Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 120 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6096 Week
» 12230 Month
» 240114 Year
» 1461679 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Thompson "B1" Class 4-6-0


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Wed 21/07/1954 61002,
61397
50A,
64A
  Gateshead Works visit: Around the works. - Awaiting works.
Gateshead Works visit: Around the works. - Under repair.
RO 9/1954  
Thu 05/08/1954 61119,
61252,
61335,
61364
30A,
32B,
30A,
35A
  Stratford Works visit: Around the works.
Stratford Works visit: Around the works. - Freshly painted on shed/yard.
Stratford Works visit: Around the works.
Stratford Works visit: Around the works.
RO 9/1954  
Sun 15/08/1954 61056,
61066,
61157,
61162,
61201,
61386,
61406
38A,
38B,
36A,
37B,
38A,
37B,
40B
  Gorton Works visit: Around the works. - Awaiting works.
Gorton Works visit: Around the works.
Gorton Works visit: Around the works. - Awaiting works.
Gorton Works visit: Around the works.
Gorton Works visit: Around the works.
Gorton Works visit: Around the works. - Awaiting works.
Gorton Works visit: Around the works.
RO 9/1954  
Sat 11/02/1961 61035,
61039,
61201,
61274,
61368,
61383
52C,
50A,
26B,
56F,
2F,
56F
  Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside stripping shop.
Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Scrap road.
Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Scrap road.
Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside stripping shop.
   
Sun 26/02/1961 61000,
61058,
61234,
61281,
61285,
61315
40E,
40A,
41A,
40E,
40E,
41A
  Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works.
Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Paint shop.
   
Sat 11/11/1961 61008,
61020,
61024,
61129,
61192,
61216,
61218,
61220,
61257,
61289,
61382
26B,
50A,
56A,
56C,
15E,
52C,
51L,
51L,
51L,
50B,
51A
  Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard.
Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard.
Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard.
Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard.
Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
SLS 1/1962  
Sat 02/12/1961 61042,
61107,
61286,
61317
40A,
36A,
30A,
40B
  Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Outside weigh house.
Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Paint shop.
Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Crimpsall.
SLS 1/1962  
Sun 25/03/1962 61013,
61019,
61039,
61237,
61240,
61256,
61288,
61368
56B,
52C,
50A,
52G,
50A,
50B,
50A,
Wdn
  Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Stripping shop yard.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Darlington shed.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Darlington shed.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Waiting entry to works on Da
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Stripping shop yard.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Scrapyard, partially cut.
SLS 5/1962  
Sat 21/07/1962 61175 40E   Worked the 8:55am Leicester Belgrave Road to Skegness summer seasonal service BackTrack Jan 2007  
Sat 21/07/1962 61361 40E   Worked the 9:10am Leicester Belgrave Road to Mablethorpe summer seasonal service BackTrack Jan 2007  
Sat 04/08/1962 61227 40E   Worked a summer seasonal special from Skegness to Leicester Belgrave Road BackTrack Jan 2007  
Sat 04/08/1962 61227 40E   Shunted sidings at Melton Mowbray at 5:50pm BackTrack Jan 2007  
Sat 26/09/1964 61208 36E   Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Hauled an Up fitted freight. During the previous three months I rarely saw a Class 4 fitted freight on this line. This day was the second occasion on mid-morning, late-summer Saturdays that I saw a steam hauled service (vans forming the load). The B1's attack of the bank resulted in prodigious amounts of dark-brown smoke. 61208 would have coupled-up to the train at nearby Rotherwood Sidings, Sheffield, the location where diesel, electric and steam traction exchanged trains. John Thickitt  
Sat 03/10/1964 61138,
61218
34E,
56B
  A morning spent at Kiveton Park (ex MSLR): Passing
A morning spent at Kiveton Park (ex MSLR): Passing
John Thickitt  
Sat 24/10/1964 61055,
61107,
61127
36E,
36E,
36E
  A visit to Retford (G.N.) shed: On shed
A visit to Retford (G.N.) shed: On shed
A visit to Retford (G.N.) shed: On shed - In steam
John Thickitt  
Sun 08/11/1964 61013,
61158,
61289,
61329
56B,
36A,
50B,
36A
  A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed
A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed
A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed
A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed
John Thickitt  
Sun 08/11/1964 61348 36E   A visit to Retford (G.C.) shed (Thrumpton): Dead on shed John Thickitt  
Sat 14/11/1964 61050,
61153,
61313,
61315,
61327,
61329,
61370,
61394
41D,
41D,
41D,
41D,
41D,
36A,
41D,
41D
  A visit to Canklow shed: On shed
A visit to Canklow shed: On shed
A visit to Canklow shed: On shed
A visit to Canklow shed: On shed
A visit to Canklow shed: On shed
A visit to Canklow shed: On shed
A visit to Canklow shed: On shed
A visit to Canklow shed: On shed
John Thickitt  
Thu 29/04/1965 61315,
61394
41D,
41D
  An afternoon at Sheffield Midland station: Sheffield Midland station - left on a local passenger train to Manchester Central
An afternoon at Sheffield Midland station: Sheffield Midland station
John Thickitt - station visit  
Fri 06/05/1966 61188 Wdn   Hughes Bolckow Scrapyard: Dumped RO 8/1966