  
07/06/1953 Reallocation 61442 NEV Neville Hill 50D Starbeck  
15/11/1953 Reallocation 61473 50B Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
15/11/1953 Reallocation 61474 50B Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
15/11/1953 Reallocation 61424 50B Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
15/11/1953 Reallocation 61452 50B Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
15/11/1953 Reallocation 61458 50B Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
15/11/1953 Reallocation 61462 50B Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
15/11/1953 Reallocation 61465 50B Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
15/11/1953 Reallocation 61466 50B Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
14/03/1954 Reallocation 61473 50A York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
14/03/1954 Reallocation 61474 50A York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
14/03/1954 Reallocation 61424 50A York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
14/03/1954 Reallocation 61452 50A York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
14/03/1954 Reallocation 61458 50A York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
14/03/1954 Reallocation 61462 50A York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
14/03/1954 Reallocation 61465 50A York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
14/03/1954 Reallocation 61466 50A York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
18/07/1954 Reallocation 61473 50B Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
18/07/1954 Reallocation 61474 50B Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
18/07/1954 Reallocation 61424 50B Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
18/07/1954 Reallocation 61458 50B Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
18/07/1954 Reallocation 61462 50B Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
18/07/1954 Reallocation 61465 50B Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
18/07/1954 Reallocation 61466 50B Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
01/05/1955 Reallocation 61478 NEV Neville Hill 50D Starbeck  
01/05/1955 Reallocation 61442 50D Starbeck 50B Neville Hill  
29/05/1955 Reallocation 61474 50A York (North) 50C Selby  
29/05/1955 Reallocation 61422 50C Selby 50A York (North)  
25/09/1955 Reallocation 61469 NEV Neville Hill 52B Heaton  
25/09/1955 Reallocation 61410 NEV Neville Hill 52B Heaton  
25/09/1955 Reallocation 61413 NEV Neville Hill 52B Heaton  
25/09/1955 Reallocation 61414 NEV Neville Hill 52B Heaton  
25/09/1955 Reallocation 61415 NEV Neville Hill 52B Heaton  
25/09/1955 Reallocation 61440 NEV Neville Hill 52B Heaton  
25/09/1955 Reallocation 61447 NEV Neville Hill 52B Heaton  
20/11/1955 Reallocation 61451 50A York (North) 52B Heaton  
20/11/1955 Reallocation 61456 50A York (North) 52B Heaton  
20/11/1955 Reallocation 61458 50A York (North) 52B Heaton  
13/05/1956 Reallocation 61469 52B Heaton 52C Blaydon  
13/05/1956 Reallocation 61414 52B Heaton 52C Blaydon  
10/06/1956 Reallocation 61414 52C Blaydon 50B Neville Hill  
10/06/1956 Reallocation 61415 52B Heaton 50B Neville Hill  
10/06/1956 Reallocation 61447 52B Heaton 50B Neville Hill  
08/07/1956 Reallocation 61469 52C Blaydon 52B Heaton  
23/09/1956 Reallocation 61433 NEV Neville Hill 50C Selby  
30/06/1957 Reallocation 61419 50A York (North) 50C Selby  
30/06/1957 Reallocation 61459 50A York (North) 50C Selby  
15/09/1957 Reallocation 61419 50C Selby 50A York (North)  
20/01/1958 Condemned 61474 50C Selby   COND  
09/02/1958 Reallocation 61466 50A York (North) 50C Selby  
08/06/1958 Reallocation 61469 52B Heaton 50C Selby  
08/06/1958 Reallocation 61410 52B Heaton 50A York (North)  
08/06/1958 Reallocation 61413 52B Heaton 50A York (North)  
08/06/1958 Reallocation 61440 52B Heaton 50A York (North)  
08/06/1958 Reallocation 61451 52B Heaton 50A York (North)  
08/06/1958 Reallocation 61456 52B Heaton 50C Selby  
08/06/1958 Reallocation 61458 52B Heaton 50C Selby  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 61478 50D Starbeck 50A York (North)  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 61433 50C Selby 50A York (North)  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 61456 50C Selby 50A York (North)  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 61458 50C Selby 50A York (North)  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 61459 50C Selby 50A York (North)  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 61452 50B Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
13/09/1959 Reallocation 61469 50C Selby 50A York (North)  
13/09/1959 Reallocation 61466 50C Selby 50A York (North)  
29/09/1959 Condemned 61426 50A York (North)   COND  
01/10/1959 Condemned 61430 YK York (North)   COND  
27/10/1959 Condemned 61441 50A York (North)   COND  
02/11/1959 Condemned 61458 50A York (North)   COND  
23/11/1959 Condemned 61470 NEV Neville Hill   COND  
30/11/1959 Condemned 61433 50A York (North)   COND  
25/01/1960 Condemned 61465 50A York (North)   COND  
01/02/1960 Condemned 61477 YK York (North)   COND  
01/02/1960 Condemned 61442 50B Neville Hill   COND  
14/02/1960 Reallocation 61425 NEV Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
14/02/1960 Reallocation 61431 NEV Neville Hill 50A York (North)  
07/03/1960 Condemned 61427 NEV Neville Hill   COND  
01/08/1960 Condemned 61456 50A York (North)   COND  
15/08/1960 Condemned 61440 50A York (North)   COND  
05/09/1960 Condemned 61471 NEV Neville Hill   COND  
03/10/1960 Condemned 61410 50A York (North)   COND  
05/10/1960 Condemned 61424 50A York (North)   COND  
19/10/1960 Condemned 61469 50A York (North)   COND  
31/10/1960 Condemned 61428 NEV Neville Hill   COND  
11/12/1960 Reallocation 61411 NEV Neville Hill 56D Mirfield  
11/12/1960 Reallocation 61412 NEV Neville Hill 56D Mirfield  
11/12/1960 Reallocation 61413 50A York (North) 56D Mirfield  
11/12/1960 Reallocation 61414 50B Neville Hill 56D Mirfield  
11/12/1960 Reallocation 61416 50A York (North) 56D Mirfield  
11/12/1960 Reallocation 61447 50B Neville Hill 56D Mirfield  
12/12/1960 Condemned 61478 50A York (North)   COND  
17/01/1961 Condemned 61446 NEV Neville Hill   COND  
12/05/1961 Condemned 61416 56D Mirfield   COND  
29/05/1961 Condemned 61462 50A York (North)   COND  
03/07/1961 Condemned 61432 NEV Neville Hill   COND  
04/07/1961 Condemned 61445 50E Scarborough   COND  
24/07/1961 Condemned 61466 50A York (North)   COND  
10/09/1961 Reallocation 61476 YK York (North) 56D Mirfield  
10/09/1961 Reallocation 61449 YK York (North) 56D Mirfield  
10/09/1961 Reallocation 61461 YK York (North) 56D Mirfield  
10/09/1961 Reallocation 61464 YK York (North) 56D Mirfield  
10/09/1961 Reallocation 61468 YK York (North) 56D Mirfield  
15/09/1961 Condemned 61460 50A York (North)   COND  
25/09/1961 Condemned 61473 50A York (North)   COND  
25/09/1961 Condemned 61411 56D Mirfield   COND  
25/09/1961 Condemned 61412 56D Mirfield   COND  
25/09/1961 Condemned 61413 56D Mirfield   COND  
25/09/1961 Condemned 61414 56D Mirfield   COND  
25/09/1961 Condemned 61415 50B Neville Hill   COND  
25/09/1961 Condemned 61419 50A York (North)   COND  
25/09/1961 Condemned 61422 50A York (North)   COND  
25/09/1961 Condemned 61423 YK York (North)   COND  
25/09/1961 Condemned 61425 50A York (North)   COND  
25/09/1961 Condemned 61429 NEV Neville Hill   COND  
25/09/1961 Condemned 61431 50A York (North)   COND  
25/09/1961 Condemned 61436 50A York (North)   COND  
25/09/1961 Condemned 61443 50A York (North)   COND  
25/09/1961 Condemned 61447 56D Mirfield   COND  
25/09/1961 Condemned 61450 YK York (North)   COND  
25/09/1961 Condemned 61451 50A York (North)   COND  
25/09/1961 Condemned 61452 50A York (North)   COND  
25/09/1961 Condemned 61459 50A York (North)   COND  
20/08/1962 Condemned 61439 YK York (North)   COND  
03/09/1962 Condemned 61417 YK York (North)   COND  
02/12/1962 Reallocation 61472 YK York (North) 50B Hull Dairycoates  
02/12/1962 Reallocation 61418 YK York (North) 50B Hull Dairycoates  
02/12/1962 Reallocation 61420 YK York (North) 50B Hull Dairycoates  
02/12/1962 Reallocation 61435 YK York (North) 50B Hull Dairycoates  
02/12/1962 Reallocation 61437 YK York (North) 50B Hull Dairycoates  
02/12/1962 Reallocation 61438 YK York (North) 50B Hull Dairycoates  
02/12/1962 Reallocation 61444 YK York (North) 50B Hull Dairycoates  
02/12/1962 Reallocation 61453 YK York (North) 50B Hull Dairycoates  
02/12/1962 Reallocation 61463 YK York (North) 50B Hull Dairycoates  
02/12/1962 Reallocation 61467 YK York (North) 50B Hull Dairycoates  
13/01/1963 Reallocation 61475 YK York (North) 50B Hull Dairycoates  
15/04/1963 Condemned 61475 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
17/06/1963 Condemned 61453 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
03/07/1963 Condemned 61449 56D Mirfield   COND  
09/09/1963 Condemned 61455 YK York (North)   COND  
16/09/1963 Condemned 61476 56D Mirfield   COND  
16/09/1963 Condemned 61461 56D Mirfield   COND  
16/09/1963 Condemned 61464 56D Mirfield   COND  
16/09/1963 Condemned 61468 56D Mirfield   COND  
23/09/1963 Condemned 61420 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
20/04/1964 Condemned 61472 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
08/06/1964 Condemned 61467 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
29/06/1964 Condemned 61418 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
29/06/1964 Condemned 61421 YK York (North)   COND  
29/06/1964 Condemned 61434 YK York (North)   COND  
29/06/1964 Condemned 61437 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
29/06/1964 Condemned 61438 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
29/06/1964 Condemned 61444 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
29/06/1964 Condemned 61448 YK York (North)   COND  
29/06/1964 Condemned 61454 YK York (North)   COND  
29/06/1964 Condemned 61457 YK York (North)   COND  
29/06/1964 Condemned 61463 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
21/07/1964 Condemned 61435 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND