NER/LNER Worsdell "B13" Class 4-6-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/1899 | To Service | 2001 | NEW | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
06/1899 | To Service | 2002 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
09/1899 | To Service | 2003 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
12/1899 | To Service | 2004 | NEW | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
12/1899 | To Service | 2005 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
12/1899 | To Service | 2006 | NEW | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
03/1900 | To Service | 2007 | NEW | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
05/1900 | To Service | 2008 | NEW | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
06/1900 | To Service | 2009 | NEW | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
06/1900 | To Service | 2010 | NEW | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
04/1906 | To Service | 726 | NEW | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
04/1906 | To Service | 740 | NEW | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
04/1906 | To Service | 757 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
05/1906 | To Service | 760 | NEW | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
06/1906 | To Service | 761 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
06/1906 | To Service | 763 | NEW | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
06/1906 | To Service | 766 | NEW | BLA | Blaydon | ||
06/1906 | To Service | 768 | NEW | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
08/1906 | To Service | 775 | NEW | BLA | Blaydon | ||
08/1906 | To Service | 1077 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
06/1908 | To Service | 738 | NEW | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
06/1908 | To Service | 739 | NEW | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
06/1908 | To Service | 741 | NEW | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
06/1908 | To Service | 743 | NEW | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
07/1908 | To Service | 744 | NEW | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
08/1908 | To Service | 745 | NEW | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
08/1908 | To Service | 746 | NEW | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
09/1908 | To Service | 747 | NEW | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
09/1908 | To Service | 748 | NEW | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
10/1908 | To Service | 749 | NEW | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
11/1908 | To Service | 750 | NEW | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
11/1908 | To Service | 751 | NEW | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
11/1908 | To Service | 752 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
12/1908 | To Service | 753 | NEW | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
01/1909 | To Service | 754 | NEW | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
01/1909 | To Service | 755 | NEW | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
01/1909 | To Service | 756 | NEW | BLA | Blaydon | ||
02/1909 | To Service | 758 | NEW | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
03/1909 | To Service | 759 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
03/1909 | To Service | 762 | NEW | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
01/1924 | Reallocation | 2001 | TWD | Tweedmouth | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
01/1924 | Reallocation | 2003 | HTN | Heaton | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
07/1924 | Reallocation | 775 | BLA | Blaydon | YK | York (North) | |
01/07/1924 | Reallocation | 2005 | HTN | Heaton | YK | York (North) | |
01/07/1924 | Reallocation | 1077 | HTN | Heaton | YK | York (North) | |
01/07/1924 | Reallocation | 754 | TWD | Tweedmouth | HTN | Heaton | |
07/07/1924 | Reallocation | 757 | HTN | Heaton | YK | York (North) | |
07/07/1924 | Reallocation | 761 | HTN | Heaton | YK | York (North) | |
07/07/1924 | Reallocation | 766 | BLA | Blaydon | YK | York (North) | |
07/07/1924 | Reallocation | 746 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | DON | Doncaster | |
07/07/1924 | Reallocation | 747 | TWD | Tweedmouth | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
09/1924 | Reallocation | 2007 | TWD | Tweedmouth | HTN | Heaton | |
07/09/1924 | Reallocation | 756 | BLA | Blaydon | TWD | Tweedmouth | |
01/1925 | Reallocation | 2002 | HTN | Heaton | TWD | Tweedmouth | |
01/1925 | Reallocation | 2007 | HTN | Heaton | BLA | Blaydon | |
07/01/1925 | Reallocation | 752 | HTN | Heaton | TWD | Tweedmouth | |
07/01/1925 | Reallocation | 754 | HTN | Heaton | TWD | Tweedmouth | |
07/01/1925 | Reallocation | 759 | HTN | Heaton | TWD | Tweedmouth | |
01/07/1925 | Reallocation | 746 | DON | Doncaster | CLK | Colwick | |
07/07/1925 | Reallocation | 744 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | YK | York (North) | |
07/02/1926 | Reallocation | 752 | TWD | Tweedmouth | ANN | Annesley | |
23/02/1926 | Reallocation | 757 | YK | York (North) | ARD | Ardsley | |
23/02/1926 | Reallocation | 743 | NEV | Neville Hill | ARD | Ardsley | |
07/06/1926 | Reallocation | 757 | ARD | Ardsley | CLK | Colwick | |
09/1926 | Reallocation | 743 | ARD | Ardsley | NEV | Neville Hill | |
20/09/1926 | Reallocation | 752 | ANN | Annesley | TWD | Tweedmouth | |
22/09/1926 | Reallocation | 757 | CLK | Colwick | YK | York (North) | |
01/1927 | Reallocation | 2002 | TWD | Tweedmouth | BLA | Blaydon | |
04/02/1927 | Reallocation | 738 | TWD | Tweedmouth | SKN | Stockton | |
04/02/1927 | Reallocation | 739 | TWD | Tweedmouth | SKN | Stockton | |
18/02/1927 | Reallocation | 752 | TWD | Tweedmouth | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
18/02/1927 | Reallocation | 754 | TWD | Tweedmouth | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
18/02/1927 | Reallocation | 756 | TWD | Tweedmouth | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
04/04/1927 | Reallocation | 754 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | TWD | Tweedmouth | |
07/04/1927 | Reallocation | 752 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | TWD | Tweedmouth | |
06/05/1927 | Reallocation | 761 | YK | York (North) | DAR | Darlington | |
06/05/1927 | Reallocation | 766 | YK | York (North) | DAR | Darlington | |
19/07/1928 | Reallocation | 757 | YK | York (North) | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
19/07/1928 | Reallocation | 738 | SKN | Stockton | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
19/07/1928 | Reallocation | 744 | YK | York (North) | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
29/08/1928 | Condemned | 2004 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
24/10/1928 | Condemned | 2007 | BLA | Blaydon | COND | ||
05/11/1928 | Reallocation | 762 | NEV | Neville Hill | SBK | Starbeck | |
21/11/1928 | Condemned | 2005 | YK | York (North) | COND | ||
16/04/1929 | Condemned | 763 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
25/05/1929 | Condemned | 768 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
09/10/1929 | Reallocation | 762 | SBK | Starbeck | NEV | Neville Hill | |
31/12/1929 | Condemned | 2008 | NEV | Neville Hill | COND | ||
31/01/1930 | Condemned | 741 | TWD | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
15/04/1930 | Condemned | 749 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
05/05/1930 | Reallocation | 739 | SKN | Stockton | NEV | Neville Hill | |
12/05/1930 | Condemned | 758 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
26/03/1931 | Condemned | 760 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
10/06/1931 | Condemned | 2001 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
10/06/1931 | Condemned | 2006 | NEV | Neville Hill | COND | ||
07/07/1931 | Condemned | 2002 | BLA | Blaydon | COND | ||
07/07/1931 | Condemned | 2003 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
07/07/1931 | Condemned | 2009D | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
07/07/1931 | Condemned | 2010 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
26/10/1931 | Condemned | 766 | DAR | Darlington | COND | ||
06/11/1931 | Condemned | 1077 | YK | York (North) | COND | ||
28/11/1931 | Condemned | 746 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
08/12/1931 | Condemned | 745 | TWD | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
15/12/1931 | Condemned | 744 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
03/05/1932 | Condemned | 757 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
03/05/1932 | Condemned | 743 | NEV | Neville Hill | COND | ||
01/07/1932 | Condemned | 739 | NEV | Neville Hill | COND | ||
04/08/1932 | Condemned | 747 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
03/09/1932 | Condemned | 740 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
01/11/1932 | Condemned | 750 | NEV | Neville Hill | COND | ||
27/03/1933 | Reallocation | 759 | TWD | Tweedmouth | NEV | Neville Hill | |
10/1933 | Reallocation | 758 | 98W | HTN | Heaton | ||
11/10/1933 | Reallocation | 759 | NEV | Neville Hill | HTN | Heaton | |
01/02/1934 | Condemned | 755 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
05/1934 | Reallocation | 758 | HTN | Heaton | NEV | Neville Hill | |
11/05/1934 | Reallocation | 759 | HTN | Heaton | NEV | Neville Hill | |
23/06/1934 | Condemned | 752 | TWD | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
21/09/1934 | Condemned | 756 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
21/10/1935 | Reallocation | 753 | NEV | Neville Hill | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
12/1935 | Reallocation | 753 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
07/05/1936 | Condemned | 751 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
13/06/1936 | Reallocation | 754 | TWD | Tweedmouth | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
15/08/1936 | Condemned | 775 | YK | York (North) | COND | ||
05/12/1936 | Reallocation | 759 | NEV | Neville Hill | YK | York (North) | |
26/12/1936 | Condemned | 726 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
26/12/1936 | Condemned | 754 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
06/05/1937 | Reallocation | 759 | YK | York (North) | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
27/05/1937 | Condemned | 762 | NEV | Neville Hill | COND | ||
30/07/1938 | Condemned | 738 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
22/10/1938 | Condemned | 748 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
22/10/1938 | Condemned | 753 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | COND | ||
22/10/1938 | Condemned | 759 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
21/12/1946 | Reallocation | 1699 | DAR | Darlington | Rugby Testing Station | ||
22/02/1951 | Condemned | 1699 | COND |