Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 373 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3964 Week
» 14099 Month
» 330330 Year
» 841432 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "B13" Class 4-6-0


NER LNER (1924) LNER (1946) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
2001 06/1899 Tweedmouth 10/06/1931 Hull Dairycoates 32
2002 06/1899 Heaton 07/07/1931 Blaydon 32.08
2003 09/1899 Heaton 07/07/1931 Hull Dairycoates 31.83
2004 12/1899 Hull Dairycoates 29/08/1928 Hull Dairycoates 28.67
2005 12/1899 Heaton 21/11/1928 York (North) 28.92
2006 12/1899 Neville Hill 10/06/1931 Neville Hill 31.5
2007 03/1900 Tweedmouth 24/10/1928 Blaydon 28.58
2008 05/1900 Neville Hill 31/12/1929 Neville Hill 29.58
2009 2009D 06/1900 Hull Dairycoates 07/07/1931 Hull Dairycoates 31.08
2010 06/1900 Hull Dairycoates 07/07/1931 Hull Dairycoates 31.08
726 04/1906 Hull Dairycoates 26/12/1936 Hull Dairycoates 30.67
740 04/1906 Hull Dairycoates 03/09/1932 Hull Dairycoates 26.42
757 04/1906 Heaton 03/05/1932 Hull Dairycoates 26.08
760 05/1906 Hull Dairycoates 26/03/1931 Hull Dairycoates 24.83
761 1699 06/1906 Heaton 22/02/1951 Darlington 44.67 44.95
763 06/1906 Hull Dairycoates 16/04/1929 Hull Dairycoates 22.83
766 06/1906 Blaydon 26/10/1931 Darlington 25.33
768 06/1906 Hull Dairycoates 25/05/1929 Hull Dairycoates 22.92
775 08/1906 Blaydon 15/08/1936 York (North) 30
1077 08/1906 Heaton 06/11/1931 York (North) 25.25
738 06/1908 Tweedmouth 30/07/1938 Hull Dairycoates 30.08
739 06/1908 Tweedmouth 01/07/1932 Neville Hill 24.08
741 06/1908 Tweedmouth 31/01/1930 Tweedmouth 21.58
743 06/1908 Neville Hill 03/05/1932 Neville Hill 23.92
744 07/1908 Hull Dairycoates 15/12/1931 Hull Dairycoates 23.42
745 08/1908 Tweedmouth 08/12/1931 Tweedmouth 23.33
746 08/1908 Hull Dairycoates 28/11/1931 Colwick 23.25
747 09/1908 Tweedmouth 04/08/1932 Hull Dairycoates 23.92
748 09/1908 Hull Dairycoates 22/10/1938 Hull Dairycoates 30.08
749 10/1908 Hull Dairycoates 15/04/1930 Hull Dairycoates 21.5
750 11/1908 Neville Hill 01/11/1932 Neville Hill 24
751 11/1908 Hull Dairycoates 07/05/1936 Hull Dairycoates 27.5
752 11/1908 Heaton 23/06/1934 Tweedmouth 25.58
753 12/1908 Neville Hill 22/10/1938 Hull Dairycoates 29.83
754 01/1909 Tweedmouth 26/12/1936 Hull Dairycoates 27.92
755 01/1909 Hull Dairycoates 01/02/1934 Hull Dairycoates 25.08
756 01/1909 Blaydon 21/09/1934 Hull Dairycoates 25.67
758 02/1909 Hull Dairycoates 12/05/1930 Hull Dairycoates 21.25
759 03/1909 Heaton 22/10/1938 Hull Dairycoates 29.58
762 03/1909 Neville Hill 27/05/1937 Neville Hill 28.17