Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 175 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7182 Week
» 13316 Month
» 241200 Year
» 1462765 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Thompson "B1" Class 4-6-0


Class Number Built Name Name Date Notes Removed Date Withdrawn
B1 8301 12/12/1942 SPRINGBOK 12/12/1942   05/03/1962
B1 8302 12/06/1943 ELAND 12/06/1943   22/09/1963
B1 8303 21/09/1943 IMPALA 21/09/1943   24/06/1967
B1 8304 22/11/1943 GAZELLE 22/11/1943   26/12/1965
B1 8305 22/12/1943 ORYX 22/12/1943   28/12/1963
B1 8306 19/02/1944 BONGO 19/02/1944   16/09/1962
B1 8307 17/03/1944 BLACKBUCK 17/03/1944   22/09/1963
B1 8308 14/04/1944 KLIPSPRINGER 14/04/1944   06/02/1964
B1 8309 13/05/1944 KUDU 13/05/1944   09/12/1966
B1 8310 19/06/1944 HARTEBEESTE 19/06/1944   16/09/1962
B1 1010 02/11/1946 WILDEBEESTE 02/11/1946   07/11/1965
B1 1011 30/11/1946 WATERBUCK 30/11/1946   02/11/1962
B1 1012 30/11/1946 PUKU 30/11/1946   12/06/1967
B1 1013 14/12/1946 TOPI 14/12/1946   06/12/1966
B1 1014 23/12/1946 ORIBI 23/12/1946   31/12/1966
B1 1015 04/01/1947 DUIKER 04/01/1947   19/11/1962
B1 1016 16/01/1947 INYALA 16/01/1947   31/10/1965
B1 1017 28/01/1947 BUSHBUCK 28/01/1947   15/11/1966
B1 1018 04/02/1947 GNU 04/02/1947   07/11/1965
B1 1019 24/02/1947 NILGHAI 24/02/1947   12/03/1967
B1 1020 28/02/1947 GEMSBOK 28/02/1947   26/11/1962
B1 1021 12/03/1947 REITBOK 12/03/1947   06/06/1967
B1 1022 22/03/1947 SASSABY 22/03/1947   25/11/1966
B1 1023 01/04/1947 HIROLA 01/04/1947   31/10/1965
B1 1024 12/04/1947 ADDAX 12/04/1947   15/05/1966
B1 1025 22/04/1947 PALLAH 22/04/1947   02/12/1962
B1 1026 28/04/1947 OUREBI 28/04/1947   10/02/1966
B1 1027 11/05/1947 MADOQUA 11/05/1947   16/09/1962
B1 1028 30/05/1947 UMSEKE 30/05/1947   08/10/1962
B1 1029 07/06/1947 CHAMOIS 07/06/1947   31/12/1966
B1 1030 26/06/1947 NYALA 26/06/1947   30/09/1967
B1 1031 10/07/1947 REEDBUCK 10/07/1947   09/11/1964
B1 1032 07/08/1947 STEMBOK 07/08/1947   27/11/1966
B1 1033 29/08/1947 DIBATAG 29/08/1947   25/03/1963
B1 1034 03/10/1947 CHIRU 03/10/1947   21/12/1964
B1 1035 31/10/1947 PRONGHORN 31/10/1947   12/12/1966
B1 1036 20/11/1947 RALPH ASSHETON 20/11/1947   16/09/1962
B1 1037 28/11/1947 JAIROU 28/11/1947   18/05/1964
B1 1038 05/12/1947 BLACKTAIL 05/12/1947   01/05/1964
B1 1189 08/08/1947 SIR WILLIAM GRAY 12/1947   11/05/1967
B1 1215 19/07/1947 WILLIAM HENTON CARVER 12/1947   08/03/1965
B1 1221 16/08/1947 SIR ALEXANDER ERSKINE-HILL 12/1947   27/03/1965
B1 1237 24/09/1947 GEOFFREY H KITSON 12/1947   06/12/1966
B1 1238 26/09/1947 LESLIE RUNCIMAN 12/1947   17/02/1967
B1 1240 06/10/1947 HARRY HINCHLIFFE 12/1947   06/12/1966
B1 1241 08/10/1947 VISCOUNT RIDLEY 12/1947   02/12/1962
B1 1242 10/10/1947 ALEXANDER REITH GRAY 12/1947   23/07/1964
B1 1243 14/10/1947 SIR HAROLD MITCHELL 23/12/1947   04/05/1964
B1 1244 20/10/1947 STRANG STEEL 16/12/1947   29/10/1965
B1 1245 20/10/1947 MURRAY OF ELIBANK 12/1947   05/07/1965
B1 1246 22/10/1947 LORD BALFOUR OF BURLEIGH 12/1947   29/12/1962
B1 1247 24/10/1947 LORD BURGHLEY 12/1947   12/06/1962
B1 1248 27/10/1947 GEOFFREY GIBBS 12/1947   07/11/1965
B1 1249 31/10/1947 FITZHERBERT WRIGHT 12/1947   04/06/1964
B1 1250 31/10/1947 A HAROLD BIBBY 12/1947   17/04/1966
B1 1251 04/11/1947 OLIVER BURY 12/1947   19/04/1964
B1 61379 14/06/1951 MAYFLOWER 13/07/1951   06/08/1962