Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 687 Today
» 1013 Yesterday
» 4522 Week
» 22993 Month
» 158658 Year
» 669760 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Raven "B16" Class 4-6-0


Class NER LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR (Orig) BR (Interim) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
B16/1 840   1400 61400   61469 12/1919 HTN
HLD
YK
SKN
YK
NEV
52B
52C
52B
50C
50A
W
Heaton
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Stockton
York (North)
Neville Hill
Heaton
Blaydon
Heaton
Selby
York (North)
Withdrawn
12/1919
27/11/1930
28/03/1943
06/05/1946
25/10/1947
07/08/1949
25/09/1955
13/05/1956
08/07/1956
08/06/1958
13/09/1959
19/10/1960
19/10/1960
B16/1 841   1401 61401   61470 12/1919 HTN
HLD
YK
NEV
W
Heaton
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
12/1919
27/11/1930
28/03/1943
07/08/1949
23/11/1959
23/11/1959
B16/1 842   1402 61402   61471 12/1919 HTN
HLD
YK
SKN
YK
NEV
W
Heaton
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Stockton
York (North)
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
12/1919
27/11/1930
28/03/1943
06/05/1946
31/08/1947
07/08/1949
05/09/1960
05/09/1960
B16/3 843   1403 61403   61472 12/1919 HTN
HLD
YK
NEV
YK
50B
W
Heaton
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
12/1919
18/10/1934
01/06/1940
07/11/1940
28/03/1943
02/12/1962
20/04/1964
20/04/1964
B16/1 844   1404 61404   61473 12/1919 YK
HLD
YK
50B
50A
50B
50A
W
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Withdrawn
12/1919
11/09/1949
04/12/1949
06/05/1951
15/11/1953
14/03/1954
18/07/1954
25/09/1961
25/09/1961
B16/1 845   1405 61405   61474 04/1920 YK
SCA
YK
SCA
YK
50B
50A
50B
50A
50C
W
York (North)
Scarborough
York (North)
Scarborough
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Selby
Withdrawn
04/1920
15/07/1924
01/10/1924
14/01/1930
28/03/1943
06/05/1951
15/11/1953
14/03/1954
18/07/1954
29/05/1955
20/01/1958
20/01/1958
B16/2 846   1406 61406   61475 03/1920 HTN
HLD
YK
50B
W
Heaton
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
03/1920
18/10/1934
28/03/1943
13/01/1963
15/04/1963
15/04/1963
B16/3 847   1407 61407   61476 03/1920 YK
NEV
YK
56D
W
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Mirfield
Withdrawn
03/1920
07/11/1940
28/03/1943
10/09/1961
16/09/1963
16/09/1963
B16/1 848   1408 61408   61477 04/1920 YK
HLB
NEV
YK
NEV
HLD
YK
W
York (North)
Hull Botanic Gardens
Neville Hill
York (North)
Neville Hill
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Withdrawn
04/1920
23/06/1931
22/06/1932
28/03/1943
07/08/1949
11/09/1949
04/12/1949
01/02/1960
01/02/1960
B16/1 849   1409 61409   61478 04/1920 YK
HLB
NEV
YK
NEV
50D
50A
W
York (North)
Hull Botanic Gardens
Neville Hill
York (North)
Neville Hill
Starbeck
York (North)
Withdrawn
04/1920
23/06/1931
22/06/1932
28/03/1943
07/08/1949
01/05/1955
14/06/1959
12/12/1960
12/12/1960
B16/1 906   1410     61410 06/1920 HTN
HLD
DAR
YK
NEV
52B
50A
W
Heaton
Hull Dairycoates
Darlington
York (North)
Neville Hill
Heaton
York (North)
Withdrawn
06/1920
16/10/1934
26/08/1941
28/03/1943
07/08/1949
25/09/1955
08/06/1958
03/10/1960
03/10/1960
B16/1 908   1411     61411 08/1920 YK
SCA
YK
NEV
56D
W
York (North)
Scarborough
York (North)
Neville Hill
Mirfield
Withdrawn
08/1920
03/10/1929
02/11/1929
07/08/1949
11/12/1960
25/09/1961
25/09/1961
B16/1 909   1412   1412 61412 08/1920 TWD
HLD
YK
NEV
56D
W
Tweedmouth
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Neville Hill
Mirfield
Withdrawn
08/1920
30/08/1929
28/03/1943
07/08/1949
11/12/1960
25/09/1961
25/09/1961
B16/1 911   1413     61413 08/1920 YK
GOR
YK
TWD
YK
SKN
YK
NEV
52B
50A
56D
W
York (North)
Gorton
York (North)
Tweedmouth
York (North)
Stockton
York (North)
Neville Hill
Heaton
York (North)
Mirfield
Withdrawn
08/1920
22/09/1924
06/03/1925
28/10/1931
16/10/1934
06/05/1946
24/08/1947
07/08/1949
25/09/1955
08/06/1958
11/12/1960
25/09/1961
25/09/1961
B16/1 914   1414     61414 09/1920 HTN
NEV
YK
NEV
52B
52C
50B
56D
W
Heaton
Neville Hill
York (North)
Neville Hill
Heaton
Blaydon
Neville Hill
Mirfield
Withdrawn
09/1920
31/10/1929
28/03/1943
07/08/1949
25/09/1955
13/05/1956
10/06/1956
11/12/1960
25/09/1961
25/09/1961
B16/1 915   1415     61415 09/1920 YK
SEL
DAR
YK
DAR
YK
NEV
52B
50B
W
York (North)
Selby
Darlington
York (North)
Darlington
York (North)
Neville Hill
Heaton
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
09/1920
05/1923
19/03/1924
28/03/1943
29/09/1946
27/07/1947
07/08/1949
25/09/1955
10/06/1956
25/09/1961
25/09/1961
B16/1 920   1416     61416 09/1920 GHD
YK
NEV
HLD
YK
50B
50A
56D
W
Gateshead
York (North)
Neville Hill
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Mirfield
Withdrawn
09/1920
29/06/1936
07/08/1949
11/09/1949
04/12/1949
06/05/1951
21/10/1951
11/12/1960
12/05/1961
12/05/1961
B16/3 921   1417     61417 10/1920 YK
TWD
YK
TWD
YK
W
York (North)
Tweedmouth
York (North)
Tweedmouth
York (North)
Withdrawn
10/1920
11/06/1928
22/07/1929
28/10/1931
16/10/1934
03/09/1962
03/09/1962
B16/3 922   1418     61418 11/1920 HTN
TDK
HLD
YK
50B
W
Heaton
Tyne Dock
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
11/1920
01/1925
29/12/1936
01/06/1940
02/12/1962
29/06/1964
29/06/1964
B16/1 923   1419     61419 11/1920 YK
SCA
YK
HLD
YK
50B
50A
50C
50A
W
York (North)
Scarborough
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Selby
York (North)
Withdrawn
11/1920
14/05/1928
03/10/1929
11/09/1949
04/12/1949
06/05/1951
17/02/1952
30/06/1957
15/09/1957
25/09/1961
25/09/1961
B16/1 924   1420     61420 12/1920 TWD
YK
NEV
YK
50B
W
Tweedmouth
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
12/1920
08/05/1924
07/07/1925
28/03/1943
02/12/1962
23/09/1963
23/09/1963
B16/1 925           12/1920 YK
HLD
SCA
YK
W
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
Scarborough
York (North)
Withdrawn
12/1920
25/11/1927
01/06/1939
25/05/1940
13/06/1942
13/06/1942
B16/2 926   1421     61421 12/1920 TWD
YK
W
Tweedmouth
York (North)
Withdrawn
12/1920
22/07/1929
29/06/1964
29/06/1964
B16/1 927   1422     61422 12/1920 YK
50B
50C
50A
W
York (North)
Neville Hill
Selby
York (North)
Withdrawn
12/1920
06/05/1951
07/06/1953
29/05/1955
25/09/1961
25/09/1961
B16/1 928   1423   1423 61423 01/1921 TWD
HLD
NEV
YK
YK
W
Tweedmouth
Hull Dairycoates
Neville Hill
York (North)
York (North)
Withdrawn
01/1921
01/08/1929
06/03/1940
28/03/1943
04/12/1949
25/09/1961
25/09/1961
B16/1 929   1424     61424 02/1921 NEV
YK
50B
50A
50B
50A
W
Neville Hill
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Withdrawn
02/1921
28/03/1943
06/05/1951
15/11/1953
14/03/1954
18/07/1954
05/10/1960
05/10/1960
B16/1 930   1425     61425 02/1921 HTN
HLD
YK
NEV
50A
W
Heaton
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Withdrawn
02/1921
30/03/1931
28/03/1943
28/08/1949
14/02/1960
25/09/1961
25/09/1961
B16/1 931   1426     61426 03/1921 NEV
YK
HLD
YK
50B
50A
W
Neville Hill
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Withdrawn
03/1921
28/03/1943
11/09/1949
04/12/1949
06/05/1951
21/10/1951
29/09/1959
29/09/1959
B16/1 932   1427     61427 03/1921 HTN
BLA
YK
NEV
W
Heaton
Blaydon
York (North)
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
03/1921
01/07/1924
30/09/1937
07/08/1949
07/03/1960
07/03/1960
B16/1 933   1428     61428 03/1921 YK
TWD
HLD
DAR
YK
NEV
W
York (North)
Tweedmouth
Hull Dairycoates
Darlington
York (North)
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
03/1921
22/10/1927
09/08/1929
04/04/1942
28/03/1943
07/08/1949
31/10/1960
31/10/1960
B16/1 934   1429     61429 04/1921 HTN
HLD
YK
NEV
W
Heaton
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
04/1921
30/03/1931
27/05/1939
07/08/1949
25/09/1961
25/09/1961
B16/1 936   1430     61430 04/1921 YK
HLD
YK
SKN
YK
NEV
HLD
YK
W
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Stockton
York (North)
Neville Hill
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Withdrawn
04/1921
15/06/1928
28/03/1943
06/05/1946
27/07/1947
07/08/1949
11/09/1949
04/12/1949
01/10/1959
01/10/1959
B16/1 937   1431   1431 61431 05/1921 HTN
HLD
YK
NEV
50A
W
Heaton
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Withdrawn
05/1921
30/03/1931
28/03/1943
07/08/1949
14/02/1960
25/09/1961
25/09/1961
B16/1 942   1432     61432 06/1921 YK
SCA
YK
HLD
YK
SKN
YK
NEV
W
York (North)
Scarborough
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Stockton
York (North)
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
06/1921
06/07/1925
28/09/1925
15/06/1928
30/05/1940
06/05/1946
31/08/1947
07/08/1949
03/07/1961
03/07/1961
B16/1 943   1433     61433 06/1921 HTN
TDK
HLD
CUD
YK
NEV
50C
50A
W
Heaton
Tyne Dock
Hull Dairycoates
Cudworth
York (North)
Neville Hill
Selby
York (North)
Withdrawn
06/1921
07/01/1925
22/03/1937
25/03/1940
05/07/1940
28/08/1949
23/09/1956
14/06/1959
30/11/1959
30/11/1959
B16/1 2363   1434     61434 11/1922 GHD
YK
W
Gateshead
York (North)
Withdrawn
11/1922
31/05/1937
29/06/1964
29/06/1964
B16/1 2364   1435     61435 11/1922 YK
50B
W
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
11/1922
02/12/1962
21/07/1964
21/07/1964
B16/1 2365   1436     61436 12/1922 GHD
BLA
HLD
YK
50B
50A
W
Gateshead
Blaydon
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Withdrawn
12/1922
01/1925
30/09/1937
28/03/1943
06/05/1951
17/02/1952
25/09/1961
25/09/1961
B16/2   2366 1437     61437 04/01/1923 YK
50B
W
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
04/01/1923
02/12/1962
29/06/1964
29/06/1964
B16/2   2367 1438     61438 17/01/1923 GHD
HLD
YK
50B
W
Gateshead
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
17/01/1923
30/03/1931
28/03/1943
02/12/1962
29/06/1964
29/06/1964
B16/1   2368 1439     61439 19/02/1923 YK
SEL
YK
W
York (North)
Selby
York (North)
Withdrawn
19/02/1923
30/05/1923
01/09/1923
20/08/1962
20/08/1962
B16/1   2369 1440     61440 08/03/1923 GHD
HLD
YK
NEV
52B
50A
W
Gateshead
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Neville Hill
Heaton
York (North)
Withdrawn
08/03/1923
30/03/1931
30/05/1940
07/08/1949
25/09/1955
08/06/1958
15/08/1960
15/08/1960
B16/1   2370 1441     61441 12/03/1923 YK
NEV
HLD
YK
50B
50A
W
York (North)
Neville Hill
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Withdrawn
12/03/1923
07/08/1949
11/09/1949
04/12/1949
06/05/1951
21/10/1951
27/10/1959
27/10/1959
B16/1   2371 1442     61442 28/03/1923 GHD
YK
NEV
50D
50B
W
Gateshead
York (North)
Neville Hill
Starbeck
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
28/03/1923
23/06/1931
07/08/1949
07/06/1953
01/05/1955
01/02/1960
01/02/1960
B16/1   2372 1443     61443 17/04/1923 YK
HLD
YK
50B
50A
W
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Withdrawn
17/04/1923
11/09/1949
04/12/1949
06/05/1951
17/02/1952
25/09/1961
25/09/1961
B16/1   2373 1444     61444 04/05/1923 YK
50B
W
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
04/05/1923
02/12/1962
29/06/1964
29/06/1964
B16/1   2374 1445     61445 19/05/1923 YK
SUN
YK
NEV
50E
W
York (North)
Sunderland
York (North)
Neville Hill
Scarborough
Withdrawn
19/05/1923
13/07/1933
19/01/1934
07/08/1949
01/07/1951
04/07/1961
04/07/1961
B16/1   2375 1446     61446 23/05/1923 GHD
DAR
YK
DAR
YK
NEV
W
Gateshead
Darlington
York (North)
Darlington
York (North)
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
23/05/1923
16/01/1937
28/03/1943
29/09/1946
27/07/1947
07/08/1949
17/01/1961
17/01/1961
B16/1   2376 1447   1447 61447 29/05/1923 YK
NEV
52B
50B
56D
W
York (North)
Neville Hill
Heaton
Neville Hill
Mirfield
Withdrawn
29/05/1923
07/08/1949
25/09/1955
10/06/1956
11/12/1960
25/09/1961
25/09/1961
B16/1   2377 1448     61448 06/06/1923 GHD
BLA
HLD
YK
W
Gateshead
Blaydon
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Withdrawn
06/06/1923
15/01/1937
28/09/1937
28/03/1943
29/06/1964
29/06/1964
B16/1   2378 1449     61449 29/06/1923 YK
56D
W
York (North)
Mirfield
Withdrawn
29/06/1923
10/09/1961
03/07/1963
03/07/1963
B16/1   2379 1450     61450 30/06/1923 GHD
HLD
YK
HLD
YK
W
Gateshead
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Withdrawn
30/06/1923
30/03/1931
04/06/1939
11/09/1949
04/12/1949
25/09/1961
25/09/1961
B16/1   2380 1451     61451 31/07/1923 YK
HLD
YK
HLD
YK
50B
50E
50A
52B
50A
W
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Neville Hill
Scarborough
York (North)
Heaton
York (North)
Withdrawn
31/07/1923
27/05/1929
28/03/1943
11/09/1949
04/12/1949
06/05/1951
04/11/1951
17/02/1952
20/11/1955
08/06/1958
25/09/1961
25/09/1961
B16/1   2381 1452     61452 16/08/1923 GHD
YK
HLD
YK
50B
50A
50B
50A
W
Gateshead
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Withdrawn
16/08/1923
29/06/1936
11/09/1949
04/12/1949
06/05/1951
15/11/1953
14/03/1954
18/07/1959
25/09/1961
25/09/1961
B16/1   2382 1453     61453 31/08/1923 YK
50B
W
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
31/08/1923
02/12/1962
17/06/1963
17/06/1963
B16/1   1371 1454     61454 29/09/1923 YK
HLD
YK
W
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Withdrawn
29/09/1923
27/05/1929
11/05/1940
29/06/1964
29/06/1964
B16/1   1372 1455     61455 19/10/1923 HTN
TWD
YK
W
Heaton
Tweedmouth
York (North)
Withdrawn
19/10/1923
20/07/1931
16/10/1934
09/09/1963
09/09/1963
B16/1   1373 1456     61456 19/10/1923 HTN
YK
HLD
YK
HLD
YK
50B
50A
52B
50C
50A
W
Heaton
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Heaton
Selby
York (North)
Withdrawn
19/10/1923
23/06/1931
19/01/1937
04/06/1939
11/09/1949
04/12/1949
06/05/1951
21/10/1951
20/11/1955
08/06/1958
14/06/1959
01/08/1960
01/08/1960
B16/2   1374 1457     61457 23/10/1923 YK
HLD
YK
W
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Withdrawn
23/10/1923
27/05/1929
28/03/1943
29/06/1964
29/06/1964
B16/1   1375 1458   1458 61458 30/10/1923 TWD
HLD
NEV
YK
HLD
YK
50B
50A
50B
50A
52B
50C
50A
W
Tweedmouth
Hull Dairycoates
Neville Hill
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Heaton
Selby
York (North)
Withdrawn
30/10/1923
16/09/1929
06/03/1940
28/03/1943
11/09/1949
04/12/1949
06/05/1951
15/11/1953
14/03/1954
18/07/1954
20/11/1955
08/06/1958
14/06/1959
02/11/1959
02/11/1959
B16/1   1376 1459     61459 31/10/1923 TWD
HLD
YK
HLD
YK
50B
50A
50C
50A
W
Tweedmouth
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Selby
York (North)
Withdrawn
31/10/1923
29/08/1929
28/03/1943
11/09/1949
04/12/1949
06/05/1951
21/10/1951
30/06/1957
14/06/1959
25/09/1961
25/09/1961
B16/1   1377 1460     61460 10/11/1923 YK
HLD
YK
50B
50A
W
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Withdrawn
10/11/1923
11/09/1949
04/12/1949
06/05/1951
17/02/1952
15/09/1961
15/09/1961
B16/1   1378 1461     61461 15/11/1923 TWD
HLD
YK
56D
W
Tweedmouth
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Mirfield
Withdrawn
15/11/1923
09/10/1929
28/03/1943
10/09/1961
16/09/1963
16/09/1963
B16/1   1379 1462     61462 21/11/1923 HTN
TWD
NEV
YK
HLD
YK
50B
50A
50B
50A
W
Heaton
Tweedmouth
Neville Hill
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Withdrawn
21/11/1923
20/07/1931
16/10/1934
28/03/1943
11/09/1949
04/12/1949
06/05/1951
15/11/1953
14/03/1954
18/07/1954
29/05/1961
29/05/1961
B16/1   1380 1463     61463 29/11/1923 NEV
YK
50B
W
Neville Hill
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
29/11/1923
28/03/1943
02/12/1962
29/06/1964
29/06/1964
B16/1   1381 1464     61464 04/12/1923 DAR
YK
56D
W
Darlington
York (North)
Mirfield
Withdrawn
04/12/1923
28/03/1943
10/09/1961
16/09/1963
16/09/1963
B16/1   1382 1465     61465 13/12/1923 DAR
HLD
YK
HLD
YK
50B
50A
50B
50A
W
Darlington
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Withdrawn
13/12/1923
29/08/1941
28/03/1943
11/09/1949
04/12/1949
06/05/1951
15/11/1953
14/03/1954
18/07/1954
25/01/1960
25/01/1960
B16/1   1383 1466     61466 20/12/1923 HTN
NEV
YK
HLD
YK
50B
50A
50B
50A
50C
50A
W
Heaton
Neville Hill
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Selby
York (North)
Withdrawn
20/12/1923
22/11/1929
28/03/1943
11/09/1949
04/12/1949
06/05/1951
15/11/1953
14/03/1954
18/07/1954
09/02/1958
13/09/1959
24/07/1961
24/07/1961
B16/3   1384 1467   1467 61467 01/01/1924 TWD
YK
HLD
YK
50B
W
Tweedmouth
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1924
08/05/1924
07/07/1925
28/03/1943
02/12/1962
08/06/1964
08/06/1964
B16/3   1385 1468     61468 01/01/1924 HTN
HLD
YK
56D
W
Heaton
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Mirfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1924
27/11/1930
01/06/1940
10/09/1961
16/09/1963
16/09/1963