Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 236 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2351 Week
» 24857 Month
» 328047 Year
» 1549612 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "B14" Class 4-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
12/1900 To Service 2111   NEW GHD Gateshead  
06/1901 To Service 2112   NEW GHD Gateshead  
06/1901 To Service 2113   NEW GHD Gateshead  
06/1901 To Service 2114   NEW GHD Gateshead  
08/1901 To Service 2115   NEW GHD Gateshead  
07/10/1924 Reallocation 2112 GHD Gateshead HLB Hull Botanic Gardens  
07/10/1924 Reallocation 2114 GHD Gateshead HLB Hull Botanic Gardens  
07/11/1924 Reallocation 2111 GHD Gateshead HLB Hull Botanic Gardens  
07/11/1924 Reallocation 2113 GHD Gateshead HLB Hull Botanic Gardens  
07/11/1924 Reallocation 2115 GHD Gateshead HLB Hull Botanic Gardens  
07/02/1925 Reallocation 2111 HLB Hull Botanic Gardens HLD Hull Dairycoates  
07/02/1925 Reallocation 2112 HLB Hull Botanic Gardens HLD Hull Dairycoates  
07/02/1925 Reallocation 2113 HLB Hull Botanic Gardens HLD Hull Dairycoates  
07/02/1925 Reallocation 2114 HLB Hull Botanic Gardens HLD Hull Dairycoates  
27/02/1925 Reallocation 2115 HLB Hull Botanic Gardens YK York (North)  
07/07/1925 Reallocation 2113 HLD Hull Dairycoates SEL Selby  
28/09/1925 Reallocation 2113 SEL Selby HLD Hull Dairycoates  
21/05/1928 Reallocation 2115 YK York (North) HLD Hull Dairycoates  
19/06/1929 Condemned 2115 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
01/07/1929 Condemned 2111 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
17/10/1930 Condemned 2113 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
17/10/1930 Condemned 2114 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
14/04/1931 Condemned 2112 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND