Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 971 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6947 Week
» 13081 Month
» 240965 Year
» 1462530 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "B14" Class 4-6-0


NER Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
2111 12/1900 Gateshead 01/07/1929 Hull Dairycoates 28.58
2112 06/1901 Gateshead 14/04/1931 Hull Dairycoates 29.83
2113 06/1901 Gateshead 17/10/1930 Hull Dairycoates 29.33
2114 06/1901 Gateshead 17/10/1930 Hull Dairycoates 29.33
2115 08/1901 Gateshead 19/06/1929 Hull Dairycoates 27.83