Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 191 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2306 Week
» 24812 Month
» 328002 Year
» 1549567 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "B14" Class 4-6-0


Class NER Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
B14 2111 12/1900 GHD
HLB
HLD
W
Gateshead
Hull Botanic Gardens
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
12/1900
07/11/1924
07/02/1925
01/07/1929
01/07/1929
B14 2112 06/1901 GHD
HLB
HLD
W
Gateshead
Hull Botanic Gardens
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
06/1901
07/10/1924
07/02/1925
14/04/1931
14/04/1931
B14 2113 06/1901 GHD
HLB
HLD
SEL
HLD
W
Gateshead
Hull Botanic Gardens
Hull Dairycoates
Selby
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
06/1901
07/11/1924
07/02/1925
07/07/1925
28/09/1925
17/10/1930
17/10/1930
B14 2114 06/1901 GHD
HLB
HLD
W
Gateshead
Hull Botanic Gardens
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
06/1901
07/10/1924
07/02/1925
17/10/1930
17/10/1930
B14 2115 08/1901 GHD
HLB
YK
HLD
W
Gateshead
Hull Botanic Gardens
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
08/1901
07/11/1924
27/02/1925
21/05/1928
19/06/1929
19/06/1929